Freeny et al v Apple Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: Charles C Freeny, Bryan E Freeny and James P Freeny
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00361
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/04/2014. (nkl, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 135 REPLY to Response to Motion re 133 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Vizio Inc. (Koole, Charles)
November 12, 2014 Filing 134 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 133 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard C. Lin ISO Response in Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
November 5, 2014 Filing 133 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Koole, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2014: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 129 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 10/22/2014. (ch, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re 129 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. With Prejudice filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Banys, Christopher)
October 3, 2014 Filing 130 RESPONSE to Motion re 129 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. With Prejudice filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koole, Charles)
October 1, 2014 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. With Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banys, Christopher)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 10/1/2014. (ch, )
September 22, 2014 Filing 127 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Charles Koole ("Koole Decl."), # 2 L to Koole Decl., # 3 M to Koole Decl., # 4 N to Koole Decl., # 5 O to Koole Decl., # 6 P to Koole Decl., # 7 Q to Koole Decl.)(Koole, Charles)
September 22, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 126, Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 126 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Charles Koole ("Koole Decl."), # 2 Exhibit L to Koole Decl., # 3 Exhibit M to Koole Decl., # 4 Exhibit N to Koole Decl., # 5 Exhibit O to Koole Decl., # 6 Exhibit P to Koole Decl., # 7 Exhibit Q to Koole Decl.)(Koole, Charles) Modified on 9/22/2014 (ch, ).
September 8, 2014 Filing 125 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' ReplC, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Christopher D. Banys ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 7 Affidavit of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 9 Exhibit B to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 10 Exhibit C to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 11 Exhibit D to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 12 Exhibit E to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 13 Exhibit F to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 14 Exhibit G to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 15 Exhibit H to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 16 Exhibit I to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply, # 17 Exhibit J to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply)(Banys, Christopher)
August 29, 2014 Filing 124 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. Without Prejudice filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles C. Koole ("Koole Decl."), # 2 Exhibit A to Koole Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Koole Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Koole Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Koole Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Koole Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Koole Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Koole Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Koole Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Koole Decl., # 11 Exhibit J to Koole Decl., # 12 Exhibit K to Koole Decl., # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Koole, Charles)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/28/2014. (ch, )
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part 121 Motion to Continue Claim Construction Hearing. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/29/2014, will be cancelled. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/27/2014. (ch, )
August 26, 2014 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Claim Construction Hearing by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banys, Christopher)
August 26, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION to Dismiss VIZIO, Inc. Without Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Banys, Christopher)
August 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 117 Motion to Extend Time to Complete Mediation. Deadline 9/30/14.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/22/14. (ch, )
August 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss. Netgear Inc was dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/22/14. (ch, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete Mediation by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
August 22, 2014 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss NETGEAR, Inc. with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 7/29/2014. (ch, )
July 28, 2014 Filing 114 RESPONSE in Opposition re 107 Opposed MOTION to Strike 99 Claim Construction Brief, Defendants Opposed Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Alon Konchitsky (DN 99-10) filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
July 25, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny Plaintiffs' Notice of Technology Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Richard)
July 25, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE by Netgear Inc Of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 25, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE NOTICE AND ATTACH AS ATTACHMENT. Document # 111, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 24, 2014 Filing 111 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny Plaintiffs' Technology Tutorial (Lin, Richard) Modified on 7/25/2014 (ch, ).
July 24, 2014 Filing 110 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Lin, Richard)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 7/22/2014. (ch, )
July 17, 2014 Filing 108 REPLY to 99 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit I to Declaration of Richard C. Lin)(Lin, Richard)
July 10, 2014 Filing 107 Opposed MOTION to Strike 99 Claim Construction Brief, Defendants Opposed Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Alon Konchitsky (DN 99-10) by Netgear Inc, Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bovich, John)
July 10, 2014 Filing 106 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 105 Reply to Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A - US6091956)(Bovich, John)
July 10, 2014 Filing 105 Responsive to 99 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Netgear Inc, Vizio Inc. (Bovich, John) Modified on 7/11/2014 (ch, ).
July 10, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge William C. Bryson. (mrm, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 104 RESPONSE to 98 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Response toDefendant VIZIO, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 2 Exhibit A)(Lin, Richard)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss. Belkin International Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 6/30/2014. (ch, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by ASUS against the Freenys are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, including all pending claims and counterclaims. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 6/30/2014. (ch, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 101 Joint MOTION to Dismiss ASUS Computer International With Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
June 30, 2014 Filing 100 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Belkin International, Inc. With Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
June 26, 2014 Filing 99 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard C. Lin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Affidavit Declaration of Alon Konchitsky, # 11 Exhibit 1)(Lin, Richard)
June 26, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE by Vizio Inc re 97 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, 84 Order on Sealed Motion - Notice of Compliance with the Court's April 15, 2014 Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles C. Koole ("Koole Decl."), # 2 Exhibit A to Koole Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Koole Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Koole Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Koole Decl.)(Koole, Charles)
June 20, 2014 Filing 97 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 92 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I)(Lin, Richard)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 6/17/14. (mrm, )
June 16, 2014 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Belkin International Inc, Netgear Inc, Vizio Inc. (Bovich, John)
June 13, 2014 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Belkin International Inc, Netgear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 5, 2014 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 92 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
May 16, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review by Belkin International Inc, Netgear Inc, Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John P. Bovich in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Litigation Pending Inter Partes Review, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Bovich, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2014: # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion to Dismiss. Dft D-Link Systems Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 5/16/2014. (ch, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss D-Link Systems, Inc. with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
May 15, 2014 Filing 89 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Richard)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER, granting 87 Joint MOTION to Dismiss TP-LINK USA Corporation with Prejudice filed by James P Freeny, Charles C Freeny, Bryan E Freeny. TP-Link USA Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/30/14. (mrm, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Dismiss TP-LINK USA Corporation with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER, granting 85 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ruckus Wireless, Inc. with Prejudice filed by James P Freeny, Charles C Freeny, Bryan E Freeny. Ruckus Wireless Inc terminated. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/18/14. (mrm, )
April 18, 2014 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Ruckus Wireless, Inc. with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part 66 Sealed Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a). Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/15/14. (mrm, )
April 9, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mieke K Malmberg on behalf of Vizio Inc (Malmberg, Mieke)
April 9, 2014 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion: In place of the April 15, 2014, in-court hearing on the plaintiffs motion to compel (Dkt. No. 66), the Court will hold a telephonic conference at 1 p.m. Central Time, on April 15, 2014. The parties should send an email to Judge Brysons law clerk, Nic Hunter, at huntern@cafc.uscourts.gov to receive the dial-in number and access code. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances. (jml)
April 8, 2014 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Motion hearing previously set on April 15, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (jml)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 GENERAL ORDER 14-9 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William C. Bryson for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/4/14. (mrm, )
April 4, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by ASUS Computer International, Belkin International Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Ruckus Wireless Inc, TP-Link USA Corporation, Vizio Inc of Compliance re P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
April 3, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny Notice of Compliance With P.R. 4-1(a) (Lin, Richard)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/14. (mrm, )
March 31, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 28, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Lin, Richard)
March 24, 2014 Filing 77 SEALED RESPONSE [Sur-Reply in Opposition] to Motion re 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Charles Koole in support of VIZIO's Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Pruetz, Adrian)
March 24, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE by Apple Inc Request for Termination of ECF Notices (Taylor, Keana)
March 20, 2014 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs filed by ASUS Computer International, Belkin International Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Ruckus Wireless Inc, TP-Link USA Corporation, Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Seth Herring in Support of Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Herring, Seth)
March 13, 2014 Filing 74 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion to Compel, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion to Compel, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Reply to Motion to Compel)(Sidebotham, Eric)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER, granting 72 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc. filed by James P Freeny, Charles C Freeny, Bryan E Freeny. Apple Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/11/14. (mrm, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc. by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2014: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
March 3, 2014 Filing 71 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) filed by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles C. Koole, # 2 Declaration of Avraham Schwartz, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Pruetz, Adrian)
February 28, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Richard C. Lin ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Adopt Model Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Buffalo America Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2014. (ch, )
February 13, 2014 Filing 68 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Buffalo Americas, Inc. (f/k/a Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc.) with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Richard)
February 12, 2014 Filing 67 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Sidebotham, Eric)
February 11, 2014 Filing 66 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio, Inc. to Produce Technical Documents Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eric J. Sidebotham ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Vizio to Produce Technical Documents, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Sidebotham, Eric)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Withdraw. Deron R Dacus is withdrawn as attorney for Dft Vizio Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/3/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Vizio Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
January 6, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny Notice of Change of Counsel's Name and Contact Information (Gilbert, Jennifer)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss. Western Digital Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/11/2013. (ch, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Western Digital Corporation with Prejudice by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lu, Jennifer)
October 11, 2013 Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ruckus Wireless Inc re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Keefe, Heidi)
October 11, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ASUS Computer International re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Nash, Brian)
October 10, 2013 Filing 58 NOTICE by Vizio Inc of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R.3-4(a) (Auyang, Heather)
October 10, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE by Netgear Inc of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Herring, Seth)
October 10, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE by Belkin International Inc of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Herring, Seth)
October 10, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation Notice of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4 (Claassen, Brian)
October 10, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE by TP-Link USA Corporation of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Auyang, Heather)
October 10, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE by Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(a) (Hawkins, Myall)
October 10, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by D-Link Systems Inc Re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
October 10, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE by Apple Inc Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Service of Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-4(A) (Taylor, Keana)
October 10, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE by ASUS Computer International, Apple Inc, Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc, D-Link Systems Inc, Netgear Inc, Ruckus Wireless Inc, TP-Link USA Corporation, Vizio Inc, Western Digital Corporation Defendants' Notice of Service of Invalidity Contentions (Taylor, Keana)
September 24, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE by Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Meyerhoff, Lisa)
September 24, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE by D-Link Systems Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 24, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE by Netgear Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Herring, Seth)
September 24, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE by Belkin International Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Herring, Seth)
September 24, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE by Apple Inc of Service of Initial Disclosure (Taylor, Keana)
September 24, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE by ASUS Computer International of Service of Initial Disclosures (Nash, Brian)
September 23, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by Vizio Inc re 32 Order of Service of Initial Disclosures (Pruetz, Adrian)
September 23, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE by Ruckus Wireless Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Keefe, Heidi)
September 23, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE by TP-Link USA Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Auyang, Heather)
September 23, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE by Western Digital Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Claassen, Brian)
September 23, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny of Service of Initial Disclosures (Lu, Jennifer)
September 23, 2013 Filing 38 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) by D-Link Systems Inc.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the disclosure and use of discovery materials. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/10/13. (ehs, )
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/10/13. (ehs, )
September 5, 2013 Filing 35 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by ASUS Computer International, Apple Inc, Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc, D-Link Corporation, Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny, Netgear Inc, Ruckus Wireless Inc, TP-Link USA Corporation, Vizio Inc, Western Digital Corporation Proposed Order Regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases (Appendix P). (Taylor, Keana)
September 5, 2013 Filing 34 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by ASUS Computer International, Apple Inc, Belkin International Inc, Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc, D-Link Corporation, Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny, Netgear Inc, Ruckus Wireless Inc, TP-Link USA Corporation, Vizio Inc, Western Digital Corporation Proposed Agreed Protective Order. (Taylor, Keana)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 8/29/2013., Markman Hearing set for 8/7/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 3/2/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/16/2015., Jury Selection set for 4/6/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation deadline 9/4/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2013. (ch, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2013. (ch, )
August 22, 2013 Filing 31 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Sidebotham, Eric)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order. Deadline is 9/5/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 8/22/2013 (ch, ).
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator William Cornelius, One American Center, 909 ESE Loop 323, Ste. 400, Tyler, Texas 75701, telephone number (903) 509-5004, and fax number (903) 509- 5091, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2013. (ch, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Protective Order by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Louis)
August 19, 2013 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J Sidebotham on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sidebotham, Eric)
August 16, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Domingo Manueal Llagostera on behalf of Apple Inc (Llagostera, Domingo)
August 15, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom and Judge Edward A. Infante, filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Banys, Christopher)
August 8, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/13. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:13-cv- 361. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the first- filed case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/2013. (ch, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of Apple Inc (Taylor, Keana)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time for Exchange of Disclosures 3-1 Through 3-4. Deadline to comply with P.R.3-1 and 3-2 is 8/2/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/26/2013. (ch, )
July 25, 2013 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Time for Exchange of Disclosures Under P.R. 3-1 through 3-4 by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lu, Jennifer)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2013 04:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/2013. (ch, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 19 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 16 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny.(Lu, Jennifer)
July 18, 2013 Filing 18 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny.(Lu, Jennifer)
July 15, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny Notice that Case is Ready for Scheduling Conference (Lu, Jennifer)
July 15, 2013 Filing 16 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny by Apple Inc.(Brucculeri, Louis)
July 3, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Lu on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lu, Jennifer)
June 26, 2013 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc, filed by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Banys, Christopher)
June 24, 2013 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Brucculeri, Louis)
June 24, 2013 Filing 12 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Apple Inc.(Brucculeri, Louis)
June 11, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Banys (Banys, Christopher)
May 22, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 6/22/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 21, 2013 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Knoll, Susan)
May 21, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan K Knoll on behalf of Apple Inc (Knoll, Susan)
May 13, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James P Freeny, Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny. Apple Inc served on 5/2/2013, answer due 5/23/2013. (ehs, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny (Hill, Jack)
May 1, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny of Related Cases (Banys, Christopher)
May 1, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Cheng-hong Lin on behalf of Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny (Lin, Richard)
April 30, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (ehs, )
April 30, 2013 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan E Freeny, Charles C Freeny, James P Freeny. (Banys, Christopher)
April 30, 2013 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (ehs, )
April 30, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
April 29, 2013 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Banys, Christopher)
April 29, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4115339.), filed by James P. Freeny, Bryan E. Freeny, Charles C Freeny. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Banys, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeny et al v Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Susan K Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles C Freeny
Represented By: Christopher Banys
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan E Freeny
Represented By: Christopher Banys
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Freeny
Represented By: Christopher Banys
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?