GeoTag Inc v. Starbucks Corp et al
Plaintiff: GEOTAG, INC.
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORP., AFC ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A POPEYE'S CHICKEN AND BISCUITS D/B/A POPEYE'S, BOB EVANS FARMS, INC. D/B/A BOB EVANS, BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS OF MICHIGAN, LLC, BRINKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A CHILI'S D/B/A ROMANO'S MACARONI GRILL D/B/A MAGGIANO'S LITTLE ITALY, BURGER KING CORP., CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC., CEC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. D/B/A CHUCK E. CHEESE'S;, CEC ENTERTAINMENT CONCEPTS, L.P., CICI ENTERPRISES, LP D/B/A CICI'S PIZZA, CINNABON, INC., CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE, INC. D/B/A CRACKER BARREL, DUNKIN' BRANDS, INC. D/B/A DUNKIN DONUTS, DUNKIN DONUTS, INC., DELI MANAGEMENT, INC. D/B/A JASON'S DELI, APPLEBEE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC., APPLEBEE'S IP, LLC, DOCTOR'S ASSOCIATES INC. D/B/A SUBWAY, DOMINO'S PIZZA, INC., DR. PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC., GODFATHER'S PIZZA, INC., GREAT HARVEST BREAD CO., IHOP CORP., IHOP IP, LLC, DINEEQUITY, INC. D/B/A IHOP D/B/A INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PANCAKES, JACK IN THE BOX, INC., LANDRY'S INC. D/B/A CHART HOUSE D/B/A SALT GRASS D/B/A CLAIM JUMPER D/B/A OCEANAIRE D/B/A SALTGRASS, SALTGRASS, INC., THE OCEANAIRE, INC., LITTLE CEASAR ENTERPRISES, INC., ILITCH HOLDINGS, INC., MCDONALD'S CORP., MOE'S SOUTHWEST GRILL, LLC, MSWG, LLC, MOE'S, INC., MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, MR. GATTI'S, L.P., MAMA JIM'S PIZZA, INC. D/B/A MR. JIM'S PIZZA, PANERA BREAD COMPANY, PANERA, LLC, PAPA JOHNS INTERNATIONAL, INC., PAPA JOHNS USA, INC., PIZZA INN, INC., PIZZERIA UNO CORP. and Darden Corporation
Counter_claimant: DELI MANAGEMENT, INC. D/B/A JASON'S DELI, MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, CICI ENTERPRISES, LP D/B/A CICI'S PIZZA, DOCTOR'S ASSOCIATES INC. D/B/A SUBWAY, BURGER KING CORP., PANERA, LLC, PANERA BREAD COMPANY, JACK IN THE BOX, INC., DOMINO'S PIZZA, INC., GODFATHER'S PIZZA, INC., DR. PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC., CEC ENTERTAINMENT CONCEPTS, L.P., CEC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. D/B/A CHUCK E. CHEESE'S;, AFC ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A POPEYE'S CHICKEN AND BISCUITS D/B/A POPEYE'S, CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC., MR. GATTI'S, L.P., CINNABON, INC., MCDONALD'S CORP., DUNKIN' BRANDS, INC. D/B/A DUNKIN DONUTS, DUNKIN DONUTS, INC., DINEEQUITY, INC. D/B/A IHOP D/B/A INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PANCAKES, IHOP IP, LLC, STARBUCKS CORP., Darden Corporation, BRINKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A CHILI'S D/B/A ROMANO'S MACARONI GRILL D/B/A MAGGIANO'S LITTLE ITALY, PAPA JOHNS USA, INC., PAPA JOHNS INTERNATIONAL, INC., APPLEBEE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC., APPLEBEE'S IP, LLC, BOB EVANS FARMS, INC. D/B/A BOB EVANS, BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS OF MICHIGAN, LLC, LITTLE CEASAR ENTERPRISES, INC. and ILITCH HOLDINGS, INC.
Counter_defendant: GEOTAG, INC.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00572
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 857 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 834 Report and Recommendations, 736 Sealed Motion filed by Domino's Pizza Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/07/2014. (nkl, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 640 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the patent-in-suit. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/7/13. (ehs, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2013. (rsp2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoTag Inc v. Starbucks Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEOTAG, INC.
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORP.
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Chibib
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFC ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A POPEYE'S CHICKEN AND BISCUITS D/B/A POPEYE'S
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB EVANS FARMS, INC. D/B/A BOB EVANS
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS OF MICHIGAN, LLC
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRINKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A CHILI'S D/B/A ROMANO'S MACARONI GRILL D/B/A MAGGIANO'S LITTLE ITALY
Represented By: John Thomas Tower
Represented By: John Lawrence Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURGER KING CORP.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC.
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. D/B/A CHUCK E. CHEESE'S;
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEC ENTERTAINMENT CONCEPTS, L.P.
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CICI ENTERPRISES, LP D/B/A CICI'S PIZZA
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINNABON, INC.
Represented By: Robert W Kantner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE, INC. D/B/A CRACKER BARREL
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNKIN' BRANDS, INC. D/B/A DUNKIN DONUTS
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNKIN DONUTS, INC.
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELI MANAGEMENT, INC. D/B/A JASON'S DELI
Represented By: David M Stein
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLEBEE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLEBEE'S IP, LLC
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR'S ASSOCIATES INC. D/B/A SUBWAY
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMINO'S PIZZA, INC.
Represented By: John S Le Roy
Represented By: Thomas W Cunningham
Represented By: Frank A Angileri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Steven J Corr
Represented By: Daniel T Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GODFATHER'S PIZZA, INC.
Represented By: James Claud Tidwell
Represented By: Andre R Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT HARVEST BREAD CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHOP CORP.
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHOP IP, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DINEEQUITY, INC. D/B/A IHOP D/B/A INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PANCAKES
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK IN THE BOX, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDRY'S INC. D/B/A CHART HOUSE D/B/A SALT GRASS D/B/A CLAIM JUMPER D/B/A OCEANAIRE D/B/A SALTGRASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALTGRASS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OCEANAIRE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LITTLE CEASAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILITCH HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDONALD'S CORP.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOE'S SOUTHWEST GRILL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSWG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOE'S, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC
Represented By: Robert W Kantner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. GATTI'S, L.P.
Represented By: Stewart Mesher
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAMA JIM'S PIZZA, INC. D/B/A MR. JIM'S PIZZA
Represented By: Robert D Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANERA BREAD COMPANY
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANERA, LLC
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA JOHNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA JOHNS USA, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIZZA INN, INC.
Represented By: David Lynn Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIZZERIA UNO CORP.
Represented By: Lance Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Corporation
Represented By: C Robert Dorsett, Jr
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DELI MANAGEMENT, INC. D/B/A JASON'S DELI
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: David M Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC
Represented By: Robert W Kantner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CICI ENTERPRISES, LP D/B/A CICI'S PIZZA
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DOCTOR'S ASSOCIATES INC. D/B/A SUBWAY
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: BURGER KING CORP.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PANERA, LLC
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PANERA BREAD COMPANY
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JACK IN THE BOX, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DOMINO'S PIZZA, INC.
Represented By: Frank A Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W Cunningham
Represented By: John S Le Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: GODFATHER'S PIZZA, INC.
Represented By: Andre R Barry
Represented By: James Claud Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DR. PEPPER SNAPPLE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Daniel T Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CEC ENTERTAINMENT CONCEPTS, L.P.
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CEC ENTERTAINMENT, INC. D/B/A CHUCK E. CHEESE'S;
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: AFC ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A POPEYE'S CHICKEN AND BISCUITS D/B/A POPEYE'S
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CALIFORNIA PIZZA KITCHEN, INC.
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MR. GATTI'S, L.P.
Represented By: Stewart Mesher
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CINNABON, INC.
Represented By: Robert W Kantner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MCDONALD'S CORP.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DUNKIN' BRANDS, INC. D/B/A DUNKIN DONUTS
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DUNKIN DONUTS, INC.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: DINEEQUITY, INC. D/B/A IHOP D/B/A INTERNATIONAL HOUSE OF PANCAKES
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: IHOP IP, LLC
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: STARBUCKS CORP.
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Michael Chibib
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Darden Corporation
Represented By: C Robert Dorsett, Jr
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: BRINKER INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A CHILI'S D/B/A ROMANO'S MACARONI GRILL D/B/A MAGGIANO'S LITTLE ITALY
Represented By: John Lawrence Hendricks
Represented By: John Thomas Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PAPA JOHNS USA, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PAPA JOHNS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: APPLEBEE'S INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: APPLEBEE'S IP, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Charkow
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Anthony F Lo Cicero
Represented By: Richard S Mandaro
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: BOB EVANS FARMS, INC. D/B/A BOB EVANS
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: BOB EVANS RESTAURANTS OF MICHIGAN, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: LITTLE CEASAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: ILITCH HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: GEOTAG, INC.
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Charles Van Cleef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?