Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC v. Condesa, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC
Defendant: RV Media LLC doing business as PR 18 Network, MEK Enterprises doing business as eReleases.com, Mass Media Distribution, LLC, Condesa, Inc., PR Worldwide, Inc. and Proven Ways, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00210
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC as to defendant Proven Ways Inc. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/12. (ehs, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/19/2011. (ch, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Deft Proven Ways Inc. All claims dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/17/11. (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File a proposed docket control order and discovery order. Deadline extended to 3/16/11. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/3/11. (ehs, )
March 1, 2011 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit a Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC, Proven Ways, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC as to deft Mass Media Distribution, LLC. Claims dismissed with prejudice, each party will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/11. (ehs, )
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/22/11. (ehs, )
February 22, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (delat, )
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all activities as to Mass Media Distribution, LLC shall be stayed pending execution of a formal written settlement agreement. It is further ORDERED that the formal settlement agreement be executed and a stipulation of dismissal of all claims in this action, Pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, be filed within 15 days. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/15/2011. (ch, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 47 Agreed MOTION to Stay by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 10:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ehs, )
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Status Conference set for 2/16/11 at 10:15 am before Judge T John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on March 2, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/11. (ehs, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - granting #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant RV Media, LLC d/b/a PR 18 Network are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/15/2010. (ch, )
December 13, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - granting #42 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Condesa Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/15/2010. (ch, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - granting #39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by plaintiff and dft PR Worldwide Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/2010. (ch, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Mass Media Distribution, LLC by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - granting #36 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. All claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant MEK Enterprises d/b/a Ereleases.com are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/6/2010. (ch, )
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PR Worldwide Inc deadline to secure substitute counsel and answer is extended to 10/5/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/6/2010. (ch, )
October 4, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 4, 2010 Filing 35 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Second Agreed Motion - by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 30, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for MEK Enterprises to 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant MEK to answer is hereby extended to October 12, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/10. (ehs, )
September 30, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PR Worldwide, Inc. to 10/4/2010. (ehs, )
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PR Worldwide, Inc. to secure substitute counsel and answer is hereby extended to October 4, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/10. (ehs, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MEK Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
September 28, 2010 Filing 31 First ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (Jury Demand), COUNTERCLAIM against Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC by Mass Media Distribution, LLC.(Douglas, Frederic)
September 27, 2010 Filing 30 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 24, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC (Smith, Melissa)
August 16, 2010 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC, RV Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MEK Enterprises to 9/28/2010. 41 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MEK Enterprises.( Tadlock, Charles)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Collin Michael Maloney terminated for deft PR Worldwide Inc.. Defendant PR WORLDWIDE, INC. is directed to secure substitute counsel within forty-five days. Mr. Maloney will remain counsel of record until substitute counsel appears in this matter. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/10. (ehs, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PR Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
August 9, 2010 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Proven Ways, Inc. by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mass Media to answer Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended to September 28, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/10. (ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Mass Media Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglas, Frederic)
July 19, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PR Worldwide, Inc. to 9/17/2010. 60 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PR Worldwide, Inc..( Maloney, Collin)
July 16, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for RV Media LLC to 8/18/2010. (ch, )
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft RV Media LLC deadline is extended to 8/18/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/16/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MEK Enterprises to 8/18/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MEK Enterprises.( Tadlock, Charles)
July 15, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of MEK Enterprises (Tadlock, Charles)
July 14, 2010 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC, RV Media LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2010 Filing 16 Defendant's Proven Ways, Inc., ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC by Proven Ways, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, David)
July 14, 2010 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. Mass Media Distribution, LLC served on 7/9/2010 by CM RRR c/o Rodd Pree designated to accept service of process, answer due 7/30/2010. (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 14 ***DUPLICATE COPY PLEASE IGNORE.***E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Condesa, Inc. (Registered Agent L Lozano). (ch, ) Modified on 7/12/2010 (ch, ).
July 12, 2010 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Condesa, Inc.. (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC as to Condesa, Inc.. (ehs, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Mass Media Distribution, LLC. (ch, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC as to Mass Media Distribution, LLC. (ch, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. PR Worldwide, Inc. served on 6/28/2010 by CM RRR c/o Jason Manheim, answer due 7/19/2010. (ehs, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. MEK Enterprises d/b/a ereleases.com served on 6/28/2010 by CM RRR c/o Mickie E Kennedy Jr, answer due 7/19/2010. (ehs, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. Proven Ways, Inc. served on 6/28/2010 by CM RRR c/o Harvard Business Services, answer due 7/19/2010. (ehs, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. RV Media, LLC d/b/a PR 18 Network served on 6/28/2010 by CMRRR, answer due 7/19/2010. (ehs, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to RV Media, LLC d/b/a PR 18 Network. (Attachments: #1 Proven Ways Inc, #2 PR Worldwide Inc, #3 Mass Media Distribution LLC, #4 MEK Enterprises, #5 Condesa Inc)(ch, )
June 24, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vertigo Holding, LLC for Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Condesa, Inc., MEK Enterprises d/b/a ereleases.com, Mass Media Distribution, LLC, PR Worldwide, Inc., Proven Ways, Inc., RV Media, LLC d/b/a PR 18 Network ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2545834.), filed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Condesa, Inc., MEK Enterprises d/b/a ereleases.com, Mass Media Distribution, LLC, PR Worldwide, Inc., Proven Ways, Inc., RV Media, LLC d/b/a PR 18 Network ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2545834.), filed by Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC v. Condesa, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RV Media LLC doing business as PR 18 Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEK Enterprises doing business as eReleases.com
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mass Media Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Frederic March Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condesa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PR Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Collin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proven Ways, Inc.
Represented By: David Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gooseberry Natural Resources, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?