Lodsys, LLC v. Brother International Corporation et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lodsys Group, LLC and Lodsys, LLC
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC, Brother International Corporation, Trend Micro Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Novell, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Shop MA, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Electronic Arts Inc., HSN, Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., Atari Interactive Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Dell, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Webroot Software, Inc., Network Solutions LLC, Hoovers, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Symantec Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Tivo, Inc., Market America Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, RK Netmedia, Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Walgreen Co., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Foster and Smith, Inc., AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Score Internet Group, LLC, Nike, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., Sleepy's, LLC, Becker Professional Development Corporation and Illusion Labs AB
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and Pete Peterson
Consolidated Plaintiff: Lodsys Group LLC
Counter Claimant: Vitamin Shoppe Inc., Apple, Inc., Atari Interactive, Inc., Square Enix Ltd., Sam's West Inc. and Take-Two Interactive Software Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation and Application Developers Alliance
Case Number: 2:2011cv00090
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2014 Filing 1086 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Dismissal of Vouyer Media, Inc. Without Prejudice (Roth, Kit)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER granting #1084 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice all claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/14. (mjc, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 1084 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 ORDER, granting in part #1081 Third MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement filed by Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ORDERED that if the Parties requesting the stay have not filed a joint motion to dismiss after 30 days, counsel for those parties shall appear for a hearing before the Court on 1/8/2014 08:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/3/13. (mrm, )
November 15, 2013 Filing 1082 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Tindel, Andy)
November 14, 2013 Filing 1081 Third JOINT MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ORDER granting #1079 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Hewlett-Packard Company is dimissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 1079 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Hewlett-Packard Company, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER granting #1077 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Symantec Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (ch, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 1077 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lodsys Group, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER granting #1075 Motion to Stay deadlines. All pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Symantec Corporation are stayed for a period of 5 days while Plaintiff and Defendant execute the terms of the their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/13. (ehs, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 1075 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement Between Plaintiff and Defendant Symantec Corporation by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 ORDER granting #1071 Motion to Stay deadlines. All pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Symantec Corporation are stayed for a period of 5 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/13. (ehs, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 ORDER granting #1070 Motion to Stay deadlines. All pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC are stayed for a period of 25 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/13. (ehs, )
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER granting #1069 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company are stayed for a period of 25 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/13. (ehs, )
October 11, 2013 Filing 1071 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Between Plaintiff and Symantec by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 11, 2013 Filing 1070 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Between Plaintiff and Samsung Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 11, 2013 Filing 1069 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Between Plaintiff and HP by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER granting #1067 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Attorney Kellie M Johnson; Eric Joseph Klein; Fred Irvin Williams; Charles Everingham, IV and Christopher M Huck terminated., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo (United States) Inc. terminated Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/7/13. (ehs, )
October 4, 2013 Filing 1067 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1066 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: claims dismissed (Kaspersky Lab, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1065 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Settled (Symantec Corporation)(Folsom, David)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1064 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Settled (Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC)(Folsom, David)
October 2, 2013 Filing 1063 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Settled (Hewlett-Packard Company)(Folsom, David)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER granting #1058 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Kaspersky Labs, Inc.s with prejudice as to all claims and counterclaims, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/30/13. (ehs, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER granting #1049 Motion to Stay all pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Symantec Corporation are stayed for a period of 15 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/13. (ehs, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER granting #1048 Motion to Stay all pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC are stayed for a period of 15 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/13. (ehs, )
September 30, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Pretrial Conference held on 9/30/2013. Counsel for the parties announced that the case had settled. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
September 28, 2013 Filing 1058 Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims and Counterclaims between Defendant Kaspersky Labs, Inc. and Plaintiff by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 27, 2013 Filing 1057 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vouyer Media, Inc. (sm, )
September 27, 2013 Filing 1056 Proposed Jury Instructions by Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Jury Instructions-Corrected, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Verdict Form-Corrected)(Kniser, Casey)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER granting #1046 Motion to Extend the deadline to Take Deposition from Dr. David Martin to 9/26/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/26/2013. (ch, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER granting #1045 Motion to Stay Deadlines between plaintiff and Dft Hewlett-Packard Companu for 15 days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/26/2013. (ch, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 ORDER granting #1043 Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Proposed Jury Instructions for Presentation at Close of Evidence and Special Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/26/2013. (ch, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 1052 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. Requesting Termination of Electronic Notices (Jalali, Neema)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1051 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. Requesting Termination of Electronic Notices (Barsky, Wayne)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1050 Request by Lodsys Group, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against Vouyer Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F)(Huck, Christopher)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1049 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement as Between Plaintiff and Symantec by Lodsys Group, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 26, 2013 Filing 1048 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement as Between Plaintiff and Samsung Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 26, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY,. Document # 1039, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 26, 2013 Filing 1047 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC re #377 Scheduling Order, - Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Correspondence)(Davis, William)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1046 Joint MOTION to Take Deposition from Dr. David Martin on September 26, 2013 at 8:00AM by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline)(Lopez, Richard)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1045 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1044 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #1000 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Clarification re: Samsung's Duty to Supplement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Supplemental Collins Declaration ISO Clarification Opposition, #12 Appendix Appendix A - Lodsys Source Code Request Dates)(Collins, Kevin)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1043 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #1026 Proposed Jury Instructions by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Jury Instructions, #2 Corrected Verdict Form)(Kniser, Casey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2013: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 ORDER finding as moot motions for jury questonnaires #1017 Motion ; finding as moot #1019 Motion ; finding as moot #1020 Motion ; granting #1036 Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/25/13. (ehs, )
September 25, 2013 Filing 1041 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC re #377 Scheduling Order, - Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Correspondence)(Davis, William)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1040 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC re #377 Scheduling Order, - Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Correspondence)(Davis, William)
September 25, 2013 Filing 1039 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC re #377 Scheduling Order, - Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence)(Davis, William) Modified on 9/26/2013 (sm, ).
September 25, 2013 Filing 1038 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC re #377 Scheduling Order, Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Notice of Correspondence (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Correspondence)(Davis, William)
September 24, 2013 Filing 1037 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Apples counterclaim against Lodsys be and it is DISMISSED AS MOOT. This dismissal for mootness does not bar reassertion of such claims at a future date, either before this Court or elsewhere. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/13. (ehs, )
September 24, 2013 Filing 1036 Joint MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jury Selection Questionnnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 24, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 1030, Joint Motion for jury questionaire is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 24, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG RELIEF WAS USED. Document # 1033, Joint Motion to amend is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 ORDER granting #1032 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Motorola Mobility, LLCs with prejudice. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Motorola Mobility, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/13. (ehs, )
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER granting #1022 Motion to Dismiss. Pla and counterdefendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/2013. (ch, )
September 24, 2013 Filing 1033 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1030 Joint MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Hewlett-Packard Company, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order On Revised Motion for Jury Questionnaire)(Mann, James) Modified on 9/24/2013 (sm, ).
September 24, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, DUPLICATE ENTRY. Document # 1029, Sealed Notice of Joint Jury Instructions and Verdict. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 1032 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1031 SEALED SURREPLY to Response to Motion re #829 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1030 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jury Selection Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 9/24/2013 (sm, ).
September 23, 2013 Filing 1029 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document, Notice of Joint proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Verdict Form. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS, #2 Exhibit PROPOSED VERDICT FORM)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 9/24/2013 (sm, ).
September 23, 2013 Filing 1028 Sealed Proposed Joint Verdict Form (Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1027 Sealed Joint Lodsys and Apple's Proposed Joint Jury Instructions (Smith, Melissa)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1026 Proposed Jury Instructions by Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Proposed Verdict Form)(Roth, Kit)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1025 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lodsys Group, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Ex B - Proposed Verdict Form)(Roth, Kit)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1024 Proposed Jury Instructions by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Ex B - Proposed Verdict Form)(Roth, Kit)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1023 Proposed Jury Instructions by Hewlett-Packard Company, Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Ex B - Proposed Verdict Form)(Huck, Christopher)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1022 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Counterclaims Between Plaintiff and Novell, Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER denying #1006 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are ORDERED to submit proposed jury instructions and verdict form no later than 5:00 pm on September 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/20/13. (ehs, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 1020 Joint MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Lodsys Group, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Jury Questionnaire)(Sacksteder, Michael)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1019 Joint MOTION for Submission of Jury Questionnaire re Lodsys v. Kaspersky by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldfarb, Michael)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1018 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Conducting Mock Trial (Knudson, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1017 Joint MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudson, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1016 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY in Opposition to HP's Reply re #835 SEALED Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys's Infringement Expert filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex J, #2 Ex K)(Roth, Kit)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1015 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #832 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Nicholas P. Godici filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Knudson, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1014 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #834 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Bruce M. Maggs filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Knudson, David)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1013 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Symantec's Reply re #847 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Declaration of R. Moore, #3 Ex A to Declaration of R. Moore)(Huck, Christopher)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1012 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Samsung's Reply re #842 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT DAMAGES filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B)(Huck, Christopher)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1011 SEALED SUR-REPLY In Opposition to #833 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of James T. Carmichael filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie Kramer In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Proposed Testimony of James T. Carmichael, #2 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(Sacksteder, Michael)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1010 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY In Opposition to #843 SEALED PATENT MOTION by Defendant Symantec Corporation to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, PhD. filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex D)(Roth, Kit)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1009 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to HP's Reply re #837 SEALED Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Damages Expert filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B)(Huck, Christopher)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1008 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Symantec's Reply re #848 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B)(Huck, Christopher)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER granting #1000 Sealed Motion for clarification. The Court hereby ORDERS that to the extent Samsung chooses to file a Response to Lodsys Motion, it shall do so by September 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/20/13. (ehs, )
September 19, 2013 Filing 1006 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form (Re: Dkt. 994) by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER granting #999 Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae (the Motion). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/19/13. (ehs, )
September 19, 2013 Filing 1004 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Kaspersky's Reply re #828 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
September 19, 2013 Filing 1003 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Kaspersky's Reply In Support of #830 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER granting #997 Motion to amend jury questionnaire, finding #976 denied as moot. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/13. (ehs, )
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER granting #996 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc.. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/13. (ehs, )
September 18, 2013 Filing 1000 Emergency SEALED MOTION for Clarification re: Samsung's Duty to Supplement by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Goldfarb, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 18, 2013 Filing 999 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae In Support Of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Lodsys, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Intervention of Apple Inc. by Application Developers Alliance, Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nazer, Daniel)
September 18, 2013 Filing 998 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel K Nazer on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Application Developers Alliance (Nazer, Daniel)
September 18, 2013 Filing 997 Amended Joint MOTION for Submission of Jury Questionnaire by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 18, 2013 Filing 996 Joint MOTION to Dismiss re Electronic Arts by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of REVISED Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher).
September 18, 2013 Filing 995 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re #978 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 994 ORDER granting #983 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit their Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form. The Parties shall have up to and including Friday, September 20, 2013 to submit their Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/13. (ehs, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER granting #980 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lodsys Group, LLC., Defendant Quickoffice, Inc.. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice, with all attorneys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/13. (ehs, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER granting #977 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline to complete the deposition of Keith Ugone shall be extended t o until and including September 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/18/13. (ehs, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 991 SEALED RESPONSE to #916 Samsung's SEALED Motions in Limine filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 17, 2013 Filing 990 SEALED RESPONSE to #912 HP's SEALED Motions in Limine filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 17, 2013 Filing 989 SEALED RESPONSE By Symantec Corporation to #913 Lodsys Group, LLC's Omnibus MOTION in Limine filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Whittemore In Support of Symantec Corporation's Response to Plaintiff Lodsys Group LLC's Omnibus Motion in Limine, #2 Exhibit A to Whittemore Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Whittemore Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Whittemore Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Whittemore Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Whittemore Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order Denying Lodsys Group, LLC's Omnibus Motion in Limine)(Sacksteder, Michael)
September 17, 2013 Filing 988 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #913 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Weinstein Core Report, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Ugone Rebuttal Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 LODS027283, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 LODS053561, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 LODS027307, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 LODS053583, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 Combined Infringement Contentions, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 June 21, 2013Email, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Samsung Response to First RFAs, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 078 Reexam, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 LODS012483, #12 Appendix Appendix A, #13 Supplement Declaration of Richard Lopez in Support of Samsung's Responses to Plaintiff's MIL)(Collins, Kevin)
September 17, 2013 Filing 987 SEALED RESPONSE to #914 Symantec's SEALED Motions in Limine filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 17, 2013 Filing 986 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #913 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cunningham, Sean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2013: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). Modified on 9/17/2013 (ch, ).
September 17, 2013 Filing 985 RESPONSE in Opposition re #913 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) (No. 22) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 17, 2013 NOTICE that this document was SEALED per attorney filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. re #982 Response in Opposition to Motion (ehs, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 984 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): #982 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 9/18/2013 (sm, ).
September 17, 2013 Filing 983 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form (Re: Dkt. 938) by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 17, 2013 Filing 982 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #913 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 9/17/2013 SEALED PER ATTORNEY(ehs, ).
September 17, 2013 Filing 981 SEALED RESPONSE to Apple's #887 SEALED MOTION In Limine to Exclude Parol Evidence filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 17, 2013 Filing 980 STIPULATION of Dismissal re Quickoffice Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 16, 2013 Filing 979 REPLY to Response to Motion re #831 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
September 16, 2013 Filing 978 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #943 MOTION to Dismiss the Intervention of Apple Inc. filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Sanders, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 16, 2013 Filing 977 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Certain Deposition by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 16, 2013 Filing 976 Joint MOTION submission of jury questionnaire by Lodsys Group, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 16, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/30/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER granting #972 Motion to Stay all pending deadlines as between Plaintiffs Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. are stayed for an additional period of 15 days while Plaintiffs and Defendant memorialize the terms of their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/13/13. (ehs, )
September 13, 2013 Filing 974 Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Apple, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H1, #9 Exhibit H2, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K1, #13 Exhibit K2, #14 Exhibit K3, #15 Exhibit L)(Smith, Melissa)
September 13, 2013 Filing 973 Proposed Pretrial Order re: Lodsys v. Kaspersky by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2A, #3 Ex 2B, #4 Ex 3, #5 Ex 4, #6 Ex 5A, #7 Ex 5B, #8 Ex 6)(Huck, Christopher)
September 13, 2013 Filing 972 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement (Third) by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Eric)
September 12, 2013 Filing 971 REPLY to Response to Motion re #829 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity On Behalf of Symantec Corporation and On Behalf of All Remaining Defendants filed by Symantec Corporation. (Sacksteder, Michael)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER Regarding Exhibits. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/13. (ehs, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER granting #965 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Kaspersky and Lodsys shall have up to and including September 13, 2013 to file their Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/13. (ehs, )
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting #961 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Apple and Lodsys shall have up to and including September 13, 2013 to file their Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/13. (ehs, )
September 11, 2013 Filing 967 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Amended Report - Settlement [Lenovo (United States) Inc.](Folsom, David)
September 11, 2013 Filing 966 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Amended Report - Settlement (Electronic Arts, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
September 10, 2013 Filing 965 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Pretrial Order re: Losys v. Kaspersky by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 10, 2013 Filing 964 Proposed Pretrial Order re Lodsys v. Symantec by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2A, #3 Ex 2B, #4 Ex 3, #5 Ex 4, #6 Ex 5A, #7 Ex 5B, #8 Ex 6)(Huck, Christopher)
September 10, 2013 Filing 963 Proposed Pretrial Order re Lodsys v. HP by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2A, #3 Ex 2B, #4 Ex 3, #5 Ex 4, #6 Ex 5A, #7 Ex 5B, #8 Ex 6A, #9 Ex 6B)(Huck, Christopher)
September 10, 2013 Filing 962 Proposed Pretrial Order re Lodsys v. Samsung by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2A, #3 Ex 2B, #4 Ex 3, #5 Ex 4, #6 Ex 5A, #7 Ex 5B, #8 Ex 6)(Huck, Christopher)
September 10, 2013 Filing 961 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by Apple, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 10, 2013 Filing 960 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): #947 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 9/10/2013 (sm, ).
September 10, 2013 Filing 959 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): #946 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion.. (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 9/10/2013 (sm, ).
September 10, 2013 Filing 958 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leslie A Kramer on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Kramer, Leslie)
September 9, 2013 Filing 957 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT ( Declaration of Lauren Whittemore cotnained in main document) In Support of #955 Sealed Reply to Response to #847 SEALED PATENT MOTION By Symantec Corporation for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38)(Whittemore, Lauren) Modified on 9/10/2013 (sm, ).
September 9, 2013 Filing 956 SEALED REPLY by Symantec Corporation to Response re #843 SEALED PATENT MOTION by Defendant Symantec Corporation to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, PhD. filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of David D. Schumann In Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, #2 Exhibit A to Schumann Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Schumann Declaration in Support, #4 Exhibit C to Schumann Declaration in Support, #5 Exhibit D to Schumann Declaration in Support)(Schumann, David)
September 9, 2013 Filing 955 SEALED REPLY by Symantec Corporation to Response to #847 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages filed by Symantec Corporation. (Sacksteder, Michael)
September 9, 2013 Filing 954 SEALED REPLY to Response to #848 Defendant Symantec Corporation's SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Lauren Whittemore In Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein, #2 Exhibit A to Whittemore Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Whittemore Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Whittemore Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Whittemore Declaration)(Sacksteder, Michael)
September 9, 2013 Filing 953 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #842 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT DAMAGES filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Collins Declaration In Support of Defendants Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Pre Suit Damages, #2 Exhibit IV-LODSYS 000514, #3 Exhibit IV-LODSYS 000523, #4 Exhibit US5251294)(Collins, Kevin)
September 9, 2013 Filing 952 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #834 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Bruce M. Maggs filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
September 9, 2013 Filing 951 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #837 SEALED MOTION Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Damages Expert filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Knudson, David)
September 9, 2013 Filing 950 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion #832 to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Nicholas P. Godici filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Huck, Christopher)
September 9, 2013 Filing 949 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #835 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Infringement Expert Regarding Accused Products He Failed to Analyze filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Knudson, David)
September 9, 2013 Filing 948 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion #833 to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of James T. Carmichael filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A)(Huck, Christopher)
September 9, 2013 Filing 947 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #830 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Kniser, Casey)
September 9, 2013 Filing 946 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #828 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Kniser, Casey)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER to expedite the deadline for Apples Response to Lodsys Motion. Parties are ORDERED that to the extent Apple chooses to file a Response to Lodsys Motion, it shall do so by or before September 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/9/13. (ehs, )
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER - sua sponte, that the case be submitted to a new round of mediation before the Honorable David Folsom, 6004 Summerfield Drive, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number (903) 255-3250, and fax number (903) 255-3265. Parties to mediate no later than 9/27/13 Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/9/13. (ehs, )
September 7, 2013 Filing 943 MOTION to Dismiss the Intervention of Apple Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 6, 2013 Filing 942 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of 35 U.S.C. 282 Disclosure Statement (Sacksteder, Michael)
September 6, 2013 Filing 941 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Notice under 35 U.S.C. 282 (Fowler, R)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER granting #939 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2013. (ch, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 939 Joint MOTION to Stay All Upcoming Deadlines by Lodsys Group, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER granting #931 Motion to Amend deadlines. Deadline for filing Proposed Jury Instructions and Verdict Form reset to September 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/5/13. (ehs, )
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER setting deadline for response to #928 Sealed Motion for protection. Deadline reset to 9/6/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/13. (ehs, )
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 936 ORDER granting #920 Motion for Extension to Complete Email Production. Deadline reset to 9/9/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/4/13. (ehs, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 935 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #934 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - AMP 108 Online Assessment System by Harvard)(Jones, Michael)
September 4, 2013 Filing 934 RESPONSE in Opposition re #831 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 declaration, #2 Exh 1, #3 Exh 2, #4Exh 3, #5 Exh 4, #6 Exh 5, #7 Exh 6, #8 Exh 7, #9 Exh 8, #10 Exh 9, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Weingaertner, Scott)
September 4, 2013 Filing 933 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Service of Objections to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness List, Objections to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Trial Exibt List, and Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Smith, Melissa)
September 4, 2013 Filing 932 Sealed Notice of Lodsys Group, LLC's Intent to File a Response in Opposition to #928 Motorola's Emergency Motion for Protection. (Huck, Christopher)
September 4, 2013 Filing 931 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #621 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, - Parties' Joint Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 4, 2013 Filing 930 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #767 SEALED MOTION Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Sanders, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Smith, Melissa)
September 4, 2013 Filing 929 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Service of Objections to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Witness List, Objections to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Trial Exhibit List, and Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Smith, Melissa)
September 3, 2013 Filing 928 SEALED MOTION Emergency Motion for Protection by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Weingaertner, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2013: #7 Text of Proposed Order) (ehs, ).
September 3, 2013 Filing 927 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Davis, William)
September 3, 2013 Filing 926 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Sacksteder, Michael)
September 3, 2013 Filing 925 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Weingaertner, Scott)
September 3, 2013 Filing 924 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Smith, Melissa)
September 3, 2013 Filing 923 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Smith, Melissa)
September 3, 2013 Filing 922 NOTICE by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts of Court Proceedings (Kniser, Casey)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 921 ORDER granting #891 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines as between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant QuickOffice, Inc. are stayed for a period of 15 days while Plaintiff and Defendant memorialize the terms of their agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/31/13. (ehs, )
September 3, 2013 Filing 920 Emergency Unopposed MOTION for Extension to Complete Email Production Unopposed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Mod
September 3, 2013 Filing 919 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Cunningham, Sean)
September 3, 2013 Filing 918 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/29/13 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 935-3868 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2013. (sholmes, )
August 30, 2013 Filing 917 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #829 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, and #828 Kaspersky's SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Declaration of D. Abelow, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 30, 2013 Filing 916 SEALED MOTION Motions in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of R. Jason Fowler, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Fowler, R)
August 30, 2013 Filing 915 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Lauren E. Whittemore in Support of Symantec Corporation's Motions in Limine ): #914 SEALED MOTION Motions in Limine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Whittemore, Lauren)
August 30, 2013 Filing 914 SEALED MOTION Motions in Limine by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael)
August 30, 2013 Filing 913 MOTION in Limine (Omnibus) by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 30, 2013 Filing 912 SEALED MOTION Motions in Limine by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting #877 Sealed Patent Motion. Previous Order #824 is hereby vacated. The court does hereby DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE all claims in this action brought by Lodsys against Motorola, to the extent such claims brought by Lodsys arise out of or are based upon products and/or services provided by Oracle Corp. or any of its affiliates, including without limitation RightNow Technologies Inc., Art Technology Group, Inc., and Oracle America, Inc., to Motorola. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/13. (bas, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER ruling on pending motions: finding as moot #736 Motion ; denying #737 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #745 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/13. (ehs, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 1059 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2013 re #736 Opposed MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Samsung Defendants #718 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs #745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
August 29, 2013 Filing 909 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motorola's Sealed Motion #845 for Noninfringement, filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 29, 2013 Filing 908 SEALED RESPONSE In Opposition to HP's #835 SEALED Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Infringement Expert, filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 29, 2013 Filing 907 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motorola's Sealed Motion #846 to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr., filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 29, 2013 Filing 906 SEALED Opposition re #833 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of James T. Carmichael filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation. (Sacksteder, Michael)
August 29, 2013 Filing 905 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Symantec's Sealed Motion re #843 to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, PhD. filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 29, 2013 Filing 904 SEALED RESPONSE In Opposition to Samsung and Motorola's Motion re #842 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT DAMAGES filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 29, 2013 Filing 903 RESPONSE in Opposition re #832 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Nicholas P. Godici filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Knudson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudson, David)
August 29, 2013 Filing 902 RESPONSE in Opposition re #834 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Bruce M. Maggs filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Buergi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudson, David)
August 29, 2013 Filing 901 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Symantec's Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages #847 filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 29, 2013 Filing 900 SEALED RESPONSE In Opposition to Kaspersky's Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin #830 , filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Ex H, #10 Ex I, #11 Ex J, #12 Ex K, #13 Ex L, #14 Ex M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 29, 2013 Filing 899 SEALED Opposition to Symantec's Sealed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein #848 , filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Ex H, #10 Ex I, #11 Ex J, #12 Ex K, #13 Ex L, #14 Ex M, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER granting #886 Motion to Stay. All pending deadlines between Plaintiff and Electronic Arts, Inc. are stayed for a period of 30 days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/13. (bas, )
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER granting #885 Motion to extend deadline. The new deadline is SEPTEMBER 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/13. (bas, )
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER granting #880 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/13. (bas, )
August 28, 2013 Filing 895 SEALED RESPONSE In Opposition to Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Damages Expert #837 , filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Ex H, #10 Ex I, #11 Ex J, #12 Ex K, #13 Ex L, #14 Ex M, #15 Ex N, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 28, 2013 Filing 894 SEALED RESPONSE In Opposition to Motorola's Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein #836 , filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex A, #3 Ex B, #4 Ex C, #5 Ex D, #6 Ex E, #7 Ex F, #8 Ex G, #9 Ex H, #10 Ex I, #11 Ex J, #12 Ex K, #13 Ex L, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 28, 2013 Filing 893 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Samsung's Sealed Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein #838 , filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 28, 2013 Filing 892 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Tindel, Andy)
August 28, 2013 Filing 891 Second MOTION to Stay re #801 Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement as Between Plaintiff and Quickoffice (Unopposed) by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 28, 2013 Filing 890 SEALED Notice of Supplemental Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Samsung (Attachments: (1) Ex A - Rebuttal Expert Report of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D.) (Roth, Kit)
August 28, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 888, Notice of Supplemental Evidence. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 27, 2013 Filing 889 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weingaertner, Scott)
August 27, 2013 Filing 888 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED Notice of Supplemental Evidence Regarding: #737 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Samsung and #797 Plaintiff's Reply. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Rebuttal Expert Report of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D.)(Roth, Kit) Modified on 8/28/2013 (ch, ).
August 27, 2013 Filing 887 SEALED MOTION In Limine to Exclude Parol Evidence by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Sanders, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 27, 2013 Filing 886 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement as Between Plaintiff and Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 27, 2013 Filing 885 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Serve Objections and Rebuttal Disclosures by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey)
August 27, 2013 NOTICE ***FILED IN WRONG CASE BY DEPUTY CLERK PLEASE IGNORE DOCUMENT #884 Order, should have been filed in case 2:11cv290 Variant Holdings (ehs, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ***FILED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE IGNORE***ORDER/Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice of all claims and counterclaims between plaintiffs and the Carlson Defendants, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, all costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 8/27/2013 (ehs, ).
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER granting #876 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Intervenor Apple Inc. shall have up to and including September 4, 2013 to respond to Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Opposition to Apples Motion for Summary Judgment, and that Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC shall have up to and including September 24, 2013 to respond to Intervenor Apple Inc.s Reply in support of Apples Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/4/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/13. (ehs, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER granting #872 Motion to Stay all pending deadlines as between Plaintiffs Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. are stayed for an additional period of 20 days while Plaintiffs and Defendant memorialize the terms of their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/13. (ehs, )
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER granting #875 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 8/30/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/13. (ehs, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 880 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions in Limine by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER granting #874 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/13. (ehs, )
August 23, 2013 Filing 878 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Pastakia, #2 Exhibit 10 - June 21-25 email chain, #3 Exhibit 11 - July 8 email from R, #4 Exhibit 12 - Aug 4-8 email chain, #5 Exhibit 13 - July 2 Dubois transcript, #6 Exhibit 14 - Lodsys Pretrial Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit 15 - Aug 20 Martin rough transcript)(Jones, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 877 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Entering Dismissal by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Weingaertner, #2 Exhibit 1 - Aug 4-7 email chain, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lodsys Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #4 Exhibit 3 - July 1 to Aug 1 email chain, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 23, 2013 Filing 876 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 23, 2013 Filing 875 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #828 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b), #829 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, #831 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 22, 2013 Filing 874 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #830 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 22, 2013 Filing 873 NOTICE by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Kniser, Casey)
August 21, 2013 Filing 872 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement (Second) by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Second Agreed Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement)(Klein, Eric)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER granting #870 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/20/13. (ehs, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 870 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Permit Certain Depositions) by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER granting #867 Motion to Withdraw #718 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER granting #799 Motion to Dismiss. Lodsys Group, LLCs claims against Electronic Arts, Inc. to the extent based on The Sims 3 for iOS. Electronic Art, Inc.s counterclaims and affirmative defenses against Lodsys Group, LLC to the extent based on The Sims 3 for iOS. Electronic Arts, Inc.s First Affirmative Defense for License/Exhaustion of Patent Rights and First Sale; and Electronic Arts, Inc.s First Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment that Lodsyss Claims against EA Are Barred by Virtue of Apple Inc.s License to U.S. Patent Nos. 7,222,078 and 7,620,565 and the Doctrines of Patent Exhaustion and First Sale, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs incurred in prosecuting and defending the above-listed claims, counterclaims, and affirmative defenses are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/19/13. (ehs, )
August 19, 2013 Filing 867 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #718 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudson, David)
August 19, 2013 Filing 866 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Pretrial Disclosures (Weingaertner, Scott)
August 19, 2013 Filing 865 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
August 19, 2013 Filing 864 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Sacksteder, Michael)
August 19, 2013 Filing 863 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Roth, Kit)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER granting #857 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant Samsung shall have up to 2 additional pages for its Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/19/13. (ehs, )
August 19, 2013 Filing 861 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Knudson, David)
August 19, 2013 Filing 860 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures to Plaintiff (Smith, Melissa)
August 19, 2013 Filing 859 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
August 16, 2013 Filing 858 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Collins Supplemental Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
August 16, 2013 Filing 857 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Sur-Reply on Motion for Sanctions by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 14, 2013 Filing 856 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #767 SEALED MOTION Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 14, 2013 Filing 855 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Thomas Haslam, III on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Haslam, Robert)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER granting #822 Motion to Dismiss deft Dell. Deft Dell is dismissed with prejudice, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs with respect to such claims are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/12/13. (ehs, )
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER granting #821 Motion to Dismiss to deft Lexmark International Inc.. All claims and counterclaims dismissed with prejudice, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/12/13. (ehs, )
August 12, 2013 Filing 852 REPLY to Response to Motion re #745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Huck, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Huck, Christopher)
August 12, 2013 Filing 851 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): #830 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin.. (Kniser, Casey)
August 12, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED ON DOCKET SEPARATELY Document # 839, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 12, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on #737 Sealed Motion for Sanctions against Samsung Defendants, #736 Opposed Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing, #718 Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs, #745 Motion for Sanctions Against Motorola Mobility, LLC.: Motions Hearing RESET for 8/29/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 11, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #737 Sealed Motion for Sanctions against Samsung Defendants, #736 Opposed Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing, #718 Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs, #745 Motion for Sanctions Against Motorola Mobility, LLC.: Motions Hearing set for 8/29/2013 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 11, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 8/29/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 10, 2013 Filing 850 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Dkt 848): Declaration of Lauren Whittemore in Support of Symantec Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Weinstein Core Expert Report and Exs, #2 Exhibit B - Weinstein Symantec Expert Report and Ex 1, #3 Exhibit C - Norton Automatic Renewal Service FAQ, #4 Exhibit D - SYM_L_00000620, #5 Exhibit E - pcworld_top-paid-antivirus for 2011, #6 Exhibit F - pcworld_bodyguard, #7 Exhibit G - http___www.pcmag.com_article2_0,2817,2372364,00, #8 Exhibit H - pcmag.com_article2_0,2817,2402583,00, #9 Exhibit I - pcmag.com_article2_0,2817,2369749,00, #10 Exhibit J - SYM_L_00021709, #11 Exhibit K - SYM_L_00021840, #12 Exhibit L - Choi and Weinstein Article, #13 Exhibit M - Nash 1950 Econometrica, #14 Exhibit N - Nash 1953 Econometrica, #15 Exhibit O - Myerson 1991 Chapter 8, #16 Exhibit P - Varner CV, #17 Exhibit Q - Symantec 10-K FY Ended 3-29-13, #18 Exhibit R - 2013 06 25 Blake, Jordan 30(b)6 (Mini)(1))(Whittemore, Lauren)
August 10, 2013 Filing 849 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Lauren Whittlemore is contained in main document): #847 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Sacksteder, Michael) Modified on 8/12/2013 (sm, ).
August 10, 2013 Filing 848 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas R. Varner, Ph.D, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed_Order_for_Weinstein_Daubert.pdf)(Whittemore, Lauren)
August 9, 2013 Filing 847 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Symantec Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment on Pre-Suit Damages)(Sacksteder, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 846 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of David M. Martin Jr. by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of B. Banner, #2 Exhibit 1 - Report of Dr. Martin re Motorola - 2, #3 Exhibit 2 - Report of Dr. Martin re Motorola - 3, #4 Exhibit 3 - Lodsys Infringement Contention against MML, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2012-05-16 Price ltr to Roth, #6 Exhibit 5 - 2012-07-13 Roth ltr to Price, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 845 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Noninfringement by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacobson, #2 Exhibit 1 - Oracle Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2013-04-25 Lodsys Production Email, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2013-01-11 Production, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2013-02-05 Production, #6 Exhibit 5 - 2013-06-07 Weingaertner ltr to Huck re Oracle license, #7 Exhibit 6 - RightNow v. Lodsys - E.D.Wis, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2013-07-02 DuBois transcript (mini), #9 Exhibit 8 - Oracle v. Lodsys (E.D.Wis), #10 Exhibit 9 - K.Roth to K. Pastakia, #11 Exhibit 10 - Lodsys Infringement Contention against MML, #12 Exhibit 11 - Exhibit M13, #13 Exhibit 12 - Exhibit M14, #14 Exhibit 13 - custhelp, #15 Exhibit 14 - motorola-global-en-usa.custhelp, #16 Exhibit 15 - whois_results, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 844 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #841 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein. (Barsky, Wayne)
August 9, 2013 Filing 843 SEALED PATENT MOTION by Defendant Symantec Corporation to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, PhD. by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Declaration of David D. Schumann In Support Symantec Corporation's Motion to Exclude Testimony of David Martin, PhD., #2 Exhibit 1 to Schumann Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Schumann Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Schumann Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Schumann Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Schumann Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Schumann Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Schumann Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Schumann Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Exclude Testimony of David Martin PhD.)(Sacksteder, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 842 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO PRE-SUIT DAMAGES by Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Collins, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Affidavit Declaration of Bailey, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 9, 2013 Filing 841 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Barsky, Wayne)
August 9, 2013 Filing 840 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #837 SEALED MOTION Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Damages Expert.. (Knudson, David) Modified on 8/12/2013 (ch, ).
August 9, 2013 Filing 839 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #835 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Infringement Expert Regarding Accused Products He Failed to Analyze.. (Knudson, David) Modified on 8/12/2013 (ch, ).
August 9, 2013 Filing 838 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ROY WEINSTEIN by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Collins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 9, 2013 Filing 837 SEALED MOTION Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Damages Expert by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Knudson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2013: #8 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
August 9, 2013 Filing 836 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Pastakia, #2 Exhibit 1 - Weinstein Report (Core), #3 Exhibit 2 - Weinstein Report (MML), #4 Exhibit 3 - An Analytical Solution, #5 Exhibit 4 - Taming Complex IP Compensation, #6 Exhibit 5 - The Bargaining Problem, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 835 SEALED MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Lodsys' Infringement Expert Regarding Accused Products He Failed to Analyze by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Knudson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2013: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
August 9, 2013 Filing 834 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Dr. Bruce M. Maggs by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2013 Filing 833 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of James T. Carmichael by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2013 Filing 832 MOTION to Exclude Proposed Expert Testimony of Nicholas P. Godici by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2013 Filing 831 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Counterclaims and Affirmative Defenses by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Huck, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D, #6 Ex. E, #7 Ex. F, #8 Ex. G, #9 Ex. H, #10 Ex. I, #11 Ex. J, #12 Ex. K, #13 Ex. L, #14 Ex. M, #15 Ex. N, #16 Ex. O, #17 Ex. P, #18 Ex. Q, #19 Ex. R, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2013 Filing 830 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Roy Weinstein and David Martin by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Casey Kniser, #3 Exhibit 1 - Weinstein Report, #4 Exhibit 2 - Weinstein Core Report, #5 Errata 3 - Martin Report)(Kniser, Casey)
August 9, 2013 Filing 829 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of L. Jacobson, #2 Exhibit 1 - USP 7,620,565, #3 Exhibit 2 - USP 7,222 078, #4 Exhibit 3 - USP 5,999,908, #5 Exhibit 4 - '565 Reexam, #6 Exhibit 5 - '078 reexam, #7 Exhibit 6 - Abelow (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 7 - Flagg (min), #9 Exhibit 8 - FLAGG_Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 9 - FLAGG_Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 10 - FLAGG_Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 11 - OA Granting Reexam - '565 patent, #13 Exhibit 12 - OA Granting Reexam - '078 patent, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 9, 2013 Filing 828 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 102(b) by Electronic Arts Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Casey Kniser, #3 Exhibit 1 - App No. 07/926,333, #4 Exhibit 2 - App No. 08/243,638, #5 Exhibit 3 - US Patent 7,620,565, #6 Exhibit 4 - Contract, #7 Exhibit 5 - Agreement, #8 Exhibit 6 - Abelow Depo, #9 Errata 7 - Flagg Depo, #10 Exhibit 8 - Summary Report, #11 Exhibit 9 - Prior Inventorship Dec, #12 Exhibit 10 - Online Assessment)(Kniser, Casey)
August 9, 2013 Filing 827 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC)(Folsom, David)
August 9, 2013 Filing 826 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Hewlett-Packard Company)(Folsom, David)
August 9, 2013 Filing 825 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Kaspersky Lab, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ***THIS ORDER IS HEREBY VACATED PER ORDER #911 ***ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS re #819 Notice (Other) filed by Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/13. (bas, ) Modified on 8/30/2013 (bas, ).
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER granting #818 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Lodsys, LLC and Substitute Lodsys Group, LLC filed by Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/13. (bas, )
August 9, 2013 Filing 822 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2013 Filing 821 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lexmark International, With Prejudice by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 8, 2013 Filing 820 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Service of P.R. 3-6 Amended Invalidity Contentions to Plaintiff (Knudson, David)
August 8, 2013 Filing 819 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Claims (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 8, 2013 Filing 818 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Lodsys, LLC and Substitute Lodsys Group, LLC by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 8, 2013 Filing 817 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC of Disclosure of Expert Reports (Roth, Kit)
August 8, 2013 Filing 816 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hewlett-Packard Company Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Notice of Service of Expert Reports to Plaintiff (Knudson, David)
August 8, 2013 Filing 815 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts Inc. Notice of Expert Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER granting #805 Motion for one day extension to serve expert report. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/13. (bas, )
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER granting #810 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to respond to Intervenor Apples Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsyss Claims Against Apple Developers. Responses due by 8/14/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/13. (ehs, )
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting #804 Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/13. (bas, )
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting #800 Motion to Stay Deadlines between Plaintiffs and Novell, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/7/13. (bas, )
August 7, 2013 Filing 810 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #767 SEALED MOTION Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 7, 2013 Filing 809 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Expert Disclosures (Weingaertner, Scott)
August 7, 2013 Filing 808 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation (Schumann, David)
August 7, 2013 Filing 807 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Notice of Expert Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ***FILED IN ERROR. CORRECT ORDER IS DKT. #814. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER granting #805 Motion for 48-hour extension to serve expert report. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/13. (bas, ) Modified on 8/8/2013 (bas, ).
August 6, 2013 Filing 805 Unopposed MOTION for One-Day Extension to Serve Rebuttal Expert Report on Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 8/8/2013 (bas, ).
August 6, 2013 Filing 804 Joint MOTION to Extend Certain Deadlines for Service of Pretrial Disclosures as Between Plaintiffs and Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER granting #793 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Report of Dr. Martin Buncher. Deadline is 8/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/5/2013. (ch, )
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER granting #791 Motion to Stay deadlines Pendign Finalized Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/5/2013. (ch, )
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER granting #796 Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Agreement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/2013. (ch, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 800 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 6, 2013 Filing 799 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims, Counterclaims, and Affirmative Defenses between Plaintiff and Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 798 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT Supp. Declaration of Roth ISO Reply re #797 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions against Samsung (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J, #11 Ex K, #12 Ex L, #13 Ex M, #14 Ex N, #15 Ex O, #16 Ex P, #17 Ex Q, #18 Ex R)(Roth, Kit) Modified on 8/6/2013 (sm, ).
August 5, 2013 Filing 797 REPLY to Response to Motion re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Roth, Kit)
August 5, 2013 Filing 796 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Agreement as Between Plaintiff and Defendant Quickoffice, Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER setting status conference, ( Status Conference set for 8/28/2013 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/2/13. (ehs, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER granting #790 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Docket Control Order in this case is amended to allow for the deposition of non-party NVIDIA Corporation to be completed by August 7, 2013. Should Samsung settle its case with Lodsys prior to the August 7, 2013 deposition, this extension of time shall apply with equal force to the remaining defendants in. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/2/13. (ehs, )
August 2, 2013 Filing 793 Unopposed MOTION for a 48-Hour Extension to Serve the Expert Report of Dr. Martin Buncher by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudson, David)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER granting #789 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/2/2013. (ch, )
August 2, 2013 Filing 791 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Finalized Settlement by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Williams, Fred) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 2, 2013 Filing 790 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery OPPOSED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 1, 2013 Filing 789 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #788 Opposition to Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 1, 2013 Filing 788 RESPONSE in Opposition re #745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Pastakia, #2 Exhibit 1 - P R 3-1 Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2012-05-16 Price ltr to Roth, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2013-06-07 Weingaertner ltr to Huck re Oracle license, #5 Exhibit 4 - 2012-11-02 Motorola's Response to Lodsys 1st Common RFP (Nos 1-34), #6 Exhibit 5 - Kit 7 8 email, #7 Exhibit 6 - LDJ 7 9 email, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2013-05-13 Motorola's Objections and Responses to Lodsys's 30(b)(6), #9 Exhibit 8 - MML witnesses, #10 Exhibit 9 - 7 12 motion to extend, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 1, 2013 Filing 787 Unopposed MOTION to Set Case for Status Conference by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 1, 2013 Filing 786 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Symantec Corporation (Smith, Michael)
July 31, 2013 Filing 785 NOTICE by Network Solutions LLC for Termination of Electronic Notices (McSwane, Douglas)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER granting #781 Motion to Dismiss, all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Dell, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/13. (ehs, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER granting #780 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (ehs, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER granting #777 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/29/13. (ehs, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 781 Joint MOTION to Dismiss to All Claims and Counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Dell, Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 26, 2013 Filing 780 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to File a Motion to Compel by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 26, 2013 Filing 779 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #772 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Rowe, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 26, 2013 Filing 778 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #772 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin B. Collins, #2 Exhibit 1 (Additional Docs #2), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Smith, Melissa)
July 26, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #776 Sealed additional attachment submitted by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. No certificate of authority to seal was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
July 26, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTORNEY MUST REFILE. Documents # 773-775, Responses to motions. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 26, 2013 Filing 777 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 25, 2013 Filing 776 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #772 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration Of Kevin B. Collins In Support Of Defendants Samsungs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Sanctions, #2 Supplement Declaration Of Jeffrey Rowe In Support Of Defendants Samsungs Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Sanctions)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 7/26/2013 (sm, ).
July 25, 2013 Filing 775 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 031 - 2013-5-30 Samsung Supp Responses to Lodsys First Set of Common, #2 Exhibit Ex 032 - Samsung Response to 30(b)(6) Notice 05212013, #3 Exhibit Ex 033 - RE_ Lodsys v. Brother et al. - Notices of Deposition, #4 Exhibit Ex 034 - Lodsys Rule 30(b)(6) Dates, #5 Exhibit Ex 035 - Samsung 30b6 Depositions, #6 Exhibit Ex 036 - RE_ Lodsys_Samsung - Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit Ex 037 - RE_ Lodsys_Samsung, #8 Exhibit Ex 038 - RE_ Lodsys_Samsung, #9 Exhibit Ex 039 - RE_ Lodsys_Samsung, #10 Exhibit Ex 040 - RE_ Lodsys_Samsung, #11 Exhibit Ex 041 - Samsung Collins Letter to Lodsys 07022013, #12 Exhibit Ex 042 - RE_ Activity in Case 2_11-cv-00090-JRG Lodsys, LLC v. Brother International Corporation et al Sealed Motion)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 7/26/2013 (sm, ).
July 25, 2013 Filing 774 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 021 - 40 Day Extension, #2 Exhibit Ex 022 - 2012 10 31 Samsung Responses, #3 Exhibit Ex 023 - Lodsys - Production of Samsung Documents, #4 Exhibit Ex 024 - Marketing Documents, #5 Exhibit Ex 025 - Lodsys - Production of Samsung Documents, #6 Exhibit Ex 026 - Lodsys Source Code Review Dates, #7 Exhibit Ex 027 - Lodsys v. Samsung - Discovery Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex 028 - 2013 04 23 Samsung Letter to Huck re Document Production, #9 Exhibit Ex 029 - Lodsys April 12 Letters, #10 Exhibit Ex 030 - 2013 04 23 Samsung Letter to Huck re Discovery Deficiencies)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 7/26/2013 (sm, ).
July 25, 2013 Filing 773 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 011 - Claims Asserted Against Brother Defendants, #2 Exhibit Ex 012 - Products Accused in Brother Litigation, #3 Exhibit Ex 013 - Lodsys Lawsuits, #4 Exhibit Ex 014 - Samsung Document Production, #5 Exhibit Ex 015 - SAM0000004, #6 Exhibit Ex 016 - SAM0015082, #7 Exhibit Ex 017 - SAM0012920, #8 Exhibit Ex 018 - SAM0010918, #9 Exhibit Ex 019 - PO Negotiation, #10 Exhibit Ex 020 - May 13 Letter to Kevin Collins)(Collins, Kevin) Modified on 7/26/2013 (sm, ).
July 25, 2013 Filing 772 RESPONSE in Opposition re #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 01 - Samsung - Disclosure of Claims and Contentions, #2 Exhibit Ex 02 - Samsung - Disclosure of Accused Products, #3 Exhibit Ex 03 - Samsung Ex D mini, #4 Exhibit Ex 04 - Samsung Ex E mini, #5 Exhibit Ex 05 - Samsung Ex F mini, #6 Exhibit Ex 06 - Samsung Ex G mini, #7 Exhibit Ex 07 - Samsung Ex H mini, #8 Exhibit Ex 08 - Samsung Ex I mini, #9 Exhibit Ex 09 - Samsung Ex J mini, #10 Exhibit Ex 010 - Brother Accused Products)(Collins, Kevin)
July 23, 2013 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICIAL COURT REPORTER AND INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING DAILY TRANSCRIPTS : Effective August 1, 2013, Shelly Holmes will become the Official Court Reporter for this Court due to the retirement of Susan Simmons as Official Court Reporter. To the extent the current Docket Control Order in this case directs contact with Ms. Simmons to arrange for daily transcripts, you should (on and after August 1, 2013) contact Shelly Holmes at: Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov in lieu of contacting Ms. Simmons, in this regard. (jml)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER granting #768 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/23/2013. (ch, )
July 23, 2013 Filing 770 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #767 SEALED MOTION Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Smith, Melissa)
July 23, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 769, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 22, 2013 Filing 769 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Additional Attachments to Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers [Dkt. 767] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/23/2013 (sm, ).
July 22, 2013 Filing 768 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Service of Expert Reports as between Lodsys and Kaspersky by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 22, 2013 Filing 767 SEALED MOTION Intervenor Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Barring Lodsys's Claims Against Apple Developers by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Sanders Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Sanders Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Sanders Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Sanders Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Sanders Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Sanders Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Sanders Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Sanders Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Sanders Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Sanders Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Sanders Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Sanders Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Sanders Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Sanders Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Sanders Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Sanders Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Sanders Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Sanders Declaration, #20 Exhibit R to Sanders Declaration, #21 Exhibit S to Sanders Declaration, #22 Exhibit T to Sanders Declaration, #23 Exhibit U to Sanders Declaration, #24 Exhibit V to Sanders Declaration, #25 Exhibit W to Sanders Declaration, #26 Exhibit X to Sanders Declaration, #27 Exhibit Y to Sanders Declaration, #28 Exhibit Z to Sanders Declaration, #29 Exhibit AA to Sanders Declaration, #30 Goldberg Declaration, #31 Exhibit A to Goldberg Declaration, #32 Exhibit B to Goldberg Declaration, #33 Exhibit C to Goldberg Declaration, #34 Exhibit D to Goldberg Declaration, #35 Quinn Declaration, #36 Murphy Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
July 22, 2013 Filing 766 RESPONSE in Opposition re #736 Opposed MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing filed by Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER granting #763 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2013. (ch, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER granting #762 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Deadlines. Deadline extended to 7/26/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2013. (ch, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 763 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel Discovery with respect to Lodsys and Lenovo by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 18, 2013 Filing 762 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel with respect to Electronic Arts by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting #754 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hoovers With Prejudice filed by Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC. Hoovers, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/18/13. (mrm, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 760 NOTICE by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. of Service of Pytlovany Expert Report (Kniser, Casey)
July 17, 2013 Filing 759 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Klein, Eric)
July 17, 2013 Filing 758 NOTICE by Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation Notice of Service of Expert Reports to Plaintiff (Weingaertner, Scott)
July 17, 2013 Filing 757 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Service of Expert Reports to Plaintiff (Knudson, David)
July 17, 2013 Filing 756 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Everingham, Charles)
July 17, 2013 Filing 755 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Report to Plaintiff (Smith, Melissa)
July 17, 2013 Filing 754 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hoovers With Prejudice by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 16, 2013 Filing 753 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC regarding Expert Reports (Roth, Kit)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #750 Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline filed by Lodsys, LLC, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. ( Mediation Completion due by 7/19/2013.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/13. (mrm, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER denying as moot #308 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot #331 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/13. (mrm, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 750 Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by Hewlett-Packard Company, Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER granting #744 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/13. (ehs, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER granting #743 Motion for Extension of Time to File motions to compel with respect to Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. to July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/13. (ehs, )
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER granting #742 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for Lodsys Group, LLC to file a motion to compel Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. is extended to July 19, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/13. (ehs, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 746 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate)(Huck, Christopher)
July 12, 2013 Filing 745 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC or Alternatively MOTION TO COMPEL by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 12, 2013 Filing 744 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 12, 2013 Filing 743 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions to Compel Discovery with respect to Lodsys and Lenovo by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 12, 2013 Filing 742 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel with Respect to EA by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER granting #740 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Gannon; Justin P Hayes; Paul J Hayes; Dean G Bostock and John L Capone terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Lexmark. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/10/13. (ehs, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 740 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
July 8, 2013 Filing 739 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America, #738 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Authority)(Roth, Kit)
July 5, 2013 Filing 738 SEALED Declaration of Kit W. Roth In Support of: #737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F, #7 Ex. G, #8 Ex. H, #9 Ex. I, #10 Ex. J, #11 Ex. K, #12 Ex. L, #13 Ex. M, #14 Ex. N, #15 Ex. O, #16 Ex. P, #17 Ex. Q, #18 Ex. R, #19 Ex. S, #20 Ex. T, #21 Ex. U, #22 Ex. V, #23 Ex. W, #24 Ex. X, #25 Ex. Y, #26 Ex. Z, #27 Ex. AA, #28 Ex. BB, #29 Ex. CC, #30 Ex. DD, #31 Ex. EE)(Roth, Kit)
July 5, 2013 Filing 737 SEALED MOTION for Sanctions against Defendants Samsung Electronics, Samsung Electronics America, and Samsung Telecommunications America by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
July 3, 2013 Filing 736 Opposed MOTION Motion to Limit the Number of Asserted Patent Claims and Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Alexander Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 3, 2013 Filing 735 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. (Chassman, Peter)
July 2, 2013 Filing 734 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eugene A Feher (Feher, Eugene)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER - Pete Peterson appointed to the position of technical advisor has submitted his invoice for services through May 30, 2013, payments to be promptly made to Mr. Peterson at the 112 E. Pecan Street, Suite 1800, San Antonio, Texas 78205. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/1/13. (ehs, )
June 26, 2013 Filing 732 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Weingaertner, Scott)
June 26, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, MOTION IS REQUIRED TO FILE. Document # 730, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER granting #721 Motion to Dismiss. Dft RK Netmedia Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2013. (ch, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 730 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company re #718 MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs Defendant Hewlett-Packard Companys Notice of Withdrawal of its Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs (Knudson, David) Modified on 6/26/2013 (sm, ).
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER granting #711 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Amended deadlines must occur by August 6, 2013, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER on Notice of Compliance - Letter Briefs re #673 #674 #668 , #671 #670 , #667 #678 #675 #679 #672 Each motion for summary judgment that a party joins in will be counted towards their 60 page maximum pursuant to L.R. cv-7(a)(3). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Filing 727 Letter Brief filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply ltr Brief)(Kniser, Casey)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER granting #710 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice all claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant GMCI Internet Operations, Inc.. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER granting motion #709 extending deadlines as set forth herein. Motions terminated: #709 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Depositions of Certain Defendants filed by Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER granting motion to extend certain deadlines (Complete Discovery due by 8/20/2013., Expert Witness Exhibit List due by 7/16/2013.)and other deadlines as set forth nerein, Motions terminated: #707 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines Regarding Expert Reports and Expert Discovery filed by Lodsys, LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Filing 723 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Service of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 24, 2013 Filing 722 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Huck, Christopher)
June 24, 2013 Filing 721 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant RK Netmedia, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 24, 2013 Filing 720 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Service of HP's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Knudson, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 719 NOTICE by Electronic Arts Inc. of Service of Electronic Arts, Inc.'s Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
June 21, 2013 Filing 718 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #869 *** MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Responses from Plaintiffs by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Erin) Modified on 8/20/2013 (ehs, ).
June 21, 2013 Filing 717 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of Service of Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Court's Discovery Order (Sacksteder, Michael)
June 21, 2013 Filing 716 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Service of Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement and Discovery Responses (Knudson, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 715 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lenovo (United States) Inc. Supplemental Disclosures (Williams, Fred)
June 21, 2013 Filing 714 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Electronic Arts, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 713 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Apple, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 712 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Motorola Mobility LLC a/k/a Motorola Mobility, Inc.(Folsom, David)
June 21, 2013 Filing 711 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Non-Party NVIDIA Corporation by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 710 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 709 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Depositions of Certain Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 708 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #698 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, #695 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, #703 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Authority)(Huck, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 707 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines Regarding Expert Reports and Expert Discovery by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Docket Control Order) #2 Exhibit B - Redline Proposed Docket Control Order) (Roth, Kit) Modified on 6/21/2013 (sm, ).
June 20, 2013 ***ENTRY WAS MODIFIED BY CLERK, PER ATTY, TO REFLECT THE DOCUMENT ENTRY IS NOW SEALED. Document # 703, Letter Brief. (sm, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 706 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 705 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 704 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 703 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 6/20/2013 (sm, ).
June 19, 2013 Filing 702 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 701 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 700 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 699 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 698 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 697 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 696 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 695 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 694 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 693 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 692 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
June 19, 2013 Filing 691 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF SYMANTEC CORPORATION (Sacksteder, Michael)
June 19, 2013 Filing 690 Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weingaertner, Scott)
June 14, 2013 Filing 689 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the patents-in-suit. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Within thirty (30) days of the issuance of this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the parties are hereby ORDERED, in good faith, to mediate this case with the mediator agreed upon by the parties..(ehs, )
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ORDER granting #687 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Lodsys Group, LLC to serve its initial expert reports concerning Lenovo (United States) Inc. is extended to July 17, 2013, the exchange of rebuttal reports is extended to August 7, 2013, and the deadline to complete expert discovery of Lodsys and Lenovos experts be extended to August 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/14/13. (ehs, )
June 12, 2013 Filing 687 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding 30(B)(6) Deposition of Defendant Lenovo by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER granting #684 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. the deadline for Lodsys Group, LLC to serve its initial expert reports concerning Symantec Corporation is extended to July 8, 2013, the exchange of rebuttal reports is extended to July 29, 2013, and the deadline to complete expert discovery of Lodsys Group, LLCs and Symantec Corporations experts be extended to August 9, 2013.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/11/13. (ehs, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 685 NOTICE by Nike, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Renk, Christopher)
June 10, 2013 Filing 684 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Defendant Symantec Coporations Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 7, 2013 Filing 683 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jay I Alexander on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4171921. (Alexander, Jay)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER granting #664 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/13. (ehs, )
June 7, 2013 Filing 681 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James P Hughes on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4171042. (Hughes, James)
June 6, 2013 Filing 680 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Cert of authority): #669 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief.. (Kniser, Casey) Modified on 6/6/2013 (sm, ).
June 5, 2013 Filing 679 Letter Brief filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Williams, Fred)
June 5, 2013 Filing 678 Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc. on behalf of all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Brief - On-Sale Bar)(Weingaertner, Scott)
June 5, 2013 Filing 677 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Brief re: License Defense)(Weingaertner, Scott)
June 5, 2013 Filing 676 SEALED Letter Brief for permission to file Motions for summary judgment filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Smith, Melissa)
June 5, 2013 Filing 675 Letter Brief filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Novell, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Barsky, Wayne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 674 Letter Brief filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Novell, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Barsky, Wayne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 673 Letter Brief filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Barsky, Wayne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 672 Letter Brief filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Barsky, Wayne)
June 5, 2013 Filing 671 Letter Brief filed by Symantec Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sacksteder, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Filing 670 Letter Brief filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huck, Christopher)
June 5, 2013 Filing 669 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief)(Kniser, Casey)
June 5, 2013 Filing 668 Letter Brief filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mann, James)
June 5, 2013 Filing 667 Letter Brief filed by Novell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Letter Brief)(Braithwaite, Jared)
June 5, 2013 Filing 666 Letter Brief filed by Novell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1--Letter Brief regarding Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity, #2 Exhibit 2--Letter Brief regarding Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement)(Sears, Lannie)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER granting #663 Motion to Dismiss deft Rovio Entertainment Ltd with prejudice. All claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/13. (ehs, )
June 4, 2013 Filing 664 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 3, 2013 Filing 663 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rovio Entertainment Ltd., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 3, 2013 Filing 662 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neema Jalali on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (Jalali, Neema)
May 31, 2013 Filing 661 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #619 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Regarding Inequitable Conduct filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc.. (Weingaertner, Scott)
May 29, 2013 Filing 660 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Lenovo US Inc. and Dell, Inc)(Folsom, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 659 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (Lexmark International, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 658 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse (Symantec Corporation)(Folsom, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 657 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ketan Pastakia on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4157129. (Pastakia, Ketan)
May 21, 2013 Filing 656 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
May 20, 2013 Filing 655 REPLY to Response to Motion re #619 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Regarding Inequitable Conduct filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huck, Christopher)
May 20, 2013 Filing 654 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/13 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082 (shellyholmes@skynetcountry.com).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2013. (sholmes, )

May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER granting #651 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/17/13. (mrm, )
May 17, 2013 Filing 652 NOTICE by HSN, Inc. -- Request for Termination of Electronic Notices -- (Thames, Earl)
May 16, 2013 Filing 651 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #621 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,, by Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER granting #649 Motion to Dismiss by Nike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 15, 2013 Filing 649 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nike, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
May 14, 2013 Filing 648 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Kniser, Casey)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #639 Motion to Unseal Documents # 580, 585,586, 587,588, 594, 595, 604, 605, 609, and 619, 620, documents are unsealed. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/13/13. (ehs, )
May 13, 2013 Filing 646 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Feher, Eugene)
May 10, 2013 Filing 645 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Symantec Corporation. (Sacksteder, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 644 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hoovers, Inc.. (Nguyen, Daniel)
May 10, 2013 Filing 643 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dell, Inc.. (Chassman, Peter)
May 10, 2013 Filing 642 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Erickson, Brian)
May 10, 2013 Filing 641 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Novell, Inc.. (Braithwaite, Jared)
May 10, 2013 Filing 640 RESPONSE in Opposition re #619 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Regarding Inequitable Conduct filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redline of Def 3rd Amended Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 10, 2013 Filing 639 Unopposed MOTION to Unseal Document by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weingaertner, Scott)
May 10, 2013 Filing 638 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC of Praecipe to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses (Huck, Christopher)
May 9, 2013 Filing 637 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Barsky, Wayne)
May 9, 2013 Filing 636 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2013 Filing 635 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Jones, Michael)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER granting #633 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Knudson; Carrie L Williamson; John M Guaragna and James M Heintz and Mark Fowler terminated as counsel for Nike Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/9/2013. (ch, )
May 8, 2013 Filing 633 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nike, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER granting #627 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Network Solutions, LLCs., with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/3/13. (ehs, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 631 NOTICE by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. Notice of Filing Defendant Kaspersky Lab, Inc.'s Claim Construction Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Presentation)(Gillam, Harry)
May 3, 2013 Filing 630 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Notice of Filing Defendants' Claim Construction Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Presentation)(Smith, Melissa)
May 3, 2013 Filing 629 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC of Additional Slides Presented at Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Kit)
May 2, 2013 Filing 627 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Network Solutions, LLC, by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
May 2, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, MOTION IS REQUIRED TO WITHDRAW. Document # 626, Notice of withdrawal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 626 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Lexmark International, Inc. of Withdrawal of Attorney Appearance of Dean G. Bostock (Bostock, Dean) Modified on 5/2/2013 (sm, ).
May 2, 2013 Filing 625 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Thompson, Gregory)
April 30, 2013 Filing 628 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 4/30/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (bga, )
April 29, 2013 Filing 624 NOTICE by Adidas America, Inc., Adidas America, Inc., Apple, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Vouyer Media, Inc. Regarding the Order of Terms to be Presented at the Claim Construction Hearing (Dacus, Shannon)
April 27, 2013 Filing 623 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Lamb on behalf of Apple, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC (Lamb, William)
April 25, 2013 Filing 622 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Mann, James)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER ( Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/1/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2013.) Claim Construction Hearing on 4/30/2013 at 1:30 pm in Marshall. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/22/2013. (sm, )
April 23, 2013 Filing 620 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authorization to seal) : #619 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Regarding Inequitable Conduct.. (Huck, Christopher) Modified on 4/23/2013 (sm, ). Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 22, 2013 Filing 619 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 *** SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Affirmative Defenses Regarding Inequitable Conduct by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 22, 2013 Filing 618 NOTICE by Brother International Corporation, GFI Software, Inc., Score Internet Group, LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2013 Filing 617 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit)
April 22, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 616, Submission of agreed order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 19, 2013 Filing 616 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit) Modified on 4/22/2013 (sm, ).
April 19, 2013 Filing 615 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Kit)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #612 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses. Responses due by 4/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/17/13. (ehs, )
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #611 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants amended counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/16/2013. (sm, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 612 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Amended Counterclaims by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
April 15, 2013 Filing 611 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Amended Answers and Additional Defenses by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting #608 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant GFI Software, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/2013. (ch, )
April 10, 2013 Filing 609 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of authorization): #604 Sealed Patent Document,.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/10/2013 (sm, ). Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 10, 2013 Filing 608 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant GFI Software, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
April 10, 2013 Filing 607 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan D Albright on behalf of Hewlett-Packard Company (Albright, Alan)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting #603 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roderick R McKelvie terminated as counsel for Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/10/13. (ehs, )
April 9, 2013 Filing 605 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Sealed Document. (Second Amended Answer & Counterclaim to Lodsys Group Complaint by Symantec Corp) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Abelow Depo), #2 Exhibit 2 (Flagg Depo), #3 Exhibit 3 (565 Declaration re Inventorship), #4 Exhibit 4 (078 Declaration re Inventorship), #5 Exhibit 5 (333 App Oath), #6 Exhibit 6 (638 App Oath), #7 Exhibit 7 (Abelow - Flagg HBS Contract), #8 Exhibit 8 (Abelow - Flagg HBS Contract Clarification), #9 Exhibit 9 (Flagg 1990 Invalidity Chart for 565), #10 Exhibit 10 (Flagg 1990 Invalidity Chart for 078), #11 Exhibit 11 (Abelow - Flagg IP Contract))(Sacksteder, Michael) Modified on 4/10/2013 (sm, ). Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 9, 2013 Filing 604 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff Lodsys, LLC's Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 8, 2013 Filing 603 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting #597 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 4-5(d). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/4/13. (mrm, )
April 4, 2013 Filing 601 NOTICE by HSN, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Muffo, Patrick)
April 4, 2013 Filing 599 Defendant Novell, Inc.'s SEALED First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Goehringer, Charles)
April 4, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #598 Amended Answer submitted by Novell, Inc.. Exhibits were not identified per local rules and wrong event used. Correction must be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER - parties may file substantive objections to the appointment of Mr. Peterson within 10 days from the date of this Order. If no objections are received the parties are deemed to consent to Mr. Petersons appointment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/13. (ehs, )
April 3, 2013 Filing 598 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Novell, Inc.'s First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Brennan, Sterling) Modified on 4/4/2013 (sm, ).
April 3, 2013 Filing 597 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-5(d) by Apple, Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Vouyer Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
April 2, 2013 Filing 596 Rovio Entertainment Ltd.'s Sealed Second Amended Answer to Lodsys, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Rho, Jennifer)
April 2, 2013 Filing 595 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Sealed Second Amended Answer to Lodsys, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Electronic Art (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Rho, Jennifer) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 1, 2013 Filing 594 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Dell Inc.'s Sealed First Amended Answer and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Complaint.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Chassman, Peter) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting #590 Motion to Amend/Correct Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/1/2013. (ch, )
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER, Pete Peterson added as Technical Advisor.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/13. (mrm, )
March 29, 2013 Filing 591 REPLY regarding #555 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Kit Roth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Roth, Kit)
March 29, 2013 Filing 590 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #578 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,,,,, by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey)
March 29, 2013 Filing 589 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NIKE, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF LODSYS GROUP, LLC'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 1 - deposition transcript, #2 2 - deposition transcript, #3 3 - declaration, #4 4 - declaration, #5 5 - combined declaration and power of attorney, #6 6 - combined declaration and power of attorney, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9 - claim chart, #10 10 - claim chart, #11 11 - memorandum)(Hill, Jack)
March 29, 2013 Filing 588 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s Sealed Second Amended Answer to Lodsys, LLC's Complaint for Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
March 29, 2013 Filing 587 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Lexmark Int., Inc.'s Sealed Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim(s). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Feher, Eugene) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
March 28, 2013 Filing 586 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Quickoffice, Inc. Sealed Second Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Weingaertner, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
March 28, 2013 Filing 585 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Motorola Mobility, LLC Sealed Second Amended Answer, Additional Defenses and Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Weingaertner, Scott) Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
March 28, 2013 Filing 584 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kerry L Konrad on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4067862. (Konrad, Kerry)
March 28, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER JUDGE, FILED IN WRONG CASE. Document # 583, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER JUDGE, PLEASE IGNORE***ORDER All pending deadlines are stayed for a period of 60 days pending enrollment of new counsel for Plaintiff due to the death of Plaintiffs counsel, Reese Andrews. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/27/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 3/28/2013 (sm, ).
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Honorable David Folsom, 6004 Summerfield Drive, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number (903) 255-3250, and fax number (903) 255-3265, is hereby appointed mediator in the above-styled case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/27/13. (ehs, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #580 Sealed Motion for leave to amend their answers and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/25/2013. (sm, )
March 22, 2013 Filing 580 ***UNSEALED PER ORDER #647 ***Unopposed SEALED MOTION For Defendants to Seek Leave to Amend their Answers and Counterclaims by Motorola Mobility LLC, Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer & Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit A-9, #11 Exhibit A-10, #12 Exhibit A-11)(Weingaertner, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2013: #13 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). Modified on 5/21/2013 (ehs, ).
March 22, 2013 Filing 579 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Liu on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd (Liu, Shawn)
March 18, 2013 Filing 578 Defendants' RESPONSE to #555 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Vouyer Media, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Kaspersky Lab, Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Declaration of Kevin B. Collins in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA (Part 1 of 2), #30 Exhibit AA (Part 2 of 2), #31 Exhibit BB)(Chassman, Peter)
March 18, 2013 NOTICE the parties are instructed to file a joint proposed amended docket control order reflecting the new claim construction date and any dates affected by the change.(bga, )
March 18, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 4/30/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting #576 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Rosetta Stone, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/15/2013. (ch, )
March 14, 2013 Filing 576 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rosetta Stone, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
March 13, 2013 Filing 575 NOTICE by Trend Micro Incorporated of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Heartfield, J)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #572 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Sams West, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2013. (ch, )
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2013. (ch, )
March 11, 2013 Filing 572 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sam's West, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
March 8, 2013 Filing 571 NOTICE by Nike, Inc. pursuant to Tex. Disciplinary R. Profl Conduct 1.11 (Hill, Jack)
March 8, 2013 Filing 570 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Nike, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER of Dismissal of defendant HSN Inc.. All claims and counterclaims asserted between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant HSN, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/13. (ehs, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER granting #567 Motion to Dismiss. All of Lodsys Group, LLCs claims against Defendant Webroot Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/2013. (ch, )
March 5, 2013 Filing 567 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Webroot, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
March 5, 2013 Filing 566 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant HSN, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER granting #560 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2013. (sm, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting #559 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2013. (sm, )
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting #561 Motion to exchange Privilege Log deadline. Deadline for Sams West to exchange privilege logs with Plaintiffs extended to March 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/5/13. (ehs, )
March 1, 2013 Filing 562 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #531 MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
February 28, 2013 Filing 561 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 26, 2013 Filing 560 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Lowell)
February 25, 2013 Filing 559 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Electronic Arts Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rho, Jennifer)
February 21, 2013 Filing 558 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christian J Hansen on behalf of Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4010378. (Hansen, Christian)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER granting #554 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lodsys shall have up to and including March 15, 2013 to file its answer to the Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/20/13. (mrm, )
February 20, 2013 Filing 556 REPLY to Response to Motion re #531 MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 19, 2013 Filing 555 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kit Roth, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Roth, Kit)
February 19, 2013 Filing 554 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Defendants Rosetta Stone's Counterclaims, to Complete Discovery, and to Exchange Privilege Logs by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
February 15, 2013 Filing 553 Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC's Original ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims [dkt. no. 541] of Defendant HSN, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting #550 Motion for Extension of Time to File Technical Tutorials. Deadline is 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/15/2013. (ch, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 551 RESPONSE to Motion re #531 MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
February 14, 2013 Filing 550 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Technical Tutorials by Adidas America, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Vouyer Media, Inc., Webroot Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER granting #547 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Seth W Black and Joseph M Shapiro terminated as counsel for Novell Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/11/13. (ehs, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER granting #546 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline for Defendant Dell Inc. to serve its privilege log is extended to 2/19/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/11/13. (ehs, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 547 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph M. Shapiro, Seth W. Black and Workman Nydegger by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Joseph)
February 7, 2013 Filing 546 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Defendant Dell Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Privilege Log by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
February 5, 2013 Filing 545 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jared J Braithwaite on behalf of Novell, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3986084. (Braithwaite, Jared)
February 4, 2013 Filing 544 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC of Change of Firm Name (Huck, Christopher)
February 1, 2013 Filing 543 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lannie Rex Sears on behalf of Novell, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3982454. (Sears, Lannie)
February 1, 2013 Filing 542 ANSWER to #517 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Rosetta Stone, Inc..(Suppes, John)
February 1, 2013 Filing 541 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC by HSN, Inc..(Muffo, Patrick)
January 31, 2013 Filing 540 Plaintiffs' Original ANSWER to #525 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Rovio Entertainment LTD., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 539 Plaintiffs' Original ANSWER to #524 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 538 Plaintiffs' Original ANSWER to #522 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Symantec Corporation by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 537 Plaintiffs' Original ANSWER to #521 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Quickoffice, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 536 Plaintiffs' Original Answer ANSWER to #519 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Lenovo, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 535 Plaintiffs' Original ANSWER to #518 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Filing 534 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher J Renk on behalf of Nike, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3979589. (Renk, Christopher)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #526 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/13. (ehs, )
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting #528 Motion to supplement invalidity contentions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/13. (ehs, )
January 30, 2013 Filing 531 MOTION Clarification Regarding Submission of Expert Declarations re #505 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting #527 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Kaspersky Lab, Inc. may file a 7-page Response Brief, and that Plaintiff may accordingly add 7 additional pages to its Reply Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/13. (ehs, )
January 30, 2013 Filing 529 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael J Harris on behalf of Nike, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3977892. (Harris, Michael)
January 29, 2013 Filing 528 Unopposed MOTION Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Hewlett-Packard Company, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Novell, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2013 Filing 527 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Claim Construction Briefing by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey)
January 29, 2013 Filing 526 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages regarding Claim Construction Briefing by Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Vouyer Media, Inc., Webroot Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 18, 2013 Filing 525 Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC, Lodsys Group, LLC by Rovio Mobile Ltd.(Lo, Jason)
January 18, 2013 Filing 524 Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Lo, Jason)
January 18, 2013 Filing 523 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Webroot Software, Inc..(Sauer, Peter)
January 18, 2013 Filing 522 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by Symantec Corporation. (Sacksteder, Michael)
January 18, 2013 Filing 521 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
January 18, 2013 Filing 520 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Hewlett-Packard Company.(Erickson, Brian)
January 18, 2013 Filing 519 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by Lenovo (United States) Inc..(Williams, Fred)
January 18, 2013 Filing 518 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Banner, Brian)
January 18, 2013 Filing 517 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Rosetta Stone, Inc., filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER granting #515 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims. Claims against Defendants Kaspersky Lab, Inc. and Webroot Software, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/17/2013. (ch, )
January 16, 2013 Filing 515 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims against Defendants Kaspersky Lab, Inc., and Webroot Software, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER granting #510 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims against HSN, Inc., and Nike Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/2013. (ch, )
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #506 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims against Sam's West Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/2013. (ch, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 512 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip David Price on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Price, Phillip)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #501 Motion to Dismiss deft Overstock.com. All claims against deft Overstock.com are dismissed without prejudice, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/13. (ehs, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 509 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting #238 Motion for Reconsideration ; Granting and Denying #241 Motion, Granting the issue of Severance but Denying the issue to transfer. FURTHER ORDERED that motions to sever filed in 2:12cv291, 2:12cv286 also be GRANTED and that Hewlett Packard Company, Lexmark International Inc, GMCI Internet Operations, Playboy Enterprises, Inc, RK Netmedia Inc and HSN, Inc are severed to new cases and then CONSOLIDATED back into the LEAD case 2:11cv90.; DENYING #303 and #304 Motions to Stay Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2013. (sm, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice #503 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants filed by Lodsys Group, LLC., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation and Cabela's Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2013. (sm, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #502 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants filed by Lodsys Group, LLC., Walgreen Co., Foster and Smith, Inc. and Recreational Equipment, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2013. (sm, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 506 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims Defendant Sam's West, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2013 (sm, ).
January 14, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE. Document #504 , Notice. See Document #505 for corrected Notice.*** (ehs, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 505 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT #504 ***NOTICE by Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 (replacing Docket No. 504) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Proposed Claim Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - CV of Joseph Bailey)(Chassman, Peter) Modified on 1/14/2013 (ehs, ).
January 11, 2013 Filing 504 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT #505 ***NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Parties' Proposed Claim Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - CV of Joseph Bailey)(Chassman, Peter) Modified on 1/14/2013 (ehs, ).
January 11, 2013 Filing 503 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 11, 2013 Filing 502 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 11, 2013 Filing 501 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Overstock.com, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting #499 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David R Wright terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2013. (ch, )
January 9, 2013 Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David R. Wright by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(Shapiro, Joseph)
January 8, 2013 Filing 498 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc E Montgomery on behalf of GFI Software, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3943722. (Montgomery, Marc)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting #496 Motion to Dismiss deft The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. All claims are dismissed with prejudice, all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/7/13. (ehs, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 496 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting #493 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Vitamin Shoppe, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2013. (ch, )
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Trend Micro Incorporated terminated., and GRANTING #489 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated filed by Lodsys Group, LLC.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/2/2013. (sm, )
January 2, 2013 Filing 493 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting #488 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/2/2013. (ch, )
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #487 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/2/2013. (ch, )
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting #486 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Atari Interactive, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/2/2013. (ch, )
December 28, 2012 Filing 489 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 26, 2012 Filing 488 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 26, 2012 Filing 487 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AVG Technologies USA, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 21, 2012 Filing 486 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Atari Interactive, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 21, 2012 Filing 485 NOTICE by Score Internet Group, LLC re #464 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Olmedo-Rodriguez, Jennifer)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, Hulu, LLC terminated., GRANTING #480 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hulu, LLC filed by Lodsys Group, LLC.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/2012. (sm, )
December 19, 2012 Filing 483 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 Disclosure (Roth, Kit)
December 19, 2012 Filing 482 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. P.R. 4-2 (Kniser, Casey)
December 18, 2012 Filing 481 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atari Interactive Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-2 (Chassman, Peter)
December 18, 2012 Filing 480 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hulu, LLC by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #478 Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/17/12. (ehs, )
December 14, 2012 Filing 478 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
December 13, 2012 Filing 477 Amended NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atari Interactive Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Amended Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-1 (Chassman, Peter)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER granting #475 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Christopher Bunt terminated as counsel for Network Solutions LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/12. (ehs, )
December 11, 2012 Filing 475 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Network Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
December 11, 2012 Filing 474 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Network Solutions LLC (McSwane, Douglas)
December 10, 2012 Filing 473 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tivo, Inc. Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Tindel, Andy)
December 10, 2012 Filing 472 NOTICE by Adidas America, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc. of REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Low, John)
December 5, 2012 Filing 471 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 Disclosure (Roth, Kit)
December 5, 2012 Filing 470 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atari Interactive Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GFI Software, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Symantec Corporation, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., Vouyer Media, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-1 (Chassman, Peter)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER granting #468 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline extended to 12/10/12. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/12. (ehs, )
December 4, 2012 Filing 468 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) by Tivo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
December 4, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. in Compliance with P.R. 3.3 and 3.4 (Kniser, Casey)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #461 Motion to Dismiss. Charming Shoppes, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/4/2012. (ch, )
December 4, 2012 Filing 465 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc. in Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Stinson, Andrew)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting #459 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Score Internet Group, LLCs. Defendant Score Internet Group, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/4/12. (ehs, )
December 4, 2012 Filing 463 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. regarding PR 3-4(a) Compliance (Jones, Michael)
December 3, 2012 Filing 462 NOTICE by Network Solutions LLC of Compliance as to P.R. 3-4(a) (Bunt, Robert)
December 3, 2012 Filing 461 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Charming Shoppes, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 3, 2012 Filing 460 RESPONSE to #448 Notice (Other) of Joinder in Motion to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-Pending Supplier Infringment Action by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
December 3, 2012 Filing 459 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Score Internet Group, LLC, by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
November 29, 2012 Filing 458 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alice J Ahn on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3893138. (Ahn, Alice)
November 28, 2012 Filing 457 NOTICE by GFI Software, Inc. of Joinder re P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 455, Notice of Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #454 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Square Enix, Ltd.s.. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/28/12. (ehs, )
November 27, 2012 Filing 455 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GFI Software, Inc. re Joinder in P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/28/2012 (sm, ).
November 27, 2012 Filing 454 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Square Enix, Ltd., by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
November 21, 2012 Filing 453 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M Shapiro on behalf of Novell, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3884119. (Shapiro, Joseph)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #432 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (ch, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting #436 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (ch, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting #439 Motion for Extension for Compliance with P.R. 3-4. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (ch, )
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting #440 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2012. (ch, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 448 NOTICE by Overstock.com, Inc. re #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action (Notice of Joinder) (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Neeshan)(Guaragna, John)
November 20, 2012 Filing 447 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. in Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Stinson, Andrew)
November 20, 2012 Filing 446 NOTICE by Webroot Software, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-3(a) (Sauer, Peter)
November 20, 2012 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #434 Motion for joinder submitted by Overstock.com, Inc.. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
November 20, 2012 Filing 445 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tivo, Inc. Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Tindel, Andy)
November 19, 2012 Filing 444 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quickoffice, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Banner, Brian)
November 19, 2012 Filing 443 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hoovers, Inc. Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Nguyen, Daniel)
November 19, 2012 Filing 442 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. Notice of Disclosure Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4(a) (Chassman, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 441 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Atari Interactive Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hoovers, Inc., Network Solutions LLC, Nike, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd., Symantec Corporation, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. Notice of Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Chassman, Peter)
November 19, 2012 Filing 440 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) by GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stinson, Andrew)
November 19, 2012 Filing 439 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Network Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Bonnie)
November 19, 2012 Filing 438 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Symantec Corporation (Sacksteder, Michael)
November 19, 2012 Filing 437 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. pursuant to PR 3-4(a) (Barsky, Wayne)
November 19, 2012 Filing 436 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) by Tivo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
November 19, 2012 Filing 435 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rosetta Stone, Inc. (Suppes, John)
November 19, 2012 Filing 434 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Joinder in and Adoption of Defendants Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabelas Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Nike, Inc., and The Mens Wearhouse, Inc., Motion to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-Pending Supplier Infringement Action by Overstock.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Nasheen, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) Modified on 11/20/2012 (sm, ).
November 19, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HSN, Inc. (Muffo, Patrick)
November 19, 2012 Filing 432 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re: PR 3-3 and 3-4 by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kniser, Casey)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #430 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2012. (ch, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 430 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding PR 3-4A by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 16, 2012 Filing 429 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Score Internet Group, LLC re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2012 Filing 428 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GFI Software, Inc. re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2012 Filing 427 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard Anthony Lopez on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3875001. (Lopez, Richard)
November 9, 2012 Filing 426 Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to #384 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant GFI Software, Inc., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting #422 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Sleepy's LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2012. (ch, )
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #419 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2012. (ch, )
November 8, 2012 Filing 423 NOTICE by Adidas America, Inc., BestBuy.com LLC, Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc. REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Low, John)
November 7, 2012 Filing 422 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sleepy's LLC by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
November 7, 2012 Filing 421 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Quickoffice, Inc. of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Order (Jacobson, Lowell)
November 7, 2012 Filing 420 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
November 7, 2012 Filing 419 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosure Deadline by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 7, 2012 Filing 418 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
November 7, 2012 Filing 417 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rovio Mobile Ltd Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
November 7, 2012 Filing 416 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Electronic Arts Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barsky, Wayne)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #410 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2012. (ch, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 414 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by Score Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2012. (ch, )
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting #391 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2012. (ch, )
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting #390 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/2/2012. (ch, )
November 2, 2012 Filing 410 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by GFI Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 1, 2012 Filing 409 NOTICE by Webroot Software, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sauer, Peter)
November 1, 2012 Filing 408 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kaspersky Lab, Inc. Initial Disclosures Under Rule 26(a)(1) (Kniser, Casey)
November 1, 2012 Filing 407 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with Discovery Order (Roth, Kit)
November 1, 2012 Filing 406 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc. of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's Discovery Order (Stinson, Andrew)
October 31, 2012 Filing 405 NOTICE by Hoovers, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Nguyen, Daniel)
October 31, 2012 Filing 404 NOTICE by Symantec Corporation of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Court's Discovery Order (Sacksteder, Michael)
October 31, 2012 Filing 403 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HSN, Inc. (Muffo, Patrick)
October 31, 2012 Filing 402 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Williams, Fred)
October 31, 2012 Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosures by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
October 31, 2012 Filing 400 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hulu, LLC Notice of Initial Disclosures (Bernstein, Matthew)
October 31, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Chassman, Peter)
October 31, 2012 Filing 398 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tivo, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
October 31, 2012 Filing 397 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
October 31, 2012 Filing 396 NOTICE by Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., Nike, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Walgreen Co. of Compliance With Initial Disclosures (Guaragna, John)
October 31, 2012 Filing 395 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rosetta Stone, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Smith, Michael)
October 31, 2012 Filing 394 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Network Solutions LLC Notice of Initial Disclosures (Bunt, Robert)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #389 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/31/2012. (ch, )
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER granting #388 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/31/2012. (ch, )
October 31, 2012 Filing 391 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosure Deadline by Sleepy's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Shannon)
October 31, 2012 Filing 390 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosure Deadline by AVG Technologies USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2012 Filing 389 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosures by Electronic Arts Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Take-Two Interactive Software Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pezzano, Amanda)
October 30, 2012 Filing 388 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosure Deadline by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting #386 Motion to Dismiss. Brother International Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/29/2012. (ch, )
October 23, 2012 Filing 386 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 22, 2012 Filing 385 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC re #382 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Corrected Caption (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huck, Christopher)
October 22, 2012 Filing 384 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by GFI Software, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2012 Filing 383 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GFI Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent GFI USA Holding Company, Inc. for GFI Software, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2012 Filing 382 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
October 19, 2012 Filing 381 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
October 18, 2012 Filing 380 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #308 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
October 16, 2012 Filing 379 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Adam Suppes on behalf of Rosetta Stone, Inc. (Suppes, John)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 DISCOVERY ORDER, #372 Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery Order filed by Apple, Inc. now terminated per order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/2012. (sm, )
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Selection set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 5/14/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/30/2013.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/2012. (sm, )
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 376 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/2012. (sm, )
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting #353 Notice of Dismissal filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Motions terminated:, Shop MA, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/12. (mrm, )
October 15, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, DOCUMENT IS SAME AS #373 EXCEPT FOR REVISED PROPOSED ORDER, CLERK IS GOING TO ATTACH THE REVISED ORDER TO #373. Document # 374, Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 12, 2012 Filing 374 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #373 Joint MOTION Entry of Protective Order.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 10/15/2012 (sm, ).
October 12, 2012 Filing 373 Joint MOTION Entry of Protective Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2012: #2 REVISED PROTECTIVE ORDER) (sm, ).
October 12, 2012 Filing 372 Joint MOTION Entry of Discovery Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2012 Filing 371 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2012 Filing 370 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Filing Sur-Reply to Defendant Webroot's Motion to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. 299, Docket No. #45 , Originally Filed in Case No. 2:12-cv-290 (Huck, Christopher)
October 9, 2012 Filing 369 REPLY to Response to Motion re #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Nike, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guaragna, John)
October 9, 2012 Filing 368 REPLY to Response to Motion re #304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Foster and Smith, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guaragna, John)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #359 Motion to substitute Exhibit F re #334 (Clerk has substituted exhibit per this order). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2012. (sm, )
October 8, 2012 Filing 366 NOTICE by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Apple, Inc., Atari Interactive Inc., Becker Professional Development Corporation, Brother International Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Dell, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Foster and Smith, Inc., GMCI Internet Operations, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hoovers, Inc., Hulu, LLC, Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC, Network Solutions LLC, Novell, Inc., Overstock.com, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., RK Netmedia, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., Rovio Mobile Ltd, Sam's West, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Score Internet Group, LLC, Sleepy's, LLC, Square Enix Ltd., Symantec Corporation, Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated, Vitamin Shoppe, Inc., Walgreen Co., Webroot Software, Inc. NOTICE OF MEDIATOR (Chassman, Peter)
October 8, 2012 Filing 365 REPLY to Response to Motion re #308 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Score Internet Group, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Iyoho)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #357 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Illusion Labs, AB with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/12. (ehs, )
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Withdraw Jacob Schneider as counsel of record for Lexmark International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/12. (ehs, )
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #355 Motion to change the name of Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/05/12. (bas)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/05/12. (bas)
October 3, 2012 Filing 360 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #308 MOTION to Change Venue by Score Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2012 Filing 359 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Exhibit F re #334 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) to Quish Plaintiff's Notice of Response in Opposition [Dkt. 334-7] to Webroot Inc.'s Motion to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. 299 [Dkt. 45 in Case No. 2:12-cv-290] by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
October 3, 2012 Filing 358 RESPONSE to Motion re #331 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 3, 2012 Filing 357 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Illusion Labs AB in Case No. 2:11-272 by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 3, 2012 Filing 356 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Schneider as Counsel for Defendant Lexmark International, Inc. by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
October 3, 2012 Filing 355 Agreed MOTION To Change the Name of Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. to Motorola Mobility, LLC. by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banner, Brian)
October 2, 2012 Filing 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dara M Kurlancheek on behalf of Network Solutions LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3810247. (Kurlancheek, Dara)
October 2, 2012 Filing 353 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Shop MA, Inc. in Case No. 2:12-284 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 2, 2012 Filing 352 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Baskin on behalf of Network Solutions LLC (Baskin, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #346 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control, Discovery, and Protective Orders. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/1/2012. (ch, )
October 1, 2012 Filing 350 NOTICE by Webroot Software, Inc. re #334 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Filing of Reply in Support of Motion to Sever Under 35 USC Section 299 (DI 45 in 2:12cv290) (Sauer, Peter)
September 28, 2012 Filing 349 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with PR 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-291 (Roth, Kit)
September 28, 2012 Filing 348 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with PR 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-290 (Roth, Kit)
September 28, 2012 Filing 347 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-286 (Roth, Kit)
September 28, 2012 Filing 346 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control, discovery and protective orders ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS AND ALL DEFENDANTS IN THIS CONSOLIDATED CASE by Network Solutions LLC, Shop MA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting #341 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2012. (ch, )
September 28, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GFI Software, Inc. to 10/22/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 27, 2012 Filing 344 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GFI Software, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 27, 2012 Filing 343 RESPONSE in Opposition re #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 27, 2012 Filing 342 RESPONSE in Opposition re #304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 27, 2012 Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Lodsys Group's Responses in Opposition to Defendants' Motions (Docket Nos. 303 and 304) by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 27, 2012 Filing 340 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa Richards Smith (Smith, Melissa)
September 24, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of filing of Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Surreply to Defendant GMCI Internet Operations, Inc.s Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) [dkt. no. 49 in Case No. 2:12-cv-291] (Huck, Christopher)
September 24, 2012 Filing 338 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC Notice of filing of Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Surreply to Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc.s Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) [dkt. no. 50 in Case No. 2:12-cv-291] (Huck, Christopher)
September 24, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of filing of Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Surreply to Defendant RK NetMedia's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) [dkt. no. 51 in Case No. 2:12-cv-291] (Huck, Christopher)
September 24, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of filing of Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Surreply to Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. 299 [dkt. no. 52 in Case No. 2:12-cv-291] (Huck, Christopher)
September 24, 2012 Filing 335 RESPONSE in Opposition re #308 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 18, 2012 Filing 334 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of filing of Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCs Opposition to Webroot Inc.s Motion to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. 299 [dkt. no. 45 in Case No. 2:12-cv-209] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Attachment 7 - Exhibit F - replaced on 10/9/2012 per order) (sm, ). Modified on 10/9/2012 (sm, ).
September 17, 2012 Filing 333 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with PR 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:11-cv-272 (Roth, Kit)
September 17, 2012 Filing 332 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with PR 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-284 (Roth, Kit)
September 17, 2012 Filing 331 RENEWED MOTION to Dismiss by HSN, Inc.. (Lanser, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2012: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #319 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul J Berman terminated as counsel for Defendants Samsung. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/17/12. (ehs, )
September 17, 2012 NOTICE of CANCELLATION of Case Managment Conference set for 9/19/2012 @ 4:00 p.m. before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER - Markman Hearing set for 4/16/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Jury Selection set for 10/7/2013 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/14/2012. (ch, )
September 14, 2012 Filing 328 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by Nike, Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 327 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by The Men's Warehouse, Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 326 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by Charming Shoppes, Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 325 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by Cabela's Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 324 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by Becker Professional Development Corporation.(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 323 ANSWER to #288 Amended Complaint by Recreational Equipment, Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 322 ANSWER to #288 Amended Complaint by Walgreen Co..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 321 ANSWER to #288 Amended Complaint by Foster and Smith, Inc..(Williamson, Carrie)
September 14, 2012 Filing 320 ANSWER to #294 Amended Complaint, by Tivo, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
September 13, 2012 Filing 319 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Paul J. Berman by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 13, 2012 Filing 318 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Original Answer to Defendant Network Solutions, Inc.'s Counterclaims [dkt. No. 285] in Case no. 2:12-cv-284 by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
September 13, 2012 Filing 317 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Original Answer to Defendant Hoover's, Inc.'s Counterclaims[dkt. No. 279] in Case no. 2:12-cv-284 by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
September 13, 2012 Filing 316 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs Original Answer to Defendant Estee Lauders Counterclaims [dkt. No. 281] in Case no. 2:12-cv-284 by Lodsys Group, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
September 13, 2012 Filing 315 BRIEF filed re: Consolidated Defendants' Case Management Submission by Kaspersky Lab, Inc.. (Kniser, Casey)
September 12, 2012 Filing 314 BRIEF filed by Consolidated Defendants Regarding Case Management, by Hoovers, Inc.. (Nguyen, Daniel)
September 12, 2012 Filing 313 BRIEF filed INTERVENOR APPLE INC.'S CASE MANAGEMENT SUBMISSION by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
September 12, 2012 Filing 312 BRIEF filed Regarding Case Management by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Kit)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #310 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action, #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action Responses due by 9/27/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/11/2012. (ch, )
September 11, 2012 NOTICE of Case Management Conference RESET for 4:00 pm on 9/19/12. **Note that only the TIME has changed** (bga, )
September 10, 2012 Filing 310 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action, #304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #307 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadline is 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/7/2012. (ch, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 308 MOTION to Change Venue by Score Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Iyoho, #2 Exhibit A - Median Time Intervals Chart, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2012 Filing 307 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Compliance with Paragraph 3(b) of the Discovery Order ) by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
September 4, 2012 Filing 306 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven D Moore on behalf of Shop MA, Inc. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2012 Filing 305 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alton Absher, III on behalf of Shop MA, Inc. (Absher, Alton)
August 31, 2012 Filing 304 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action by Foster and Smith, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Williamson, #2 Exhibit A to Williamson Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Williamson Decl., #4 Decl. of Landau, #5 Decl. of Coe, #6 Decl. of Walker, #7 Decl. of Enriquez, #8 Decl. of Erchinger, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Carrie)
August 30, 2012 Filing 303 MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Allegations Already at Issue in Co-pending Supplier Infringement Action by Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., Nike, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Decl. of Williamson, #2 Exhibit A to Williamson Decl. (complaint), #3 Exhibit B to Williamson Decl. (amended complaint), #4 Exhibit C to Williamson Decl. (infringement contentions), #5 Decl. of Myer, #6 Exhibit A to Myer Decl., #7 Decl. of Roselli, #8 Decl. of Palumbo, #9 Decl. of Meyer, #10 Decl. of Porter, #11 Decl. of Keller, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Williamson, Carrie)
August 30, 2012 NOTICE of Case Management Conference set for September 19, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER - This order obviates the need for the submission of proposed docket control, discovery, and protective orders within 14 days as indicated in the Courts August 17, 2012 consolidated order, and as discussed during the docket call held on August 29, 2012, and as such the parties should turn their attention to the case management proposals called for herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/12. (ehs, )
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER - All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Bank of America Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/28/12. (ehs, )
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Webroot Inc.s Motion to Sever Under 35 U.S.C. 299 [dkt. no. 45] (the Motion) filed in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-290-JRG consolidated herewith. Finding Lodsyss motion well taken, the Court hereby GRANTS the motion. Lodsys shall have up to and including September 18, 2012 to file its response to the Motion. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/28/12. (ehs, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 297 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Score Internet Group, LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
August 28, 2012 Filing 295 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Score Internet Group, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
August 28, 2012 Filing 294 AMENDED COMPLAINT fo Patent Infringement against Becker Professional Development Corporation, Cabela's Inc., Charming Shoppes, Inc., HSN, Inc., Nike, Inc., The Men's Warehouse, Inc., Tivo, Inc., filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit)
August 28, 2012 Filing 293 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN, Inc. (Thames, Earl)
August 28, 2012 Filing 291 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
August 27, 2012 Filing 290 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J Pieper for The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 27, 2012 Filing 289 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas C Mahlum for The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 27, 2012 Filing 288 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Foster and Smith, Inc., Recreational Equipment, Inc., Walgreen Co., filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Roth, Kit)
August 27, 2012 Filing 287 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Overstock.com, Inc. (Guaragna, John)
August 27, 2012 Filing 286 NOTICE by Overstock.com, Inc. of Answer to #50 Amended Complaint in 2:12cv284 (Guaragna, John)
August 27, 2012 Filing 285 Defendant Network Solutions' ANSWER to Complaint AMENDED filed in 2:12-cv-284 dkt # 50, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group, LLC by Network Solutions LLC.(Bunt, Robert)
August 27, 2012 Filing 284 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AVG Technologies USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AVG Technologies Holding B.V. for AVG Technologies USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2012 Filing 283 NOTICE by AVG Technologies USA, Inc. of Answer to #1 Complaint in 2:12cv290 (Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2012 Filing 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 27, 2012 Filing 281 NOTICE by The Estee Lauder Companies, Inc. of Answer to #50 Amended Complaint in 2:12cv284 (Jones, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2012 (sm, ). Modified on 8/28/2012 (sm, ).
August 27, 2012 Filing 280 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hoovers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hoover's, Inc. for Hoovers, Inc., Hoovers, Inc.. (Phipps, Charles)
August 27, 2012 Filing 279 Hoover's, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Hoovers, Inc..(Phipps, Charles)
August 27, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Sleepy's, LLC (Dacus, Shannon)
August 27, 2012 Filing 277 NOTICE by Sleepy's, LLC Answer to Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC's Amended Complaint filed 8-9-12 as Dkt. No. 50 in 2:12-cv-284 (Dacus, Deron)
August 27, 2012 Filing 276 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Webroot, Inc.'s Motion to Sever (dkt. 45) Originally filed in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-290 by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 27, 2012 Filing 275 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 24, 2012 Filing 274 NOTICE by Sam's West, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Stiner Toomer, Tamara)
August 24, 2012 Filing 273 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Shop MA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2012, answer due 10/15/2012. (ehs, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 301 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer Olmedo-Rodriguez for Score Internet Group, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-10187) (bsw, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 300 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard A Morgan for Score Internet Group, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-10187) (bsw, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 296 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew J Feeley for Score Internet Group, LLC. (pkb, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 292 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney S Lloyd Smith for Score Internet Group, LLC. (pkb, )
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #267 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #241 MOTION to Sever Defendant Lexmark From All Other Defendants Responses due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/22/2012. (sm, )
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #266 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV terminated as atty for dft. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/22/2012. (sm, )
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting #265 Motion to Substitute Party. Shop MA, Inc is substituted for Market America. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/22/2012. (sm, )
August 22, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Blaine Brown on behalf of Lodsys, LLC (Brown, Ryan)
August 22, 2012 Filing 268 NOTICE by Lodsys Group, LLC of Compliance with PR 3-1 and 3-2 in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-289 (Roth, Kit)
August 21, 2012 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions to Sever and Transfer Venue filed in Civil Action No. 2:12-cv-291, docket numbers 26, 29, 32, and 33 by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Kit)
August 21, 2012 Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by Market America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
August 21, 2012 Filing 265 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party SHOP MA, Inc. for Market America, Inc. by Lodsys Group, LLC, Market America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
August 21, 2012 Filing 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Market America Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
August 21, 2012 Filing 263 NOTICE by Illusion Labs AB of ANSWER (ANSWER to AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement Dkt. No. 26 in Case Number 2:11-cv-00272) (Findlay, Michael)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #260 Motion to Dismiss all claims between Plaintiffs Lodsys, LLC and Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Canon U.S.A., Inc. with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/12. (ehs, )
August 20, 2012 Filing 261 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION to Sever Defendant Lexmark From All Other Defendants filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
August 20, 2012 Filing 260 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Canon U.S.A., by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims arising out of or based upon products and/or services provided by LivePerson, Inc., asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLCand Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.s, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.s, and Samsung Telecommunications America,, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs related to these claims and counterclaims are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/202012. (ch, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER - the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:11- cv-90. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming August 29, 2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the Court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2012. (ch, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 257 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
August 14, 2012 Filing 256 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John L Capone for Lexmark International, Inc. (pkb, )
August 13, 2012 Filing 255 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huck, Christopher)
August 9, 2012 Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION to Sever Defendant Lexmark From All Other Defendants filed by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Feher, Eugene)
August 9, 2012 Filing 253 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
August 7, 2012 Filing 252 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lowell D Jacobson for Motorola Mobility, Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-9888) (bsw, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 251 REPLY to Response to Motion re #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Erickson, Brian)
July 30, 2012 Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #241 MOTION to Sever Defendant Lexmark From All Other Defendants filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting #247 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Phillip David Price; Michelle C Replogle; Jonathan E Retsky; Peter John Chassman and John R Keville terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/12. (mrm, )
July 26, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
July 26, 2012 Filing 247 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jonathan E. Retsky, Peter J. Chassman, John R. Keville, Michelle C. Replogle, and Phillip D. Price of Winston & Strawn LLP by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Replogle, Michelle)
July 23, 2012 Filing 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) filed by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 19, 2012 Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Weingaertner, Scott)
July 19, 2012 Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F Perry on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Perry, Robert)
July 19, 2012 Filing 243 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Carnaval, Christopher)
July 19, 2012 Filing 242 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
July 13, 2012 Filing 241 MOTION to Sever Defendant Lexmark From All Other Defendants by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) Responses due by 7/23/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2012. (ch, )
July 11, 2012 Filing 239 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) by Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 27, 2012 Filing 238 MOTION for Reconsideration re #172 Memorandum & Opinion (Order Denying Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Sever and Transfer Venue) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 26, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE from The Federal Circuit RE MISC Docket No 124 denying the petition for a writ of mandamus (ehs, )
June 25, 2012 Filing 236 NOTICE from USCA for The Federal Circuit RE: MISC Docket No 124, denying the petition for writ of mandamus (ehs, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 235 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kit W Roth (Roth, Kit)
May 31, 2012 Filing 234 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Keville, John)
May 24, 2012 Filing 233 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC re #222 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, of Parties Non Agreement to Designate a Mediator and Requesting Court Appointed Mediator (Roth, Kit)
May 24, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE***. Document # 232, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, ) Modified on 5/24/2012 (sm, ).
May 24, 2012 Filing 232 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Court Appointed, filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Roth, Kit) Modified on 5/24/2012 (sm, ).
May 24, 2012 Filing 231 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brother International Corporation re Supplemental P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 Filing 230 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Collins, Kevin)
May 21, 2012 Filing 229 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Hulu, LLC (Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a)) (Bernstein, Matthew)
May 21, 2012 Filing 228 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Novell, Inc. (Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a)) (Black, Seth)
May 21, 2012 Filing 227 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Replogle, Michelle)
May 21, 2012 Filing 226 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brother International Corporation re P.R. 3-4(a) (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2012 Filing 225 NOTICE by Canon U.S.A., Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Dorsky, Jason)
May 21, 2012 Filing 224 NOTICE by Lexmark International, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Feher, Eugene)
May 18, 2012 Filing 223 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group, LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1097) (bsw, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 REVISED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2012., Complete Expert Discovery due by 5/13/2013., Expert Witness List due by 4/5/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 5/18/2012., Markman Hearing set for 2/19/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 7/2/2013., Pretrial Order due by 7/15/2013., Jury Selection set for 8/5/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/12. (ehs, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 221 Joint MOTION for Entry of Revised Docket Control Order by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pensabene, Marc)
May 11, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 220, Submission. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 10, 2012 Filing 220 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Canon U.S.A., Inc. , Joint Motion for Entry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pensabene, Marc) Modified on 5/11/2012 (sm, ).
May 9, 2012 Filing 219 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kai Zhu for Hulu, LLC. (pkb, )
May 3, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 8/5/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing RESET for 2/19/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The parties are instructed to meet and confer and submit a revised Scheduling Order within seven days.(bga, )
May 3, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 8/5/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing RESET for 2/19/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #210 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Novells Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that Novell has up to and including May 21, 2012 in which to comply with P.R. 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12. (ehs, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #211 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. MMI has up to and including May 21, 2012, in which to make its Patent Rule 3-4(a) document production. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12.(ehs, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #209 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12. (mrm, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12. (mrm, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Extension of Time to comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12. (mrm, )
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #212 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Brother has up to, and including May 21, 2012 in which to comply with PR 3- (a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/30/12. (ehs, )
April 27, 2012 Filing 212 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-4(a) by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2012 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a)) by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Replogle, Michelle)
April 26, 2012 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Comply with with P.R. 3-4(a) ) by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth)
April 26, 2012 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (P.R. 3-4(a)) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #205 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Lexmark's Internation's Inc deadline to Comply is 5/21/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2012. (ch, )
April 26, 2012 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH PATENT RULE 3-4(a) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 26, 2012 Filing 206 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a) by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
April 25, 2012 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Disclosures and Documents in Compliance With P.R. 3-4(a) by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
April 16, 2012 Filing 204 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit that order entered as to Lodsys LLC to respond no later than 4/27/12 to petn for writ of mandamus (ehs, )
April 16, 2012 Filing 203 NOTICE from USCA for The Federal Circuit assigning MISC NO 124 to Hewlett-Packard petition for writ of mandamus (ehs, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 202 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #179 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Lexmark by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
April 2, 2012 Filing 201 NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. DEFENDANT LENOVO (UNITED STATES) INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-4(a) (Klein, Eric)
March 30, 2012 Filing 200 NOTICE by Brother International Corporation, Canon U.S.A., Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hulu, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Novell, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Trend Micro Incorporated of Compliance with PR 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Erickson, Brian)
March 30, 2012 Filing 199 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Compliance with PR 3-4(a) (Erickson, Brian)
March 30, 2012 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION - REFILED PER LAW CLERK ***<.b< Document # 192, Motion for Extension. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 30, 2012 Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-4(a) by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG ORDER WAS ATTACHED TO MOTION Document # 195, Order grant # 192, Motion for Extension to Comply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER - granting #190 Motion for extension to time to Comply with P.R. 3-4 (a). Lexmark deadline is 4/29/2012 in which to comply with P.R. 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/30/2012. (ch, )
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #191 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Motorola Mobility Inc has up to and including April 29, 2012, in which to make its Patent Rule 3-4(a) document production. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/30/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 3/30/2012 (ch, ).
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG ORDER WAS ATTACHED TO MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting #192 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Lexmark's Time to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a) is GRANTED and that Lexmark has up to and including April 29, 2012 in which to comply with P.R. 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/30/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 3/30/2012 (ch, ).
March 30, 2012 Filing 194 NOTICE by Trend Micro Incorporated of Compliance with PR 3-4(a) (Erickson, Brian)
March 27, 2012 Filing 193 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , Affirmative Defenses by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC.(Smith, Melissa)
March 27, 2012 Filing 192 ***NEED TO BE REFILED PER LAW CLERK***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re P.R. 3-4(a) by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 (Proposed Order) replaced on 3/28/2012) (sm, ). Modified on 3/30/2012 (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a)) by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Replogle, Michelle)
March 27, 2012 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Disclosures and Documents in Compliance With P.R. 3-4(a) by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Feher, Eugene)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #186 Motion for extension of time to comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a) filed by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. Canons unopposed motion for extension of time is GRANTED and that Canon has up to and including April 29, 2012 in which to make its Patent Rule 3-4(a) document production. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/27/12. (ehs, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Novells Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that Novell has up to and including April 29, 2012 in which to comply with P.R. 3-4(a).. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/27/12. (ehs, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-4(a) ) by Novell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Black, Seth)
March 26, 2012 Filing 186 MOTION Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a) by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
March 23, 2012 Filing 185 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Gannon for Lexmark International, Inc.,Kevin Gannon for Lexmark International, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1010) (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Hulus Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that Hulu has up to, and including April 29, 2012 in which to comply with PR 3-4(a). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/23/12. (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 9/2/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 5/8/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 23, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing CANCELLATION: Status Conference CANCELLED for 4/20/2012 09:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 22, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. to 3/27/2012; Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., to 3/27/2012; Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to 3/27/2012. (ehs, )
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung has up to and including March 27, 2012 in which to file an answer to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/22/12. (ehs, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 182 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin B Collins for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-999 (ch, )
March 22, 2012 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (P.R. 3-4(a)) by Hulu, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 21, 2012 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 21, 2012 Filing 179 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lexmark International, Inc..(Feher, Eugene)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Patent Rule 3-4(a). Samsung Defendants have up, to and including April 29, 2012 in which to comply with PR 3-4(a).. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/12. (ehs, )
March 13, 2012 Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION To Extend Time to Serve PR 3-4(a) Disclosures by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 12, 2012 Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Keville on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Keville, John)
March 12, 2012 Filing 175 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan E Retsky on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Retsky, Jonathan)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 4/20/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/12. (ehs, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 173 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle C Replogle on behalf of Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Replogle, Michelle)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons discussed below, each of the foregoing motions is DENIED #42 , #44 , #96 , #102 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/8/2012. (ch, )
March 6, 2012 Filing 171 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard J Katz terminated as counsel for Brother International Corporation. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/24/2012. (ch, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard Katz by Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Novell, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Black, Seth)
February 17, 2012 Filing 167 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
February 17, 2012 Filing 166 NOTICE by Hulu, LLC of Service of Defendant Hulu, LLC's Initial Disclosures (Bernstein, Matthew)
February 17, 2012 Filing 165 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lexmark International, Inc. of Service of Defendant Lexmark International, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Feher, Eugene)
February 17, 2012 Filing 164 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company of Service of Disclosures (Erickson, Brian)
February 17, 2012 Filing 163 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Chassman, Peter)
February 17, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lenovo (United States) Inc. Notice of Service of Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Klein, Eric)
February 17, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE by Trend Micro Incorporated of Service of Disclosures (Erickson, Brian)
February 17, 2012 Filing 160 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brother International Corporation re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Canon U.S.A., Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Haughey, Edmund)
February 17, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Initial Disclosures (Huck, Christopher)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/2012. (ch, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 156 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder of Lodsys Group, LLC by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
February 6, 2012 Filing 155 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Maureen Japha for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,,Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-911 (ch, )
February 6, 2012 Filing 154 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kaveh Saba for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.,Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-911 (ch, )
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard L Rainey terminated as Samsung Dfts. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/3/2012. (ch, )
February 1, 2012 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on Behalf of Richard L. Rainey by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 31, 2012 Filing 151 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Assignment and Intent to File Motion to Substitute (Huck, Christopher)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #149 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Order Dismissing Certain Claims. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the following claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice: Lodsyss claim for Infringement Of U.S. Patent No. 5,999,908 against Trend Micro; and Any and all other claims of infringement against Trend Micro, to the extent such claims relate to products and/or services provided to Trend Micro by ForeSee Results, Inc. It is further ORDERED that all costs, expenses, and attorneys fees related to the above-listed claims are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2012. (ch, )
January 23, 2012 Filing 149 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #140 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 18, 2012 Filing 148 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick R McKelvie for Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-879 (ch, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Shanahan; Brent A Hawkins and John Cannon Low terminated as counsel for Trend Micro Incorporated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/18/2012. (ch, )
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #145 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Thad Heartfield and M. Dru Montgomery terminated as counsel for Trend Micro Incorporated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/18/2012. (ch, )
January 16, 2012 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 13, 2012 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, John)
January 10, 2012 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (ehs, )
January 4, 2012 The previous case assigned to Judge Davis is hereby reassigned to Judge Folsom per Local Rule CV 63-B (ehs, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, )Entered in Error - Modified on 1/11/2012 (ehs, ).
December 22, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Compliance With P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Goldfarb, Michael)
December 22, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 141, Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 21, 2011 Filing 141 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Lodsys, LLC (Goldfarb, Michael) Modified on 12/22/2011 (sm, ).
December 19, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Dismiss. The following claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice: (a) Lodsyss claim for Infringement Of U.S. Patent No. 5,999,908 against Trend Micro, and any and all other claims for infringement against Trend Micro, to the extent such claims relate to products and/or services provided to Trend Micro by ForeSee. It is further ORDERED that all costs, expenses, and attorneys fees related to the above-listed claims are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/5/2011. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims against Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
December 2, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC Of Dismissal of Certain Calims of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - granting #135 Joint Motion for Discovery Order and Docket Control Order. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2012., Discovery due by 2/14/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2012., Markman Hearing set for 5/8/2013 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom., Motions in Limine due by 8/8/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2014., Jury Selection set for 9/2/2014 09:00AM before Judge David Folsom., Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2014 09:00 AM before Judge David Folsom. Mediation deadline is 3/28/2014. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/1/2011. (ch, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/1/2011. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2011: #1 Ex A) (rml, ).
October 28, 2011 Filing 135 Joint MOTION for Discovery and Docket Control Orders by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Attachment 2 (Discovery Order), #2 Discovery Order #3 Docket Control Order Huck, Christopher) Modified on 10/31/2011 (sm, ).
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended 10/28/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/2011. (ch, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 133 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alfonso N Cornish, II for Hulu, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 1-2550 (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2011: #1 CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION) (ch, ).
October 21, 2011 Filing 131 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Second Extension of Deadlines by Brother International Corporation, Canon U.S.A., Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hulu, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Novell, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsky, Jason)
October 21, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc. Notice of Affiliation (Klein, Eric)
October 19, 2011 Filing 132 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brent A Hawkins for Trend Micro Incorporated. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-760 (ch, )
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting #128 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to October 21, 2011, and the October 31, 2011 deemed date of the initial case management conference is vacated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/13/11. (ehs, )
October 11, 2011 Filing 128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extension of Deadlines by Brother International Corporation, Canon U.S.A., Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, Hulu, LLC, Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Lodsys, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Novell, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, )
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER - This case is now set for jury selection on September 2, 2014 and for a claim construction on May 8, 2014. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on October 14, 2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems October 31, 2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on October 21, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/22/11. (ehs, )
September 22, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cannon Low on behalf of Trend Micro Incorporated (Low, John)