Choice Exploration Inc et al v. Gemini Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Choice Exploration Inc., Petrodome Liberty LLC and Petrodome Energy LLC
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company, Berkley Oil & Gas Specialty Services, LLC and Suzanne Roberts
Not Classified By Court: Jeff Kaplan
Case Number: 1:2021cv00609
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 2 (Beaumont) before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/9/22. (kcv, )
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying the #12 Motion to Remand. Defendants Berkley Oil & Gas Specialty Services, LLC and Suzanne Roberts are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 1/28/22. (kcv, )
January 26, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael J. Truncale: Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2022. Attorneys Present: Aaron Bender and Wesley Ward. (Court Reporter None.) (jmv, )
January 26, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard Louis Close on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company (Close, Howard)
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Scheduling Order) (kcv, ).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER directing parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by January 7, 2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 02:30 PM in Room 221 before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 12/21/21. (kcv, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-01519. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (bjc, )
December 20, 2021 The following attorney was contacted on 12/20/2021 regarding admission requirements to the Eastern District of TX: Plaintiffs attorney Clint Cowan. (bjc, )
December 20, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (bjc, )
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case Out of District/Division: The Court GRANTS Gemini's motion to transfer and transfers this case to the Beaumont Division of the Eastern District of Texas. The proper federal court to consider the remand motion (Doc. No. #12 ) is the Eastern District of Texas. Accordingly, this Court declines to rule on that motion. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/17/2021) (jmg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by Jeff Kaplan. Attorneys in Attendance: E. Jason Dennis, S. Clinton Cowan and Natasha N. Taylor. Prv Fee: $ 6,390.00. Outcome of ADR: Continuing to work with parties to reach a settlement. (Kaplan, Jeff) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassie J Dallas on behalf of Gemini Insurance Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dallas, Cassie) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
September 3, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Choice Exploration Inc, Petrodome Energy LLC, Petrodome Liberty LLC re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Dennis, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/23/2021) (chmb) Modified text on 8/24/2021 (jmg). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Gemini Insurance Company re: #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Judge Ed Kinkeade no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/5/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY filed by Gemini Insurance Company re: #6 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Eastern District of Texas (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Choice Exploration Inc, Petrodome Energy LLC, Petrodome Liberty LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Dennis, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Choice Exploration Inc, Petrodome Energy LLC, Petrodome Liberty LLC re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Dennis, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Choice Exploration Inc, Petrodome Energy LLC, Petrodome Liberty LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dennis, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Choice Exploration Inc, Petrodome Energy LLC, Petrodome Liberty LLC re: #6 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Eastern District of Texas (Dennis, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 Amended Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet B, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I) (Taylor, Natasha) Modified text on 7/15/2021 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD PER ATTORNEY***AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gemini Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet B, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Taylor, Natasha) Modified on 7/2/2021 (ykp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)-(2). The Court orders Defendant Gemini to amend its Notice of Removal to distinctly and affirmatively allege the citizenship of Plaintiff Petrodome Liberty and Plaintiff Petrodome Energy, respectively within twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is signed. Failure to comply with this order will result in immediate remand to state court without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/1/2021) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division to the Eastern District of Texas filed by Gemini Insurance Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Gemini Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:21-cv-1519-K. (cea) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gemini Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate W.R. Berkley Corporation for Gemini Insurance Company. (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Gemini Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12017643) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet B, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G) (Taylor, Natasha) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Choice Exploration Inc et al v. Gemini Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jeff Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Choice Exploration Inc.
Represented By: Edward Jason Dennis
Represented By: Samuel Clinton Cowan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrodome Liberty LLC
Represented By: Edward Jason Dennis
Represented By: Samuel Clinton Cowan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrodome Energy LLC
Represented By: Edward Jason Dennis
Represented By: Samuel Clinton Cowan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Represented By: Natasha Taylor
Represented By: Cassie J Dallas
Represented By: Ronald Lee Flack, Jr
Represented By: Howard Louis Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Oil & Gas Specialty Services, LLC
Represented By: Natasha Taylor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Flack, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Roberts
Represented By: Natasha Taylor
Represented By: Ronald Lee Flack, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?