TQP Development, LLC v. Twitter, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: TQP Development, LLC
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00503
Filed: August 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion RESPONSE TO TWITTER, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING TRANSFER OF VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA [DKT. 42] filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Twitter, Inc. re 41 Memorandum & Opinion (Toddy, Derrick)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/29/2013. (ch, )
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failutre to State a Claim and to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/15/2013. (ch, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 39 RESPONSE to 35 Report and Recommendations, 38 Objection to Report and Recommendations, 16 Motion to Dismiss, by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
August 5, 2013 Filing 38 OBJECTION to 35 Report and Recommendations on Motion to Dismiss 16 by Twitter, Inc.. (Davis, Scott)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Burke terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2013. (ch, )
July 24, 2013 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
July 22, 2013 Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike filed by Twitter, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/22/2013. (ch, )
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - the Court hereby consolidates the cases listed in the caption for pretrial purposes only. Case No. 2:13-CV-219 is designated as the lead case. *** All future filings must be made in the lead case until this consolidation order is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/17/2013.*** (ch, ) Modified on 7/25/2013 (ch, ).
July 9, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/9/13 before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082 (shellyholmes@skynetcountry.com). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2013. (sholmes, )
May 9, 2013 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2013 re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 5, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on 16 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike : Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (jml)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hao Ni terminated. (No PDF Document Attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on March 6, 2013. (jml)
March 5, 2013 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
January 24, 2013 Filing 30 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Adam)
January 15, 2013 Filing 29 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and referring this case to United States Magistrate Judge Roy Payne per General Order 13-3. For proposed scheduling order see Appendix E to General Order 13-3. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Davis, Scott)
January 4, 2013 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Response, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
January 3, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Kroeger, Paul)
December 21, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District Of California Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) And To Stay Any Other Proceedings Pending Disposition Of The Transfer Motion by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Axelsen Decl iso Mot Transfer, # 2 Affidavit Davis Decl iso Mot Transfer, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Scott)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne for all pretrial purposes. Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/17/12. (mrm, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
December 10, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 10, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
November 29, 2012 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Davis, Scott)
November 16, 2012 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Hoffman, Adam)
November 1, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D Vandenberg on behalf of Twitter, Inc. (Vandenberg, John)
October 29, 2012 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Twitter, Inc. (Toddy, Derrick)
October 29, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and to Strike by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Toddy iso MTD, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Toddy, Derrick)
October 2, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Ni, Hao)
September 27, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Twitter, Inc. to 10/29/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 27, 2012 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Twitter, Inc..( Davis, Scott)
September 21, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Twitter, Inc. served on 9/6/2012, answer due 9/27/2012. (ehs, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Fussell, James)
August 28, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. The notice must include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer and a list of any related cases previously filed in the Eastern District of Texas involving the same patent/patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/27/12. (bas)
August 24, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Twitter, Inc.. (ehs, )
August 24, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/24/2012. (ch, )
August 24, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider. (ch, )
August 23, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Burke on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Burke, Kevin)
August 23, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Hoffman, Adam)
August 23, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Giza, Alexander)
August 23, 2012 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fenster, Marc)
August 23, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Related Cases (Fenster, Marc)
August 23, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TQP Development, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twitter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3745877.), filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Fenster, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TQP Development, LLC v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TQP Development, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Burke
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: James A Fussell, III
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?