Kinchen v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nick Kinchen
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, David Schuldt, Katherine Toomajain, Four Seventy Claims LLC and Misty Brinkley
Case Number: 1:2021cv00563
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Misty Brinkley, Four Seventy Claims LLC. (Sewell, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Misty Brinkley, Four Seventy Claims LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sewell, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Misty Brinkley, Four Seventy Claims LLC.(Sewell, Kevin)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Misty Brinkley, Four Seventy Claims LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sewell, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/9/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/4/2022. (bjc, )
January 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 1/4/2022. Attorneys present: John Parsons, Kimberly Blum, Michael Watson. Court will enter scheduling order. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
December 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Nick Kinchen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plts Initial Mandatory Disclosures)(Parsons, John)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Parsons, John)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Blum, Kimberly)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Nick Kinchen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Parsons, John)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that a Rule 26(f) attorney conference must occur on or before December 6, 2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:30 AM in Room 221 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 11/15/2021. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, David Schuldt, Katherine Toomajain.(bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** AMENDED PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE NOTIVE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Katherine Toomajain, David Schuldt from 58th District Court, Jefferson County, case number A-0208374. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8668906), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Katherine Toomajain, David Schuldt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Blum, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2021: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (bjc, ).
November 12, 2021 Case Assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
November 12, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Nick Kinchen, David Schuldt, Katherine Toomajain. (bjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinchen v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Kinchen
Represented By: John Pat Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberly Ninh Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schuldt
Represented By: Kimberly Ninh Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Toomajain
Represented By: Kimberly Ninh Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Seventy Claims LLC
Represented By: Kevin Lamar Sewell
Represented By: Michael James Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Brinkley
Represented By: Kevin Lamar Sewell
Represented By: Michael James Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?