Compression Labs, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Compression Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2005cv00156
Filed: April 21, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2005 Filing 24
NOTICE from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Vacating conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-2" filed on 5/24/05 (ehs)
June 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 23
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. All pending motions not granted are hereby denied. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/17/05. (ehs)
June 7, 2005 Filing 22
NOTICE by Compression Labs, Inc. for Dismissal of Claims Against Microsoft Corporation Without Prejudice (Buether, Eric) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2005 (ehs, ).
May 27, 2005 Filing 20
***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***
Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Bradley, James) Modified on 5/31/2005 (fal, ).
May 16, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 5/27/05 . Signed by Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/05. (poa, )
May 13, 2005 Filing 9
Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Kubasta, Kelly)
May 4, 2005 Filing 6
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Compression Labs, Inc. as to deft Microsoft Corporation served on 4/28/2005 by process server, answer due 5/18/2005. (ehs)
April 21, 2005 Filing 5
Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compression Labs, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compression Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Douglas I Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?