Locust v. Bangart
Plaintiff: Justin Locust
Defendant: FNU Bangart
Case Number: 1:2023cv00388
Filed: October 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine L Stetson
Referring Judge: Michael J Truncale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the civil rights action ( #1 Complaint) should be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/30/23. (kcv, ) (Via regular mail with ack card on 11/30/2023 (kcv, )).
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying the #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/30/23. (kcv, )
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to submit within 20 days a statment certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in and deposits into Plaintiff's prisoner trust account for the preceding six months. Failure to comply with this order may result in this case being dismissed for want of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 11/30/23. (Via reagular mail with ack card on 11/30/23). (kcv, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin Locust. (kcv, )
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY FILING FEE ORDER. It is ordered that Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days, either pay the $402.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a statement certified by an authorized prison official showing the average balance in and deposits into Plaintiffs prisoner trust account for the preceding six months. Failure to comply with this order may result in this case being dismissed for want of prosecution pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 10/30/23. (Via regular mail with ack card on 10/31/23).(kcv, )
October 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Bangart, filed by Justin Locust.(kcv, )
October 26, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locust v. Bangart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Locust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bangart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?