Allergan, Inc. v. Sandoz Inc
Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc.
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00097
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/2/2013. (ch, )
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the Court GRANTS Defendant's motion for summary judgment that none of the Defendants are seeking FDA approval for the uses claimed in claims 1-3 of the '149 patent and that the uses claimed in claims 1-3 of the '149 patent are not FDA approved.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/5/11. (ehs, )
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - In conclusion, the Court STRIKES the expert report of Dr. Kay and precludes Dr. Kay from testifying at trial. The Court also STRIKES any portion of Defendants other expert reports that rely on Dr. Kays opinions or exper t report, and precludes Defendants experts from offering testimony that relies on Dr. Kays opinions or expert report. The Court has considered lesser sanctions, including monetary sanction, but finds that such sanctions would be ineffective to cure the prejudice resulting from Defendants conduct and deter such conduct in the future. The Court further DENIES Defendants Emergency Motion to Qualify Dr. Richard Kay.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/28/11. (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER - The Court is of the opinion that striking Allergans jury demand at this time is premature. Sandozs motion is therefore DENIEd. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/2010. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan, Inc. v. Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?