Thonsgaard et al v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jake Thonsgaard and Leticia Thonsgaard
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00323
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jake Thonsgaard, Leticia Thonsgaard Certificate of Interested Parties (Luke, Robert)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Interested Parties)(Luke, Robert) Modified on 8/6/2021 (bjc, ).
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued and emailed to Plaintiffs attorney for service as to Tristar Products, Inc.(bjc, )
August 6, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 3, Certified of Interested parties. Incorrect event used. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bjc, )
June 23, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
June 23, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
June 22, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jake Thonsgaard, Leticia Thonsgaard. (bjc, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tristar Products, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8466012.), filed by Leticia Thonsgaard, Jake Thonsgaard.(Luke, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thonsgaard et al v. Tristar Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Thonsgaard
Represented By: Robert Roy Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Thonsgaard
Represented By: Robert Roy Luke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?