Franklin Inventions, LLC v. Election Systems & Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Franklin Inventions LLC
Defendant: Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc, Hart InterCivic Inc and Sequoia Voting Systems Inc
Petitioner: UHY Advisors FLVS Inc
Not Classified By Court: Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
Case Number: 2:2009cv00377
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Motion to Dismiss. All claims brought by Franklin against ES&S and Premier, and all claims brought by ES&S and Premier against Franklin, are hereby dismissed with prejudice Each party to this Order shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 4/24/2012. (ch, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion of Dismissal with Prejudice by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER assessing cost of Technical Advisor. The Court has received Mr. Egans invoice for services through February 29, 2012 in the amount of $15,845.74 and hereby ORDERS payment to be promptly made to Mr. Egan at 1101 Capital of Texas Highway South, Building C, Suite 200, Austin, TX 78746 as follows: Plaintiff: $7,922.87 Defendants: $7,922.87. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 4/9/12. (ehs, )
March 29, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 2/27/12 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (124 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2012. (tja, )
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Expert Witness List due by 4/20/2012., Rebuttal Expert Witness List due 5/11/12., Motions in Limine due by 7/10/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2012., Jury Selection set for 9/4/2012 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne., Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2012 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 3/13/12. (ehs, )
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - granting in part and denying in part #151 , #152 Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Discovery due by 3/8/2012., Motions due by 4/20/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/24/2012., Jury Selection set for 6/4/2012 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne., Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 3/8/2012. (ch, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PROVISIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 2/29/2012. (ch, )
February 27, 2012 Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne: Markman Hearing held on 2/27/2012. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
February 24, 2012 Filing 156 REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 21, 2012 Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, filed by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stephen W. Abbott Declaration in Support of Franklin's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order (Dkt. No. 151), #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Abbott Decl. (Email String Ending Jan. 12, 2012), #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Abbott Decl. (Email String Ending Feb. 2, 2012), #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Abbott Decl. (Email String Ending Feb. 15, 2012), #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Abbott Decl. (Abbott's Nov. 9, 2011, Letter to Defense Counsel), #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Abbott Decl. (Email String Ending Jan. 5, 2012))(Caldwell, Brent)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #152 Motion for Leave to File a 7-Page Rejoinder in Support of Dft's Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 2/13/2012. (ch, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Support re #117 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Gillette Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Second Gillette Declaration, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Liesner)(Evans, Robert)
February 9, 2012 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A 7-PAGE REJOINDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 6, 2012 Filing 151 MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Marc Vander Tuig, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion to Seal Document. Franklins Sur-Reply and those exhibits thereto designated as Confidential or Confidential: Attorneys Eyes Only pursuant to the terms of the Stipulated Protective Order (Dkt. No. 49), as well as those exhibits identifying personal information of non-parties, shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 2/1/12. (ehs, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 149 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #148 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen W. Abbott, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 Filing 148 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12.0, #9 Exhibit 12.1, #10 Exhibit 12.2, #11 Exhibit 12.3, #12 Exhibit 12.4, #13 Exhibit 12.5, #14 Exhibit 12.6, #15 Exhibit 13.0, #16 Exhibit 13.1, #17 Exhibit 13.2, #18 Exhibit 13.3, #19 Exhibit 14)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 31, 2012 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motion of Franklin Inventions LLC to File Sur-Reply in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Exhibits Under Seal by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO CORRECT FILING Document # 140 - 146, Sealed Sur-Reply and Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
January 31, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 139 submitted by Franklin Inventions LLC. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 146 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED Additional Attachments to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ). Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 145 ***FILRD IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13.1, #2 Exhibit 13.2, #3 Exhibit 13.3)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 144 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, #143 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12.5, #2 Exhibit 12.6)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 143 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12.1, #2 Exhibit 12.2, #3 Exhibit 12.3, #4 Exhibit 12.4)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 142 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 141 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #140 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. (Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 140 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motion of Franklin Inventions LLC to File Sur-Reply in support of Opposition tlo Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Exhibits Under Seal filed by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Filing 139 ***DEFICENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.PLEASE INGORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Unopposed Motion of Franklin Inventions LLC to File Sur-Reply in support of Opposition tlo Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Exhibits Under Seal by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ch, ).
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Memorandum in Support. Pages Plaintiffs Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Memorandum in Support. Additional five (5) pages, which shall not exceed ten (10) pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/30/12. (ehs, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #135 Motion for Extension of Time to Send Technology Tutorial to Rich Egan. Premier Election Solutions, Inc. and Election Systems & Software, Inc. shall have until February 3, 2012 to send documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/30/12. (ehs, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Franklin Inventions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 25, 2012 Filing 135 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File [Send] Technology Tutorial to Rich Egan by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Gillette, Sara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2012: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 20, 2012 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Gillette Declaration))(Evans, Robert)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - the court appoints Rich Egan as the Courts Technical Advisor in this case. The parties are ORDERED to send copies of their claim construction briefs and any technology tutorials to Mr. Egan at OKeefe Egan and Peterman, 1101 South Capital of Texas Highway, Austin, TX 78746 within 7 days. Further, the claim construction hearing in this case remains set for 9:00 a.m. on February 27, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/20/2012. (ch, )
January 20, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 6/4/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2012 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. (jml, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Amend docket control order. The parties shall comply with the Discovery Deadline by March 1, 2012. All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/18/12. (ehs, )
January 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/1/2012. (ehs, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 131 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 13, 2012 Filing 130 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Election Systems & Software Inc, Premier Election Solutions Inc. (Vander Tuig, Marc)
January 13, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. (jml)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Responsive Claim Construction Brief shall be expanded to include an additional five (5) pages, which shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/10/12. (ehs, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Memorandum in Support shall be expanded to include an additional five (5) pages, which shall not exceed twenty (20) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/10/12. (ehs, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Amend docket control deadlines. The parties shall comply with P.R. 4-5 as follows: January 9, 2012, Comply with P.R. 4- (c). All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 1/10/12. (ehs, )
January 9, 2012 Filing 126 REPLY to #113 Claim Construction Brief,,, filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Abbott, Stephen)
January 9, 2012 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David C. Reardon, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen W. Abbott, #3 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 6, #9 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 7, #10 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 8, #11 Exhibit Abbott Decl. Ex. 9)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 9, 2012 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 9, 2012 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #118 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Hart InterCivic, Inc., Franklin Inventions, LLC.. 1. All claims brought by Franklin against Hart InterCivic, and all claims brought by Hart InterCivic against Franklin, are hereby dismissed with prejudice 2. Each party to this Order shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/12. (ehs, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Seal Document. The exhibit shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/12. (ehs, )
January 5, 2012 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER assigning case to Judge Roy S Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/12. (ehs, )
December 29, 2011 Filing 118 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Franklin Inventions, LLC, Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (Abbott, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
December 23, 2011 Filing 117 MOTION to Change Venue by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Robert)
December 23, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
December 19, 2011 Filing 115 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit 39): #113 Claim Construction Brief,,,. (Vander Tuig, Marc) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 19, 2011 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #113 Claim Construction Brief,,, Exhibit 39 by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Vander Tuig, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
December 19, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #111 Motion to seal submitted by Election Systems & Software, Inc.. No certificate of conference was included and docketed as 2 motions to seal. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motions now TERMINATED. (sm, )
December 19, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document #112, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 19, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per Misc Order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (leh, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 113 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 40)(Vander Tuig, Marc) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 16, 2011 Filing 112 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. (Vander Tuig, Marc) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 16, 2011 Filing 111 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Seal Exhibit 39 to dfts Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vander Tuig, Marc) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants Opening Claim Construction Brief shall be expanded to include an additional ten (10) pages, which shall not exceed forty (40) pages.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 109 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Vander Tuig, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Amend docket control order. The parties shall comply with P.R. 4-5(b) by December 16, 2011, and P.R. 4-5(c) by January 6, 2012. All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/28/11. (ehs, )
November 22, 2011 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Evans, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 11, 2011 Filing 106 NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by Franklin Inventions, LLC (Abbott, Stephen)
November 9, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE by Franklin Inventions, LLC Franklin Inventions, LLC's Notice of Subpoenas Under Rule 45(B)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit St. Louis County Subpoena, #2 Exhibit King County Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Godfrey & Kahn Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Brian Gilpin Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Franklin County Subpoena, #6 Exhibit Cuyahoga County Subpoena)(Abbott, Stephen)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs Opening Claim Construction Brief shall be expanded to include an additional five (5) pages, which shall not exceed thirty-five (35) pages.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/25/11. (ehs, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 103 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen W. Abbott in Support of Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Abbott, Stephen)
October 24, 2011 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits to Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. The parties shall comply with P.R. 4-5 as follows: October 24, 2011: Comply with P.R. 4-5(a); December 2, 2011: Comply with P.R. 4-5(b); December 16, 2011: Comply with P.R. 4-5(c). All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/13/11. (ehs, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on September 30, 2011. (delat, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hart InterCivic, Inc. Pursuant to PR 4-2 (Smith, Michael)
September 19, 2011 Filing 96 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Franklin Inventions, LLC, Hart InterCivic, Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Proposed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Constructions for Disputed Claim Terms of the Patents in Suit, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Identification of Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence in Support of Proposed Constructions, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Identification of Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence in Support of Proposed Constructions)(Abbott, Stephen)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. The parties shall comply with P.R. 4-3 by September 19, 2011. All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/11. (ehs, )
September 13, 2011 Filing 94 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The parties shall comply with P.R. 4-3 by September 13, 2011. All other deadlines in the Courts September 15, 2010 Docket Control Order (Doc. 51) shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/8/2011. (ch, )
September 7, 2011 Filing 92 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
August 16, 2011 Filing 91 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. pursuant to P.R. 4-2 (Vander Tuig, Marc)
August 5, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. of P.R. 4-1 Disclosure (Vander Tuig, Marc)
August 5, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Franklin Inventions, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of P.R. 4-1 Disclosure (Abbott, Stephen)
August 4, 2011 Filing 88 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hart InterCivic, Inc. Pursuant to PR 4-1 (Smith, Michael)
August 4, 2011 Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #51 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbott, Stephen)
July 28, 2011 Filing 86 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph J Richetti for Hart InterCivic, Inc.,Joseph J Richetti for Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-640) (ehs, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 85 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. of Potential Dispute Concerning Privileged Documents or Information (Vander Tuig, Marc)
June 3, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE by Hart InterCivic, Inc. Hart InterCivic, Inc.'s Notice of No Present Dispute Concerning Privileged Documents or Information (Gilbert, Chris)
June 3, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE by Franklin Inventions, LLC Plaintiffs Notice of No Present Dispute (Abbott, Stephen)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for leave to serve supplemented invaliditycontentions upon Franklin Inventions, L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/11. (ehs, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (Gillette, Sara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 5, 2011 Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hassan Albakri for Hart InterCivic, Inc.,Hassan Albakri for Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-503) (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2011: #1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer E Hoekel terminated as counsel for Election Systems & Software Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/2011. (ch, )
April 26, 2011 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Election Systems & Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
April 25, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 77 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE OR ORDER. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 77 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer E. Hoekel ONLY by Election Systems & Software, Inc.. (Hoekel, Jennifer) Modified on 4/25/2011 (ch, ).
April 19, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE by Hart InterCivic, Inc. Notice that Outstanding Subpoena and Related Motion to Quash are Moot (Adair, Thomas)
March 28, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher M Faucett on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Faucett, Christopher)
March 28, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Prebeg on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Prebeg, Matthew)
March 25, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. OF SUBPOENAS (Attachments: #1 Fairfield Subpoena, #2 Cougle Subpoena, #3 Yow Subpoena)(Vander Tuig, Marc)
March 23, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Marc Vander Tuig; Fee: $100, receipt number: 5-45 (rml, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 72 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc W Vander Tuig for Election Systems & Software, Inc.,Marc W Vander Tuig for Premier Election Solutions, Inc. (Fee Paid). (rml, )
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Califf Teal Cooper and Edward W Goldstein terminated for Plaintiff, Franklin Inventions, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/11. (ehs, )
March 9, 2011 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff, Franklin Inventions, LLC by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying as moot #30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed Sequoia (Dkt. No. 36). As such, Sequoias motion in DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/4/2011. (ch, )
February 1, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Stephen Wayne Abbott on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Abbott, Stephen)
February 1, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 67, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 67 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Franklin Inventions, LLC Designation of Stephen W. Abbott as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff (Abbott, Stephen) Modified on 2/1/2011 (ch, ).
January 12, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE by Franklin Inventions, LLC Notice of Firm Name Change for Edward W. Goldstein and Califf T. Cooper (Goldstein, Edward)
January 5, 2011 Filing 65 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen Wayne Abbott (Abbott, Stephen)
December 23, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE by Election Systems & Software, Inc., Premier Election Solutions, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
December 15, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Disclosure by Hart InterCivic, Inc. of its P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Contentions and Production (Gilbert, Chris)
December 8, 2010 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Quash (Supplemental Response) filed by Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Michael)
December 8, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 60 and 61, Sur-Reply and Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 7, 2010 Filing 61 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #60 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2010 (ch, ).
December 7, 2010 Filing 60 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Quash filed by Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2010 (ch, ).
November 18, 2010 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and Hart InterCivic's Motion to Compel filed by Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Chris)
November 10, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION to Quash by UHY Advisors FLVS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibiti A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Affidavit, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ziek, Robin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2010: #6 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
November 9, 2010 Filing 57 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Quash by UHY Advisors FLVS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ziek, Robin) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ch, ).
November 9, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 57 submitted by UHY Advisors FLVS, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT, AND NEED REVISED ORDER. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE of Disclosure by Franklin Inventions, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Goldstein, Edward)
November 1, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Disclosure by Franklin Inventions, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward)
November 1, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Disclosure by Election Systems & Software, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Lee, Lance)
October 29, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Disclosure by Franklin Inventions, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward)
September 22, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/29/2012 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 4/22/2011., Discovery due by 2/1/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2010., Claim Construction Hearing set for 1/25/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions in limine due by 4/20/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2012., Jury Selection set for 6/4/2012 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Mediation deadline is 3/2/2012. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/2010. (ch, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/2010. (ch, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/15/2010. (ch, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control, Discovery and Protective Orders by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit B- Discovery Order, #3 Exhibit C- Protective Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
September 14, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 47, Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order Discovery and Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 13, 2010 Filing 47 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control, Discovery and Protective Orders by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit B- Discovery Order, #3 Exhibit C- Protective Order)(Goldstein, Edward) Modified on 9/14/2010 (ch, ).
September 7, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lance Lee (Lee, Lance)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/1/10. (ehs, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 44 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by September 13, 2010. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (bga )
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by 9/13/10. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Susan Simmons.)(delat)
August 27, 2010 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric S Rhodes for Hart InterCivic, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5594. (ch, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Jameson Adair on behalf of Hart InterCivic, Inc. (Adair, Thomas)
August 17, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chris Lee Gilbert on behalf of Hart InterCivic, Inc. (Gilbert, Chris)
July 23, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 22, 2010 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Premier Election Solutions, Inc. (Gillette, Sara)
July 22, 2010 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Election Systems & Software, Inc. (Gillette, Sara)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - This case is set for a status conference in Marshall, Texas, on August 30, 2010, at 10:00 a.m., before the Honorable T. John Ward and the Honorable Chad Everingham. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on September 13, 2010. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreements concerning these orders, the parties shall submit to the court their competing proposals along with a summary of their disagreements. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems September 29, 2010 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, th Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 17, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, )
July 21, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 10:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham. (ehs, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Notice of Voluntary dismissal without prejudice filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC as to deft Swquoia Voting Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/29/10. (ehs, )
April 5, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE by Franklin Inventions, LLC Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. (Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 5, 2010 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Goldstein, Edward)
April 1, 2010 Filing 33 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #29 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Hart Intercivic, Inc. by Franklin Inventions, LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
March 23, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. (D'Arche, Douglas)
March 22, 2010 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hart InterCivic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CAG Acquisitions, Inc. for Hart InterCivic, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
March 19, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter McManemy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(D'Arche, Douglas)
March 18, 2010 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Franklin Inventions, LLC by Hart InterCivic, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
February 17, 2010 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc..( D'Arche, Douglas)
February 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. to 3/19/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hart InterCivic, Inc. to 3/18/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 16, 2010 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hart InterCivic, Inc.(Smith, Michael)
February 12, 2010 Filing 26 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #24 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Premier Election Solutions, Inc. by Franklin Inventions, LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
February 12, 2010 Filing 25 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Election Systems & Software, Inc. by Franklin Inventions, LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
February 3, 2010 Filing 24 Premier Election Solutions, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Franklin Inventions, LLC by Premier Election Solutions, Inc..(Hoekel, Jennifer)
February 3, 2010 Filing 23 Election Systems & Software ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Franklin Inventions, LLC by Election Systems & Software, Inc..(Hoekel, Jennifer)
February 3, 2010 Filing 22 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 120)(Abbott, Stephen)
February 3, 2010 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC (Abbott, Stephen)
January 21, 2010 Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sara Wellert Gillette for Election Systems & Software, Inc. and Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5152) (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer E Hoekel for Election Systems & Software, Inc. and Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5152) (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert M Evans, Jr for Election Systems & Software, Inc. and Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5152) (ehs, )
January 15, 2010 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. Premier Election Solutions, Inc. served on 1/4/2010 by CM RRR, answer due 1/25/2010. (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Premier Election Solutions, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
January 5, 2010 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Premier Election Solutions, Inc..( Lee, Lance)
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Premier Election Solutions, Inc. to 12/3/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 30, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. to 2/18/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc..( Henson, Walter)
December 29, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Thomas Henson on behalf of Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. (Henson, Walter)
December 28, 2009 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Election Systems & Software, Inc. to 2/3/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc. served on 12/14/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/4/2010. (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. Hart InterCivic, Inc. served on 12/14/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/4/2010. (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. Election Systems & Software, Inc. served on 12/14/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 2/3/2010. (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Premier Election Solutions, Inc.. (ehs, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Election Systems & Software, Inc. (Lee, Lance)
December 23, 2009 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Election Systems & Software, Inc..( Lee, Lance)
December 8, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Smith, Melissa)
December 7, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Election Systems & Software, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Hart InterCivic Inc, #2 Premier Election Solutions Inc, #3 Sequoia Voting Systems, Inc.)(ch, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Califf Teal Cooper on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Cooper, Califf)
December 7, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Wayne Abbott on behalf of Franklin Inventions, LLC (Abbott, Stephen)
December 4, 2009 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Franklin Inventions, LLC (ch, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002266453.), filed by Franklin Inventions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- U.S. Patent No. 6,968,999, #3 Exhibit B- U.S. Patent No. 7,243,846, #4 Exhibit C- U.S. Patent No. 7,575,164)(Goldstein, Edward)
December 4, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin Inventions, LLC v. Election Systems & Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Election Systems & Software Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E Hoekel
Represented By: Robert M Evans, Jr
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Sara Weilert Gillette
Represented By: Marc W Vander Tuig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Election Solutions Inc
Represented By: Jennifer E Hoekel
Represented By: Robert M Evans, Jr
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: Sara Weilert Gillette
Represented By: Marc W Vander Tuig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hart InterCivic Inc
Represented By: Eric S Rhodes
Represented By: Thomas Jameson Adair
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Chris Lee Gilbert
Represented By: Hassan Albakri
Represented By: Joseph J Richetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Voting Systems Inc
Represented By: Douglas David D'Arche
Represented By: Walter Thomas Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Inventions LLC
Represented By: Califf Teal Cooper
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Christopher M Faucett
Represented By: Brent Taylor Caldwell
Represented By: Edward W Goldstein
Represented By: Stephen W. Abbott
Represented By: Matthew Prebeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UHY Advisors FLVS Inc
Represented By: Robin Marie Ziek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
Represented By: Richard David Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?