Malone et al v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Malone and Vicki Malone
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds and Christopher Lyda
Case Number: 1:2021cv00570
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine L Stetson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER assigning case to Judge Stetson by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/13/2022. (bjc, )
January 13, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Lyda, Tommy Malone, Vicki Malone, State Farm Lloyds. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (bjc, )
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2023 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 1/12/2022. (bjc, )
January 12, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson: Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2022. Parties executed a Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate. Scheduling Order will be entered setting the case for Final Pretrial on February 3, 2023 and Jury Selection and Trial on February 6, 2023. (Court Time: 9:31-9:37 a.m.)(Appearances: M. Ramsey for the plaintiff and D. Fisher for the defendant)(Courtroom Deputy/FTR OP: Sherre White.) (saw, )
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by State Farm Lloyds (Fisher, David)
January 7, 2022 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Scheduling Order)(Fisher, David)
December 27, 2021 NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 a.m., is RESCHEDULED to 1/12/2022 at 9:30 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Deadline for submission of the joint conference report is reset from 12/28/2021 to 1/10/2022.(saw, )
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Christopher Lyda.(Fisher, David)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by December 15, 2021. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/22/21. (kcv, )
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 11/19/2021. (bjc, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** ANSWER to #3 Petition by State Farm Lloyds.(bjc, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT AND IS INCLUDED IN THE SUPPLEMNTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL.*** PETITION against All Defendants.(bjc, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by State Farm Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1)(Fisher, David)
November 18, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (bjc, )
November 18, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
November 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tommy Malone, Vicki Malone, State Farm Lloyds. (bjc, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Lloyds from District Court of Tyler County, case number 25,814. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8675916), filed by State Farm Lloyds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Fisher, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone et al v. State Farm Lloyds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Malone
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Jason Michael Byrd
Represented By: Katherine DeEtte Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Malone
Represented By: Michael R Ramsey
Represented By: Jason Michael Byrd
Represented By: Katherine DeEtte Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds
Represented By: David Jefferson Fisher
Represented By: Charles Adam Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Lyda
Represented By: David Jefferson Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?