Snider et al v. Spinnaker Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt Snider and Scarlett Snider
Defendant: Spinnaker Insurance Company and Atlas General Agency, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00084
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bowers, Eric)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) attorney conference by 4/27/2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2022 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Michael J. Truncale. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 4/7/22. (tkd, )
March 1, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
March 1, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Michael J. Truncale. (tkd, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER (filed in state court) to #2 Original Petition, filed by Atlas General Agency, LLC, Spinnaker Insurance Company.(tkd, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION (filed in state court) against Atlas General Agency, LLC, Spinnaker Insurance Company, filed by Wyatt Snider, Scarlett Snider.(tkd, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spinnaker Insurance Company from Jefferson Co., Texas, case number B-0209148. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8807781), filed by Spinnaker Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Bowers, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider et al v. Spinnaker Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt Snider
Represented By: Wyatt David Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Snider
Represented By: Wyatt David Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spinnaker Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Kent Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas General Agency, LLC
Represented By: Eric Kent Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?