Antor Media Corporation v. Metacafe, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Antor Media Corporation alleged that MetaCafe, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,734,961 entitled "Method and Apparatus for Transmitting Information Recorded on Information Storage Means from a Central Server to Subscribers via a High Data Rate Digital Telecommunications Network."

Plaintiff: Antor Media Corporation
Defendant: Metacafe, Inc., Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., PureVideo Networks, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc. and Discovery Communications, Inc
Counter Claimant: MLB Advanced Media, LP, GoTult Media Corp., Digital Playground, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Discovery Communications, Inc, Metacafe, Inc., Google, Inc., YouTube, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc. and Vivid Entertainment, LLC
Counter Defendant: Antor Media Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00102
Filed: March 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2010 Filing 249 NOTICE by Sun Microsystems, Inc. of Change of Address for Thomas M. Dunham (Tidwell, James)
May 13, 2010 Filing 248 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony J Dain (Dain, Anthony)
January 14, 2010 Filing 247 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin P.B. Johnson (Johnson, Kevin)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER, granting 245 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP., Attorney Jennifer L Gregor terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/24/09. (mrm, )
November 23, 2009 Filing 245 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MLB Advanced Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER, granting 243 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Antor Media Corporation., Attorney Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr; Elizabeth L DeRieux; Brett Christopher Govett; Robert L Greeson; Deborah J Race; Thomas John Ward, Jr; Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III and Otis W Carroll, Jr terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/23/09. (mrm, )
November 22, 2009 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER, granting 241 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP., Attorney Sharon R Barner terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MLB Advanced Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
October 12, 2009 Filing 240 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan R Spivey on behalf of MLB Advanced Media, LP (Spivey, Jonathan)
August 28, 2009 Filing 239 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corby R Vowell on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Vowell, Corby)
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting 237 MOTION to Dismiss Macmillan Publishers, Inc. and Macmillan Publishers, Ltd. filed by Antor Media Corporation., MacMillan Publishers, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/3/09. (mrm, )
June 2, 2009 Filing 237 MOTION to Dismiss Macmillan Publishers, Inc. and Macmillan Publishers, Ltd. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
February 27, 2009 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David R. Melton by MLB Advanced Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/29/08. (ehs, )
July 28, 2008 Filing 234 STIPULATION to Stay Litigation by Sony Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order of Stipulation to Stay Litigation)(Johnson, Kevin)
July 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 230 Motion to extend deadline to submit a stipulated Stay or Scheduling Proposal. It is therefore ORDERED that Parties Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit aStipulated Stay or Scheduling Proposal up to and including Monday, July 28, 2008 isGRANTED. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/24/08. (mpv, )
July 24, 2008 Filing 232 REPORT of Mediation by James W Knowles. Mediation result: SUSPENDED-DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS(Knowles, James)
July 24, 2008 Filing 231 REPORT of Mediation by James W Knowles. Mediation result: PENDING SETTLEMENT-MACMILLIAN PUBLISHERS(Knowles, James)
July 23, 2008 Filing 230 MOTION Extension to File Stipulation of Proposed Schedule Order by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 228 Motion Joint Motion to extend deadline to submit a Stipulated Stay or Scheduling Proposal. It is therefore ORDERED that Parties Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit a Stipulated Stay or Scheduling Proposal up to and including Wednesday July 23, 2008 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/22/08. (mpv, )
July 18, 2008 Filing 228 MOTION Amended Notice of Reexamination Status and Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit a Stipulated Stay or Submit Scheduling Proposal by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 226 Motion to extend deadline to Submit Scheduling Proposal. Deadline is extended to 7/18/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/10/08. (ch, )
July 9, 2008 Filing 226 Joint MOTION To Extend Deadline to Submit Scheduling Proposal Amended Notice of Reexamination Status and Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Scheduling Proposal by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 1, 2008 Filing 225 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc. Notice of Reexamination Status (Smith, Melissa)
June 6, 2008 Filing 224 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation of Asserted Claims (Chiaviello, Robert)
June 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER, granting 222 STIPULATION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY NOTICE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING MEDIATION (DKT. NO. 217) AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION (DKT NO. 219); withdrawing 221 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/2/08. (mrm, )
May 29, 2008 Filing 222 MOTION Stipulation and Motion to Withdraw Defendants' Motion to Clarify Notice of Agreement Regarding Mediation (Dkt. # 217) and Order Regarding Mediation (Dkt. # 219) by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 20, 2008 Filing 221 MOTION Motion to Clarify re 217 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 219 Order Referring Case to Mediator Defendants' Motion to Clarify Notice of Agreement Regarding Mediation (Dkt No. 217) and Order Regarding Mediation (Dkt No. 219) by Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 220 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 218 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order filed by Antor Media Corporation.(Jury Selection set for 10/6/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.)Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.,Initial Conference set for 1/21/2009 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.,Markman Hearing set for 1/22/2009 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.,Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2008.,Joinder of Parties due by 9/12/2008.,Jury instructions due by 8/24/2009,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/08. (mrm, )
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James W Knowles rep by James W Knowles added as Mediator and mediation to be completed on or before July 25, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/2008. (sm, )
May 8, 2008 Filing 218 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Scheduling Order by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 8, 2008 Filing 217 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc. of Agreement Regarding Mediation (Chiaviello, Robert)
May 1, 2008 Filing 216 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation, Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc. of Reexamination Status (Chiaviello, Robert)
May 1, 2008 Filing 215 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of GoTult Media Corp. (Gardner, Allen)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER dismissing WITHOUT PREJUDICE 170 Motion to Stay. Dfts may refile its motion and advise court if there is a change in circumstances that would necessitate a stay.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/22/2008. (sm, )
April 8, 2008 Filing 213 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Greeson on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Greeson, Robert)
April 7, 2008 Filing 212 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 210 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, PureVideo Networks, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/08. (mrm, )
March 20, 2008 Filing 210 STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal as to PureVideo Networks, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Chiaviello, Robert)
February 29, 2008 Filing 209 NOTICE of Disclosure by Antor Media Corporation Under Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Chiaviello, Robert)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 207 Joint Motion to Continue the Hearing date on dfts Renewed Motion to Stay and Amend the Scheduling Order. The parties are ordered as follows herein. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/28/08. (ch, )
February 27, 2008 Filing 207 Joint MOTION to Continue the Hearing Date of Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay and Amend the Scheduling Order by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
February 25, 2008 Filing 206 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of GoTult Media Corp. (McSwane, Douglas)
February 22, 2008 Filing 205 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc., YouTube, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 (Doyle, Tyler)
February 21, 2008 Filing 204 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit B-1)(Chiaviello, Robert)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Google, Inc. and YouTube, LLC deadline is extended to 2/22/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/11/08. (ch, )
February 8, 2008 Filing 202 NOTICE by Grouper Networks, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. of serving Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Johnson, Kevin)
February 8, 2008 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doyle, Tyler)
February 8, 2008 Filing 200 NOTICE of Disclosure by SBO Pictures, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC Rule 26(a)(1) (Dain, Anthony)
February 8, 2008 Filing 199 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Playground, Inc. (Christensen, Becky)
February 8, 2008 Filing 198 NOTICE of Disclosure by New Frontier Media, Inc. (Macon, Richard)
February 8, 2008 Filing 197 NOTICE of Disclosure by MLB Advanced Media, LP (Harrison, Guy)
February 8, 2008 Filing 196 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sun Microsystems, Inc. (Tidwell, James)
February 8, 2008 Filing 195 NOTICE of Disclosure by MacMillan Publishers, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 (Conaty, Kelley)
February 8, 2008 Filing 194 NOTICE of Disclosure by GoTult Media Corp. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 (Gardner, Allen)
February 8, 2008 Filing 193 NOTICE of Disclosure by Antor Media Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 26 (Chiaviello, Robert)
February 8, 2008 Filing 192 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Google, Inc., YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2008 Filing 191 NOTICE of Disclosure by Metacafe, Inc. of Initial Disclosures pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 (Mills, Laurin)
February 8, 2008 Filing 190 NOTICE of Disclosure by Discovery Communications, Inc Rule 26(a)(1) (Latham, Robert)
February 7, 2008 Filing 189 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by New Frontier Media, Inc. identifying No Corporate Parent as Corporate Parent. (Macon, Richard)
January 31, 2008 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Talley Elizabeth McIntyre on behalf of Metacafe, Inc. (McIntyre, Talley)
January 29, 2008 Filing 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chiaviello, Robert)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination and each side shall have 15 minutes to present arguments : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (TEXARKANA) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/28/2008. (sm, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination Responses due by 1/29/2008. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/24/2008. (sm, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REVISED AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PROCEDURES:Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2009 before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/24/2008. (sm, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 183 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary M Calkins for MLB Advanced Media, LP. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3436 (ch, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 182 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2008 (sm, ).
January 23, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation of Filing Revised Agreed Scheduling Order and Discovery Procedures (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Agreed Scheduling Order and Discovery Procedures# 2 Exhibit A)(Chiaviello, Robert)
January 19, 2008 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Scheduling conference held 1-9-08 before Judge David Folsom. 13 pages. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford (aec, )
January 16, 2008 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laurin Howard Mills on behalf of Metacafe, Inc. (Mills, Laurin)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Justin Kurt Truelove terminated as attorney of record for Plaintiff, Antor Media Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/14/08. (ch, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re: deposition schedule. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/10/08. (mrm, )
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER re: motion practice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/9/08. (mrm, )
January 9, 2008 Filing 175 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed) by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truelove, Justin)
January 9, 2008 Filing 174 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2008. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
January 8, 2008 Filing 173 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A)(Chiaviello, Robert)
January 7, 2008 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the 172 Report of Rule 26f Planned Meeting submitted by Antor Media Corporation. Both Attys did not sign this joint pleading. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
January 7, 2008 Filing 172 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2008 (sm, ).
January 7, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY; Document # 171, REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY TO REFILE CORRECTED DOCUMENT*** (mpv, )
January 7, 2008 Filing 171 ***FILED IN ERROR; PER ATTORNEY; PLEASE IGNORE***REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2008 (mpv, ).
January 4, 2008 Filing 170 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants to Renew Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by Discovery Communications, Inc, Digital Playground, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Metacafe, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 3, 2008 Filing 169 NOTICE by Antor Media Corporation of Office Action (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chiaviello, Robert)
December 20, 2007 Filing 168 Defendant New Frontier Media, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to Plainitff's Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by New Frontier Media, Inc..(Macon, Richard)
December 14, 2007 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings. Motion hearing held 11-26-07 before Judge David Folsom. 20 pages. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford (aec, )
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER denying 47 Motion to Stay; denying 130 Motion to Stay; denying 161 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/07. (mrm, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2008 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/26/07. (mrm, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 164 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Motion Hearing held on 11/26/2007 re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by MacMillan Publishers, Inc.. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
November 26, 2007 Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re 161 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube, LLC to Join MacMillan Publishers, Inc. and MacMillan Publishers LTD.'s Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
November 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER re: Hearing on Motion 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination:The Court hereby gives Google and YouTube five (5) minutes to present their arguments at the hearing that was previously set for November 26, 2007 at 1:30 PM in Texarkana. The Plaintiff shall be given an additional five (5) minutes.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/16/07. (mrm, )
November 5, 2007 Filing 161 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube, LLC to Join MacMillan Publishers, Inc. and MacMillan Publishers LTD.'s Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by Google, Inc., YouTube, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination, 130 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Stay re 11 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2007 01:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have 15 minutes to present their arguments. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/31/07. (mrm, )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew Wesley Spangler terminated . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/22/2007. (sm, )
October 19, 2007 Filing 158 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 2, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PureVideo Networks, Inc. to 10/19/2007. (sm, )
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Pure Video Networks to Answer up to and including October 19, 2007. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/2/2007. (sm, )
September 24, 2007 Filing 156 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward J Kelly for GoTult Media Corp. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11120. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Filing 155 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dalila Argaez Wendlandt for GoTult Media Corp. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-11120. (ch, )
September 24, 2007 Filing 154 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Pure Video by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
September 19, 2007 Filing 153 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GoTult Media Corp. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Gardner, Allen)
September 19, 2007 Filing 152 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 130 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Stay re 11 Amended Complaint This document replaces Document No. 151 filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
September 19, 2007 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate document of earlier pleading. Document # 151, Sur- reply by Antor. PLEASE IGNORE - Attorney Will Refile.*** (rml, )
September 18, 2007 Filing 151 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
September 10, 2007 Filing 150 REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Stay re 11 Amended Complaint filed by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Macon, Richard)
September 5, 2007 Filing 149 Antor Media Corp.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of Vivid Entertainment, LLC by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
September 5, 2007 Filing 148 Antor Media Corp.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim of SBO Pictures,Inc. by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 31, 2007 Filing 147 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corey Darnell McGaha on behalf of Discovery Communications, Inc (McGaha, Corey)
August 31, 2007 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leisa Beaty Pearlman on behalf of Discovery Communications, Inc (Pearlman, Leisa)
August 28, 2007 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Sever and MOTION to Stay re 11 Amended Complaint as to New Frontier Media, Inc. filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
August 27, 2007 Filing 144 RESPONSE to 121 Answer to Amended Complaint Antor's Answer to Counterclaims of Sony Pictures, Sony Electronics, Sony Computer, Sony BMG and Grouper Networks by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
August 27, 2007 Filing 143 Antor's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Google and YouTube by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 27, 2007 Filing 142 Antor's ANSWER to Counterclaim of MetaCafe by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 27, 2007 Filing 141 Antor's ANSWER to Counterclaim of Discovery Communications by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 22, 2007 Filing 140 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent (Dunham, Thomas) Modified by clerk to add None as Corporate Parent on 8/23/2007 (mpv, ).
August 22, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PureVideo Networks, Inc. to 9/14/2007. (mrm, )
August 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER APPROVING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PURE VIDEO NETWORKS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Pure Video Networks Inc. answer due 9/14/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/21/07. (mrm, )
August 20, 2007 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MacMillan Publishers, Inc. identifying Macmillan Publishers Holdings Limited and Macmillan Limited as Corporate Parent. (Conaty, Kelley)
August 20, 2007 Filing 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Pure Video Networks, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 17, 2007 Filing 136 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SBO Pictures, Inc. (Ludwig, Frederic)
August 16, 2007 Filing 135 Vivid Entertainment LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Vivid Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ludwig, Frederic)
August 16, 2007 Filing 134 SBO Pictures, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, First COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by SBO Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ludwig, Frederic)
August 16, 2007 Filing 133 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Frederic G Ludwig, III for SBO Pictures, Inc. and Vivid Entertainment, LLC. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 1-1-4623 (ch, )
August 16, 2007 Filing 132 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony J Dain for SBO Pictures, Inc. and Vivid Entertainment, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID)1-1-4623 (ch, )
August 16, 2007 Filing 131 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victor M Felix for SBO Pictures, Inc. and Vivid Entertainment, LLC. (APPROVE) (FEE PAID) 1-1-4623 (ch, )
August 13, 2007 Filing 130 MOTION to Sever and, MOTION to Stay re 11 Amended Complaint by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard)
August 13, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SBO Pictures, Inc. to 8/13/2007; Vivid Entertainment, LLC to 8/13/2007. (rml, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by SBO Pictures & Vivid Entertainment until 8/13/2007 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on August 13, 2007. (rml, )
August 13, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PureVideo Networks, Inc. to 8/20/2007. (rml, )
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for Pure Video Networks up to and including August 20, 2007. Signed by Judge David Folsom on August 13, 2007. (rml, )
August 13, 2007 Filing 127 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MLB Advanced Media, LP, MLB Advanced Media, LP (No corporate parent)(Gregor, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2007 (sm, ).
August 10, 2007 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc. identifying Sony Corporation of America and Bertelsmann as parent corporation (Johnson, Kevin) Modified on 8/14/2007 (sm, ).
August 9, 2007 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Antor Media Corporation identifying Antor Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Chiaviello, Robert)
August 9, 2007 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT***. Document # 124, Notice of Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 8, 2007 Filing 124 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by Antor Media Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 (Chiaviello, Robert) Modified on 8/9/2007 (sm, ).
August 6, 2007 Filing 123 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Cambria for SBO Pictures, Inc. and Vivid Entertainment, LLC.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2874 (ch, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 122 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Johnson, Kevin)
August 6, 2007 Filing 121 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc..(Johnson, Kevin)
August 6, 2007 Filing 120 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, Inc. identifying Google Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Doyle, Tyler)
August 6, 2007 Filing 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Doyle, Tyler)
August 6, 2007 Filing 118 Defendants Google Inc. and YouTube LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Google, Inc., YouTube, Inc..(Doyle, Tyler)
August 6, 2007 Filing 117 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Metacafe, Inc., Metacafe, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Michael, Patrick)
August 6, 2007 Filing 116 Defendant METACAFE, INC.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Metacafe, Inc..(Michael, Patrick)
August 6, 2007 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to SBO and Vivid Entertainment by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 6, 2007 Filing 114 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to PureVideo by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
August 6, 2007 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by G William Lavender on behalf of Metacafe, Inc. (Lavender, G)
August 6, 2007 Filing 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Discovery Communications, Inc identifying Discovery Holding Co. as Corporate Parent. (Latham, Robert)
August 6, 2007 Filing 111 Discovery Communications, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Discovery Communications, Inc.(Latham, Robert)
August 2, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for New Frontier Media, Inc. to 8/13/2007. (sm, )
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time for Dft New Frontier to Answer Second Amended Complaint up to and including 8/13/2007. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/2/2007. (sm, )
August 1, 2007 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Randall T Garteiser on behalf of Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. (Garteiser, Randall)
August 1, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard)
July 26, 2007 Filing 107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Google, Inc. and YouTube, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2832. (ch, )
July 26, 2007 Filing 106 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tun-Jen Chiang for Google, Inc. and YouTube, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2832. (ch, )
July 26, 2007 Filing 105 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Perlson for Google, Inc. and YouTube, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2832. (ch, )
July 26, 2007 Filing 104 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tyler Doyle for Google, Inc. and YouTube, Inc. (APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-2832. (ch, )
July 20, 2007 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Claud Tidwell on behalf of Sun Microsystems, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc. (Tidwell, James)
July 16, 2007 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Truelove, Justin)
July 12, 2007 Filing 101 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by Macmillan Publishers, Inc. and Macmillan Publishers, Ltd. filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
July 2, 2007 Filing 100 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Sun Microsystems, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 29, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for New Frontier Media, Inc. to 7/30/2007. (mrm, )
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; New Frontier Answer due 7/30/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/29/07. (mrm, )
June 29, 2007 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by MacMillan Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chen, Li)
June 28, 2007 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Further Extension of Time for Defendant New Frontier Media, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Macon, Richard)
June 27, 2007 Filing 96 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Digital Playground, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 27, 2007 Filing 95 ANSWER to Counterclaim of GoTuIt Media Corp. by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 26, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Discovery Communications, Inc to 8/6/2007. (mrm, )
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWEROR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Discovery Communications, Inc. shall have up to and including August 6, 2007, . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/26/07. (mrm, )
June 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER APPROVING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTDISCOVERY COMMUNICATIONS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Discovery Communications, Inc Answer due 8/6/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/26/07. (mrm, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 92 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Discovery Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
June 25, 2007 Filing 91 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Discovery Communications, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 25, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Parke Latham on behalf of Discovery Communications, Inc (Latham, Robert)
June 25, 2007 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of Discovery Communications, Inc (Jackson, John)
June 22, 2007 Filing 88 Antor Media Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim of MLB Advanced Media, LP by Antor Media Corporation, Antor Media Corporation.(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 20, 2007 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Chiaviello, Robert)
June 19, 2007 Filing 86 NOTICE by Digital Playground, Inc. re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order 1)(Christensen, Becky)
June 19, 2007 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of GoTult Media Corp. (Bufe, John)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIMEFOR DEFENDANT NEW FRONTIER MEDIA, INC.TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; New Frontier to answer or otherwise respond toPlaintiff's Second Amended Complaint up to and including June 29, 2007 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/18/2007. (mrm, )
June 14, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PureVideo Networks, Inc. to 8/6/2007; SBO Pictures, Inc. to 8/6/2007; Vivid Entertainment, LLC to 8/6/2007. (mrm, )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTVIVID ENTERTAINMENT, LLC TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 8/6/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/14/07. (mrm, )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTSBO PICTURES, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 8/6/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/14/07. (mrm, )
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTPURE VIDEO NETWORKS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 8/6/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/14/07. (mrm, )
June 14, 2007 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer L Gregor on behalf of MLB Advanced Media, LP (Gregor, Jennifer)
June 14, 2007 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Christopher Beck on behalf of MLB Advanced Media, LP (Beck, George)
June 14, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sharon R Barner on behalf of MLB Advanced Media, LP (Barner, Sharon)
June 14, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Melton on behalf of MLB Advanced Media, LP (Melton, David)
June 14, 2007 Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard)
June 13, 2007 Filing 75 DEFENDANT SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Sun Microsystems, Inc..(Dunham, Thomas)
June 13, 2007 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Vivid Entertainment LLC by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 13, 2007 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to SBO Pictures, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 13, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Pure Video Networks, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 11, 2007 Filing 71 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas Dunham for Sun Microsystems, Inc.APPROVED (FEE PAID) 2-1-2653 (poa, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura K Carter for Metacafe, Inc. APPROVED (FEE PAID) 2-1-2650 (poa, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 69 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick T Michael for Metacafe, Inc. APPROVED (FEE PAID) Rec #2-1-2650(poa, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 68 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants MacMillan Publishers, Inc.'s and MacMillan Publishers Ltd.'s Answer to Plainitiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by MacMillan Publishers, Inc..(Chen, Li)
June 8, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of GoTult Media Corp. (Jones, Michael)
June 8, 2007 Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Becky V Christensen for Digital Playground, Inc.APPROVED (FEE PAID) 2-1-2639 (poa, )
June 8, 2007 Filing 64 Digital Playground, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by Digital Playground, Inc..(Christensen, Becky)
June 8, 2007 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by GoTult Media Corp..(Gardner, Allen)
June 8, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Metacafe, Inc. to 8/6/2007. (mrm, )
June 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTMETACAFE, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND,granting 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Defendant MetaCafe, Inc. filed by Antor Media Corporation,.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/8/07. (mrm, )
June 7, 2007 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Enrique Perez for Digital Playground, Inc.APPROVED (FEE PAID) 2-1-2639 (poa, )
June 7, 2007 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond as to Defendant MetaCafe, Inc. by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination Responses due by 6/20/2007. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/07. (mrm, )
June 6, 2007 Filing 59 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Discovery Communications, Inc.. (ch, )
June 6, 2007 Filing 58 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Discovery Communications, Inc. (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 31, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelley Anne Conaty on behalf of MacMillan Publishers, Inc. (Conaty, Kelley)
May 30, 2007 Filing 55 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Antor Media Corporation by MLB Advanced Media, LP.(Harrison, Guy)
May 24, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for YouTube, Inc. to 8/6/2007. (mrm, )
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT YOUTUBE, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF ANTOR MEDIA CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; granting 49 Motion for Extension of Time to File; YouTube Inc. answer due 8/6/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/24/07. (mrm, )
May 24, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 8/6/2007. (mrm, )
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF ANTOR MEDIA CORPORATION'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Google Inc. answer due 8/6/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/24/07. (mrm, )
May 23, 2007 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd M Briggs for Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. (FEE PAID) 6-1-9833 (ehs, )
May 23, 2007 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Todd M Briggs for Grouper Networks, Inc. and Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP. APPROVED (FEE PAID 6-1-9833 (poa, )
May 23, 2007 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P.B. Johnson for Grouper Networks, Inc. and Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc.. Sony Entertainment America Inc, Sony Pictures Entertainment, APPROVED (FEE PAID 6-1-9833 (poa, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2007 (kjr, ).
May 23, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant YouTube Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Antor Media Corporation's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by YouTube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 23, 2007 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant Google Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff Antor Media Corporation's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 22, 2007 Filing 47 MOTION to Stay Opposed Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination by MacMillan Publishers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
May 15, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Vivid Entertainment, LLC to 6/11/2007. (mrm, )
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT VIVID ENTERTAINMENT, LLC TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 44 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, Vivid Entertainment LLC Answer due 6/11/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/15/07. (mrm, )
May 15, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sun Microsystems, Inc. to 6/13/2007. (mrm, )
May 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 43 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation; Sun Microsystems Inc. Answer due 6/13/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/15/07. (mrm, )
May 14, 2007 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Vivid Entertainment to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 14, 2007 Filing 43 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Sun Microsystems to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 14, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for MacMillan Publishers, Inc. to 6/11/2007. (mrm, )
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT MACMILLAN PUBLISHERS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 40 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, MacMillan Publishers Inc Answer due 6/11/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/14/07. (mrm, )
May 14, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Metacafe, Inc. to 6/8/2007. (mrm, )
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT METACAFE, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 38 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, MetaCafe Inc. Answer due 6/8/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/14/07. (mrm, )
May 11, 2007 Filing 40 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant MacMillan Publishers, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
May 11, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for New Frontier Media, Inc. to 6/15/2007. (mrm, )
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT NEW FRONTIER MEDIA INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; New Frontier Answer due 6/15/07 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/10/07. (mrm, )
May 10, 2007 Filing 38 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant MetaCafe to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 10, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for GoTult Media Corp. to 6/9/2007; PureVideo Networks, Inc. to 6/6/2007. (mrm, )
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT PURE VIDEO NETWORKS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 32 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, Pure Video Networks Inc Answer due 6/6/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/07. (mrm, )
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOTUIT MEDIA CORP. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 31 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, GoTuIt Media Corp. Answer due 6/9/07. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/07. (mrm, )
May 9, 2007 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Martin Chiaviello, Jr on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Chiaviello, Robert)
May 9, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 30 Amended Complaint by New Frontier Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macon, Richard)
May 8, 2007 Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MacMillan Publishers, Inc.. (ch, )
May 8, 2007 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant Pure Video to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 8, 2007 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant GoTuIt to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 7, 2007 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by Antor Media Corporation.(Govett, Brett)
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING 24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Antor Media Corporation, dismissing dft Sony Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/7/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Antor Media Corporation, dismissing Dft Discovery Communications.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/7/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Grouper Networks, Inc. to 8/6/2007; Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc. to 8/6/2007; Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. to 8/6/2007; Sony Electronics, Inc. to 8/6/2007; Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc. to 8/6/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond to pla complaint for Sony Dfts and Grouper Networks. . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/7/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/7/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Digital Playground, Inc. to 6/11/2007; SBO Pictures, Inc. to 6/11/2007. (sm, )
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING 20 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation extending time to answer for Dfts Digital Playground and SBO up to and including 6/11/2007.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/7/2007. (sm, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Antor Media Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
May 4, 2007 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Grouper Networks, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
May 4, 2007 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2007 (sm, ).
May 4, 2007 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Antor Media Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
May 4, 2007 Filing 20 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants Digital Playground, Inc. and SBO Pictures, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
May 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS GOOGLE, INC. AND YOUTUBE, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND; re 16 Stipulation filed by Antor Media Corporation, . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/3/07. (mrm, )
May 3, 2007 Filing 17 Summons Reissued as to Sony Corporation. (ch, )
May 2, 2007 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants, Google, Inc. and YouTube, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiaviello, Robert)
April 30, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for MLB Advanced Media, LP to 5/31/2007. (sm, )
April 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to first amended complaint up to and including 5/31/2007.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/30/2007. (sm, )
April 27, 2007 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by MLB Advanced Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - that transfers the case to Judge Folsom. In light of Judge Folsom's familiarity with the patents and techology involved in the case. . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/17/07. (ch, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2007 (ch, ).
April 12, 2007 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Digital Playground, Inc., Discovery Communications, Inc., Google, Inc., GoTult Media Corp., Grouper Networks, Inc., MacMillan Publishers, Inc., MLB Advanced Media, LP, New Frontier Media, Inc., PureVideo Networks, Inc., SBO Pictures, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Corporation, Sony Electronics, Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc., Vivid Entertainment, LLC, YouTube, Inc.. (ch, )
April 11, 2007 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants, filed by Antor Media Corporation.(Govett, Brett)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Recusal. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/07. (ehs, )
April 10, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Wesley Spangler on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Spangler, Andrew)
April 10, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 10, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 29, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Ward, Thomas)
March 29, 2007 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Race, Deborah)
March 29, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Antor Media Corporation (Carroll, Otis)
March 28, 2007 Filing 3 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ch, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Metacafe, Inc.. (ch, )
March 27, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Metacafe, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1071898.), filed by Antor Media Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Govett, Brett) Civil Cover Sheet added on 3/28/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 3/28/2007 (mpv, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antor Media Corporation v. Metacafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antor Media Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metacafe, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Playground, Inc.
Represented By: Enrique Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoTult Media Corp.
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grouper Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacMillan Publishers, Inc.
Represented By: Kelley Anne Conaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLB Advanced Media, LP
Represented By: David R Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Frontier Media, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Laurence Macon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PureVideo Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBO Pictures, Inc.
Represented By: Frederic G Ludwig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony BMG Music Entertainment GP, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: James Claud Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivid Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Frederic G Ludwig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, Inc.
Represented By: Charles K Verhoeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Communications, Inc
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MLB Advanced Media, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: GoTult Media Corp.
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Digital Playground, Inc.
Represented By: Becky V Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: James Claud Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Discovery Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Metacafe, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: YouTube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: SBO Pictures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vivid Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Antor Media Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?