Peacock v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Erica Peacock
Defendant: Mateo Perez, Vicente Perez and Outback Steakhouse
Case Number: 1:2021cv00318
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of filing Initial Disclosures by Erica Peacock (Sparks, Mark) Modified title on 8/11/2021 (kcv, ).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2022 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 5/2/2022 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 8/9/21. (kcv, )
August 5, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2021. Attorneys present: Tim Ferguson, Jeffrey Mayes. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mayes, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (kcv, ).
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 DEFENDANTS' ORIGINAL ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Outback Steakhouse.(Mayes, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Outback Steakhouse. (Mayes, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erica Peacock. (Sparks, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2021: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (kcv, ).
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erica Peacock.(Sparks, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Outback Steakhouse identifying Corporate Parent Bloomin' Brands, Inc. for Outback Steakhouse. (Mayes, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Outback Steakhouse. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mayes, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by July 13, 2021. Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 11:00 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 6/23/21. (kcv, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court against Outback Steakhouse, Mateo Perez, Vicente Perez, filed by Erica Peacock.(kcv, )
June 21, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (kcv, )
June 21, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Outback Steakhouse, Mateo Perez, Vicente Perez. (kcv, )
June 21, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Outback Steakhouse, Vicente Perez, Mateo Perez from 60th Judicial District Court, case number B-207552. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8464027), filed by Outback Steakhouse, Vicente Perez, Mateo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mayes, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (kcv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peacock v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mateo Perez
Represented By: Jeffrey Shannon Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicente Perez
Represented By: Jeffrey Shannon Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse
Represented By: Jeffrey Shannon Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Peacock
Represented By: Mark Christopher Sparks
Represented By: Timothy Monroe Ferguson
Represented By: William Ralph Layne Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?