PalTalk Holdings, Inc. v. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PalTalk Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., Sony Online Entertainment LLC, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Activision Blizzard, Inc., Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., NCSoft Corporation, Jagex Limited and Turbine, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00274
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding claim construction. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of thepatents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4-5-2011. (delat, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 171 Report and Recommendations, denying 54 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sony Online Entertainment LLC, Sony Corporation, Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc., NCSoft Corporation, Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., Activision Blizzard, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Turbine, Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/27/10. (mrm, )
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying motion to transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/10. (ehs, )
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER; adopting 150 Report and Recommendations,, denying 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America. Accordingly, the plaintiff shall file its amended complaint within ten days. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PalTalk Holdings, Inc. v. Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PalTalk Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Online Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCSoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagex Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?