City of Clinton Arkansas v. Pilgrims Pride Corporation
Plaintiff: Bruce Boykin
Defendant: Pilgrims Pride Corporation
Consol Plaintiff: Shelia Adams and James Adams
Case Number: 2:2009cv00397
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/22/2016. (ch, )
September 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE IGNORE. FILED IN WRONG CASE. MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 259 Interthinx's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages for Failure to Mark. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 09/29/2012. (rsp1) Modified on 9/29/2012 (jml).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 358 MEMORANDUM ORDER - the # 324 Motion to Stay is DENIED and # 336 Motion to Show Cause Why Bond Should Not Be Set is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 3/1/12. (ehs, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER: granting 30 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division. The Court concludes that Plaintiffs' claims against Pilgrim's should be transferred to the docket of the Honorable T. John Ward in the Marshall Division of the Eastern District of Texas. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to transfer is GRANTED. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 12/17/2009) (cxb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/23/2009.]
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS: granting 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pilgrims Pride Corporation. Accordingly, Pilgrim's motion to dismiss is GRANTED and the City's complaint is dismissed. This dismissal is without prejudice. Thus, the Court will allow the City to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint. The City's motion for leave must be filed no later than September 30, 2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 9/15/09) (cxb)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/23/2009.]
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' motion for leave must be filed no later than October 7, 2009. In the event that Plaintiffs do not timely file motion for leave, or their motion for leave does not establish that their filing of an amended complaint is appropriate, their complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge Terry R Means on 9/14/09) (cxb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 12/23/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Clinton Arkansas v. Pilgrims Pride Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrims Pride Corporation
Represented By: Alexander Max Douglas Brauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Shelia Adams
Represented By: Christopher James Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James Adams
Represented By: Christopher James Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Boykin
Represented By: Mark C Brodeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?