BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC v. Jefferson Central Appraisal District et al
Plaintiff: BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC
Defendant: Jefferson Central Appraisal District and Angela Bellard
Case Number: 1:2021cv00496
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT LETTER showing receipt of remanded action by the 58th Judicial District Court on 11/16/2021 (tkd, )
November 10, 2021 ***Mailed certified copies of remand order and docket sheet to the 58th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, TX. (tkd, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion to Remand. This action is remanded to the 58th Judicial District Court of Jefferson County, TX. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/8/21. (tkd, )
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coon, Brent) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (tkd, ).
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Angela Bellard, Jefferson Central Appraisal District.(Calvert, Frank)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Request for Class Certification and Designation of Class Representative & Class Counsel, and Suit for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC.(Coon, Brent)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 10/26/2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/7/21. (tkd, )
October 4, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
October 4, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against Angela Bellard, Jefferson Central Appraisal District, filed by BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC.(tkd, )
October 1, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC. (tkd, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Angela Bellard, Jefferson Central Appraisal District.(Calvert, Frank)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson Central Appraisal District, Angela Bellard (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8608132), filed by Jefferson Central Appraisal District, Angela Bellard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 List of Parties, #4 List of Documents)(Calvert, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC v. Jefferson Central Appraisal District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIDCO #2 - Kyle Building LLC
Represented By: Brent Wayne Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Central Appraisal District
Represented By: Frank David Calvert
Represented By: Thomas Lee Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Bellard
Represented By: Frank David Calvert
Represented By: Thomas Lee Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?