Yellowone Investments v. Verizon Communications, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that Verizon\'s city pages and superpages websites violated its patent covering location-based search.

Plaintiff: Geomas (International) LTD.
Defendant: Idearc Media Services-West Inc.
Case Number: 2:2006cv00475
Filed: November 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/12/09. (ehs, )
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - the court received a report of settlement of the above captioned case. As such, all pending motions are denied as moot. denying 94 Sealed Motion; denying 107 Motion for Leave to File; denying 109 Motion to Compel; denying 121 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 125 Sealed Motion; denying 126 Sealed Motion; denying 127 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 133 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/10/08. (ch, )
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Jennifer Adams ISO Idearc's Reply, # 2 Exhibit 1 Horn Deposition Excerpt, # 3 Exhibit 2 Fay deposition excerpt, # 4 Exhibit 3 November 24, 2008 letter)(Durst, Timothy)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ***REPLACES #132***Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Amend by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 2, # 3 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Pltf Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to Amend)(Chaikovsky, Yar) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mpv, ).
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #132 the Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Amend by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited submitted No Certificate of Authorization to File under seal included on document, attorney to refile with this information included. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION For Leave to Amend by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 2, # 3 Exhibit Pltf Motion for Leave to Amend Exh. 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Pltf Proposed Order for Motion for Leave to Amend)(Chaikovsky, Yar) Modified on 12/5/2008 (mpv, ).
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Deficiency, 120 Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena for Documents on Joan Nagelkirk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/08. (ehs, ) Modified on 12/4/2008 (ehs, ).
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 93 Motion for Leave to File Supplement P.R. 3- i Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/08. (ehs, )
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for the expert reports for the party with the burden of proof is extended to December 17, 2008, deadline for rebuttal expert reports is extended to January 13, 2009. Dispositive motion deadline for the parties to file chain of title/ownership-related summary judgment motions and/or infringement/non-infringement related summary judgment motions is extended to December 10, 2008; Geomas will serve the Amended Fourth Set of Interrogatories as sent to Idearc on November 24, 2008, that Idearc will respond to those Interrogatories on or before December 12, 2008, and that the Court permit Idearcs Requests for Admission Nos. 41 and 42 in excess of the 40 RFA limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/4/08. (ehs, )
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on all pending non-dispositive motions, including Docket Nos. 94, 107, 109, and 121, set for 12/12/2008, 10:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude, # 4 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Exclude Ex. C, # 5 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. D, # 6 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. E, # 7 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. F, # 8 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. G, # 9 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. H, # 10 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. I, # 11 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. J, # 12 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. K, # 13 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. L, # 14 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. M, # 15 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. N, # 16 Exhibit YRC Decl. to Motion to Preclude Ex. O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Pltf Motion to Preclude)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Willful Infringement by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Susan Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 1 filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 filed under seal, # 4 Exhibit 3 filed under seal, # 5 Exhibit 4 filed under seal, # 6 Exhibit 5 filed under seal, # 7 Exhibit 6 filed under seal, # 8 Exhibit 7 filed under seal, # 9 Exhibit 8 filed under seal, # 10 Exhibit 9 filed under seal, # 11 Exhibit 10 filed under seal, # 12 Exhibit 11 filed under seal, # 13 Exhibit 12 filed under seal, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Durst, Timothy)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Contributory, Induced and Joint Infringement by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Susan Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 1 filed under seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 filed under seal, # 4 Exhibit 3 filed under seal, # 5 Exhibit 4 filed under seal, # 6 Exhibit 5 filed under seal, # 7 Exhibit 6 filed under seal, # 8 Exhibit 7 filed under seal, # 9 Exhibit 8 part 1 filed under seal, # 10 Exhibit 8 part 2 filed under seal, # 11 Text of Proposed Order granting motion for summary judgment)(Durst, Timothy)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Deficiency, Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena for Documents on Joan Nagelkirk by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , Complete Mediation, Serve Expert Reports and File Specific Dispositive Motions by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines)(Durst, Timothy)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION to Compel Production of Patent Prosecution Documents filed by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Durst, Timothy)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #120 the Emergency MOTION for leave to serve subpoena for documents on Joan Nagelkirk by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited submitted Motion not attached, attorney to refile correctly. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 119, Sealed Emergency Motion to Compel. PLEASE IGNORE. Replaced by # 121 *** (mpv, )
November 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ***REPLACES #119***Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Darin Deaver, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 PROPOSED ORDER)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 12/1/2008 (mpv, ).
November 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 131 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Emergency MOTION for leave to serve subpoena for documents on Joan Nagelkirk by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Nelson, # 2 PROPOSED ORDER, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 12/1/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/4/2008 (ehs, ).
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 12/1/2008 (mpv, ).
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Preliminary Identification of Trial Witness List by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Durst, Timothy)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Preliminary Identification of Trial Witnesses Witness List by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Nelson, Mark)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexander L Brainerd for Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc. and Geomas (International) Limited. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4271 (ch, )
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ***REPLACES #113***SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 112 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Docket #114 accidently assigned by clerk to Notice of Deficiency, now removed, docket entry does not contain a number now. (mpv, )
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 113 the SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited submitted Incorrect Docket event used, Attorney to refile as Sealed Additional Attachments to main document #112. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, ) Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Exhibit 18, # 18 Exhibit 19)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Darin W. Deaver)(Nelson, Mark)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 MOTION to Compel Production of Patent Prosecution Documents filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Nelson, Mark)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - this opinion resolves the parties' various claim construction disputes. Ruling set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/20/08. (ehs, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 109 MOTION to Compel Production of Patent Prosecution Documents Motion has been reopened and returned to docket by clerk, Motion does contain the Certificate of Conference. Clerical error in sending out tne Notice of Deficiency. (mpv, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 109 the MOTION to Compel Production of Patent Prosecution Documents by Idearc Media Services-West Inc submitted. No Certificate of Conference on Motion, Attorney to refile correctly. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Compel Production of Patent Prosecution Documents by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Durst, Timothy) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/17/2008 (mpv, ).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jimmy M Shin for Geomas (International) Limited. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-15844 (ch, )
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of Christopher Kennerly ISO Motion for Leave, # 2 Exhibit 1 Proposed Supplemental Claim Charts, # 3 Exhibit 2 Proposed Supplemental Exhibit B to Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit 3 Proposed Supplemental Exhibit E to Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 Excerpts of Deposition - David Fay, # 7 Exhibit 6 Deposition Excerpts Mike Snow, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Idearc's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions)(Durst, Timothy)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 105 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal)(Durst, Timothy)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 94 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Susan Cannon)(Durst, Timothy)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to extend deadlines. Fact discovery deadline reset to 11/26/08. Dispositive motion deadline reset to 12/3/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/08. (ehs, )
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Continue JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES IN COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/08. (ehs, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D Filed under Seal, # 2 Exhibit E Filed Under Seal)(Durst, Timothy)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Deaver Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7 to Deaver Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 8-11 to Deaver Declaration)(Nelson, Mark)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY TO SEAL AND EXHIBIT WAS NOT AN ATTACHMENT, ATTY SHOULD REFILE AS ONE EVENT ATTACHING THE 2 SEALED EXHIBITS. Document # 98 and #99, Additional attachments to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Durst, Timothy) Modified on 10/14/2008 (sm, ).
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 97 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Durst, Timothy) Modified on 10/14/2008 (sm, ).
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A Affidavit of J. Garza, # 3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Timothy Durst, # 4 Exhibit C Subpoena to VCI, # 5 Exhibit D Filed Under Seal, # 6 Exhibit E Filed Under Seal, # 7 Exhibit F Interrogatories, # 8 Exhibit G Sign-in Sheet)(Durst, Timothy)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Allyson Ho) by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw)(Durst, Timothy)
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 94 SEALED MOTION to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 executed declaration of Mark Nelson)(Bunt, Robert)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SEALED MOTION to Compel by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Nelson Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to Nelson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 6-24 to Nelson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 25-43 to Nelson Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Nelson, Mark)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement P.R. 3-1 Disclosures by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Nelson, Mark)
September 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Regarding Letter Submitting Documents After Markman Hearing (Bunt, Robert)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 8/27/2008. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (jml, )
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joe A Garza, Jr for Idearc Media Services-West Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4042. (ch, )
August 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Regarding Letter Concerning Proposed Definitions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter and chart concerning proposed definitions)(Bunt, Robert)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of all plaintiffs (Chaikovsky, Yar)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Firasat Mir Ali on behalf of all plaintiffs (Ali, Firasat)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Joint Notice of Submission of Claim Construction Chart (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Bunt, Robert)
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 78 Claim Construction Brief, Document has been sealed by the clerk per request from attorney. Attorney to email the Clerk a Certificate of Authorization to file under seal. (mpv, )
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 84 Reply Claim Construction Brief, document now sealed by clerk per attorney. (mpv, )
July 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 Unopposed Motion to Amend Docket Control Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/08. (ch, )
June 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited re 82 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Idearc's Brief in Support of its Proposed Claim Constructions for U.S. Patent 5,930,474)(Nelson, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2008: # 2 Certificate of Authorization to file under seal) (mpv, ). Modified on 7/1/2008 (mpv, ).
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
June 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Idearc Media Services-West Inc. to 78 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendices A - J, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 2 to Appendix J, # 3 Exhibits 3 - 8 to Appendix J, # 4 Exhibits 9 - 15 to Appendix J, # 5 Exhibit 16 to Appendix J)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Modify scheduling order. Parties' deadline to submit Tutorials 8/7 /08; Fact Discovery Deadline 10/30/08; Deadline for filing Dispositive Motions and any other motions that may requie a hearing 11/4/08; Response to Dispositive Motions 11/18/08, Plaintiff and Defendant to identify Trial Witnesses 11/26/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/19/08. (ehs, )
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 43 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Schedule by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited, Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Nelson, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 8/27/2008, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SEALED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Nelson in Support of Plaintiffs' Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A thru C to Nelson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits D thru L to Nelson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit M to Nelson Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 7/1/2008 (mpv, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2008: # 6 Certificate of Authorization to file under seal) (mpv, ).
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Plaintiffs' Notice of Serving its Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Mark)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Parties' First Amended Statement in Compliance with Patent Rule 4-3 filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited, Idearc Media Services-West Inc. re 43 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A to First Amended Joint PR 4-3 Statement)(Nelson, Mark)
May 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Parties' Compliance with Patent Rule 4-3: filed by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited, Idearc Media Services-West Inc. re 74 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Parties' Compliance)(Nelson, Mark)
April 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline extended to 5/2/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/08. (ehs, )
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under Patent Rule 4-3 by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Bunt, Robert)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Disclosure by Idearc Media Services-West Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (Kennerly, Christopher)
April 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding Disclosure of Confidential and Proprietary material- granting 50 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 4/1/08. (ehs, )
March 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to 65 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Answer to Idearc Media Services-West Inc.'s Counterclaims by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Nelson, Mark)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Disclosure by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Notice of Compliance PR 4-1 (Bunt, Robert)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Disclosure by Idearc Media Services-West Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 4-1 (Kennerly, Christopher)
March 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw Patton Boggs, LLP and Talcott Franklin as counsel for pltf. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/08. (ehs, )
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Idearc Media Services-West Inc.'s First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiffs' Complaint against all plaintiffs by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Durst, Timothy)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal by Patton Boggs LLP as Counsel and Notice of Change of Address for Remaining Counsel by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 62 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. The court orders the parties to exchange privilege logs or notify the court that the parties do not dispute any claims of privilege by 2/12/08, notwithstanding any contrary provision in the courts Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/29/08. (ch, )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 43 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Amend the Docket Control Order by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited, Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Mark)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Carl R Roth and the Roth Law Firm, P.C... Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ehs, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Geomas Tag Management Group, Geomas, Inc., Geomas (International) Limited Plaintiffs' Computation of Damages in Compliance with Paragraph 3(c) of the Discovery Order (Nelson, Mark)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to add additional plaintiffs. Clerk shall add Geomas Tag Management Group, LLC. and Geomas, Inc. as Plaintiffs, and change Geomas (International) Ltd. to Geomas (International) Limited in the court files. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/2/08. (ch, )
December 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION To Add Additional Plaintiffs Geomas (International) Limited's Unopposed Motion to Add Additional Plaintiffs and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Geomas (International) LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Disclosure by Geomas (International) LTD. of Filing its First Supplemental Disclosure Under P.R. 3-1(f) (Nelson, Mark)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave to File supplement P.R.3-1(f) disclosures. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/17/07. (ehs, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Geomas' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Supplement its P.R. 3-1(f) Disclosures by Geomas (International) LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER adopting in its entirety Judge Wards discovery and docket control orders(#43 and #44). Additionally, the pretrial conference set for January 21, 2009, will be held at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/07. (ehs, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham IV by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/10/07. (ehs, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Geomas (International) LTD., Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Protective Order for the Court to Enter the Agreed Proposed Protective Order by Geomas (International) LTD., Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agreed Protective Order# 2 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting-Entering Protective Order)(Nelson, Mark) Corrected Proposed Order added on 12/10/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/10/2007 (mpv, ).
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit the Joint Protective order or competing versions of proposed Protective Orders. Deadline is extended to 12/7/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/6/07. (ch, )
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Geomas (International) LTD. of Serving its First Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement (Nelson, Mark)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Disclosure by Geomas (International) LTD. and Identification of software limitation contentions (Nelson, Mark)
November 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Disclosure by Idearc Media Services-West Inc. Idearc Media Services-West Inc.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit the Joint Protective Order or Competing Versions of Proposed Protective Orders by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/07. (ehs, )
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2008. Discovery due by 10/10/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 12/30/2007. Motions in limine due by 1/14/2009. Pretrial Conference - am/pm. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2009. Jury Selection set for 2/2/2009 9:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline is 12/5/08. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/07. (ch, )
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Geomas (International) LTD., Idearc Media Services-West Inc. re 40 Status Conference, Discovery Order (Nelson, Mark)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE by Geomas (International) LTD., Idearc Media Services-West Inc. re 39 Status Conference, Docket Control Order (Nelson, Mark)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham: Status Conference held on 11/1/2007. Parties consented to Magistrate Judge Everingham. Claim construction hearing date and trial date were given to parties. Parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. (See attached sign-in sheet for attorneys in attendance.) (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status conference held on 11/1/07. Counsel for the parties appeared (see attached sign-in sheet). The parties were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. If they consented, they were then given a Markman hearing date and a jury selection date in Judge Everingham?s court. Court adjourned.
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - Status Conference set for 11/1/2007 2:00 PM before Judge T. John Ward, Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/11/07. (ch, )
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER finding as moot Verizon Communication Inc.'s 8 Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/30/07. (ehs, )
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER finding as moot 16 Motion for Leave to File to supplement the record regarding Verizon communication Inc's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/30/07. (ehs, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Disclosure by Idearc Media Services-West Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Kennerly, Christopher)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Geomas (International) LTD. (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Geomas (International) LTD. (Bunt, Robert)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension for Enlargement of Time. Deadlines are set herein . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/20/07. (ch, )
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Comply with Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 (Unopposed) by Idearc Media Services-West Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Substitute Party. Geomas (International) LTD., and Idearc Media Services-West Inc. added. Idearc Information Services, Inc. and Yellowone Investments terminated . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/07. (ch, )
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sheila N Swaroop; Michael K Friedland and Paul A Stewart terminated . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/07. (ch, )
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - granting 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Verizon Communications, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice as to the refiling of same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/07. (ch, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Party Unopposed Motion to Substitute Defendant and Reform Caption by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Nelson on behalf of Yellowone Investments (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for firm of Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedland, Michael)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Yellowone Investments (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedland, Michael)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yellowone Investments and Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Friedland, Michael)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2. Party claiming patent infringement shall have until 6/21/07. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/6/07. (ch, )
June 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Comply with Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Unopposed) by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedland, Michael)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc, Idearc Information Services, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Court sua sponte orders that any party claiming patent infringement shall comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 within 15 days from the date of this order; any party opposing a claim of patent infringement shall comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 in accordance with the deadline provided in those rules; parties may conduct discovery relevant to these disclosures subject to the following limitations herein; parties may also conduct discovery into any jurisdictional issues, subject to the above limitations, provisions of the Patent Rules including P.R. 2-2 will apply to discovery conducted pursuant to this order; and consistent with the Court's calendar the court will set this for a scheduling conference at a future date and time to address requests for additional discovery . Signed by Judge Thad Heartfield on 5/23/07. (djh, )
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION for Leave to File Supplementation of the Record re Verizon Communications' Motion to Dismiss filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Durst, Timothy)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 16 MOTION for Leave to File Supplementation of the Record re Verizon Communications' Motion to Dismiss.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Friedland, Michael)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Supplementation of the Record re Verizon Communications' Motion to Dismiss by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Supplementation of the Record# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedland, Michael)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss VERIZON COMMUNICATION INC. filed by Yellowone Investments. (Friedland, Michael)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sheila N Swaroop for Yellowone Investments.(FEE PAID) (ch, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Stewart for Yellowone Investments.(FEE PAID) (ch, )
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss VERIZON COMMUNICATION INC. filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Durst, Timothy)
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss VERIZON COMMUNICATION INC. filed by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Friedland Declaration# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6a# 8 Exhibit 6b)(Friedland, Michael)
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Communications, Inc identifying Verizon Communications Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Durst, Timothy)
February 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Idearc Information Services, Inc. identifying Idearc Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Durst, Timothy)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss VERIZON COMMUNICATION INC. by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 IDEARC INFORMATION SERVICES LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint by Idearc Information Services, Inc..(Durst, Timothy)
December 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for dfts to respond to pla complaint or otherwise respond until 2/9/07. . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/21/06. (poa, )
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Friedland; Fee: $25, receipt number: 2-1-2157 (poa, )
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael K Friedland for Yellowone Investments. APPROVED (poa, )
December 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yellowone Investments. Idearc Information Services, Inc. served on 12/6/2006, answer due 12/26/2006. (ehs, )
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2082 (ehs, )
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, )
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Verizon Communications, Inc, Idearc Information Services, Inc.. (ch, )
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Verizon Communications, Inc, Idearc Information Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Yellowone Investments. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yellowone Investments v. Verizon Communications, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geomas (International) LTD.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Idearc Media Services-West Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?