Keranos, LLC v. Analog Devices, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keranos, LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co LTD, TSMC North America, Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, Microchip Technology, Inc., Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc., Texas Instruments, Inc., Vanguard International Semiconductor Corporation, EM Microelectronic - Marin SA, Epson America, Inc., Samsung Group, International Business Machines Corporation, Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Alcatel Business Systems, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Toshiba America, Inc., ZiLOG, Inc., Infineon Technologies AG, Oki Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Analog Devices, Inc., NXP Semiconductors Netherlands, B.V., Toshiba Corporation, Intel Corporation, NEC Corporation, Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation, Atheros Communications, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Apple, Inc., ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Nanya Technology Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation, Qualcomm, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., VIS Micro, Inc., Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation, Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Micronas USA, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation America, EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc., Austriamicrosystems AG, Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. and Ubicom, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: United Module Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Michael T McLemore
Case Number: 2:2010cv00207
Filed: June 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER granting #736 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated as attorney of record for Keranos LLC. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/19/2016. (sm, )
May 17, 2016 Filing 736 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER granting #734 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton and Shawn A. Latchford terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/14/2016. (sm, )
April 8, 2016 Filing 734 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric M. Albritton and Shawn Latchford and terminate CM/ECF Notices by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 11, 2016 Filing 733 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Latchford, Shawn)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER granting #731 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Glenn Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/19/15. (ch, )
October 16, 2015 Filing 731 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Christopher Smith by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher)
October 16, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 730, Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 730 ***FILED IN ERROR.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher G. Smith by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Christopher) Modified on 10/16/2015 (ch, ).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER granting #728 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Emily Merkler Wood terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/31/2015. (ch, )
August 28, 2015 Filing 728 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Emily M. Wood by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Emily)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER granting #724 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James C Otteson; Michelle G Breit and John W Downing terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/22/15. (ch, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER granting #719 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David A Caine and Thomas T Carmack terminated as to Keranos LLC. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/20/2015. (ch, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting #722 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated for Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/20/2015. (ch, )
April 17, 2015 Filing 724 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw As Counsel by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
April 17, 2015 Filing 723 ***FILED IN ERROR.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw As Counsel by Keranos, LLC, United Module Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) Modified on 4/17/2015 (ch, ).
April 17, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 723, Unopposed Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 13, 2015 Filing 722 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record for Apple Inc. by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/6/2015. (ch, )
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 720 GENERAL ORDER 14-20 ASSIGNING CIVIL AND CRIMINAL ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/19/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 4/6/2015 (ch, ).
April 3, 2015 Filing 719 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
February 6, 2014 Filing 718 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Markman Proceedings held on December 12, 2012 before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-590-1096. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. (114 pages) Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (rem, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER CLARIFYING SEVERANCE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/7/13. (mrm, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER granting #714 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Coleman terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/7/13. (mrm, )
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER granting #713 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Coleman terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/7/13. (mrm, )
March 28, 2013 Filing 714 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney International Business Machines Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Debra Coleman as Counsel of Record by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 28, 2013 Filing 713 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER granting #711 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Xiang Long terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/29/2013. (sm, )
January 28, 2013 Filing 711 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
January 11, 2013 Filing 710 NOTICE by Microchip Technology, Inc. re #708 Order Notice of Agreed Mediator (Mills, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND SEVERING CLAIMS; denying #597 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/10/13. (mrm, )
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 708 PROVISIONAL OPINION AND ORDER; ORDERED, in good faith, to jointly mediate these cases with the mediator as agreed upon by the parties. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/8/13. (mrm, )
December 12, 2012 Filing 707 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Markman Hearing held on 12/12/2012. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: #1 List of Attorneys Present) (lgp, )
December 12, 2012 Filing 706 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra R. Coleman on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Coleman, Debra)
December 12, 2012 Filing 705 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation (Phillips, Lawrence)
December 10, 2012 Filing 704 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC NOTICE REGARDING ORDER OF TERMS FOR ARGUMENT (Downing, John)
December 4, 2012 Filing 703 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Dammann, Amina)
December 4, 2012 Filing 702 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Mills, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2012 Filing 701 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Banner, Brian)
December 4, 2012 Filing 700 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Slayden, Bruce)
December 3, 2012 Filing 699 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re #667 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, NOTICE OF A RECENT FACTUAL DEVLOPMENT RELEVANT TO PLAINTIFF KERANOS, LLCS PENDING MOTION TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT APPLE INC. (Lane, John)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER granting #690 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/3/2012. (sm, )
November 30, 2012 Filing 697 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC of Compliance (Technology Tutorial) (Downing, John)
November 30, 2012 Filing 696 NOTICE by Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Ubicom, Inc. of Compliance - Technology Tutorial (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER granting #692 Motion to Dismiss '719 Patent Claims. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/27/12. (bas)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER granting #688 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline is NOVEMBER 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/27/12. (bas)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR, Michael T McLemore added. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/26/12. (mrm, )
November 26, 2012 Filing 692 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss '719 Patent Claims (re Apple Inc.) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
November 20, 2012 Filing 691 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Downing, John)
November 16, 2012 Filing 690 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
November 16, 2012 Filing 689 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Downing in Support of Keranos, LLC's Reply Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 18 to the JWD Decl., #3 Exhibit 19 to the JWD Decl., #4 Exhibit 20 to the JWD Decl., #5 Exhibit 21 to the JWD Decl., #6 Exhibit 22 to the JWD Decl., #7 Exhibit 23 to the JWD Decl., #8 Exhibit 24 to the JWD Decl.)(Breit, Michelle)
November 16, 2012 Filing 688 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File and Submit Joint Claim Construction Chart by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER re: appointment of a technical advisor. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/16/12. (mrm, )
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 686 AMENDED JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER:(Markman Hearing set for 12/12/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.), granting #672 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #445 (Docket Control Order) filed by Microchip Technology, Inc., #679 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #445 (Docket Control Order). Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/16/12. (mrm, )
November 6, 2012 Filing 685 RESPONSE to #680 Claim Construction Brief, #684 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-26)(Banner, Brian)
October 26, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY (ATTY HAS REFILED SEE#684). Documents # 680 & #681, Claim Construction Opening Brief and Additional attachments to Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 24, 2012 Filing 684 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Breit, Michelle)
October 24, 2012 Filing 683 NOTICE by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. Request For Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 682 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 681 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #680 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John W. Downing, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Breit, Michelle) Modified on 10/26/2012 (sm, ).
October 22, 2012 Filing 680 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***KERANOS, LLCS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Keranos, LLC. (Breit, Michelle) Modified on 10/26/2012 (sm, ).
October 12, 2012 Filing 679 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #445 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions, #672 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #445 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions (Docket Control Order) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER, granting #675 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Alcatel Defendants Without Prejudice filed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel USA GP, Inc. and Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/11/12. (mrm, )
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER granting #671 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Sur-Replies due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/11/12. (mrm, )
October 5, 2012 Filing 676 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Dammann, Amina)
October 2, 2012 Filing 675 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Alcatel Defendants Without Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
October 1, 2012 Filing 674 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Intel Corporation. (Banner, Brian)
October 1, 2012 Filing 673 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Banner)(Banner, Brian)
September 28, 2012 Filing 672 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct #445 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions (Docket Control Order) by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mills, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2012 Filing 671 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses, #660 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Analog Devices, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER granting #543 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/28/12. (mrm, )
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER, granting #504 Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1). United Module Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/28/12. (mrm, )
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER denying as moot #621 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot #622 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/24/12. (mrm, )
September 24, 2012 Filing 667 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Eash Decl., #2 Exhibit A (ROG Responses))(Lane, John)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER granting #655 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Keranos' Replies to Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/19/12. (mrm, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER granting #658 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Keranos' Replies to Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/19/12. (mrm, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER granting #661 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/19/12. (mrm, )
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER granting #654 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #609 SEALED Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Replies due by 9/17/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/19/12. (mrm, )
September 18, 2012 Filing 662 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Coleman, Debra)
September 17, 2012 Filing 661 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #660 Keranos, LLCs Reply to Defendants Analog Devices, Inc., Seiko Epson Corp., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology Inc., National Semiconductor Corp., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., Texas Instruments, Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd., and TSMC North Americas Response in Opposition to Keranos LLCs Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
September 17, 2012 Filing 660 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Downing of Epson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Downing, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 11 to John W. Downing)(Downing, John)
September 17, 2012 Filing 659 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John W. Downing, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John W. Downing)(Downing, John)
September 17, 2012 Filing 658 Unopposed MOTION to Seal REPLIES TO MOTION TO AMEND by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
September 12, 2012 Filing 657 SEALED REPLY to Apple's Response (635) to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibits 1 through 14)(Downing, John)
September 12, 2012 Filing 656 SEALED REPLY to IBM's Response (641) to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibits 1 through 4)(Downing, John)
September 12, 2012 Filing 655 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
September 12, 2012 Filing 654 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #637 Sealed Response to Motion, #642 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting #652 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #609 SEALED Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Replies due by 9/12/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/10/12. (mrm, )
September 7, 2012 Filing 652 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #637 Sealed Response to Motion, #641 Response in Opposition to Motion, #635 Sealed Response to Motion,,, #642 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, Unopposed Motion for Extensions of Time to File and Serve Replies in Support of Keranos Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
August 31, 2012 Filing 651 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Downing, John)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER granting #639 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER granting #638 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal IBM's Opposition To Keranos' Motion For Leave To Amend Its Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER granting #636 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #634 Motion to Seal Document #635 Sealed Response to Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants Discovery Responses. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #640 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 27, 2012 NOTICE - please disregard the filed in error for #642, clerk has modified the document to read Response instead of Reply (ch, )
August 27, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER WRONG EVENT. Document # 642, Sead REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 25, 2012 Filing 645 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibits 101-141 to: EXHIBIT Z - Declaration of Brian C. Banner): #644 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Banner, Brian)
August 25, 2012 Filing 644 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (EXHIBIT Z - Declaration of Brian C. Banner) to Main Document: #643 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-74, #2 Exhibit 75-100)(Banner, Brian)
August 25, 2012 Filing 643 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #642 Sealed Response to Motion, Declaration of Brian C. Banner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P, #2 Exhibit Q-Y, #3 Exhibit AA-KK, #4 Exhibit LL-RR)(Banner, Brian) Modified on 8/27/2012 (ch, ).
August 24, 2012 Filing 642 SEALED Response to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Banner, Brian) Modified on 8/27/2012 (ch, ). Modified on 8/27/2012 (ch, ).
August 24, 2012 Filing 641 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Wood, Emily) Modified on 8/27/2012 - document sealed per attorney (ehs, ).
August 24, 2012 Filing 640 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages RE: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO KERANOS'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Analog Devices, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
August 24, 2012 Filing 639 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO KERANOS'S MOTION TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Analog Devices, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
August 24, 2012 Filing 638 Unopposed MOTION to Seal IBMs Opposition To Keranos Motion For Leave To Amend Its Infringement Contentions Against IBM by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Emily)
August 24, 2012 Filing 637 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Banner, Brian)
August 24, 2012 Filing 636 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document INTEL'S OPPOSITION TO KERANOS'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
August 24, 2012 Filing 635 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Lane Decl, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q1-25, #20 Exhibit Q26-40, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U1, #25 Exhibit U2, #26 Exhibit U3, #27 Exhibit U4, #28 Exhibit V, #29 Exhibit W, #30 Exhibit X, #31 Exhibit Y)(Lane, John)
August 24, 2012 Filing 634 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL APPLES RESPONSE TO KERANOS, LLCS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO ADD PRODUCTS RECENTLY DISCLOSED IN DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY RESPONSES by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting #631 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Responses due by 8/24/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/22/12. (mrm, )
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER granting #629 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #609 SEALED Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Responses due by 8/24/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/22/12. (mrm, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 631 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses (This filing should correct Dkt. #630 previously filed) by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
August 17, 2012 Filing 630 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian) Modified on 8/17/2012 (sm, ).
August 17, 2012 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #630 Motion to extend submitted by Analog Devices, Inc.. Not in pdf searchable format. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 629 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply RESPONSE TO KERANOS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS TO ADD PRODUCTS RECENTLY DISCLOSED IN DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY RESPONSES by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER granting #625 Motion to Seal #627 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/14/2012. (sm, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 627 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration - License Agreement)(Downing, John)
August 14, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT AND NEED TO INCLUDE CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO SEAL Document # 626, Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 13, 2012 Filing 626 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Downing, #2 Exhibit A - License Agreement)(Downing, John) Modified on 8/14/2012 (ch, ).
August 13, 2012 Filing 625 MOTION to Seal Document Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Keranos Surreply to Motion to Stay by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
August 9, 2012 Filing 624 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC of Compliance [P.R. 4-2] (Downing, John)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER granting #620 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #609 SEALED Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Responses due by 8/17/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/9/12. (mrm, )
August 8, 2012 Filing 622 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.)
August 8, 2012 Filing 621 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Emily)
August 7, 2012 Filing 620 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting #614 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory. Replies due by 8/1/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/6/12. (mrm, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 618 NOTICE by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation of service of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Banner, Brian)
August 2, 2012 Filing 617 REPLY to Response to Motion re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory Reply to Motion to Stay filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Reiten)(Banner, Brian)
August 2, 2012 Filing 616 ***FILED IN ERROR. CLERK ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Support re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory Reply in Support of Motion filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Reiten)(Banner, Brian) Modified on 8/2/2012 (ch, ).
August 2, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUE TO CLERK TELLING WRONG EVENT. Document # 616, Response in Support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 2, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 615, Motion to Stay. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 1, 2012 Filing 615 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Stay re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory, #606 Response in Opposition to Motion by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reiten Declaration)(Banner, Brian) Modified on 8/2/2012 (ch, ).
July 30, 2012 Filing 614 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory, #606 Response in Opposition to Motion by Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #612 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses Responses due by 8/17/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/26/2012. (sm, )
July 24, 2012 Filing 612 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #608 Motion to Seal Document #609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/23/12. (mrm, )
July 21, 2012 Filing 610 NOTICE by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America re #604 Order, Terminate Motions, Add and Terminate Parties,,, NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Wilcox, Melvin)
July 20, 2012 Filing 609 SEALED MOTION Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Nicholas Gross, #2 Affidavit Declaration of John W. Downing, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
July 20, 2012 Filing 608 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Keranos' Motion to Amend Its Infringement Contentions to Add Products Recently Disclosed in Defendants' Discovery Responses by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
July 20, 2012 Filing 607 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC Keranos, LLCs Limitation of Asserted Claims (Downing, John)
July 19, 2012 Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting #600 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/19/12. (mrm, )
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER, granting #601 Unopposed Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice (Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation America) filed by Keranos, LLC., Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation America terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/19/12. (mrm, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 603 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC of Compliance (Spangler, Andrew)
July 13, 2012 Filing 602 NOTICE by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation of Service of Defendants' Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Mills, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2012 Filing 601 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice (Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation America) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
July 12, 2012 Filing 600 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
July 11, 2012 Filing 599 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory by Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
July 11, 2012 Filing 598 NOTICE of Change of Address by Thomas John Ward, Jr (Ward, Thomas)
June 22, 2012 Filing 597 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff Keranos's Claims Against Manufacturers of Superflash Memory by Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Chung Lam Declaration, #3 Affidavit McCartney Declaration, #4 Affidavit Dormans Declaration, #5 Affidavit Gandhi Declaration, #6 Affidavit Thorpe Declaration, #7 Affidavit Dammann Declaration, #8 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex A, #9 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex B, #10 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex C, #11 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex D, #12 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex E, #13 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex F, #14 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex G, #15 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex H, #16 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex I, #17 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex J, #18 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex K, #19 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex L, #20 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex M, #21 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex N, #22 Exhibit Dammann Dec Ex O)(Mills, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2012 Filing 596 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
June 20, 2012 Filing 595 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Dammann, Amina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 594 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Dammann, Amina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 593 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of Intel Corporation (Dammann, Amina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 592 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of Texas Instruments, Inc. (Dammann, Amina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 591 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (Dammann, Amina)
June 20, 2012 Filing 590 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2012 Filing 589 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
June 20, 2012 Filing 588 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Ward, Thomas)
June 20, 2012 Filing 587 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of TSMC North America (Ward, Thomas)
June 13, 2012 Filing 586 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Mills, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2012 Filing 585 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Dammann, Amina)
June 13, 2012 Filing 584 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Banner, Brian)
June 13, 2012 Filing 583 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Slayden, Bruce)
May 24, 2012 Filing 582 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katrina G Eash on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Eash, Katrina)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #580 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Apple. Attorney Garland T Stephens terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/26/2012. (sm, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 580 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Garland T Stephens by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
April 20, 2012 Filing 579 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting #577 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Peter Broderick terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/16/2012. (sm, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 577 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed on behalf of Christopher P. Broderick by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.)
April 13, 2012 Filing 576 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOUCMENT.***Unopposed MOTION for Withdrawal of Christopher P. Broderick as Counsel of Record by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.) Modified on 4/13/2012 (ch, ).
April 13, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 576 submitted by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting #573 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Micronas USA, Inc. With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/10/12. (ehs, )
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #568 Motion to Seal Document. Combined Defendants Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/10/12. (ehs, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 573 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Micronas USA, Inc. With Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
April 2, 2012 Filing 572 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Stephens, Garland)
April 2, 2012 Filing 571 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
April 2, 2012 Filing 570 NOTICE by Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG, Micronas USA, Inc., NXP Semiconductors Netherlands, B.V., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Ubicom, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America Notice of Service of Invalidity Contentions (Mills, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 569, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 30, 2012 Filing 569 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc. (Banner, Brian) Modified on 4/2/2012 (ch, ).
March 30, 2012 Filing 568 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document (Surreply in Opposition to United Module's Motion to Dismiss) by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting #565 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) Replies due by 3/30/2012.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/28/2012. (sm, )
March 28, 2012 NOTICE - disregard notice of deficiency for # 566, it has been place back on docket. (ch, )
March 28, 2012 ***DISREGARD NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY***NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 566 submitted FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) Modified on 3/28/2012 (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 566 RESPONSE to #563 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Swider, Natalie)
March 23, 2012 Filing 565 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER - VACATES the referral of these cases to Judge Craven for pretrial purposes.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/22/12. (ehs, )
March 22, 2012 Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. (ehs, )
March 21, 2012 NOTICE - clerk modified # 563, to link to # 560 TSMC'S Motion for Protective Order (ch, )
March 20, 2012 Filing 563 RESPONSE in Opposition re #560 RESPONSE TO TSMC'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John) Modified on 3/21/2012 (ch, ).
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER - Court reschedules the location for the technology tutorial to the United States District Court, 500 N. Stateline, Third Floor Courtroom, Texarkana, Texas at 9:00 a.m. on November 29, 2012, with the claim construction hearing beginning after the technology tutorial. (Markman Hearing set for 11/29/2012 09:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/13/12. (ehs, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 561 REPLY to Response to Motion re #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by United Module Corporation. (Downing, John)
March 6, 2012 Filing 560 Sealed Document - TSMC'S Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel X. Yan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Yan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Yan Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Yan Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Yan Declaration, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Dusty Hunt, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hunt Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Hunt Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C to Hunt Declaration)(Swider, Natalie) Modified on 3/7/2012 (ch, ).
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #545 Motion for Leave to Separately Brief Disputed Item 3 of the Stipulated Protective Order. Defendants Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. and TSMC North America may file a supplemental brief to the Joint Motion for Entry of a Disputed Protective Order. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days in which to respond to the supplemental brief, after which time the Court will consider the issue ripe for consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/6/12. (ehs, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting #557 Motion for Extension of Time to File counterclaim defendant United Module to file its Reply is extended to March 9, 2012; Replies due by 3/9/2012., Surreply extended to 3/23/12 for Combined Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/5/12. (ehs, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 557 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by United Module Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
March 1, 2012 Filing 556 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Fussell, James)
March 1, 2012 Filing 555 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting #553 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendants be given to and including March 30, 2012 to submit preliminary invalidity contentions (Patent Rule 3-3) and to make a document production accompanying invalidity contentions (Patent Rule 3-4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/29/2012. (ch, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 553 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (rml, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 551 REPLY to Response to Motion re #545 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Brief for Disputed Item 3 of the Stipulated Protective Order filed by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Natalie D. Swider, #2 Exhibit A to Swider Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Swider Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Swider Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Swider Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Swider Decl., #7 Exhibit F to Swider Decl., #8 Exhibit G to Swider Decl., #9 Exhibit H to Swider Decl., #10 Exhibit I to Swider Decl., #11 Exhibit J to Swider Decl., #12 Exhibit K to Swider Decl.)(Swider, Natalie)
February 21, 2012 Filing 550 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard de Bodo on behalf of Seiko Epson Corporation (de Bodo, Richard)
February 17, 2012 Filing 549 RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Brief for Disputed Item 3 of the Stipulated Protective Order filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER granting #544 Motion to Seal Document. Defendants Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. and TSMC North Americas Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/16/12. (ehs, )
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting #537 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply and Surreply to United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Reply due by 3/2/2012 SurReplies due by 3/16/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/16/12. (ehs, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 546 Sealed Additional Attachment - TSMC's Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel X. Yan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Yan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Yan Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Yan Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Yan Declaration, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Dusty Hunt, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hunt Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Hunt Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C to Hunt Declaration)(Swider, Natalie) Modified on 2/16/2012 (ch, ). Modified on 3/6/2012 (rml, ).
February 15, 2012 Filing 545 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Brief for Disputed Item 3 of the Stipulated Protective Order by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swider, Natalie)
February 15, 2012 Filing 544 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swider, Natalie)
February 14, 2012 Filing 543 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of a Disputed Protective Order by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order (with disputed language highlighted and bracketed))(Downing, John)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #541 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed Protective Order. Deadline set for 2/14/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/14/12. (ehs, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 541 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting #539 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties be given to and including February 13, 2012 to submit their proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/03/12. (ehs, )
February 10, 2012 Filing 539 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Banner, Brian)
February 10, 2012 Filing 538 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew V Devkar for Epson America, Inc.,Andrew V Devkar for Seiko Epson Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-920 (ch, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 537 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #528 Sealed Response to Motion,, by United Module Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting #535 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Deadline extended to February 10, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/2/12. (ehs, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 535 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/1/2012. (sm, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER denying, at this time, #472 Motion to Consolidate Cases, FURTHER ORDERED that a combined technology tutorial and claim construction hearing in the above referenced cases is hereby scheduled before Caroline M. Craven, United States Magistrate Judge, at 9:00 a.m. on November 29, 2012 at the United States District Court, 500 N. Stateline, FourthFloor Courtroom, Texarkana Texas.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/1/2012. (sm, )
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting #529 Motion to file Document under seal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/30/12. (ehs, )
January 30, 2012 Filing 531 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #528 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Banner, Brian)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/27/12. (mrm, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 529 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #528 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
January 27, 2012 Filing 528 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting #526 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/26/12. (mrm, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 526 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #524 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1). Responses due by 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/23/12. (mrm, )
January 20, 2012 Filing 524 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT UNITED MODULES MOTION TO DISMISS by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER granting #522 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed protective order up to and including January 25, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2012. (sm, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 522 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting #512 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/12/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER, granting #505 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Renesas Electronics Corporation and Renesas Electronics America, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Keranos, LLC. Renesas Electronics Corporation, and Renesas Electronics America, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #503 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER granting #496 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting #487 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Disclosures and Production. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER granting #480 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Disclosures and Production. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #479 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER granting #478 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 Filing 512 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #510 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven H Morrissett terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 510 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Steven H. Morrissett) by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 6, 2012 Filing 509 REPLY to Response to Motion re #472 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiff Keranos, LLCs Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Keranos, LLC. (Breit, Michelle)
January 6, 2012 Filing 508 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1).. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge David Folsom recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, )
January 4, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK Document # 506, Order of Recusal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 4, 2012 The previous case assigned to Judge Davis, is hereby reassigned to Judge Folsom per Local Rule CV 63-B(ch, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 1/4/2012 (ch, ).
January 3, 2012 Filing 505 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Renesas Electronics Corporation and Renesas Electronics America, Inc. Without Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendants Renesas Electronics Corporation and Renesas Electronics America, Inc. Without Prejudice)(Otteson, James)
December 30, 2011 Filing 504 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United Module's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under FRCP 12(b)(1) by United Module Corporation. (Downing, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2012: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
December 29, 2011 Filing 503 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 28, 2011 Filing 502 NOTICE by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC re #501 Response to Motion, Notice of Joinder (Findlay, Eric)
December 28, 2011 Filing 501 RESPONSE to Motion re #472 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Slayden, Bruce)
December 28, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 499, Motion to Consolidate. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 27, 2011 Filing 500 RESPONSE in Opposition re #472 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Joint Opposition to Keranos, LLC's Motion to Consolidate Cases, filed by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
December 27, 2011 Filing 499 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Slayden, Bruce) Modified on 12/28/2011 (ch, ).
December 27, 2011 Filing 498 RESPONSE to Motion re #472 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.. (De Mory, Denise)
December 23, 2011 Filing 497 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amina S. Dammann, #2 Declaration of Chris Mausler, #3 Declaration of Ken Gracey)(Dammann, Amina)
December 23, 2011 Filing 496 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dammann, Amina) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2011: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
December 22, 2011 Filing 495 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Dammann, Amina)
December 20, 2011 Filing 494 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Keranos, LLC (Downing, John)
December 20, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per Misc Order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (leh, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 493 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2011 Filing 492 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a) (Stephens, Garland)
December 19, 2011 Filing 491 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation of Initial Disclosures (Poirot, Paul)
December 19, 2011 Filing 490 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Partridge, Scott)
December 19, 2011 Filing 489 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by International Business Machines Corporation (Wood, Emily)
December 19, 2011 Filing 488 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America (Initial Disclosures) (Wilcox, Melvin)
December 19, 2011 Filing 487 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Disclosures and Production on Renesas Electronics Corporation and Renesas Electronics America, Inc.) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 19, 2011 Filing 486 NOTICE by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(a) (Mills, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2011 Filing 485 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (Initial Disclosures) (Heartfield, J)
December 19, 2011 Filing 484 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC regarding Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
December 19, 2011 Filing 483 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
December 16, 2011 Filing 482 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Craft, Roger)
December 15, 2011 Filing 481 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Leeron G Kalay for Apple, Inc.,Leeron G Kalay for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-849) (ehs, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 480 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Disclosures and Production by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 15, 2011 Filing 479 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 12, 2011 Filing 478 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting #473 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 12, 2011. (jml, )
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting #471 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Proposed Protective Order deadline is extended up to and including December 12, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 12, 2011. (jml, )
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #465 Motion for Extension of Time for Supplemental Briefing on Ubicom, Inc.'s MOtion to Dismiss. Keranos to file supplemental response in opposition to Defendant Ubicom's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt 240] is extended to and including December 9, 2011. Ubicom, Inc.'s Supplemental Reply to Keranos' supplemental reply to Keranos' supplemental response is extended to and including December 23, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 12, 2011. (jml, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 474 SEALED Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion re #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Downing, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John Downing, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of John Downing, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Ken Gracey, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ken Gracey, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ken Gracey, #7 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ken Gracey, #8 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ken Gracey)(Downing, John)
December 9, 2011 Filing 473 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, John)
December 7, 2011 Filing 472 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Northern District of California's Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Transfer Cases to Eastern District of Texas (Amended Order), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
December 7, 2011 Filing 471 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Proposed Protective Order (Agreed) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 7, 2011 Filing 470 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Robert Yoches on behalf of Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America (Yoches, E)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting #468 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/2011. (ch, )
December 6, 2011 Filing 468 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Proposed Protective Order by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #464 Motion to Dismiss as to defendants Austriamicrosystems AG and Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc without prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/11. (ehs, )
December 5, 2011 Filing 466 Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's ANSWER to #459 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Epson America, Inc. by Keranos, LLC.(Breit, Michelle)
December 5, 2011 Filing 465 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing on Ubicom, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
November 28, 2011 Filing 464 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Austriamicrosystems AG and Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. Without Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting #462 Motion. Parties shall have until and through December5, 2011 to submit their Agreed Protective Order or competing versions thereof.Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/28/2011. (bga, )
November 21, 2011 Filing 462 Agreed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT AN AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER OR COMPETING VERSIONS THEREOF re #442 Unopposed MOTION Miscellaneous Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc., EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Keranos, LLC, Microchip Technology, Inc., Micronas USA, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Ubicom, Inc., VIS Micro, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER withdrawing #453 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #460 Motion to Withdraw doc #453 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on November 21, 2011. (rml, )
November 18, 2011 Filing 460 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #453 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
November 16, 2011 Filing 459 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Epson America, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
November 16, 2011 Filing 458 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Seiko Epson Corporation. (Heartfield, J)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING re #453 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Keranos, LLC ORDERING that on or before November 16, 2011, Ubicom shall file a response to Keranos Emergency Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/15/2011. (sm, )
November 15, 2011 Filing 456 RESPONSE to Motion re #453 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beard, R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2011: #5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER granting #448 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to file its Answer to Docket No. 432 is extended up to and including November 21, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to the Honorable Caroline Craven for decision: #453 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Keranos, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (mrm, )
November 13, 2011 Filing 453 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #461 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle) Modified on 11/30/2011 (ehs, ).
November 10, 2011 Filing 452 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Beard, R)
November 7, 2011 Filing 451 ANSWER to #435 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Answer to Apple, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Keranos, LLC.(Breit, Michelle)
November 7, 2011 Filing 450 ANSWER to #434 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Keranos, LLC's Answer to Combined Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Keranos, LLC.(Breit, Michelle)
November 7, 2011 Filing 449 ANSWER to #436 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Answer to Counter-Claims of Rohm Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC by Keranos, LLC.(Breit, Michelle)
November 7, 2011 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #432 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Breit, Michelle)
November 7, 2011 Filing 447 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W Downing on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Downing, John)
November 7, 2011 Filing 446 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle G Breit on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Breit, Michelle)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 445 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing 11/29/2012. Final Pretrial Conference 8/26/203. Jury Selection 9/3/2013. All other deadlines are set forth herein Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 10/26/2011 (ch, ).
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #443 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to file its Responses to Docket Nos. 432, 434, 435 and 436. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/25/11. (ehs, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #436 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #432 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #435 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #434 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 21, 2011 Filing 442 Unopposed MOTION Miscellaneous Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Otteson, James)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting #440 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court hereby deems the Case Management Conference date be extended to November 30, 2011 and that all related dates thereto be respectively extended in similar manner, subject to any further adjustments the parties may subsequently recommend in connection with their submission of their proposed docket control order.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/13/11. (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 Filing 440 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File for the Case Management Conference Deem Date and All Other Related Dates by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 12, 2011 Filing 439 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Peter Broderick (Broderick, Christopher)
October 7, 2011 Filing 438 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rusty D Crandell for Austriamicrosystems AG,Rusty D Crandell for Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-5314) (ehs, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MISC. 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (bga, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 436 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC.(Findlay, Eric)
September 29, 2011 Filing 435 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Lane, John)
September 29, 2011 Filing 434 Combined ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., TSMC North America, National Semiconductor Corporation, Intel Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., Texas Instruments, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co LTD.(Slayden, Bruce)
September 29, 2011 Filing 433 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Seiko Epson Corporation.(Heartfield, J)
September 29, 2011 Filing 432 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Epson America, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #418 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/2011. (ch, )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting #416 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A, LLC deadline is 10/3/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/29/2011. (ch, )
September 29, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC to 10/3/2011. (ch, )
September 27, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 428 and 429, Answers to Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 26, 2011 Filing 429 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to Complaint by Winbond Electronics Corporation America.(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 9/27/2011 (ch, ).
September 26, 2011 Filing 428 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Winbond Electronics Corporation.(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 9/27/2011 (ch, ).
September 26, 2011 Filing 427 Defendant Winbond Electronics Corporation America's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Winbond Electronics Corporation America.(Morrissett, Steven)
September 26, 2011 Filing 426 Defendant Winbond Electronics Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Winbond Electronics Corporation.(Morrissett, Steven)
September 26, 2011 Filing 425 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by International Business Machines Corporation.(Marlott, John)
September 26, 2011 Filing 424 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Renesas Electronics Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
September 26, 2011 Filing 423 ANSWER to Complaint by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,.(Partridge, Scott)
September 26, 2011 Filing 422 ANSWER to Complaint by Toshiba Corporation.(Partridge, Scott)
September 26, 2011 Filing 421 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***>ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,.(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2011 (sm, ).
September 26, 2011 Filing 420 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Toshiba Corporation.(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 9/26/2011 (sm, ).
September 26, 2011 Filing 419 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 26, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Documents # 420 and #421, Answer and Counterclaims. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 23, 2011 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland)
September 23, 2011 Filing 417 NOTICE by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Lin, James)
September 23, 2011 Filing 416 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, or Otherwise Respond by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 23, 2011 Filing 415 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TSMC North America.( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 414 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd..( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 413 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,.( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 412 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Samsung Electronics Co LTD.( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 411 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re National Semiconductor Corporation.( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 410 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microchip Technology, Inc..(Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 409 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intel Corporation.(Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 408 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc..( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 407 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Analog Devices, Inc..( Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 406 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amina Stephanie Dammann on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Dammann, Amina)
September 23, 2011 Filing 405 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Intel Corporation (Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 404 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (Mills, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2011 Filing 403 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Intel Corporation (Slayden, Bruce)
September 23, 2011 Filing 402 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (Slayden, Bruce)
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TSMC North America to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Analog Devices, Inc. to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intel Corporation to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microchip Technology, Inc. to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for National Semiconductor Corporation to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Samsung Electronics Co LTD to 9/29/2011. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER - This case is now set for jury selection on September 3, 2013 and for a claim construction on November 29, 2012. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on October 14, 2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems October 31, 2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on October 21, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/11. (ehs, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - (see order). Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/12/2011. (ch, )
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #397 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Monica Mucchetti Eno terminated as counsel for Keranos LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/31/2011. (ch, )
August 30, 2011 Filing 397 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw As Counsel)(Eno, Monica)
August 23, 2011 Filing 396 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Intel Corporation (Gillam, Harry)
August 10, 2011 Filing 395 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael E Jones (Jones, Michael)
July 13, 2011 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER finding as moot #169 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #229 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #269 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/11. (ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #248 Motion to Seal Document ; denying #248 Motion to Unseal Document. The Court ORDERS that EMUSs reply to its motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 242) be filed under seal, but the Court DENIES EMUSs motion to the extent it seeks to unseal Keranoss response to the motion to dismiss and accompanying exhibits.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/11. (ehs, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 391 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Lackey, Walter)
May 6, 2011 Filing 390 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul E Poirot on behalf of Renesas Electronics Corporation (Poirot, Paul)
April 21, 2011 Filing 389 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Texas Instruments, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
April 21, 2011 Filing 388 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Texas Instruments, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
April 21, 2011 Filing 387 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Texas Instruments, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
April 21, 2011 Filing 386 NOTICE by Analog Devices, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Ubicom, Inc. NOTICE OF ACTION IN RELATED PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Truman Fenton in Support of Notice of Action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration)(Mills, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2011 Filing 385 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2011 Filing 384 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron R Hand on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (Hand, Aaron)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #382 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Zilog Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/28/2011. (ch, )
March 25, 2011 Filing 382 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Zilog, Inc. with Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eno, Monica)
March 17, 2011 Filing 381 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas T Carmack on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Carmack, Thomas)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting #379 Motion to Dismiss deft Qualcomm with prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/2/11. (ehs, )
March 2, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 378 submitted by Keranos, LLC. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OR SIGNATURE PAGE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
March 1, 2011 Filing 379 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTED UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT QUALCOMM INCORPORATED WITH PREJUDICE by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eno, Monica)
March 1, 2011 Filing 378 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated with Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Keranos, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Qualcomm Incorporated with Prejudice)(Eno, Monica) Modified on 3/2/2011 (ch, ).
February 23, 2011 Filing 377 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Caine on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Caine, David)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER - granting #374 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants Alcatel-Lucent and Alcatel Business Systems are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/14/2011. (ch, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER - granting #372 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendants EM Microelectronic Marin SA, NEC Corporation, NXP Semiconductors Netherlands, B.V., Oki Semiconductor Co., Ltd., and Vanguard International Semiconductor are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/14/2011. (ch, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 374 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keranos, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER - Because all of the defendants have not answered in this case, the Court VACATES its previous Order requiring the parties to submit a proposed docket control and discovery orders to the Court on 3/2/2011. Likewise, the Court also does not deem 3/18/2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference, and the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions are not due on 3/8/2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/10/2011. (ch, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 372 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Keranos, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
February 9, 2011 Filing 371 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation (Smith, Michael)
February 9, 2011 Filing 370 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference CANCELLED for 2/16/2011 11:15 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge T. John Ward. (bga, )
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER setting Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 11:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on March 2, 2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems March 18, 2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/9/11. (ehs, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 368 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Spangler, Andrew)
January 28, 2011 Filing 367 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #351 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Lack of Standing Keranos's Surreply to NXP Semiconductor USA, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
January 18, 2011 Filing 366 REPLY to Response to Motion re #351 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Lack of Standing filed by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.. (De Mory, Denise)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #362 Motion to Dismiss. Dfts Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies North Amercia are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/13/2011. (ch, )
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #363 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott D Watkins terminated as counsel for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd and Samsung Semiconductor Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/13/2011. (ch, )
January 12, 2011 Filing 363 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Termination of Electronic Notices regarding Scott D. Watkins by Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
January 11, 2011 Filing 362 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies North America with Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
January 11, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 360, Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 10, 2011 Filing 361 NOTICE by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint, Supplemental Citation of Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Partridge, Scott)
January 7, 2011 Filing 360 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Dismiss Keranos' Unopposed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice re Defendant Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies North America by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) Modified on 1/11/2011 (ch, ).
January 7, 2011 Filing 359 NOTICE by Keranos, LLC Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Supplemental Citation of Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Otteson, James)
January 7, 2011 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #351 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Lack of Standing Keranos' Opposition to NXP Semiconductor USA, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bryan Alexander Kohm and Charlene M Morrow terminated as counsel for Ubicom Inc.. Brian C. Banner, Bruce W. Slayden II, and Jeffrey D. Mills of King & Spalding LLP, 401 Congress Ave., Suite 3200, Austin, Texas 78701, are substituted as counsel for record for Defendant Ubicom.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/11. (ehs, )
January 3, 2011 Filing 356 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2011: #2 REVISED ORDER (WITHOUT DATE SIGNED LINE)) (ch, ).
December 27, 2010 Filing 355 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss Keranos, LLC's Surreply to Defendants Winbond's Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Atheros Communications, Inc. with Prejudice. Atheros is hereby dismissed from this action WITH PREJUDICE.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/27/10. (ehs, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #349 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/27/10. (ehs, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #346 Motion Defendants Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation Americas Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/27/10. (ehs, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 351 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Lack of Standing by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.. (De Mory, Denise) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/22/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
December 20, 2010 Filing 350 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #284 MOTION to Dismiss, #273 MOTION to Dismiss, #286 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter J. Courture, #2 Exhibit Confidential Exh 1 to Declaration of Peter Courture)(Otteson, James)
December 20, 2010 Filing 349 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Document Under Seal by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James) Modified on 12/21/2010 (sm, ).
December 20, 2010 Filing 348 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): #346 MOTION to Seal Defendants Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation America's Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal.. (Morrissett, Steven) Modified on 12/20/2010 (sm, ).
December 17, 2010 Filing 347 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss filed by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America.(Morrissett, Steven)
December 17, 2010 Filing 346 MOTION to Seal Defendants Winbond Electronics Corporation and Winbond Electronics Corporation America's Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting the Winbond Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal)(Morrissett, Steven)
December 17, 2010 Filing 345 REPLY to Response to Motion re #270 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 filed by Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Gardner, Allen)
December 16, 2010 Filing 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Texas Instruments, Inc. (Roth, Brendan)
December 16, 2010 Filing 343 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Micronas USA, Inc. (Roth, Brendan)
December 16, 2010 Filing 342 MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant Atheros Communications, Inc. with Prejudice by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Otteson, James)
December 14, 2010 Filing 341 REPLY to Response to Motion re #301 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or Alternatively Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Memorandum in Support Thereof and Joinder of Pending Motions to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or Alternatively Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Memorandum in Support Thereof and Joinder of Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. (Heartfield, J)
December 10, 2010 Filing 340 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) Keranos' Surreply to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Ubicom, Inc. filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Monica Mucchetti Eno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Eno, Monica)
December 10, 2010 Filing 339 REPLY to Response to Motion re #257 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Notice of Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Renee DuBord Brown terminated as counsel for Analog Devices Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/10/2010. (ch, )
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting #332 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 1/10/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/10/10. (ehs, )
December 9, 2010 Filing 336 REPLY to Response to Motion re #284 MOTION to Dismiss, #273 MOTION to Dismiss, #286 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) filed by Apple, Inc., International Business Machines Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Banner, Brian)
December 7, 2010 Filing 335 RESPONSE in Opposition re #289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss, #288 MOTION to Dismiss, #285 MOTION to Dismiss, #270 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 Keranos Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Freescale, ROHM, Samsung and Windbond filed by Keranos, LLC. (Eno, Monica)
December 7, 2010 Filing 334 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Brown, Renee) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2010: #2 REVISED ORDER (REMOVED PROPOSED)) (ch, ).
December 6, 2010 Filing 333 RESPONSE in Opposition re #301 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or Alternatively Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Memorandum in Support Thereof and Joinder of Pending Motions to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or Alternatively Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Memorandum in Support Thereof and Joinder of Pending Motions to Dismiss Keranos' Opposition to Renesas' Motion to Dismiss filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Xiang Long Declaration, #2 Exhibit Long Exh 1, #3 Exhibit Long Exh 2, #4 Exhibit Long Exh 3, #5 Exhibit Long Exh 4, #6 Exhibit Long Exh 5)(Otteson, James)
December 6, 2010 Filing 332 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint (Second) by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 3, 2010 Filing 331 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America identifying Other Affiliate Walsin Lihwa Corporation for Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Morrissett, Steven)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #328 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Ubicoms Motions to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/2/10. (ehs, )
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #326 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(B)(6), 12(B)(2), and 12(B)(1), and Notice of Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLCs Complaint Under Rule 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6). Replies due by 12/10/2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/2/10. (ehs, )
December 1, 2010 Filing 328 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 1, 2010 Filing 327 ANSWER to #283 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Keranos' Response to NXP's Counterclaims by Keranos, LLC.(Otteson, James)
December 1, 2010 Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #257 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Notice of Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #318 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #270 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 , #166 MOTION to Dismiss, #285 MOTION to Dismiss, #249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint,, #289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss, #269 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint, #288 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 12/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/1/2010. (ch, )
November 30, 2010 Filing 324 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Freescale Semiconductor Holdings V Inc, Corporate Parent Freescale Holdings, L.P. for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
November 30, 2010 Filing 323 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ubicom, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
November 30, 2010 Filing 322 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Banner, Brian)
November 30, 2010 Filing 321 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Semiconductor Corporation (Banner, Brian)
November 30, 2010 Filing 320 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Banner, Brian) Modified on 11/30/2010 (ch, ).
November 30, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 320, Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #284 MOTION to Dismiss, #273 MOTION to Dismiss, #286 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) Keranos Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Apple Inc., IBM, and TSMC filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
November 29, 2010 Filing 318 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss, #288 MOTION to Dismiss, #285 MOTION to Dismiss, #269 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint, #270 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 24, 2010 Filing 317 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint, Keranos' Surreply to Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Toshiba Corp filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
November 23, 2010 Filing 316 REPLY to Response to Motion re #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Banner, Brian)
November 22, 2010 Filing 315 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jacqueline R Koch for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.,Jacqueline R Koch for Renesas Electronics Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-137 (ch, )
November 22, 2010 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #257 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Notice of Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Keranos Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Austriamicrosystems filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Otteson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Otteson, James)
November 22, 2010 Filing 313 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2010 Filing 312 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
November 22, 2010 Filing 311 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
November 22, 2010 Filing 310 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Banner, Brian) Modified on 11/22/2010 (sm, ).
November 22, 2010 Filing 309 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Banner, Brian) Modified on 11/22/2010 (sm, ).
November 22, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, ATTYS WANTING TO APPEAR IN CASE MUST REFILE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE USING THEIR INDIVIDUAL LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Document # 309 and 310, Notice of atty appearances. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 19, 2010 Filing 308 REPLY to Response to Motion re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint, filed by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation. (Partridge, Scott)
November 19, 2010 Filing 307 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alan D Smith for Infineon Technologies AG,Alan D Smith for Infineon Technologies North America Corp.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-135) (ehs, )
November 19, 2010 Filing 306 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam J Kessel for Infineon Technologies AG,Adam J Kessel for Infineon Technologies North America Corp..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-135) (ehs, )
November 19, 2010 Filing 305 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Swatch Group (U.S.), Inc., Other Affiliate The Swatch Group Ltd. for EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2010 Filing 304 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J O'Shea for Micronas USA, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-132) (ehs, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #236 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 18, 2010 Filing 302 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Renesas Electronics Corporation for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.; Other Affiliate NEC Corporation, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi Corporation, Other Affiliate Hitachi, Ltd. for Renesas Electronics Corporation. (Heartfield, J)
November 18, 2010 Filing 301 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or Alternatively Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), Memorandum in Support Thereof and Joinder of Pending Motions to Dismiss by Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 18, 2010 Filing 300 REPLY to Response to Motion re #238 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) And Brief In Support Thereof filed by Intel Corporation. (Degnan, Lauren)
November 18, 2010 Filing 299 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Austriamicrosystems AG for Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Austriamicrosystems AG. (Jones, Michael)
November 18, 2010 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Faulkner, Rickey)
November 17, 2010 Filing 297 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bukola T Aina for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.,Bukola T Aina for Renesas Electronics Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-123)(ehs, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 296 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
November 15, 2010 Filing 295 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Peter Broderick on behalf of Seiko Epson Corporation (Broderick, Christopher)
November 15, 2010 Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #248 Amended MOTION to Seal Document #242 Sealed Reply to Response to MotionAmended MOTION to Unseal Document #196 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, filed by Keranos, LLC, #242 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.Amended MOTION to Seal Document #242 Sealed Reply to Response to MotionAmended MOTION to Unseal Document #196 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, filed by Keranos, LLC, #242 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. Keranos' Opposition to EM Microelectronic - US Inc.'s Motion to Unseal Plaintiff's Opposition Brief and Supporting Exhibits; Declaration of J. Nicholas Gross ISO Plaintiff's Opposition filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Nicolas Gross)(Otteson, James)
November 15, 2010 Filing 293 RESPONSE in Opposition re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint, Keranos' Opposition to Toshiba Corp., et al.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Keranos, LLC. (Otteson, James)
November 10, 2010 Filing 292 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corporation (Wood, Emily)
November 10, 2010 Filing 291 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rohm U.S.A, Inc. for ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Findlay, Eric)
November 10, 2010 Filing 290 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America identifying Corporate Parent Winbond Electronics Corporation for Winbond Electronics Corporation America; Corporate Parent Winbond Electronics Corporation for Winbond Electronics Corporation. (Wilcox, Melvin)
November 10, 2010 Filing 289 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, Memorandum of Law In Support, and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
November 10, 2010 Filing 288 MOTION to Dismiss by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 10, 2010 Filing 287 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Lane, John)
November 10, 2010 Filing 286 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
November 10, 2010 Filing 285 MOTION to Dismiss by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Banner, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 10, 2010 Filing 284 MOTION to Dismiss by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Banner, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/10/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 10, 2010 Filing 283 NXP SEMICONDUCTORS USA, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc..(De Mory, Denise)
November 10, 2010 Filing 282 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Banner, Brian)
November 10, 2010 Filing 281 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Mills, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2010 Filing 280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Slayden, Bruce)
November 10, 2010 Filing 279 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
November 10, 2010 Filing 278 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2010 Filing 277 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
November 10, 2010 Filing 276 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Intel Corporation (Bunt, Robert)
November 10, 2010 Filing 275 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Intel Corporation (Parker, Robert)
November 10, 2010 Filing 274 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John A Marlott on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Marlott, John)
November 10, 2010 Filing 273 MOTION to Dismiss by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Emily)
November 10, 2010 Filing 272 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Merkler Wood on behalf of International Business Machines Corporation (Wood, Emily)
November 10, 2010 Filing 271 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung Electronics Co LTD; Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Gardner, Allen)
November 10, 2010 Filing 270 MOTION to Dismiss and Notice of Joinder in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. #166 and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. #249 by Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 10, 2010 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 8, 2010 Filing 268 RESPONSE in Opposition re #240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Otteson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 8, 2010 Filing 267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #236 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Monica Eno, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 8, 2010 Filing 266 RESPONSE to #208 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Texas Instruments, Inc. by Keranos, LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
November 8, 2010 Filing 265 RESPONSE in Opposition re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #235 MOTION to Dismiss, #238 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) And Brief In Support Thereof filed by Keranos, LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
November 8, 2010 Filing 264 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Instruments, Inc. (Abraham, Amanda)
November 8, 2010 Filing 263 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven H Morrissett for Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-104) (ehs, )
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #233 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Micromas Semiconductor Holding AG's. All Claims are dismissed with prejudice to the right of the Plaintiff to pursue any such claims in the future. All costs of court and fees are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/8/10. (ehs, )
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Motions to Dismiss under seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/8/10. (ehs, )
November 5, 2010 Filing 260 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Philip Brinkmann on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Brinkmann, John)
November 5, 2010 Filing 259 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Lane on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Lane, John)
November 5, 2010 Filing 258 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Stephens, Garland)
November 5, 2010 Filing 257 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Notice of Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Wachsler-Markowitsch, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 4, 2010 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #209 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(5) of Micronas USA, Inc. filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Otteson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Otteson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Otteson, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Elvira Minjarez, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Elvira Minjarez, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Elvira Minjarez)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 4, 2010 Filing 255 SEALED SUR-REPLY TO REPLY to Response to Motion re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof, #192 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint, #168 MOTION for Joinder In MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Microchip Technology, Inc., #179 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1), #166 MOTION to Dismiss, #173 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nick Gross)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 4, 2010 Filing 254 NOTICE of Change of Address by J Thad Heartfield (Heartfield, J)
November 4, 2010 Filing 253 RESPONSE to Motion re #233 MOTION to Dismiss by Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG (Non-opposition) filed by Keranos, LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
November 4, 2010 Filing 252 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re #209 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(5) of Micronas USA, Inc. filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Otteson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Otteson, #3 Exhibit B Declaration of James Otteson, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Elvira Minjarez, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Elvira Minjarez, #6 Exhibit B Declaration of Elvira Minjarez)(Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 11/4/2010 (ch, ).
November 4, 2010 Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
November 4, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 252, Response in Opposition to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 250 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Toshiba America, Inc. for Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,. (Partridge, Scott)
October 28, 2010 Filing 249 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos's Complaint, by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
October 27, 2010 Filing 248 Amended MOTION to Seal Document #242 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Amended MOTION to Unseal Document #196 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, filed by Keranos, LLC, #242 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #243 Motion for leave to file document under seal. Defendants Microchip Technology, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., and National Semiconductor, Inc. Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal is GRANTED.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/26/10. (ehs, )
October 26, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 241 submitted by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE, TWO PART PLEADING, NO ORDER ATTACHED. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 246 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #243 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document, #166 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Analog Devices, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation, Qualcomm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E)(Banner, Brian)
October 25, 2010 Filing 245 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonah D Mitchell for Atheros Communications, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-59) (ehs, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stefani E Shanberg terminated as counsel for National Semiconductor Corp. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Analog Devices, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
October 25, 2010 Filing 242 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #173 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2010 Filing 241 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Seal Document EMUS Reply for Motion Dismiss for Lack of Standing, MOTION to Unseal Document Plainitff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits [D.E. 196] by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Lindenbaum, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 240 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) by Ubicom, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Chris Mausler In Support of Ubicom's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Kohm, Bryan)
October 22, 2010 Filing 239 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intel Corporation (Degnan, Lauren)
October 22, 2010 Filing 238 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rules 12(b)(1) And 12(b)(6) And Brief In Support Thereof by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Degnan, Lauren)
October 22, 2010 Filing 237 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alcatel Lucent for Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2010 Filing 236 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Dismiss by Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 22, 2010 Filing 235 MOTION to Dismiss by National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
October 22, 2010 Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint filed by VIS Micro, Inc.. (Slater, Steven)
October 22, 2010 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss by Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
October 22, 2010 Filing 232 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Joinder by National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian) Modified on 10/22/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Filing 231 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Micronas USA, Inc.. (ch, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 230 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atheros Communications, Inc. (Faulkner, Rickey)
October 22, 2010 Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Defendant Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faulkner, Rickey)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER - granting #225 Motion to Substitute Party. Samsung Electronics Co Ltd added. Samsung Group terminated. Samsung Electroncis Co Ltd and Samsung Semiconductor Inc deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/22/2010. (ch, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Glenn Smith on behalf of Intel Corporation (Smith, Christopher)
October 22, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE Document # 232, Motion for Joinder. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 22, 2010 ***MOTION # 214 HAD BEEN FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - CORRECT ORDER WAS SIGNED SEE DOCKET # 228 Document # 225, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 10/22/2010 (ch, ).
October 22, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics Co LTD to 11/10/2010; Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 226 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER CLERK. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting #215 Motion to Substitute Party. Samsung Electronics Co LTD added. Samsung Group terminated. Samsung Electroncis Co Ltd and Samsung Semiconductor Inc deadline is extended to 11/18/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/20/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 10/20/2010 (ch, ). Modified on 10/22/2010 (ch, ).
October 20, 2010 Filing 224 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Mills, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2010 Filing 223 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Qualcomm, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2010 Filing 222 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Beard, R)
October 20, 2010 Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of Qualcomm, Inc. (Beard, R)
October 20, 2010 Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Banner, Brian)
October 20, 2010 Filing 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Qualcomm, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
October 20, 2010 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Slayden, Bruce)
October 20, 2010 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Qualcomm, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
October 20, 2010 Filing 216 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul A Gennari for Samsung Group,Paul A Gennari for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-287) (ehs, )
October 20, 2010 Filing 215 Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party --- Agreed Motion to Substitute Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Group by Keranos, LLC, Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
October 20, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 214, Agreed Motion to Substitute Parties. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 19, 2010 Filing 214 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Agreed MOTION to Substitute Party --- Agreed Motion to Substitute Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Group by Keranos, LLC, Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen) Modified on 10/20/2010 (ch, ).
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER - granting #207 Unopposed Motion for Extenion of Time. Dft NXP Semixonductiors USA Inc deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/19/2010. (ch, )
October 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ***DUPLICATE ORDER PLEASE IGNORE***ORDER granting #207 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corp. shall have until and including November 10, 2010 to (a) file an answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/18/10. (ehs, ) Modified on 10/18/2010 (ehs, ).
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #204 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corp deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/18/2010. (ch, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan James Moran terminated as counsel for Dft Analog Devices Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/18/2010. (ch, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 209 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(5) by Micronas USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Carl)
October 18, 2010 Filing 208 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by Texas Instruments, Inc..(Roth, Carl)
October 18, 2010 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Mory, Denise)
October 18, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for International Business Machines Corporation to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Brown, Renee)
October 15, 2010 Filing 205 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc., Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (Gardner, Allen)
October 14, 2010 Filing 204 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marlott, John)
October 14, 2010 Filing 203 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marlott, John) Modified on 10/14/2010 (ch, ).
October 14, 2010 Filing 202 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corporation (Marlott, John)
October 14, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 203, Fourth Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/2010. (ch, )
October 13, 2010 Filing 200 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Beard, R)
October 13, 2010 Filing 199 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey David Mills on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Mills, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2010 Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
October 13, 2010 Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
October 12, 2010 Filing 196 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #169 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof, #192 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint, #168 MOTION for Joinder In MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Microchip Technology, Inc., #179 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1), #166 MOTION to Dismiss, #173 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Monica Eno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 12, 2010 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Under Seal by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 12, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 193 submitted by Analog Devices, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VIS Micro, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent VIS Investment Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Other Affiliate Vanguard International Semiconductor Corporation, Other Affiliate VIS Associates, Inc. for VIS Micro, Inc.. (Slater, Steven)
October 8, 2010 Filing 193 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Moran, Ryan) Modified on 10/12/2010 (ch, ).
October 8, 2010 Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint by VIS Micro, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Steven)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #188 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is extended up to and including October 12, 2010. Responses due by 10/12/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/8/10. (ehs, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #172 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., and Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. have until and through October 22, 2010 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/7/10. (ehs, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Atheros Communications, Inc. to file its Answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond be and hereby is extended to October 22, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/7/10. (ehs, )
October 7, 2010 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #169 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof, #168 MOTION for Joinder In MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Microchip Technology, Inc., #179 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1), #166 MOTION to Dismiss, #173 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 7, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Alcatel Business Systems to 10/22/2010; Alcatel USA GP, Inc. to 10/22/2010; Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc. to 10/22/2010; Alcatel USA Resources, Inc. to 10/22/2010; Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. to 10/22/2010; Alcatel-Lucent to 10/22/2010; Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. to 10/22/2010. (ehs, )
October 7, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Atheros Communications, Inc. to 10/22/2010. (ehs, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 187 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey A Lindenbaum for deft EM Microelectronic US Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) (ehs, ) Modified on 10/8/2010 to correct party representing (ehs, ).
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft National Semiconductor Corporations deadline is extended to 10/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/6/2010. (ch, )
October 6, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for National Semiconductor Corporation to 10/22/2010. (ch, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #182 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer. Toshiba's response to Plaintiffs Complaint will be due November 10,2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/5/10. (ehs, )
October 5, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., to 11/10/2010; Toshiba Corporation to 11/10/2010. (ehs, )
October 4, 2010 Filing 183 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Seiko Epson Corporation; Corporate Parent U.S. Epson, Inc. for Epson America, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
October 4, 2010 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
September 29, 2010 Filing 181 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubicom, Inc..( Kohm, Bryan)
September 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ubicom, Inc. to 10/22/2010. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #177 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. and Austriamicrosystems AG have until and through November 5, 2010 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/27/10. (ehs, )
September 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Austriamicrosystems AG to 11/5/2010; Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. to 11/5/2010. (ehs, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support Thereof and Joinder in Microchip Technology, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(1) by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
September 24, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren A Degnan on behalf of Intel Corporation (Degnan, Lauren)
September 24, 2010 Filing 177 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 22, 2010 Filing 176 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Analog Devices, Inc. (Brown, Renee)
September 22, 2010 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
September 22, 2010 Filing 174 NOTICE by Microchip Technology, Inc. Notice of Collateral Proceeding (Banner, Brian)
September 22, 2010 Filing 173 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinlein, Craig)
September 22, 2010 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 22, 2010 Filing 171 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond -Unopposed- by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faulkner, Rickey)
September 21, 2010 Filing 170 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm, Inc. (Zembek, Richard)
September 21, 2010 Filing 169 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Brief in Support Thereof by Qualcomm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard)
September 21, 2010 Filing 168 MOTION for Joinder In, MOTION to Dismiss Filed by Microchip Technology, Inc. by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Analog Devices, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Brown, Renee)
September 21, 2010 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Renee DuBord Brown on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Brown, Renee)
September 20, 2010 Filing 166 MOTION to Dismiss by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
September 20, 2010 Filing 165 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. VIS Micro, Inc. personally served on 8/19/2010 Sherman Cnou Authorized Agent designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #161 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline by which Defendant NXP Semiconductors USA Inc to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to and including October 18, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/10. (ehs, )
September 16, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. to 10/18/2010. (ehs, )
September 15, 2010 Filing 163 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re International Business Machines Corporation.( Marlott, John)
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intel Corporation to 10/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for International Business Machines Corporation to 10/15/2010. 23 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 162 Defendant Intel Corporation's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint ( Cordell, Ruffin)
September 14, 2010 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Mory, Denise)
September 14, 2010 Filing 160 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Denise M De Mory on behalf of NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. (De Mory, Denise)
September 13, 2010 Filing 159 ANSWER to #129 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Keranos, LLC's Response to Defendant and Counterclaimant Zilog, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Keranos, LLC.(Otteson, James)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Motion to Dismiss. Nanya Technology Corporation and Nanya Technology Corporation USA are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/13/2010. (ch, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baik, Steven)
September 9, 2010 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Mucchetti Eno on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Eno, Monica)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Renesas Electronics America Inc deadine is extended to 11/18/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/8/2010. (ch, )
September 9, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to 11/18/2010. (ch, )
September 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for VIS Micro, Inc. to 10/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 154 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VIS Micro, Inc..( Slater, Steven)
September 7, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Dawn Swider on behalf of VIS Micro, Inc. (Swider, Natalie)
September 7, 2010 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Clark Knapp on behalf of VIS Micro, Inc. (Knapp, Roger)
September 7, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Howard Slater on behalf of VIS Micro, Inc. (Slater, Steven)
September 2, 2010 Filing 150 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
September 1, 2010 Filing 149 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Renesas Electronics Corporation waiver sent on 8/20/2010, answer due 11/18/2010. (ehs, )
August 31, 2010 Filing 148 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc..( Andelman, Ethan)
August 31, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. to 9/16/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 27, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE of Change of Address by James C Otteson (Otteson, James)
August 27, 2010 Filing 145 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marina N Saito for Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-23716. (ch, )
August 27, 2010 Filing 144 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward H Rice for Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc.,Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-23716. (ch, )
August 26, 2010 Filing 143 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David D Eaton for ZiLOG, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5591. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2010: #1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Apple Inc deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/26/2010. (ch, )
August 26, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple, Inc. to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG and Micronas USA Inc deadline is extended to 10/18/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #130 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Texas Instruments Inc deadline is extened to 10/18/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Atheros Communications Inc deadline is extended to 9/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Infineon Technologies AG and Infineon Technologies North America Corp deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft National Semiconductor Corporation deadline is extended to 10/6/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corp deadlines is extended to 9/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. EM Microelectronic US Inc deadline is extended to 9/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft's Defendants Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., and Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. have until and through 9/23/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for International Business Machines Corporation to 9/22/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Alcatel Business Systems to 9/23/2010; Alcatel USA GP, Inc. to 9/23/2010; Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc. to 9/23/2010; Alcatel USA Resources, Inc. to 9/23/2010; Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. to 9/23/2010; Alcatel-Lucent to 9/23/2010; Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. to 9/23/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. to 9/22/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Infineon Technologies AG to 11/10/2010; Infineon Technologies North America Corp. to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG to 10/18/2010; Micronas USA, Inc. to 10/18/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for National Semiconductor Corporation to 10/6/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Texas Instruments, Inc. to 10/18/2010. (ch, )
August 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Atheros Communications, Inc. to 9/22/2010. (ch, )
August 24, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to 9/7/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 23, 2010 Filing 133 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Renesas Electronics America, Inc..( Heartfield, J)
August 23, 2010 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weinlein, Craig) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2010: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
August 23, 2010 Filing 131 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, Unopposed by Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG, Micronas USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Amanda)
August 23, 2010 Filing 130 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, Unopposed by Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Amanda)
August 23, 2010 Filing 129 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Keranos, LLC by ZiLOG, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 23, 2010 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intel Corporation to 9/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 23, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ubicom, Inc. to 10/1/2010. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 23, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 20, 2010 Filing 127 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubicom, Inc..( Kohm, Bryan)
August 20, 2010 Filing 126 Defendant Intel Corporation's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. ( Cordell, Ruffin)
August 20, 2010 Filing 125 ***FILE IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubicom, Inc..( Kohm, Bryan) Modified on 8/20/2010 (ch, ).
August 20, 2010 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faulkner, Rickey)
August 20, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 125, Application for Extension of time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, or Otherwise Respond by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marlott, John)
August 19, 2010 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Beard, R)
August 19, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
August 19, 2010 Filing 120 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R William Beard, Jr on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Beard, R) Modified on 8/19/2010 (ch, ).
August 19, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce W Slayden, II on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Slayden, Bruce)
August 19, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 120, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Microchip Technology Technology Inc deadline is extended to 9/22/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/18/2010. (ch, )
August 18, 2010 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
August 18, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Microchip Technology, Inc. to 9/22/2010. (ch, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. dealine extended to November 10, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/17/10. (ehs, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants', WINBOND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA and WINBOND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/17/2010. (ch, )
August 17, 2010 Filing 114 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Microchip Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 17, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. to 11/10/2010. (ehs, )
August 17, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Winbond Electronics Corporation to 11/10/2010; Winbond Electronics Corporation America to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 113 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to VIS Micro, Inc.. (ch, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Witcoff, David)
August 13, 2010 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 9, 2010 Filing 110 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph E Mais for Austriamicrosystems AG,Joseph E Mais for Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0023441) (ehs, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 109 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney C Mark Kittredge for Austriamicrosystems AG,C Mark Kittredge for Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0023441) (ehs, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott D Watkins for Samsung Group,Scott D Watkins for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-23880 (ch, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William J Barrow for Samsung Group,William J Barrow for Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-23380. (ch, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by National Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shanberg, Stefani)
August 4, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefani E Shanberg on behalf of National Semiconductor Corporation (Shanberg, Stefani)
August 3, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (Caracappa, John)
August 3, 2010 Filing 103 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul E Poirot for Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5524) (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 Filing 102 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qualcomm, Inc..( Zembek, Richard)
August 3, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Qualcomm, Inc. to 9/21/2010. 34 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 101 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Qualcomm, Inc. served on 7/19/2010 through Registred Agent Corporation Service Co d/b/a CSS Lawyers Incorporating Svc, answer due 8/9/2010. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 100 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel USA GP, Inc. served on 7/19/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., (Jones, Michael)
August 2, 2010 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. and Austriamicrosystems AG have until and through October 6, 2010 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/10. (ehs, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 96 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc..( Andelman, Ethan)
July 30, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. to 9/1/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 30, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Austriamicrosystems AG to 10/6/2010; Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. to 10/6/2010. (ehs, )
July 29, 2010 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for TSMC North America to 11/10/2010; Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. to 11/10/2010. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Alcatel Business Systems to 8/23/2010; Alcatel USA GP, Inc. to 8/23/2010; Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc. to 8/23/2010; Alcatel USA Resources, Inc. to 8/23/2010; Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. to 8/23/2010; Alcatel-Lucent to 8/23/2010; Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. to 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nanya Technology Corporation, USA to 10/21/2010. (ehs, )
July 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Analog Devices, Inc. to 9/21/2010. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Samsung Group and Samsung Semiconductors time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to October 21, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Xiang Long on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Long, Xiang)
July 26, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Otteson on behalf of Keranos, LLC (Otteson, James)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Nanya USAs time to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Keranos, LLCs Complaint is extended to October 21, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Analog Devices, Inc.s response to Plaintiffs Complaint will be due September 21, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., and Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. have until and through August 23, 2010 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. and TSMC North Americas time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Keranos, LLCs Complaint is extended to November 10, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intel Corporation to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Infineon Technologies North America Corp. to 8/26/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Nanya Technology Corporation, USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baik, Steven)
July 23, 2010 Filing 86 Defendant Intel Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.( Cordell, Ruffin)
July 23, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Intel Corporation (Cordell, Ruffin)
July 23, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven S Baik on behalf of Nanya Technology Corporation, USA (Baik, Steven)
July 23, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James H Lin on behalf of Nanya Technology Corporation, USA (Lin, James)
July 23, 2010 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Analog Devices, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moran, Ryan)
July 23, 2010 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan James Moran on behalf of Analog Devices, Inc. (Moran, Ryan)
July 23, 2010 Filing 80 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Infineon Technologies North America Corp..( Heartfield, J)
July 23, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Montgomery, M.)
July 23, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Infineon Technologies North America Corp. (Heartfield, J)
July 23, 2010 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2010 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Slater, Steven)
July 22, 2010 Filing 75 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atheros Communications, Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey)
July 22, 2010 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Dawn Swider on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Swider, Natalie)
July 22, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Clark Knapp on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Knapp, Roger)
July 22, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Howard Slater on behalf of TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd. (Slater, Steven)
July 22, 2010 Filing 71 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re International Business Machines Corporation.(Marlott, John)
July 22, 2010 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caracappa, John)
July 22, 2010 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG, Micronas USA, Inc..( Abraham, Amanda)
July 22, 2010 Filing 68 Defendant's, WINBOND ELECTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Winbond Electronics Corporation America.( Wilcox, Melvin)
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ubicom, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Winbond Electronics Corporation America to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for International Business Machines Corporation to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atheros Communications, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 22, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Micronas USA, Inc. to 8/23/2010; Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 21, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Kohm, Bryan)
July 21, 2010 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubicom, Inc..( Morrow, Charlene)
July 21, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlene M Morrow on behalf of Ubicom, Inc. (Morrow, Charlene)
July 21, 2010 Filing 64 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc..( Weinlein, Craig)
July 20, 2010 Filing 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments, Inc..( Abraham, Amanda)
July 20, 2010 Filing 62 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. ZiLOG, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 61 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Winbond Electronics Corporation America served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Kuang Y Chiu, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 60 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Ubicom, Inc. served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR through Registered agent Thehuy Truong, answer due 7/27/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 59 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. TSMC North America served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Naomi Obinata, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 58 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CTT Corporation, answer due 10/6/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 57 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Toshiba America, Inc. served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR through registered agent The orporatrion Trust Co, answer due 7/27/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 56 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Texas Instruments, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Joseph F Hubach, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 55 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 54 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service, answer due 7/27/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 53 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Renesas Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 52 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc. served on 7/12/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/2/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 51 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. National Semiconductor Corporation served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 50 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Nanya Technology Corporation, USA served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registereed Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 49 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Micronas USA, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 48 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Microchip Technology, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 47 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. International Business Machines Corporation served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Chief Executive Officer Samuel J Palmisano, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Intel Corporation served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 45 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Infineon Technologies North America Corp. served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/27/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 43 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Epson America, Inc. served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent US Corporation Co, answer due 11/10/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR on Registered Agent Friedrich Plankensteiner, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Atheros Communications, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Adam Tachner, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Analog Devices, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered agent Wendy Howell, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel USA Resources, Inc. served on 7/6/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC, answer due 7/27/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Filing 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keranos, LLC. Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc. served on 7/2/2010 by CM RRR through Registered agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 20, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Texas Instruments, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A, LLC deadline extended to November 10,2010 to file answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/19/10. (ehs, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
July 16, 2010 Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Alcatel USA GP, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Qualcomm Inc)(ch, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Seiko Epson Corporation and Epson America Inc deadline is extended to 11/10/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/16/2010. (ch, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Toshiba Corporation and Toshiba America Electronic Components Inc is extended to 10/6/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/16/2010. (ch, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Toshiba America Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/16/2010. (ch, )
July 16, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc., to 10/6/2010; Toshiba Corporation to 10/6/2010. (ch, )
July 16, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Epson America, Inc. to 11/10/2010; Seiko Epson Corporation to 11/10/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 15, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (Montgomery, M.)
July 15, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation (Heartfield, J)
July 15, 2010 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
July 15, 2010 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Toshiba America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
July 14, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robinson Vu on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc. (Vu, Robinson)
July 14, 2010 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Freescale Semiconductor, Inc..( Witcoff, David)
July 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Renesas Electronics America, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 13, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Renesas Electronics America, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
July 13, 2010 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Renesas Electronics America Inc.( Heartfield, J)
July 13, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 13, 2010 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microchip Technology, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Microchip Technology, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microchip Technology, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Keranos, LLC as to Alcatel USA GP, Inc..Summons returned by CT Corporation stating that the State of DE has determined The Corporation Trust Co is not the agent for an entity by the name of Alcatel USA GP Inc, currently, the state lists Corporation Service Co as the agent(ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZiLOG, Inc. to 8/23/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 8, 2010 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZiLOG, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 8, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of ZiLOG, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 8, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A Hawes on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc. (Hawes, Michael)
July 8, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott F Partridge on behalf of Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc. (Partridge, Scott)
July 6, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC (Findlay, Eric)
June 30, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America, Inc.. (ch, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Ubicom, Inc., VIS Micro, Inc., Winbond Electronics Corporation America, ZiLOG, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 VIS Micro Inc, #2 Winbond Electronics, #3 ZiLOG)(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, National Semiconductor Corporation, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, TSMC North America, Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 National Semiconductor Corp, #2 Samsung Semiconductor Inc, #3 TSMC North America, #4 Texas Instruments Inc, #5 Toshiba Am Electronic Corp)(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Microchip Technology, Inc., Micronas USA, Inc., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., Qualcomm, Inc., ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Renesas Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Micarochip Tech Incorp, #2 Micronas USA Inc, #3 NXP Semiconductors USA, #4 Qualcomm Inc, #5 RHOM Semiconductor USA, #6 Renesas Electronics Am Inc)(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc., EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc., Epson America, Inc., Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 EM Microelectronic US Inc, #2 Epson America Inc, #3 Infineon Tech N Am Corp, #4 Intel Corp, #5 International Business Machine)(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Alacatel USA Marketing, #2 Alcatel USA Resources, #3 Alcatel USA Sourcing, #4 Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, #5 Analog Devices, #6 Apple Inc, #7 Atheros Communications)(ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: (CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET) #1 Complaint,,,,,,.. (Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 6/28/2010 (ch, ).
June 24, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 23, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
June 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Alcatel Business Systems, Alcatel USA GP, Inc., Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc., Alcatel USA Resources, Inc., Alcatel USA Sourcing, Inc., Alcatel-Lucent, Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc., Analog Devices, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Austriamicrosystems AG, Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc., EM Microelectronic - Marin SA, EM Microelectronic - U.S., Inc., Epson America, Inc., Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Infineon Technologies AG, Infineon Technologies North America Corp., Intel Corporation, International Business Machines Corporation, Microchip Technology, Inc., Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG, Micronas USA, Inc., NEC Corporation, NXP Semiconductors Netherlands, B.V., NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc., Nanya Technology Corporation, Nanya Technology Corporation, USA, National Semiconductor Corporation, Oki Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Qualcomm, Inc., ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC, Renesas Electronics America, Inc., Renesas Electronics Corporation, Samsung Group, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,, Seiko Epson Corporation, TSMC North America, Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd., Texas Instruments, Inc., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Ubicom, Inc., VIS Micro, Inc., Vanguard International Semiconductor Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation, Winbond Electronics Corporation America, ZiLOG, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2544372.), filed by Keranos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keranos, LLC v. Analog Devices, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co LTD
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Scott D Watkins
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSMC North America
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Natalie Dawn Swider
Represented By: Roger Clark Knapp
Represented By: Steven Howard Slater
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel USA Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation, USA
Represented By: Steven S Baik
Represented By: Hsiang James H. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microchip Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: R William Beard, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austriamicrosystems USA, Inc.
Represented By: C Mark Kittredge
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Rusty D Crandell
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Joseph E Mais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Clay Roth
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Amanda Aline Abraham
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Carl R Roth
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard International Semiconductor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM Microelectronic - Marin SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew V Devkar
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Group
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Scott D Watkins
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Debra Coleman
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Shawn A. Latchford
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Represented By: Emily Merkler Wood
Represented By: John A Marlott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micronas Semiconductor Holding AG
Represented By: Amanda Aline Abraham
Represented By: Carl R Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.,
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Scott D Watkins
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel Business Systems
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Natalie Dawn Swider
Represented By: Roger Clark Knapp
Represented By: Steven Howard Slater
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Hawes
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZiLOG, Inc.
Represented By: David D Eaton
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies AG
Represented By: Adam J Kessel
Represented By: Alan D Smith
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oki Semiconductor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analog Devices, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan James Moran
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Renee DuBord Brown
Represented By: R William Beard, Jr
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP Semiconductors Netherlands, B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Christopher Glenn Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Represented By: Lauren A Degnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winbond Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Steven H Morrissett
Represented By: E Robert Yoches
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atheros Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jonah D Mitchell
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel USA Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.,
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Lawrence Augustine Phillips
Represented By: Michael A Hawes
Represented By: Scott F Partridge
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Debra Coleman
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Garland T Stephens
Represented By: John Philip Brinkmann
Represented By: Katrina G Eash
Represented By: Leeron G Kalay
Represented By: John R Lane
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROHM Semiconductor U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanya Technology Corporation
Represented By: Steven S Baik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline R Koch
Represented By: Bukola T Aina
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Paul Edward Poirot
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: R William Beard, Jr
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Represented By: Stefani E Shanberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By: Andrew V Devkar
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Christopher Peter Broderick
Represented By: Richard de Bodo
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: R William Beard, Jr
Represented By: Richard S Zembek
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NXP Semiconductors USA, Inc.
Represented By: Denise M De Mory
Represented By: Amina Stephanie Dammann
Represented By: Aaron R Hand
Represented By: Ethan B Andelman
Represented By: Brian Christopher Banner
Represented By: Bruce W Slayden, II
Represented By: Jeffrey David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIS Micro, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Dawn Swider
Represented By: Roger Clark Knapp
Represented By: Steven Howard Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel USA GP, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Edward H Rice
Represented By: Marina N Saito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renesas Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Jacqueline R Koch
Represented By: Bukola T Aina
Represented By: Paul Edward Poirot
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infineon Technologies North America Corp.
Represented By: Adam J Kessel
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Alan D Smith
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google |