Williams v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Polyneisia Williams
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00562
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2022., Discovery due by 4/15/2022., FINAL Status Conference set for 8/5/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone.. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 01/07/2022. (klc, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Marcia A. Crone: Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2022. (klc, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Polyneisia Williams (Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that Rule 26(f) conference must occur by December 14, 2021. Joint written report filed no later than December 28, 2021. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/15/2021. (bjc, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Ward, Wesley)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Thomas Nave Kiehnhoff on behalf of Polyneisia Williams (Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
November 15, 2021 CORRECTED NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2022 at 2:30 PM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (jc, )
November 15, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 2:30 PM in Beaumont Courthouse before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Counsel must appear in person.(jc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from 60th District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number B-0208563. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8668373), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - Case Ledger in the state court action, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Original Petition, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Process, #5 Exhibit E - Issued Citation, #6 Exhibit F - Allstates Original Answer, #7 Exhibit G - List of Counsel of Record, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Wesley)
November 12, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Polyneisia Williams. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polyneisia Williams
Represented By: Thomas Nave Kiehnhoff
Represented By: Chris Michael Portner
Represented By: J Trenton Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?