Robertson v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Robertson
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00604
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 9:00 AM and Jury Selection/Trial set for 11/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/27/22. (tkd, )
January 26, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2022. Attorneys Present: Aaron Bender, Wesley Ward. Court will enter Scheduling Order (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Wesley)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by 1/7/2022. Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 02:00 PM in Room 221 before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/21/21. (kcv, )
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Ward, Wesley)
December 20, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
December 20, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER (filed in state court) to #2 Original Petition, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(tkd, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Jennifer Robertson.(tkd, )
December 17, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Jennifer Robertson. (tkd, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from 136th District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number D-0208861. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8716246), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B - Case Summary in the state court action, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Original Petition, #4 Exhibit G - Allstates Original Answer, #5 Exhibit H - List of Counsel of Record, #6 Exhibit I - Pre-Suit Demand Letter from Plaintiffs counsel to Allstate, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Robertson
Represented By: Aaron Kevin Bender
Represented By: Adam Michael Grable
Represented By: Mark Christopher Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Wesley R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?