Nelson et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Clayton Nelson and Cynthia Nelson
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00502
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 11/7/2022 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/3/2021. (bjc, )
December 3, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 12/3/2021. Attorneys present: Joseph Muckleroy, Michael Maus. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kothari, Nishi)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Clayton Nelson, Cynthia Nelson (Kothari, Nishi)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before November 16, 2021. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on December 3, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., in Room 221, Jack Brooks Federal Building, 300 Willow Street, Beaumont, Texas. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 10/27/21. (ljw, )
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company.(Maus, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Nelson, Cynthia Nelson. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company served on 10/6/2021, answer due 10/27/2021. (Muckleroy, Joseph)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company and emailed to pltfs' attorney for service (tkd, )
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8611305.), filed by Clayton Nelson, Cynthia Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kothari, Nishi) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/5/2021) (tkd, ).
October 5, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
October 5, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
October 4, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Clayton Nelson, Cynthia Nelson. (tkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Nelson
Represented By: Nishi Vimal Kothari
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Azor Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Nelson
Represented By: Nishi Vimal Kothari
Represented By: Derek Clinton Brasher
Represented By: Joseph Azor Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle & Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?