Mitchell v. Daniels
Petitioner: Wallace Mitchell
Respondent: Charles Daniels
Case Number: 1:2022cv00269
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Referring Judge: Christine L Stetson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:22-cv-02025. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Easter District of Texas (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 6/29/2022, filed. (jmarchand, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 29, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield. (bjc, )
June 29, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (bjc, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 Specific Referral to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (VanesaAranda, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Wallace Mitchell, filed. (VanesaAranda, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wallace Mitchell, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2022. (VanesaAranda, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Wallace Mitchell.(VanesaAranda, 3) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wallace Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?