Northeastern University et al v. Google, Inc., Featured Case

Plaintiffs Northwestern University and Jarg Corporation allege that Defendant Google, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 entitled "Distributed Computer Database System and Method."

Plaintiff: Northeastern University and Jarg Corporation
Defendant: Google, Inc.,
Counter Claimant: Google, Inc.,
Counter Defendant: Northeastern University and Jarg Corporation
Case Number: 2:2007cv00486
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 210 Motion to Seal Document. 210 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 127 Notice of Discovery Disclosure, 160 Notice (Other) : MOTION TO SEAL D.I. 127-2 AND 160-2Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 127 Notice of Discovery Disclosure, 160 Notice (Other) : MOTION TO SEAL D.I. 127-2 AND 160-2. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/28/11. (ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 210 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 127 Notice of Discovery Disclosure, 160 Notice (Other) : MOTION TO SEAL D.I. 127-2 AND 160-2 (CORRECTED) filed by Google, Inc.,. (Duarte, Enrique)
June 27, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #211 Affidavit in support submitted by Google, Inc.,. No certificate of service included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
June 24, 2011 Filing 211 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***AFFIDAVIT in Support re 210 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 127 Notice of Discovery Disclosure, 160 Notice (Other) : MOTION TO SEAL D.I. 127-2 AND 160-2 filed by Google, Inc.,. (Duarte, Enrique) Modified on 6/27/2011 (sm, ).
June 24, 2011 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 127 Notice of Discovery Disclosure, 160 Notice (Other) : MOTION TO SEAL D.I. 127-2 AND 160-2 by Google, Inc.,. (Duarte, Enrique) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - all claims for relief asserted against Google Inc. by Northeastern University and Jarg Corporation, and against Northeastern University and Jarg Corporation by Google Inc. are dismissed, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/15/11. (ehs, )
April 14, 2011 Filing 208 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 7, 2011 Filing 206 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 Was Not Willful filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Shek, Bernard)
April 7, 2011 Filing 205 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply ISO Jarosz Motion to Exclude by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Google Motion to Exceed Page Limit Jarosz)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
April 7, 2011 Filing 204 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN JAROSZ filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit SEALED Scarpati Declaration)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
April 6, 2011 Filing 203 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 Was Not Willful filed by Google, Inc.,. (Scarpati, Jennifer)
April 6, 2011 Filing 202 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 200 Emergency MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Michael Belanger filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Enrique D. Duarte, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique)
April 6, 2011 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION AND FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE Defendant Google Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidty for Lack of Written Description and Failure to Disclose the Best Mode filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jerry T. Yen, # 2 Exhibit K)(Yen, Jerry)
April 6, 2011 Filing 200 Emergency MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Michael Belanger by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Schick, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
April 6, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #198 Emergency Motion and NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION regarding #199 Additional Attachment to #198 submitted by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. No certificate of conference was included in #198. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 199 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 198 Emergency MOTION to Quash the Subpoena of Michael Belanger.. (Glauser, Nicole) Modified on 4/6/2011 (sm, ).
April 5, 2011 Filing 198 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Emergency MOTION to Quash the Subpoena of Michael Belanger by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Schick, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole) Modified on 4/6/2011 (sm, ).
April 4, 2011 Filing 207 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Jury Selection held on 4/4/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
April 4, 2011 Filing 197 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 196 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Enrique D. Duarte)(Duarte, Enrique)
April 4, 2011 Filing 196 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 151 SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Keller's Supplemental Expert Report filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H)(Duarte, Enrique)
April 4, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRE-TRIAL HEARING held on 3/29/11 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (54 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2011. (tja, )
April 3, 2011 Filing 194 Sealed Document Amended Joint Pretrial Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations, # 4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Deposition Designations and Counter, # 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs Objections Deposition Designations, # 6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Trial Exhibit List (Final 4-3), # 7 Exhibit G - Defendants Final Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Verdict Form, # 9 Exhibit I - Defendants Verdict Form)(Valek, Michael)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 130 Sealed Motion; granting 134 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 1, 2011. (jml)
March 29, 2011 Filing 192 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/29/2011. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 187 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, )
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, )
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 180 Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, )
March 29, 2011 Filing 188 Proposed Jury Instructions by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Shek, Bernard)
March 28, 2011 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Opposition to Pltfs Mot to Exclude Expert Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
March 28, 2011 Filing 186 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 147 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Shelley K. Mack, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
March 28, 2011 Filing 185 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 144 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim of Invalidity for Failure to Disclosure the Best Mode filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Jerry T. Yen, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Yen, Jerry)
March 28, 2011 Filing 184 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order. [Sealed Document]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Plaintiffs' Witness List, # 2 Exhibit B-Defendant's Witness List, # 3 Exhibit C-Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations, # 4 Exhibit D-Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations, # 5 Exhibit E-Defendant's Deposition Designations, # 6 Exhibit F-Defendant's Deposition Objections, # 7 Exhibit G-Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit H-Defendant's Exhibit Objections, # 9 Exhibit I-Defendant's Exhibits, # 10 Exhibit J-Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Exhibits, # 11 Exhibit K-Plaintiffs' Jury Instructions and Verdict Form, # 12 Exhibit L-Defendant's Jury Instructions and Verdict Form)(Valek, Michael)
March 28, 2011 Filing 183 SEALED RESPONSE to 145 SEALED Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Vitter filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit X, # 25 Text of Proposed Order SEALED Proposed Order, # 26 Affidavit SEALED Scarpati Decl in Support of Opposition)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
March 28, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, MOTION TERMINATED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 177, Joint SEALED MOTION for pretrial order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Daubert Motion to Exclude Jarosz Testimony by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 28, 2011 Filing 181 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 155 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN JAROSZ filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicole Glauser ISO Pltfs' Opp to Daubert Motion to Exclude Jarosz, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 3 Exhibit 2 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 4 Exhibit 3 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 5 Exhibit 4 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 6 Exhibit 5 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 7 Exhibit 6 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 8 Exhibit 7 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 9 Exhibit 8 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 10 Exhibit 9 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 11 Exhibit 10 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 12 Exhibit 11 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 13 Exhibit 12 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 14 Exhibit 13 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 15 Exhibit 14 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 16 Exhibit 15 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 17 Exhibit 16 - ISO Declaration of Glauser, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 27, 2011 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exceed Page Limit for MSJ Responses by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
March 27, 2011 Filing 179 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Google's Motion re 152 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION AND FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Shek ISO of Pltfs' Opp to Google's 112 MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 3 Exhibit 2 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 4 Exhibit 3 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 5 Exhibit 4 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 6 Exhibit 5 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 7 Exhibit 6 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 8 Exhibit 7 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 9 Exhibit 8 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 10 Exhibit 9 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 11 Exhibit 10 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 12 Exhibit 11 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 13 Exhibit 12 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 14 Exhibit 13 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 15 Exhibit 14 - ISO of Declaration of Shek, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
March 27, 2011 Filing 178 SEALED RESPONSE in Oppotion to Motion re 153 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 Was Not Willful filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Bernard Shek ISO Opp to Willfulness MSJ, # 2 Exhibit 1 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 - ISO Shek Declaration, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
March 25, 2011 Filing 177 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint SEALED MOTION Pretrial Order by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A-Plaintiffs Witness List, # 2 Exhibit Ex B-Defendant's Witness List, # 3 Exhibit Ex C-Plaintiffs Deposition Designations, # 4 Exhibit Ex D- Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Deposition Designations, # 5 Exhibit Ex E-Defendant's Deposition Designations, # 6 Exhibit Ex F- Defendants Deposition Objections, # 7 Exhibit Ex G-Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit Ex H-Defendant's Exhibit Objections, # 9 Exhibit Ex I-Defendant's Exhibits, # 10 Exhibit Ex J-Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Exhibits, # 11 Exhibit Ex K-Plaintiffs' Jury Instructions and Verdict Form, # 12 Exhibit Ex L-Defendant's Jury Instructions and Verdict Form)(Valek, Michael) Modified on 3/28/2011 (sm, ).
March 25, 2011 Filing 176 Sealed Document: Corrected Exhibit L to Google's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of John Jarosz to 155 pursuant to [D.I. 162] 3/21/11 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Various Motions. (Attachments: #(1) Corrected Exhibit L); (Duarte, Enrique)
March 25, 2011 Filing 175 Sealed Document: Corrected Exhibits E and F to Google's Damages Motion In Limine to 154 pursuant to [D.I. 162] 3/21/11 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Various Motions. (Attachments: #(1) Corrected Exhibit E, #(2) Corrected Exhibit F); (Duarte, Enrique)
March 25, 2011 Filing 174 Sealed Document: Corrected Exhibits J and K to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment that any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 was not Willful to 153 pursuant to [D.I. 162] 3/21/11 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Various Motions. (Attachments: #(1) Corrected Exhibit J, #(2) Corrected Exhibit K); (Duarte, Enrique)
March 25, 2011 Filing 173 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 151 SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Keller's Supplemental Expert Report filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James Shead, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2, # 4 Exhibit Ex 3, # 5 Exhibit Ex 4, # 6 Exhibit Ex 5, # 7 Exhibit Ex 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Shead, James)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 102 Sealed Motion for summary judgment of noninfringement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/24/11. (ehs, )
March 22, 2011 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Schick on behalf of Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University (Schick, Robert)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/11. (ehs, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 169 SEALED RESPONSE to Google's Motion re 154 Damages Motions in Limine filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 19 Exhibit 18 - Declaration of Glauser ISO Response to Google's Damages MILs, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 21, 2011 Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Response to Google's Damages MILs by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 21, 2011 Filing 167 SEALED RESPONSE to 130 Google Inc.'s Non-Damages Motions in Limine filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bernard Shek ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Shek Declaration ISO Response to Googles Non-Damages MIL, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 21, 2011 Filing 166 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Damages Related Motion in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 - 2 of 3, # 2 Exhibit 5 3 of 3)(Mack, Shelley)
March 21, 2011 Filing 165 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Damages Related Motion in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 - 1 of 3)(Mack, Shelley)
March 21, 2011 Filing 164 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Damages Related Motion in Limine filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Shelley K. Mack, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
March 21, 2011 Filing 163 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 132 SEALED MOTION of Non-Damages Related Motion in Limine filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Frank J. Albert, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Albert, Francis)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 159 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Various Motions (D.I. 153 155). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/21/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Filing 161 NOTICE by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.S AMENDED WITNESS LIST,COUNTER EXHIBIT LIST, AND COUNTER-DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections to Counter Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B - Objections to Counter Designations)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 18, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE by Google, Inc., re 127 Notice of Disclosure Objections to Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Duarte, Enrique)
March 18, 2011 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Exhibits to Various Motions (DI 153-155) by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique)
March 17, 2011 Filing 158 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 134 SEALED MOTION FOR GOOGLE TO PROVIDE NON-PRIVILEGED ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Enrique D. Duarte, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit with respect toits Damages Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/9/11. (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Damages Motions in Limine Exceeding Page Limit by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
March 8, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 150, Motion for Summary Judgment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 153)(ch, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 155 SEALED MOTION DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF JOHN JAROSZ by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Affidavit, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Yen, Jerry)
March 7, 2011 Filing 154 SEALED MOTION Google Inc.'s Damages Motions in Limine by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer N Scarpati, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
March 7, 2011 Filing 153 SEALED MOTION For Summary Judgement That Any Alleged Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 5,694,593 Was Not Willful by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarpati, Jennifer)
March 7, 2011 Filing 152 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY FOR LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION AND FAILURE TO DISCLOSE THE BEST MODE by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Affidavit, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Yen, Jerry)
March 7, 2011 Filing 151 SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Keller's Supplemental Expert Report by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique)
March 7, 2011 Filing 150 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ***SEE CORRECTED # 153 ***MOTION for Summary Judgment that Any Alleged Infringement was Not Willful by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Scarpati Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit R)(Scarpati, Jennifer) Modified on 3/8/2011 (ch, ). Modified on 3/8/2011 (ch, ).
March 7, 2011 Filing 149 NOTICE by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University of Compliance with Docket Control Order Regarding Mediation (Glauser, Nicole)
March 7, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University of Request for Real Time Reporting and Daily Transcripts (Glauser, Nicole)
March 7, 2011 Filing 147 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Testimony of W. Christopher Bakewell by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Nicole Glauser, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 7, 2011 Filing 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Damages Related Motion in Limine by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bernard C. Shek, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-Segment 001 of 001 of Ex. 2, # 4 Exhibit 2-Segment 002 of 001 of Ex. 2, # 5 Exhibit 2-Segment of 002 of Ex. 2, # 6 Exhibit 2-Segment 003 of Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
March 7, 2011 Filing 145 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Jeffrey Vitter by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Benard C. Shek, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
March 7, 2011 Filing 144 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim of Invalidity for Failure to Disclosure the Best Mode by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stephen C. Stout, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen)
March 7, 2011 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer N Scarpati on behalf of Google, Inc., (Scarpati, Jennifer)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Agreed Jury Questionnaire. APPROVES use of the proposed Jury Questionnaire, and ORDERS that the Jury Questionnaire be included in the summonses to be sent to the venire panel in this matter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/7/11. (ehs, )
March 7, 2011 Filing 141 Joint MOTION for Agreed Jury Questionnaire by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Jury Questionnaire, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 4, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE by Google, Inc., re 32 Order of Compliance With Discovery Order (Mack, Shelley)
March 4, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE INC.'S PRE-TRIAL DISCLOSURES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections to Google's Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit B - Objections to Google's Exhibit List)(Glauser, Nicole)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on March 3, 2011. (jml)
March 3, 2011 Filing 137 NOTICE by Google, Inc., - Notice of Request for Real Time Reporting and Daily Transcripts of Court Proceeds at Trial (Mack, Shelley)
February 28, 2011 Filing 136 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): 132 SEALED MOTION of Non-Damages Related Motion in Limine.. (Shek, Bernard) Modified on 2/28/2011 (sm, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 135 Additional Attachments to Main Document (CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE): 130 SEALED MOTION Google Inc.'s Non-Damages Motions in Limine.. (Duarte, Enrique) Modified on 2/28/2011 (sm, ).
February 28, 2011 Filing 134 SEALED MOTION FOR GOOGLE TO PROVIDE NON-PRIVILEGED ANSWERS TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
February 25, 2011 Filing 133 Joint MOTION in Limine by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
February 25, 2011 Filing 132 SEALED MOTION of Non-Damages Related Motion in Limine by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bernard Shek, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Shek, Bernard)
February 25, 2011 Filing 131 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 130 SEALED MOTION Google Inc.'s Non-Damages Motions in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Duarte, Enrique)
February 25, 2011 Filing 130 SEALED MOTION Google Inc.'s Non-Damages Motions in Limine by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duarte, Enrique)
February 24, 2011 Filing 129 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer N Scarpati for Google, Inc.,(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-329. (ch, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Disclosure by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University of Pre-Trial Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition Designations, # 2 Exhibit B - Trial Exhibits)(Glauser, Nicole)
February 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO BE ADMITTED Document # 126, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 126 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Google, Inc., (Perlson, David) Modified on 2/18/2011 (ch, ).
February 15, 2011 Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 2/15/2011. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties are granted until and including 3/1/2011, to conduct depositions of each sides experts and until 2/15/2011 to depose fact witnesses Vin Lembo, and motions in limine relating to damages and/or to the damages experts reports, opinions, or testimony are due on or before 3/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/15/2011. (ch, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 124 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery FOR EXPERT DEPOSITIONS AND THE DEADLINE FOR DAMAGES RELATED MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Nicole) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2011: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
February 10, 2011 Filing 123 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allison H Altersohn for Google, Inc.,. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 1-1811) (ehs, )
February 9, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole E Glauser on behalf of Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University (Glauser, Nicole)
February 9, 2011 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bernard Chi-Bung Shek on behalf of Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University (Shek, Bernard)
February 8, 2011 Filing 120 NOTICE of Change of Address by William B Dawson (Dawson, William)
February 8, 2011 Filing 119 STIPULATION AUTHENTICATING DOCUMENTS PRODUCED by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (DeRose, Zeke)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Modify Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/2/11. (ehs, )
February 1, 2011 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 Protective Order, Terminate Motions by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
February 1, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 115, Sur-Reply to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 116 SEALED SURREPLY to Google Inc.'s Reply In Support of It's Motion re 102 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Ryan, Christopher)
January 31, 2011 Filing 115 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 102 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Ryan, Christopher) Modified on 2/1/2011 (ch, ).
January 19, 2011 Filing 114 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re D102 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jerry T. Yen, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H)(Yen, Jerry)
January 19, 2011 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Google, Inc., (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 Unopposed Motion to Supplement Damages Expert Report and Extend Deadline for Dft Rebuttal Report. ORDERED that Plaintiffs may serve a supplement to their expert report on damages by Friday, 1/7/2011 and Defendant shall serve its rebuttal expert report on damages by Friday, 1/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/7/2011. (ch, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend /Supplement Damages Expert Report and Extend Deadline for Google's Rebuttal Report by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael)
December 27, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 10/6/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (134 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2011. (tja, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 109 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Constance S Huttner for Jarg Corporation and for Northeastern University. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-191) (ehs, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 108 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration included in main document): 107 Sealed Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Google, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement - Declaration of James Daniel Shead. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit D - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit E - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit F - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit G - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit H - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit I - Pltfs' Opp to Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher) Modified on 12/22/2010 (sm, ).
December 21, 2010 Filing 107 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 102 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - NEU and Jarg Response to Google's Stmt of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Exhibit B - Keller Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B-1 Keller Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B-2 Keller Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B-3 Keller Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B-4 Keller Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B-101 Keller Declaration, # 8 Exhibit B-102 Keller Declaration, # 9 Exhibit B-103 Keller Declaration, # 10 Exhibit B-104 Keller Declaration, # 11 Exhibit B-105 Keller Declaration)(Ryan, Christopher)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a response is extended until December 21, 2010. Defendant's reply deadline is extended to January 19, 2011.(jml)
November 23, 2010 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply Briefs in connection with Googles Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #102) by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Withdraw # 100 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of NonInfringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/17/10. (ehs, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 100 SEALED MOTION Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
November 15, 2010 Filing 102 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stmt of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit B - US 5694593, # 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Suppl Infring Cont - Appendix B and C, # 4 Exhibit D - 06-07-1996 Resp from 593 File History, # 5 Exhibit E - 05-14-1997 Resp from 593 File History, # 6 Affidavit of Nadav Eiron w-Exs, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Yen, Jerry)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The court issues the following set forth herein concerning the claim construction issues. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 593 patent. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/9/10. (ehs, )
November 8, 2010 Filing 100 SEALED MOTION Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Affidavit of Nadav Eiron, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Yen, Jerry)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. expert reports are due 15 days after the claim construction ruling is entered, or on December 15, 2010, whichever date is later. Rebuttal expert reports are due 30 days after the claim construction order is entered, or on January 6, 2011, whichever date is later. All discovery shall be completed on or before February 11, 201. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/10. (ehs, )
October 21, 2010 Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (For Expert Reports and Discovery Deadline) by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRose, Zeke)
October 6, 2010 Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 10/6/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (jml)
September 24, 2010 Filing 96 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Google, Inc., Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Shead, James)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion for procedures and protections to assist in resolving privilege disputes in this litigation. Procedures set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/16/10. (ehs, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 94 Joint MOTION to Enter Rule 502 Agreement by Google, Inc.,, Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRose, Zeke)
August 27, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/25/10 Hotline Call before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/29/2010. (lss, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 92 ANSWER to 91 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Reply to Counterclaims) by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University.(Stout, Stephen)
July 6, 2010 Filing 91 GOOGLE INC.'S ANSWER to 88 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University by Google, Inc.,.(Mack, Shelley)
June 17, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University regarding Privileged Information (DeRose, Zeke)
June 17, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE by Google, Inc., Regarding Privilege Disputes (Albert, Francis)
June 16, 2010 Filing 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc.,, filed by Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University.(DeRose, Zeke)
June 16, 2010 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen Lee Hirschman on behalf of Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University (Hirschman, Karen)
May 25, 2010 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 5/25/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
May 18, 2010 Filing 85 AMENDED PATENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Google, Inc.,. (Albert, Francis) Modified on 5/19/2010 (sm, ).
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to Supplement its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ISO of Defendant Google's Unopposed Mot for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Defendant Google's Unopposed Mot for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions)(Albert, Francis)
April 6, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Daniel Shead on behalf of Jarg Corporation, Northeastern University (Shead, James)
January 12, 2010 Filing 80 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Stout, Stephen)
December 15, 2009 Filing 79 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 SEALED MOTION to Supplement Disclosure of Assorted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts from Peterman Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Jarg Revised Notice of 30b6 Depo to Google, # 3 Exhibit 13 - Emails between Stout and Wolff)(Wolff, Jason)
December 11, 2009 Filing 78 REPLY to 71 Claim Construction Brief filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Albert, Francis)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Google to submit its surreply brief to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Supplement their Infringement Contentions is extended to 12/15/09. Deadline for Northeastern University and Jarg Corporation to comply with P.R. 4-5(c) is extended to 1/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/09. (ch, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Google, Inc.,. (Mack, Shelley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2009: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
December 2, 2009 Filing 75 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 SEALED MOTION to Supplement Disclosure of Assorted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Exhibit A-6, # 8 Exhibit A-7, # 9 Exhibit A-8, # 10 Exhibit A-9, # 11 Exhibit A-10, # 12 Exhibit A-11, # 13 Exhibit A-12, # 14 Exhibit A-13, # 15 Exhibit B, # 16 Exhibit C, # 17 Exhibit D, # 18 Exhibit E)(Blanke, David)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply brief in support of their motion to supplement their disclosure of asserted claims and infringement contentions. Responses due by 12/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/25/09. (ehs, )
November 24, 2009 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 70 SEALED MOTION to Supplement Disclosure of Assorted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blanke, David)
November 16, 2009 Filing 72 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 70 SEALED MOTION to Supplement Disclosure of Assorted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Jarg Ex L w Google comments, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 2008-12-04 Ltr to Valek fr Wolff re meet and confer re Google PR 3-4a prod, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2009-01-05 Email to Wolff-Valek fr Weaver re 12-4-08 Ltr and date-time to meet, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2009-01-16 Ltr to Wolff fr Stout re search terms, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Google Source Code File Table 11-11-09, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 2009-07-02 Ltr to Shead fr Albert re Google availability for inspection of addll source code, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 2009-07-09 Email to Albert fr Shead re source code, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 2009-04-13 Ltr to Wolff fr DeRose re production descriptions and Zunger Docs, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 2009-04-15 Ltr to DeRose fr Albert re Depo of Zunger, # 10 Exhibit 10 - 2009-11-03 Ltr to Mack fr Stout re Jarg-NU 30b6 Depo, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolff, Jason)
November 13, 2009 Filing 71 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Stout, Stephen)
October 30, 2009 Filing 70 SEALED MOTION to Supplement Disclosure of Assorted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Blanke, David)
October 30, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Woodcock, Jr on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Woodcock, David)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Extend Time. May 27, 2010 Deadline for exchanging updates of Privilege Logs. June 17, 2010 Deadline to notify the Court that there are no disputes concerning privileged documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/30/09. (ehs, )
October 29, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zeke DeRose, III on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (DeRose, Zeke)
October 27, 2009 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Extend Time re Privilege Log Deadlines by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 63 Motion Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/19/09. (ch, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David P Blanke on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Blanke, David)
October 15, 2009 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with P.R. 4-5 by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
August 28, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc., - Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Valek, Michael)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/26/09. (ehs, )
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ORDERED that the following schedule of deadlines is in effect until further order of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
June 4, 2009 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time)(Albert, Francis)
May 22, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Disclosure by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation Pursuant to P.R. 4-1 (Stout, Stephen)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The parties are granted until and including June 5, 2009 to produce a copy of all documents, electronically stored information, and tangible things in the possession, custody, or control of the party that are relevant to liability related issues involved in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/09. (ch, )
May 8, 2009 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (for Additional Disclosures) by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen)
January 8, 2009 Filing 55 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Weaver, David)
January 5, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 53, Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney refiled see document #54)(ch, )
December 31, 2008 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mack, Shelley)
December 31, 2008 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 54 ***REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY filed by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O)(Mack, Shelley) Modified on 1/5/2009 (ch, ).
December 23, 2008 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith J Fitzpatrick on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Fitzpatrick, Meredith)
December 17, 2008 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Weaver, David)
December 15, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francis J Albert on behalf of Google, Inc., (Albert, Francis)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs are granted until and including December 17, 2008 to file their response to Googles Motion to Compel. Google is granted until and including December 31, 2008 to file a reply in support of its Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/08. (ch, )
December 4, 2008 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stout, Stephen)
November 26, 2008 Filing 47 MOTION to Compel 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY FROM JARG CORPORATION AND NORTHEASTERN UNIVERSITY by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Boston Globe article, # 2 Exhibit B - Reuters article, # 3 Exhibit C - Amended Notice of Deposition to Jarg, # 4 Exhibit D - Amended Notice of Deposition to NU, # 5 Exhibit E - Jarg Objs to Google 30b6 Not, # 6 Exhibit F - NU Objs to Google 30b6 Not, # 7 Exhibit G - NU and Jarg Initial Disclosures, # 8 Exhibit H - Order Denying MyMail Mot for PO and Granting AOL Mot to Compel, # 9 Exhibit I - Amended Docket Control Order, # 10 Exhibit J - Jarg Notice of Disclosures, # 11 Exhibit K - D195 Order Re Mass Eng v Ergotron, # 12 Exhibit L - Pirri Depo Transcript, # 13 Exhibit M - Belanger Depo Transcript, # 14 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Wolff, Jason)
November 10, 2008 Filing 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Francis J Albert for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-15838. (ch, )
November 7, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc., Under P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Wolff, Jason)
October 27, 2008 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.,. (Jones, Michael)
September 9, 2008 Filing 43 NOTICE of Disclosure by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation - Notice of Disclosure under P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Stout, Stephen)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/08. (ehs, )
September 2, 2008 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Enter Protective Order re 38 Joint MOTION For entry of protective order and for extension of time for submitting a mutually agreeable attachment to the protective order - This motion supercedes 38 in that the previously proposed Agreed Protective Order has not been entered and the attached proposed Agreed Protective Order includes both the Protective Order and the mutually agreeable attachment by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valek, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2008: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion to Extend time for Submitting a Mutually Agreeable Attachment to the Protective Order. Joint Motion to Extend Time for Submitting a Mutually Agreeable Attachment to the Protective Order, filed on August 28, 2008 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that a two day extension of time, until and including Tuesday, September 2, 2008, is granted for the parties to confer and submit a further mutually agreeable attachment to the protective order to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/29/08. (ch, )
August 28, 2008 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to submit a Mutually Agreeable Attachment To The Protective Order CONTAINED IN # 38 MOTION by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (mpv, )
August 28, 2008 Filing 38 Joint MOTION For entry of protective order and for extension of time for submitting a mutually agreeable attachment to the protective order by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation, Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting extension of time)(Valek, Michael)
August 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 35 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Mutually Agreeable Protective Order. Deadline is extended to 8/28/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/27/08. (ch, )
August 27, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT, IS A PROPOSED ORDER ONLY, NOT A MOTION SO THIS MOTION IS TERMINATED, CLERK WILL ATTACH ORDER TO #35 MOTION***. Document # 36, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 36 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mutually Agreeable Protective Order - Text of Proposed Order by Google, Inc.,. (Wolff, Jason) Modified on 8/27/2008 (sm, ).
August 26, 2008 Filing 35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mutually Agreeable Protective Order by Google, Inc.,. (Wolff, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2008: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 26, 2008 Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Enrique D Duarte for Google, Inc.. (FEE PAID) 6-1-14893 (ehs, )
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 6/25/2010. Discovery due by 2/4/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2009. Markman Hearing set for 10/6/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 2/25/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/25/2011. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/21/08. (ehs, )
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/21/08. (ehs, )
August 19, 2008 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Adopt Proposed Docket Control Order and Proposed Discovery Order by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Discovery Order)(Wolff, Jason)
August 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control and discovery orders. Deadline extended to 8/19/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/15/08. (ehs, )
August 12, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension to File DCO and DO)(Wolff, Jason)
August 1, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W Wolff on behalf of Google, Inc., (Wolff, Jason)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/08. (ehs, )
July 30, 2008 Filing 26 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
July 29, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 7/29/2008. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order and to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
July 29, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 7/29/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order and to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on August 12, 2008.Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 9, 2008. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/26/08. (ehs, )
May 14, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Ryan on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Ryan, Christopher)
May 1, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google, Inc., (Gardner, Allen)
January 31, 2008 Filing 22 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation.(Valek, Michael)
January 11, 2008 Filing 21 Google, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation by Google, Inc.,.(Jones, Michael)
January 10, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry T. Yen on behalf of Google, Inc., (Yen, Jerry)
January 10, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Google, Inc., (Cordell, Ruffin)
December 26, 2007 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shelley K Mack for Google, Inc.. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12230(ch, )
December 26, 2007 Filing 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Howard G Pollack for Google, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12230. (ch, )
December 18, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Charles Stout on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Stout, Stephen)
November 26, 2007 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc., to 1/11/2008. (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/11/08. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 21, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Maloney, Collin)
November 21, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Carroll, Otis)
November 21, 2007 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, [Unopposed] by Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 19, 2007 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B Dawson on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Dawson, William)
November 19, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raymond Floyd Walker on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Walker, Raymond)
November 19, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Weaver, David)
November 19, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation (Valek, Michael)
November 15, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Jones, Jr on behalf of Northeastern University (Jones, Franklin)
November 9, 2007 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northeastern University. Google, Inc., served by Process Server on 11/7/2007, answer due 11/27/2007. (ch, )
November 8, 2007 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jarg Corporation identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis)
November 8, 2007 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Northeastern University identifying none as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis)
November 6, 2007 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc.,. (ch, )
November 6, 2007 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ch, )
November 6, 2007 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Google, Inc., (Filing fee $ 350.) , filed by Northeastern University, Jarg Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northeastern University et al v. Google, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeastern University
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarg Corporation
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.,
Represented By: Jerry T. Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google, Inc.,
Represented By: Jerry T. Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Northeastern University
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jarg Corporation
Represented By: David B Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?