Barron v. Century Surety Company
Plaintiff: Larry Barron doing business as Larry's Old Time Trade Days
Defendant: Century Surety Company doing business as Century Insurance Group
Case Number: 1:2022cv00144
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #25 Joint Motion for Continuance. Final Status Conference reset for 1/5/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/25/23. (tkd, )
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: #19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2023 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 6 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 5/22/23. (tkd, )
May 19, 2023 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Continue by Century Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewing, Reagan)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn for a recommended disposition: #19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Larry Barron. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 4/13/23. (tkd, )
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply. Accordingly, pltf's #22 Reply is deemed timely filed. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 4/13/23. (tkd, )
April 10, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Larry Barron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit H (MTC), #10 Exhibit I (MTC), #11 Exhibit K (MTC), #12 Exhibit L (MTC), #13 Exhibit M (MTC), #14 Exhibit O (MTC))(Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
April 10, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to #19 Motion to Compel Discovery, by Larry Barron. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kiehnhoff, Thomas) Modified on 4/11/2023 (tkd, ).
March 31, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Century Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Ewing, Reagan)
March 17, 2023 Filing 19 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery by Larry Barron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C.1, #4 Exhibit C.2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
March 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE by Century Surety Company Defendant Century Surety Company D/B/A Century Insurance Groups Designation of Expert Witnesses and Rule 26(A)(2) Disclosures (Ewing, Reagan)
January 23, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Larry Barron Plaintiff's Disclosure of Expert Witnesses (Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Final Status Conference reset for 10/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 3 (Beaumont) before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 12/14/22. (tkd, )
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Scheduling Order by Century Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ewing, Reagan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ).
October 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reagan F. Ewing on behalf of Century Surety Company (Ewing, Reagan)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Bryan Andre Giribaldo is withdrawn as counsel for Century Surety Company. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 1/19/22. (tkd, )
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Lawrence Shuchart on behalf of Century Surety Company (Shuchart, Fred)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Century Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Witmeyer, Robert)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 7/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 7/8/22. (tkd, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Marcia A. Crone: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/6/2022. (tkd, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Larry Barron (Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2022 at 4:00 PM before District Judge Marcia A. Crone in chambers. Counsel must appear in person. (jc, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giribaldo, Bryan)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the parties of conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference June 23, 2022. In addition to a discussion of the items set forth in Rule 26(f), the parties shall attempt in good faith to agree on certain matters, including deadlines for a proposed Scheduling Order, and shall file with the court a joint written report outlining their proposals no later than July 7, 2022. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 6/3/22. (kcv, )
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Century Surety Company Certificate of Interested Parties (Witmeyer, Robert)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Century Surety Company.(Witmeyer, Robert) Modified on 5/23/2022 (tkd, ).
May 16, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Barron. Century Surety Company served on 5/10/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Kiehnhoff, Thomas)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Century Surety Company and emailed to pltf's attorney for service (tkd, )
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Century Surety Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8867523), filed by Larry Barron. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiehnhoff, Thomas) Modified on 4/8/2022 (tkd, ).
April 8, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (tkd, )
April 8, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Larry Barron. (tkd, )
April 8, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Century Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Barron doing business as Larry's Old Time Trade Days
Represented By: Thomas Nave Kiehnhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company doing business as Century Insurance Group
Represented By: Robert John Witmeyer
Represented By: Bryan Andre Giribaldo
Represented By: Fred Lawrence Shuchart
Represented By: Reagan F. Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?