Lake Cherokee Hard Drive Technologies, L.L.C. v. Bass Computers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lake Cherokee Hard Drive Technologies, L.L.C.
Defendant: Bass Computers, Inc., Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc., LSI Corporation, Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, STMicroelectronics, Inc. and STMicroelectronics, N.V.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00216
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/2012. (ch, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - the Court GRANTS Lake Cherokees Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions (Dkt. No. 208). In light of this ruling, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Marvells and LSIs letter briefs seeking leave to (1) req uest that the Court strike the second amended contentions and (2) move for partial summary judgment of non-infringement based on Lake Cherokees existing infringement contentions. (Dkt. Nos. 213 and 220.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/29/12. (ehs, )
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - ORDERED that Marvells Motion to Disqualify William R. Foland as Expert Witness and Expert Consultant # 147 is GRANTED-IN-PART, as follows: Foland is prohibited from consulting or serving as an expert for Lake Cherokee with regard to Marvells alleged infringement of the patents-in suit, and Foland is prohibited from accessing documents produced by Marvell that have been designated with any level of confidentiality. However, the Motion is also DENIED-IN-PART such th at Folands ability to consult or serve as an expert for Lake Cherokee with regard to other issues in this case, specifically including claim construction and patent validity, is permitted and allowed.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/5/12. (ehs, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - denying defendant's motion for transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/12. (ehs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Cherokee Hard Drive Technologies, L.L.C. v. Bass Computers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Cherokee Hard Drive Technologies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Computers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Global Storage Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tech Data Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STMicroelectronics, N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?