Zapmedia Services, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff ZapMedia Services Inc. alleges that Defendant Apple, Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,020,704 entitled "System and method for distributing media assets to user devices via a portal synchronized by said user devices " and 7,343,414 entitled "GUI driving media playback device."

Plaintiff: Zapmedia Services, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00104
Filed: March 12, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the 414 and 704 patents. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/19/10. (ehs, )
May 20, 2008 Filing 16
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zapmedia Services, Inc. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Maurer, Eric)
May 8, 2008 Filing 14
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM Defendant Apple Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Zapmedia Services, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Brucculeri, Louis)
April 29, 2008 Filing 12
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
March 26, 2008 Filing 9
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Taylor, Keana)
March 13, 2008 Filing 6
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Patton Culbertson on behalf of Zapmedia Services, Inc. (Culbertson, Geoffrey)
March 12, 2008 Filing 4
Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Zapmedia Services, Inc. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapmedia Services, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zapmedia Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia L Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?