Childress v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Laura Childress
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00596
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Zack Hawthorn
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference by 3/4/2022 and file a joint written report by 3/18/2022. Rule 16 Management/Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 2/10/22. (tkd, )
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/9/22. (tkd, )
December 17, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
December 17, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (tkd, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #3 Original Petition, filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(tkd, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Laura Childress.(tkd, )
December 13, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Laura Childress, United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (tkd, )
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Raul De La Garza on behalf of United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8707525. (De La Garza, Raul)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8707423), filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C, #4 List of Counsel of Record, #5 Index of Matters, #6 A, #7 B, #8 C, #9 D, #10 E, #11 F, #12 G, #13 H)(De La Garza, Raul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2021: #14 Civil Cover Sheet) (tkd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Childress
Represented By: Shaun Wesley Hodge
Represented By: Jahan Vir Guram
Represented By: Katherine Cora Hairfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Raul De La Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?