Broadcom Corporation et al v. WI-Lan, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Broadcom Corporation and Atheros Communications, Inc.
Defendant: WI-Lan, Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2009cv00322
Filed: October 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Case Management Conference re (211 in 5:08-cv-04555-JW) Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/22/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/16/2009.]
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING DATE FORDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (31 in 5:08-cv-04555-JW) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/16/2009.]
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RELATED CASE ORDER. Related cases: Create association to 3:08-cv-05624-SI, 3:08-cv-05742-MHP. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/20/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/16/2009.]
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO RELATE CASES. C-08-5543 EMC, C-08-4555 JW AND C-08-05544 JW ARE RELATED. Related cases: Create association to 5:08-cv-04555-JW, 5:08-cv-05544-JW. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/16/2009.]
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 Stipulation filed by WI-Lan, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/16/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcom Corporation et al v. WI-Lan, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcom Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atheros Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WI-Lan, Inc.,
Represented By: Gayle Rosenstein Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?