Alfonso Cioffi et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Alfonso Cioffi, Melanie Rozman, Megan Rozman and Morgan Rozman
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00103
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE by Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman, Morgan Rozman - Plaintiffs' Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Davis, William)
April 11, 2013 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2013 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2013 Filing 15 ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Google, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
April 5, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc Tarlock on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4081307. (Tarlock, Marc)
April 3, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie Powers Skaff on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4077051. (Skaff, Stephanie)
April 3, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Phuc Nguyen on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4076940. (Nguyen, Andrew)
April 3, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eugene Y Mar on behalf of Google, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4076228. (Mar, Eugene)
March 4, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Morgan Rozman, Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman. Google, Inc. served on 2/19/2013, answer due 4/11/2013. (ehs, )
February 20, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc. to 4/11/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
February 7, 2013 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google, Inc., filed by Morgan Rozman, Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,103, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,500, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,528, # 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,529)(Davis, William)
February 7, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Google, Inc.. (ehs, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman, Morgan Rozman (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 7, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman, Morgan Rozman (Bunt, Robert)
February 7, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman, Morgan Rozman (Parker, Robert)
February 6, 2013 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2013. (ch, )
February 6, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3987246.), filed by Morgan Rozman, Alfonso Cioffi, Megan Rozman, Melanie Rozman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,103, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,500, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,528, # 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Reissue Patent No. RE43,529, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alfonso Cioffi et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Cioffi
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Rozman
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Rozman
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Rozman
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?