Certicom Corporation et al v. Sony Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Certicom Corp. and Certicom Patent Holding Corp. alleged that Defendants Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony DADC US Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,563,928 entitled "Strengthened Public Key Protocol."

Plaintiff: Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation
Defendant: Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony DADC US Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00216
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DISMISSING CASE- pursuant to the Stipulated motion to dismiss without prejudice, this case is dismissed without prejudice, with all costs and attorneys fees to be borne by the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/27/09. (ehs, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 112 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Motion to suspend docket control and discovery order schedule. parties are directed to file appropriate pleadings terminating this litigation by May 27, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/15/09. (ehs, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION to Suspend Docket Control Order Schedule by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER regarding motions to be submitted in recently filed patent cases. Proceedures for filing set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/30/09. (ehs, )
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that the aforementioned deadlines on the Docket Control and Discovery Control Schedules be suspended until Plaintiffs retain new lead counsel. Plaintiffs are however ordered to retain new lead counsel no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. The parties are directed to meet and confer, and file immediately thereafter, an Amended Docket Control Order retaining the Court's original Jury Selection and Claim Construction Hearing dates. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/09. (ch, )
April 8, 2009 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 106 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 101 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 102 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUSPEND DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY CONTROL SCHEDULES UNTIL PLAINTIFF RETAINS NEW LEAD COUNSEL by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. ORDERED that the time for the parties submitting the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is extended from March 25, 2009 to April 8, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/30/09. (ch, )
March 25, 2009 Filing 105 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 102 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, (Joint Claim Construction and Pre-hearing Statement) by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert C Morgan terminated as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/24/09. (ch, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion of Ropes & Gray LLP for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert Morgan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Amend docket control order. PR4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is extended to March 25, 2009. Disclosure of Computation of Damages is extended to April 16, 2009; P.R. 4-5(a) Plaintiffs Opening Brief is extended from April 2, 2009 to April 16, 2009; Close of Fact Discovery is extended to May 15, 2009; P.R. 4-5(b) Defendants Responsive Brief is extended to May 12, 2009; and P.R.4-5(c) Plaintiffs Reply Brief is extended to May 23, 2009. Signed this the 6th day of March 2009 by US District Judge T John Ward (ehs). (ehs, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 98 Motion to Amend discovery order to extend time relating to damages computations. Time for the complete computation of any category of damages claimed by any party to the action is extended to 4/2/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/6/09. (ehs, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended to 3/11/09 for parties to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/6/09. (ehs, )
March 5, 2009 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 62 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
February 27, 2009 Filing 98 Unopposed/AGREED MOTION to Amend/Correct 61 Order to modify Discovery Order by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl) Modified on 3/2/2009 (sm, ).
February 27, 2009 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 62 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement - P.R. 4-3) by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
February 24, 2009 Filing 96 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brandon Stroy for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4516 (ch, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney T Cy Walker for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4465 (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2009: # 1 Personal Information) (ch, ).
February 4, 2009 Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rose Cordero for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4465 (ch, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 93 NOTICE of Disclosure by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance of P.R. 3-1 (Roth, Carl)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to serve second amended patent invalidity contentions. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 88 Motion to modify the docket control order. Deadline to exchange preliminary claim constructions and extrinsic evidence extended to 2/2/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Leave to File second amended disclosure of asserted claims and infringement contentions. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/2/09. (ehs, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 89 Consent MOTION for Leave to File SONY'S AGREED-TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ITS SECOND AMENDED PATENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2nd Amd Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit A to 2d Amd Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit B to 2d Amd Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Affidavit Qualey Declaration)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 29, 2009 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER [#62] by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 29, 2009 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for to Serve its Second Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl) Modified on 1/29/2009 (sm, ).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Certicom's Unopposed Amended Application for Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/16/09. (ch, )
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting amended application- Amended Commission Directing the taking abroad of Voluntarty Oral Depositions of Japanese Witnesses. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/14/09. (ehs, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 84 MOTION Certicom's Unopposed Amended Application for Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certified Order Directing Depositions (signature lines for Judge due to original certified copy required))(Roth, Carl)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - COMMISSION DIRECTING THE TAKING ABROAD OF VOLUNTARY ORAL DEPOSITIONS OF JAPANESE WITNESSES. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/8/09. (ch, )
January 8, 2009 Filing 82 MOTION Certicom's Application for Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - List of Attendees for Depositions, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Commission Directing The Taking Abroad of Voluntary Oral Depositions of Japanese Witnesses. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/08. (ch, )
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Commission Directing The Taking Abroad of Voluntary Oral Depositions of Japanese Witness. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/08. (ch, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION Application for Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roth, Carl)
December 2, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION Application for Commission to Take Oral Deposition of Japanese Witnesses by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Roth, Carl)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER regarding the 5/13/08 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/20/08. (ehs, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 76 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hiroyuki Hagiwara for Certicom Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4233 (ch, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kaede Toh for Certicom Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4234 (ch, )
November 17, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION for Protective Order Certicom's Agreed-to Motion Regarding the Parties' May 13, 2008 Stipulated Protective Order by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Amanda) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to File relating to damages conmputations. The time for the complete computation of any category of damages claimed by any party to the action, as set forth in paragraph 3(c) of the Courts January 22, 2008 Discovery Order be extended from January 5, 2009 to March 2, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/12/08. (ehs, )
November 10, 2008 Filing 72 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File SONY'S AGREED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME RELATING TO DAMAGES COMPUTATIONS by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Motion to extend time relating to deposition transcripts. That the time for witnesses to review transcripts and make a signed statement listing changes for depositions be extended to November 28, 2008 and that the time to re-designate the confidentiality level of those transcripts be extended to November 28, 2008.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/23/08. (ehs, )
October 22, 2008 Filing 70 Consent MOTION extend time for witnesses to review transcripts, make changes, re-designate confidentiality level of deposition transcripts SONY'S AGREED-TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME RELATING TO DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Modify Discovery Order. Parties to inform the Court that there are no disputes regarding privileged documents or information to January 9, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/16/08. (ehs, )
October 14, 2008 Filing 68 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct SONY'S AGREED-TO MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY ORDER (re privileged documents and information) by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 26, 2008 Filing 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victor J Castellucci for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. (FEE PAID) 2-1-4056 (ehs, )
August 25, 2008 Filing 66 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul T Qualey for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4036 (ch, )
August 25, 2008 Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Philip J. McCabe for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4036 (ch, )
August 18, 2008 Filing 64 NOTICE by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation Certicom's Notice of Service of Privilege Log (Roth, Carl)
August 18, 2008 Filing 63 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America Notice of Service of Privilege Log on 8/14/08 (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2008., Discovery due by 4/15/2009., Claims Construction Hearing set for 6/11/2009 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Jury Selection set for 9/8/2009 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2009 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/18/08. (ch, )
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/18/08. (ch, )
August 12, 2008 Filing 60 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Hopenfeld for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4021 (ch, )
August 6, 2008 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Khue Van Hoang for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4003 (ch, )
August 6, 2008 Filing 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Zaed M Billah for Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation and Sony Corporation of America. APPROVED) (FEE PAID) 2-1-4000 (ch, )
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to modify the discovery order. The time for the parties to exchange privilege logs is extended to August 14, 2008 and the deadline for the parties to inform the Court that there are no disputes regarding privileged documents or information to October 14, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/1/08. (ehs, )
July 31, 2008 Filing 56 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 50 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Sony's Agreed-To Motion to Modify the Discovery Order by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 28, 2008 Filing 55 Certicom's ANSWER to 52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation.(Traupman, Matthew)
July 15, 2008 Filing 54 ***REPLACES #53***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/15/2008 (mpv, ).
July 15, 2008 NOTICE re 52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim. Exhibit A is unreadable, attorney will refile as an Additional Attachment to main document as soon as a readable document is obtained. (mpv, )
July 15, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Additional Attachments to Main Document submitted Document is unreadable, contains an error; attorney will refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
July 15, 2008 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/15/2008 (mpv, ).
July 14, 2008 Filing 52 Defendants' Second Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Unreadable), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/15/2008 (mpv, ).
July 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to Serve Amended Patent Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/11/08. (ch, )
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 49 Motion to modify the discovery order. Deadline to exchange privilege logs extended to 7/31/08, deadline for parties to inform the Court that there are no disputes regarding privileged documents or information reset to 9/30/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/9/08. (ehs, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 49 MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Order (Agreed) by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
June 26, 2008 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Agreed Motion for Leave to Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Carniaux, # 2 Exhibit Sony's Amended Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit A to Amended Invalidity Contentions, # 4 Exhibit B to Sony Amended Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to File amended disclosure. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/20/08. (ehs, )
June 12, 2008 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Agreed Motion for Leave to file its Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert Morgan, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Morgan Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 44 Motion for Protective Order. Amended Exhibit A shall substitute the Exhibit A to the Stipulated Protective Order that this Court entered on May 16, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/12/08. (ehs, )
June 5, 2008 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 Protective Order (Exhibit A to Protective Order), MOTION for Protective Order by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting the parties' 41 Stipulation to extend time to file reply, filed by Certicom Corporation, Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc.. Signed by Judge Judge T. John Ward on 5/20/08. (ehs, )
May 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/16/08. (ch, )
May 15, 2008 Filing 41 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
May 13, 2008 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
April 24, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL PATENT RULE 3-3, DEFENDANTS' PATENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (Wilcox, Melvin)
April 24, 2008 Filing 38 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilcox, Melvin)
March 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Charles Smith terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/13/08. (ehs, )
March 11, 2008 Filing 36 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America Notice of Compliance (Initial Disclosures) (Wilcox, Melvin)
March 11, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation Notice Of Compliance With P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Traupman, Matthew)
March 10, 2008 Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shahar Harel for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc.and all other Sony Dft's (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3583. (ch, )
February 22, 2008 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael C. Smith by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2008 (sm, ).
February 21, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation (Abraham, Amanda)
February 21, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation (Roth, Brendan)
January 22, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation Notice Of Filing of Proposed Docket Control Order And Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order)(Traupman, Matthew)
January 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on January 22, 2007. Deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems February 5, 2007 to be the date of the initial case management conference. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on February 19, 2007.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/9/08. (ch, )
January 8, 2008 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties have 14 days to submit the proposed orders. The Court further instructed the parties that the time for complying with P.R. 3-1 would be 10 days after the date of the parties filing their proposed orders. Court Adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (jml)
January 8, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham: Status Conference held on 1/8/2008. Melissa Smith, Melvin Wilcox, and John Flock in attendance. Claim construction hearing date and trial date were given to parties. Parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (shd, )
December 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - Status Conference set for 1/8/2008 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward, and Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/11/07. (ch, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony DADC US Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Electronics Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Corporation of America identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Corporation identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2007 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America.(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 11, 2007 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michelle Carniaux for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (FEE PAID) 2-1-2771 (ehs, )
July 11, 2007 Filing 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Flock for Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. and Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-2771. (ch, )
June 25, 2007 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. Sony Corporation of America served on 6/6/2007, answer due 6/26/2007. (ehs, )
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Sony entities deadline is extended to 8/31/07 . Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/25/07. (ch, )
June 19, 2007 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Stipulation Extending Answer Date to 8-31-07# 2 Appendix Stipulation - Waiver of Service Sony Corporation# 3 Appendix Stipulation Waiver Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 13, 2007 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation. Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc. served on 6/7/2007, answer due 6/27/2007. (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation. Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. served on 6/8/2007, answer due 6/28/2007. (ehs, )
June 13, 2007 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation. Sony DADC US Inc. served on 6/6/2007, answer due 6/26/2007. (ehs, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc. served on 6/4/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (ehs, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. Sony Electronics Inc. served on 6/4/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (ehs, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laurence S Rogers for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation.(Fee Paid) 2-1-2617 (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Traupman for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation.(Fee Paid) 2-1-2617 (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Megan Raymond for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Fee Paid) 2-1-2617 (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert C Morgan for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation.(Fee Paid) 2-1-2617 (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Paul Carroll for Certicom Corporation and Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Fee Paid) 2-1-2617 (ch, )
June 4, 2007 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (ch, )
May 31, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. (ehs, )
May 30, 2007 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Corporation. (ehs, )
May 30, 2007 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-2603 (ehs, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 2 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (ehs, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sony Computer Entertainment Inc., Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony DADC US Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Certicom Corporation, Certicom Patent Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ehs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certicom Corporation et al v. Sony Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certicom Corporation
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certicom Patent Holding Corporation
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony DADC US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?