Software Rights Archive, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Software Rights Archive, LLC alleges that Defendants Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL LLC and Lycos, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 5,544,352 entitled "Method and Apparatus for Indexing, Searching and Displaying Data."

Plaintiff: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC. and Lycos, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Yahoo! Inc., AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv00511
Filed: November 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to Case Transferred Out - District Transfer received in the Northern District of California on 8/25/10 and assigned case number 5:10cv3723. (ehs, )
August 18, 2010 Interdistrict Electronically transfer to the Northern District of California. (ehs, )
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for amended pleadings is extended to September 2, 2010; and the deadline for responding to amended pleadings is extended through October 1, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/11/10. (ehs, )
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Amended Pleadings/Response to Amended Pleadings) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Lycos, Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE from USCA Federal Circuit dismissing as moot Google's Petition for Writ of Mandamus No. MISC 946 (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting 324 Motion to Dismiss all claims asserted by plaintiff Software Rights Archive, LLC (SRA) against defendant IAC Search & Media, Inc. (IACSAM) with prejudice. And for dismissal of all counterclaimsasserted by IACSAM against SRA without prejudice. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Mark)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting motion to transfer venue filed by defts. Court suspends any deadline under the Local Rules for responding to pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/22/10. (ehs, )
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting 319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr terminated as counsel for deft Google Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/22/10. (ehs, )
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend the Docket Control Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell Allen Chorush on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Chorush, Russell)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion by Harry L. Gillam, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney of Record by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 318 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(DiNovo, Andrew)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Google Inc. (Smith, Michael)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Subpoena Commanding Production of Documents to FTI Consulting (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kaplan, Lee)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 315 RESPONSE in Opposition re 313 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 314 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 284 MOTION to Compel Google to Disclose Function Media Discovery and Transcript filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott Weingaertner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Supplemental Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit granting leave to file a corrected petition and directs Software Rights Archive LLC to respond no later than 7/22/10 to said petition (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit assigning the petition for writ of mandamus filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc, IAC Search & Media Inc, Lycos Inc and Yahoo! Inc case number MISC No. 946 (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting 309 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to comply with P.R. 4-3 is extended to 7/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/2010. (ch, )
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-3 by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siebman, Clyde)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Google Inc. (Phillips, Lawrence)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Google Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED MOTION to Compel Google to Provide Damages Discovery by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 305 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 284 MOTION to Compel Google to Disclose Function Media Discovery and Transcript filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri)(Kaplan, Lee)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Subpoena Commanding Production of Documents to the Leland Stanford Junior University (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, Lee)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Subpoena Commanding Production of Documents to Lumen Patent Firm (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kaplan, Lee)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 302 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 284 MOTION to Compel Google to Disclose Function Media Discovery and Transcript filed by Google Inc.. Attachments: (1) Affidavit - Declaration of Scott Weingaertner, (2) Exhibit 1, (3) Exhibit 2, (4) Exhibit 3, (5) Exhibit 4, (6) Exhibit 5, (7) Exhibit 6, (8) Exhibit 7, (9) Exhibit 8(Gillam, Harry)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 301 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher C Carnaval for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5440) (ehs, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Sealed Document - REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of 4/1/52010 hearing filed by Google. (rml, )
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting 298 Motion to amend docket control. Discovery deadline, claim construction issues due 7/30/10. Respond to amended pleadings due 8/20/10. Comply with PR 4-5(a) due 8/20/10. Deft's response claim construction brief due 9/22/10. Comply with PR 4-5(c) Pltf's reply claim construction brief due 10/20/10. Comply with PR 4-5(d) due 11/1/10. Deadline to supplement PR 4-3 chart due 7/28/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/10. (ehs, )
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Joint MOTION to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting 296 Unopposed Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/2010. (ch, )
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION to Further Extend Deadline for Yahoo! to produce documents pursuant to June 9, 2010 Order re 293 Order on Motion to Compel by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Sealed redaction request. (rml, )
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Subpoena Commanding Production of Documents (Kaplan, Lee)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting 269 Motion to Compel. Yahoo is ordered to provide the requested information within twenty-one days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/10. (ehs, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting 291 Google's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Dkt No. 284. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/9/2010. (jml)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Google to Produce Function Media Discovery and Transcript by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Intent to Request Redaction (Gillam, Harry)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 269 MOTION to Compel Yahoo Inc. to Provide Discovery filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER denying 286 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying 271 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/10. (ehs, )
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2010: # 3 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Sealed Transcript of hearing held 4/15/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. (tja, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MOTION to Compel Google to Disclose Function Media Discovery and Transcript by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Raj Duvvuri, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 283 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 271 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Disclose Their Noninfringement Contentions filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Saelao Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 to Saelao Decl, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 to Saelao Decl, # 4 Exhibit Ex 3 to Saelao Decl, # 5 Exhibit Ex 4 to Saelao Decl, # 6 Affidavit Walsh Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Ex 1 to Walsh Decl, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer J Schmidt for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5374) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam M Conrad for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5374) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexas D Skucas for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5374) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-8374) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 278 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura S Huffman for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5374) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re 269 MOTION to Compel Yahoo Inc. to Provide Discovery Relating to Other Search Engines, Comparisons, and Its Negotiations and Search Engine Agreements with Microsoft Corp. filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott T Weingaertner for Google Inc.,Scott T Weingaertner for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5372) (ehs, )
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting 274 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Yahoo! Inc. to Provide Discovery Relating to Other Search Engines, Comparisons, and its Negotiations and Search Engine Agreement with Microsoft Corp. Based on the arguments presented in the motion and the Plaintiff not being opposed. Responses due by 5/24/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/14/10. (ehs, )
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 269 MOTION to Compel Yahoo Inc. to Provide Discovery by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 255 SEALED MOTION for Protection filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. of Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Walsh, Thomas)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Disclose Their Noninfringement Contentions by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Kaplan, Lee)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order *** Document # 269, Motion to Compel modified and placed under seal per attorney*** (ehs, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ***SEALED PER ATTORNEY*** MOTION to Compel Yahoo Inc. to Provide Discovery by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 4/29/2010 (ehs, ).
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 266 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Sur-reply is limited to 12 pages, excluding attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2010. (ch, )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 255 Motion for Protection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2010. (ch, )
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Deadline for Amended pleadings 6/23/10. Response to Amended pleadings 7/21/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/9/10. (ehs, )
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 84 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting 254 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Google is granted leave to file a Motion for Protection containing up to and including twenty-one (21) pages, excluding attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/6/2010. (ch, )
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEALED MOTION for Protection by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Walsh, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Walsh Decl, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Walsh Decl, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Walsh Decl, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Walsh Decl, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Walsh Decl, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Walsh Decl, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Walsh Decl, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Walsh Decl, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Walsh Decl, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Walsh Decl, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Walsh Decl, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Walsh Decl, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Walsh Decl, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Walsh Decl, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Walsh Decl, # 18 Exhibit 18 to Walsh Decl, # 19 Exhibit 19 to Walsh Decl, # 20 Exhibit 20 to Walsh Decl, # 21 Exhibit 21 to Walsh Decl, # 22 Exhibit 22 to Walsh Decl, # 23 Exhibit 23 to Walsh Decl, # 24 Exhibit 24 to Walsh Decl, # 25 Exhibit 25 to Walsh Decl, # 26 Exhibit 26 to Walsh Decl, # 27 Exhibit 27 to Walsh Decl, # 28 Exhibit 28 to Walsh Decl, # 29 Exhibit 29 to Walsh Decl, # 30 Exhibit 30 to Walsh Decl, # 31 Exhibit 31 to Walsh Decl, # 32 Exhibit 2 to Walsh Decl, # 33 Exhibit 14 to Walsh Decl)(Cordell, Ruffin)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Motion for Protection by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 218 MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Maloney, Collin)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Decl of Thomas B. Walsh, IV, # 2 Exhibit A to Walsh Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Walsh Decl, # 4 Exhibit C to Walsh Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Walsh Decl, # 6 Exhibit E to Walsh Decl, # 7 Exhibit F to Walsh Decl, # 8 Exhibit G to Walsh Decl)(Cordell, Ruffin)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. #194) RESET for 4/15/2010, 04:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER to govern the Production/Inspection of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/10. (ehs, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 245 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 4/2/10 for parties to notify the Court of any disputes regarding the discovery of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/10. (ehs, )
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 194 SEALED MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing RESET for 4/8/2010 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 194 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2010 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Agreed Supplemental Protective Order to Govern the Production/Inspection of Source Code by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline by AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 RESPONSE to Motion re 236 MOTION for Hearing re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Trans MOTION for Hearing re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Trans filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google Inc. of Joinder in Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Hearing on Motion to Transfer and In the Alternative For Continuance of Claim Construction Deadlines (Walsh, Thomas)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 241 NOTICE by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. Of Joinder in Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Hearing on Motion to Transfer and In the Alternative For Continuance of Claim Construction Deadlines (Maloney, Collin)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 237 Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines. See deadlines herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/12/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 3/18/2010 (ch, ).
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 238 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dft's Sur-Reply in Opposition tp Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Dft's Invalidity Contentions. Deadline is 3/26/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/12/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Sur-reply in Opposition to 218 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION for Hearing re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 235 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 234 RESPONSE in Support re 218 MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 232 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 3/11/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting 229 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to defendants' motion for leave to amend and supplement Invalidity Contentions and Reply supporting Pltf's motion to strike invalidity contentions. Responses due by 3/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting 226 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 226 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff may file a 15-page Reply Brief supporting its Motion to Compel. Defendant, Google, shall have until March 24, 2010 to file a Sur-Reply to Plaintiff s Motion to Compel of up to 15 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/24/10. (ehs, )
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 228 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 227 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re 218 MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 2 Exhibit H to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 3 Exhibit I to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 4 Exhibit J to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 5 Exhibit K to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 6 Exhibit L to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 7 Exhibit M to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 227 REPLY to Response to Motion re 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 2 Exhibit H to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 3 Exhibit I to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 4 Exhibit J to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 5 Exhibit K to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 6 Exhibit L to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 7 Exhibit M to Second Dec of Mark D. Baker)(Maloney, Collin)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri Part 1, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri Part 2, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri Part 3, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri Part 4, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Raj Duvvuri Part 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 223 Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/8/2010. (ch, )
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Joint MOTION To Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines by Software Rights Archive, LLC, IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER to govern the production/inspection of Google Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/2/10. (ehs, )
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to Govern the Production/Inspection of Google Source Code by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2010: # 3 REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER) (ch, ).
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/29/10. (ehs, )
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated (1) Reply Supporting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions and (2) Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. No. 213) and to Seek Leave for 10-Page Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION to Strike 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Software Rights Archive, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of L Kaplan, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 214 Motion to Extend Page Limits for Consolidated Briefing Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Contentions. Plaintiff shall have a page limit of twenty- five pages for its consolidated Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions / Plaintiff s Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions. 2. Defendants shall have a page limit of thirty pages for their consolidated Reply Supporting Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions / Response to Plaintiff s Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions. 3. Plaintiff shall have a page limit of fifteen pages for its consolidated Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions / Reply Supporting Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 212 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 2/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 211 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion To Compel. Responses due by 2/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/21/10. (ehs, )
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION Extend page limits re 213 Response to Motion, by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 RESPONSE to Motion re 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Affidavit, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Ex 1 to Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Ex 2 to Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Ex 3 to Declaration, # 5 Affidavit Ex 4 to Declaration, # 6 Affidavit Ex 5 to Declaration, # 7 Affidavit Ex 6 to Declaration, # 8 Affidavit Ex 7 to Declaration, # 9 Affidavit Ex 8 to Declaration, # 10 Affidavit Ex 9 to Declaration, # 11 Affidavit Ex 10 to Declaration, # 12 Affidavit Ex 11 to Declaration, # 13 Affidavit Ex 12 to Declaration, # 14 Affidavit Ex 13 to Declaration, # 15 Affidavit Ex 14 to Declaration, # 16 Affidavit Ex 15 to Declaration, # 17 Affidavit Ex 16 to Declaration, # 18 Affidavit Ex 17 to Declaration, # 19 Affidavit Ex 18 to Declaration, # 20 Affidavit Ex 19 to Declaration, # 21 Affidavit Ex 20 to Declaration, # 22 Affidavit Ex 21 to Declaration, # 23 Affidavit Ex 22 to Declaration, # 24 Affidavit Ex 23 to Declaration, # 25 Affidavit Ex 24 to Declaration, # 26 Affidavit Ex 25 to Declaration, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 207 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Responses due by 1/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/10. (ehs, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 206 Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/810. (ehs, )
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint MOTION to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadline by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 202 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Responses due by 1/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Amend Scheduling Deadlines.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Responses due by 1/20/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 194 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Compel by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 SEALED RESPONSE by Google Inc. to 191 Sealed Document SRA's Second Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer filed by Google Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 182 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Opposed MOTION Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 2 Exhibit A to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 3 Exhibit B to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 4 Exhibit C to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 5 Exhibit D to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 6 Exhibit E to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 7 Exhibit F to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 8 Exhibit G to Dec of Mark D. Baker, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants Leave to Amend and Supplement Invalidity Contentions)(Maloney, Collin)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Change of Address by Collin Michael Maloney (Maloney, Collin)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 193 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that SRA's page limit for its Motion to Compel, and Google's page limit for its response thereto, are both extended to 25 pages, excluding attachments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/11/09. (ch, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 190 Sealed Motion for leave to file second Supplemental Brief Opposing Dft's motion to transfer and granting leave to Google to file a Second Supplemental Brief in Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/10/09. (ch, )
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ***REPLACES # 192 ***SEALED MOTION to Compel by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit Part 1 of 3, # 4 Affidavit Part 2 of 3, # 5 Affidavit Part 3 of 3)(Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 12/10/2009 (ch, ). Modified on 12/11/2009 (ch, ).
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Compel by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 192 submitted by Software Rights Archive, LLC. OVER THE PAGE LIMITS AND NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. OVER THE PAGE LIMIT AND NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit Part 1 of 3, # 4 Affidavit Part 2 of 3, # 5 Affidavit Part 3 of 3)(Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 12/10/2009 (ch, ).
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Sealed Document - Second Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants Motion to Transfer, filed by Software Rights Archive. LLC. (Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 12/9/2009 (ch, ).
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc. regarding Privileged Information Pursuant to Section 5 of the Court's Discovery Order (Jones, Michael)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE by Google Inc., AOL, LLC. of Service of Privilege Logs Under Section 5 of the Court's Discovery Order (Walsh, Thomas)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE of Disclosure by IAC Search & Media, Inc. Service of Privilege Log (Maloney, Collin)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT Document # 186, Unopposed Sealed Motion for leave. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Supplemental Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) Modified on 12/7/2009 (ch, ).
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Service of Privilege Logs Under Section 5 of the Court's Discovery Order (Kaplan, Lee)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 183 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privildge Logs until December 7, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/7/09. (poa, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 176 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/3/09. (ehs, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc., AOL, LLC. Pursuant to Paragraph 3(c) of the Discovery Order (Walsh, Thomas)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Pursuant to Paragraph 3(c) of the Discovery Order (Jones, Michael)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE of Disclosure by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. Under Section 3(c) of the Court's Discovery Order (Maloney, Collin)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Disclosure by Software Rights Archive, LLC Under Section 3(c) of the Court's Discovery Order (Bunt, Robert)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re [173, EX A] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Cordell, Ruffin)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Joint Motion for Plaintiff and Defendants IAC Search and Media and Lycos, Inc. to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting 173 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Opposing Defendants' Motion to Transfer Based on Recently-Revealed Discovery Abuses by Google. Defendants are also granted leave to file arebuttal brief in response within fifteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/13/09. (ehs, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 173 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave filed by Google Inc.. (Walsh, Thomas)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for Document Production under paragraph 3(b) of September 12, 2008Discovery Order (Dkt. No. 82), as extended in Dkt. No. 166. As reflected in Dkt. No. 127, Source Code will not be included by Defendants in this production deadline extended to 11/30/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Software Rights Archive, LLC, IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of AOL, LLC., Google Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 169, Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile under Notice of Attorney Appearance)(ch, )
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google Inc. of Appearance And Substitution of Lead Counsel (Cordell, Ruffin) Modified on 10/23/2009 (ch, ).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jack Wesley Hill terminated as counsel for IAC Search & Media, Inc., and Lycos, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/8/09. (ch, )
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion to Further Extend Certain Scheduling. Deadline for Document Production under paragraph 3(b) of September 12, 2008 Discovery Order (Dkt. No. 82), as extended in Dkt. No. 163. As reflected in Dkt. No. 127, Source Code will not be included by Defendants in this production.October 30, 2009. Deadline for serving a complete computation of any category of damages claimed by any party to this action, making available for inspection and copying as under Rule 34, the documents or other evidentiary material on which such computation is based, including materials bearing on the nature and extent of injuries suffered, under paragraph 3(c) of September 12, 2008 Discovery Order (Dkt. No. 82)November 30, 2009.Deadline for Privilege Logs to be exchanged by parties (or a letter to the Court stating that there are no disputes as to privilege December 4, 2009.Plaintiff will determine which of Defendants modules (or portions of Defendants systems), if any, contain Source Code that it contends in good faith should be produced. plaintiff will identify these modules (or portions of Defendantssystems) in writing to Defendants on or before January 8, 2010. Plaintiffsidentification of modules (or portions of Defendants systems) shall not constitute an admission as to which modules (or portions of Defendants systems) are relevant to the case, but rather shall merely identify themodules (or portions of Defendants systems) as to which, as of that date, Plaintiff believes in good faith it needs access to Source Code. Defendants reserve the right to object to any such identification from Plaintiff.At that time, the parties will attempt in good faith to agree on reasonable limits as to the manner, location, and quantity with regard to printing of any of the production. Nothing herein shall preclude Plaintiff from seeking further discovery relating to Defendants Source Code or shall obligate Defendants to acquiesce to such discovery. Nothing in this Order shall obligate the parties to produce or relieve the parties from producing any Source Code or constitute an admission that any particularsource code or object code is, or is not, discoverable.anuary 8, 2010. On or before January 22, 2010, the parties will file a joint motion to further supplement the Protective Order to address issues and protocols regarding discovery of Source Code, or otherwise notify the Court of any disputes regarding the discovery of Source Code January 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Joint MOTION to Further Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc. of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Walsh, Thomas)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/20/09. (ch, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines) by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/09. (ch, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated as counsel for Software Rights Archive LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/28/09. (ehs, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 99 Motion for entry of Protective Order. The parties are ordered to submit a protective order that complies with the above rulings within 7 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/28/09. (ch, )
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are extended as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/09. (ch, )
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines) by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - denying 147 motion for certification of order for interlocutory appeal or in the alternative for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/09. (ehs, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Certain Scheduling. Document production 7/31/09. Complete computation of any category of damages 8/28/09. Privilege logs 9/4/09. Pltf and Defts to determinemodules contain Source Code 10/5/09. Parties to file a joint motion to further supplement the Protective Order 10/23/09 Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/23/09. (ehs, )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines) by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re 147 SEALED MOTION for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying)(Kaplan, Lee)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until June 15, 2009 to respond to Google Inc., AOL LLC, and Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal, or in the alternative, for Reconsideration and Movants have until July 2, 2009 to file their reply, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/5/09. (ch, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lee Kaplan)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 SEALED MOTION for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal, or in the Alternative, for Reconsideration by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27)(Hill, Jack)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 143 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Kaplan, Lee)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lee Kaplan, # 2 Exhibit 1-5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit 16, # 14 Exhibit 17, # 15 Exhibit 18, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC Amended Disclosures (Kaplan, Lee)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Document Production due 6/30/09. Serve complete computation of damages claimed due 7/28/09. Privilege Logs due 8/4/09. Pltf will determine shich deft's modules if any contain Source Code 9/1/09. Parties to file joint motion to supplemental the Protective Order 9/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/29/09. (ehs, )
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Extend Certain Scheduling Deadlines) by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Denying deft's motion to dismiss # 66 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/31/09. (ehs, )
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) Responses due by 5/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/27/09. (ch, )
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALEDOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kaplan, Lee)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE in Opposition re 133 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALEDOpposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Tabtiang, Ramon)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent AOL Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent TW AOL Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc. for AOL, LLC.. (Walsh, Thomas)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to deft's motion to transfer. Responses due by 3/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/3/09. (ehs, )
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23)(Jones, Michael)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order ***Document # 76 modified to attached proposed order*** (ehs, )
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re 124 SEALED MOTION SUGGESTION TO REFER BANKRUPTCY ISSUES TO BANKRUPTCY COURT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc. of PR 3-3 Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AGREED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/26/09. (ch, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Joint MOTION to Enter Proposed Agreed Supplemental Protective Order by Yahoo! Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 SEALED MOTION SUGGESTION TO REFER BANKRUPTCY ISSUES TO BANKRUPTCY COURT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-RESPONSE BRIEF filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bufe, John)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SEALED MOTION SUGGESTION TO REFER BANKRUPTCY ISSUES TO BANKRUPTCY COURT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SUR-RESPONSE BRIEF by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bufe, John)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC re 120 Notice (Other) of Filing of the Transcript from the Site Technologies, Inc. Chapter 11 Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12/17/2008 Transcript)(Kaplan, Lee)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Source Code, deadline extended toJanuary 23, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/15/09. (ehs, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Protective Order re Source Code Until and Including January 23, 2009 by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC re 113 Notice (Other) on the Site Technologies, Inc. Chapter 11 Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC re 113 Notice (Other) (Kaplan, Lee)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Errata Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 28 Errata Exhibit 27)(Duvvuri, Narasa)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File supplemental protective order. Deadline extended to 1/14/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/12/08. (ehs, )
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Pltf's deadline to file sur-reply due 12/17/08; Pltf deadline to serve objections and responses to deft's first set of interrogatories due 1/5/09; Deft's deadline to comply with PR 3-3 invalidity contentions due 1/23/09; Deft's deadline for document production under PR 3-49a) due 2/13/09 and Deft's deadline for document production under 3(b) of 9/12/08 discovery order extended to 5/15/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/12/08. (ehs, )
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Protective Order re Source Code Until and Including January 14, 2009 by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Various Scheduling Deadlines by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE by Yahoo! Inc., AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. Notice of Re-Opening of Chapter 11 Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kash, Jennifer)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Costello for Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4284. (ch, )
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 110 Joint Motion to Further Extend Deadline to Submit Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Source Cod Until and Including Dec 10 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/26/08. (ch, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Source Code Until and Including December 10, 2008 by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Walsh, Thomas)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Walsh, Thomas)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Kaplan, Lee)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Carroll, Otis)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for (1) An Extension of Time to File Sur-reply Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and (2) an Increased Page Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 14, 2008. (jml, )
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing and to Increase Page Limit by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order NOTICE re 102 Response in Support of Motion, Document has been sealed by clerk. (mpv, )
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SEALED RESPONSE in Support re 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, part 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, part 1, # 11 Exhibit 9, part 2, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17)(Walsh, Thomas) Modified on 11/12/2008 (mpv, ).
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting deft's 100 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, filed on November 6, 2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/7/08. (ehs, )
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Joint MOTION for Protective Order To Notify The Court of (1) Agreements Regarding Protective Order and (2) One Remaining Dispute re Protective Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE by Aldo Noto Objecting to Defendant's Subpoena to Produce Documents (Rommel, Alexander)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (Kaplan, Lee)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed protective order. Deadline extended to 11/4/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/24/08. (ehs, )
October 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply brief in support of deft's motion to dismiss. Responses due by 11/10/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/08. (ehs, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Deadline extended to 10/24/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/08. (ehs, )
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to submit protective order. Deadline extended to 10/10/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/08. (ehs, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr; Collin Michael Maloney; Antonio Sistos; Claude M Stern; Mark D Baker and Elaine Herrmann Blais terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/17/08. (ehs, )
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED by Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blais, Elaine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2008: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DOCKET CONTROLORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2010. Discovery due by 2/25/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 10/16/2009. Markman Hearing set for 11/10/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Motions due by 4/1/2011. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/13/2011. Jury Selection set for 5/2/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/08. (ehs, )
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Software Rights Archive LLC has until and through October 31,2008, to serve its P.R. 3-1 asserted claims and preliminary infringement contentions and P.R. 3-2 production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/08. (ehs, )
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/08. (ehs, )
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ramon K Tabtiang for Google Inc. and AOL, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4073. (ch, )
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen A Marshall for Google Inc. and AOL, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-4072. (ch, )
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Discovery to Adopt Proposed Docket Control Order and Proposed Discovery Order by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply brief in support of deft's motion to dismiss. Responses due by 10/20/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/08. (ehs, )
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Kaplan, Lee)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Thomas)
August 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Lee Kaplan 1-12, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Lee Kaplan 13-16, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Lee Kaplan 17-24, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Lee Kaplan 25-36)(Kaplan, Lee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2009: # 5 Text of Proposed Order) (ehs, ).
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control and discovery orders. Deadline extended to 9/11/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/12/08. (ehs, )
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time For Submitting Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order)(Wolff, Jason)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/08. (ehs, )
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 7/29/2008. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order and to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
July 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 7/29/08. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order and to submit the proposed orders. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
July 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Abernathy, Nancy)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason W Wolff on behalf of Google Inc. (Wolff, Jason)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Baker for IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-14524. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2008: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing Responses due by 8/25/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/21/08. (ch, )
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Yahoo! Inc., Software Rights Archive, LLC, AOL, LLC., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Walsh, Thomas)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Status Conference set for 7/29/2008 10:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and the Honorable Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/26/08. (ch, )
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Leo Burns, II for AOL, LLC. (FEE PAID) 2-1-3871 (ehs, )
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Bufe, John)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juanita R Brooks on behalf of Google Inc. (Brooks, Juanita)
May 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Juanita R Brooks for Google Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3761. (ch, )
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by Software Rights Archive, LLC (Notice of Change of Firm Name and Electronic Addresses) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Google Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Claude M Stern for IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc.(APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-13084. (ch, )
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antonio Sistos for IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-13084. (ch, )
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Lycos, Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-13084. (ch, )
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Software Rights Archive, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Software Rights Archive, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Software Rights Archive, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Software Rights Archive, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Software Rights Archive, LLC.(Kaplan, Lee)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of IAC Search & Media, Inc., Lycos, Inc. (Maloney, Collin)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lycos, Inc. identifying Daum Communications Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis) Modified on 1/31/2008 (mpv, ).
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Rights Archive, LLC by Lycos, Inc..(Carroll, Otis)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc. identifying IAC/InterActive Corp as Corporate Parent. (Carroll, Otis) Modified on 2/1/2008 (mpv, ).
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Rights Archive, LLC by IAC Search & Media, Inc..(Carroll, Otis)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Walsh, Thomas)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 GOOGLE INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Rights Archive, LLC by Google Inc..(Walsh, Thomas)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC. identifying Time Warner Incorporated and Google Incorporated as Corporate Parents (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 1/31/2008 (mpv, ).
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Defendant AOL LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Rights Archive, LLC by AOL, LLC..(Gillam, Harry)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Jones, Michael)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ,Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Software Rights Archive, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(Jones, Michael)
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S J Hung for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12596. (ch, )
January 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Jacobs for Yahoo! Inc. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 6-1-12596. (ch, )
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - granting 35 Motion to Extend time to answer. AOL. Inc. deadline is extended to 1/31/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/24/08. (ch, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL, LLC. AOL LLC has until 1/31/08 to answer.( mpv, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Lycos, Inc.. (ch, )
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - granting 34 Agreed Motion for extension of time. Lyco's deadline is extended to 1/31/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/23/08. (ch, )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AOL, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 1/31/2008; IAC Search & Media, Inc. to 1/31/2008; AOL, LLC. to 1/31/2008; Lycos, Inc. to 1/31/2008.( mpv, )
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc.. Answer Requested and Agreed for January 31, 2008.( Jones, Michael)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (UNOPPOSED MOTION) by Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blais, Elaine)
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 1/31/2008. (ehs, )
January 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Google reset for 1/31/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 1/14/08. (ehs, )
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ,Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for IAC Search & Media, Inc. to 1/22/2008. (ch, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Lycos, Inc. to 1/22/2008. (ch, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Lyco's deadline is extended to 1/22/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/07. (ch, )
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google Inc deadline is extended to 1/22/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/07. (ch, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IAC Search & Media, Inc. deadline is extended to 1/22/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/19/07. (ch, )
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 1/22/2008. (ch, )
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Software Rights Archive, LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Lycos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blais, Elaine) Corrected Proposed Order added on 12/18/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/18/2007 (mpv, ).
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elaine Herrmann Blais on behalf of Lycos, Inc. (Blais, Elaine)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for AOL, LLC. to 1/22/2008. (ch, )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL deadline is extended to 1/22/08. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/17/07. (ch, )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Software Rights Archive, LLC, IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Lee) Corrected Proposed Order added on 12/18/2007 (mpv, ). Modified on 12/18/2007 (mpv, ).
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by AOL, LLC by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Yahoo! Inc. to 1/22/2008. (ehs, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 1/22/08 for deft YAHOO!INC.. Signed by Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/07. (ehs, )
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint [Unopposed] by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. Google Inc. served on 11/29/2007, answer due 12/19/2007. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. Yahoo! Inc. served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. AOL, LLC. served on 11/29/2007, answer due 12/19/2007. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. Lycos, Inc. served on 11/28/2007, answer due 12/18/2007. (ch, )
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. IAC Search & Media, Inc. served on 11/29/2007, answer due 12/19/2007. (ch, )
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Victor Hardy for Software Rights Archive, LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3290 (ch, )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay D Ellwanger on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Ellwanger, Jay)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G Price on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Price, Adam)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Software Rights Archive, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Software Rights Archive, LLC (ch, )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/26/07. (ch, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., AOL, LLC., Lycos, Inc.. (ch, )
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Kaplan, Lee)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kaplan, Lee)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1341017.), filed by Software Rights Archive, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Software Rights Archive, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Represented By: Adam G Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Collin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL, LLC.
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycos, Inc.
Represented By: Collin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edwin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: AOL, LLC.
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Bernard Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: IAC Search & Media, Inc.
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lycos, Inc.
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Software Rights Archive, LLC
Represented By: Adam G Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?