Lodsys, LLC v. DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lodsys, LLC
Defendant: DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc., ESET, LLC, ForeSee Results, Inc., LivePerson, Inc., OpinionLab, Inc. and The New York Times Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00309
Filed: July 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2011 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. LivePerson, Inc. served on 7/14/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Ctr, answer due 8/4/2011. (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Goldfarb for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-630) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Huck for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-630) (ehs, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. ESET, LLC served on 7/13/2011, answer due 9/2/2011; OpinionLab, Inc. served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011; The New York Times Company served on 7/13/2011, answer due 8/3/2011. Parties served by CM RRR through Registered Agent (Attachments: # 1 OpinionLab, # 2 ESET)(ehs, )
July 21, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ESET, LLC to 9/2/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 20, 2011 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESET, LLC.( Pisano, Nicola)
July 20, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicola Anthony Pisano on behalf of ESET, LLC (Pisano, Nicola)
July 8, 2011 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.. (ch, )
July 8, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ESET, LLC, (Attachments: # 1 ForeSee Results LLC, # 2 LivePerson Inc, # 3 OpinionLab Inc, # 4 The New York Times Company)(ch, )
July 5, 2011 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
July 5, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings, LLC for Lodsys, LLC. (Davis, William)
July 5, 2011 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
July 5, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc., ESET, LLC, ForeSee Results, Inc., LivePerson, Inc., OpinionLab, Inc., The New York Times Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3108043.), filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 5,999,908, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodsys, LLC v. DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodsys, LLC
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Michael A Goldfarb
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DriveTime Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESET, LLC
Represented By: Nicola Anthony Pisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ForeSee Results, Inc.
Represented By: John Cannon Low
Represented By: Michael E Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivePerson, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpinionLab, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Wood Kennerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?