Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. et al v. AAA Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. and LPL Licensing, L.L.C.
Defendant: AAA Life Insurance Company and AT&T Services, Inc.
Petitioner: Yesmail, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, United Airlines, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Verizon Communications, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, General Motors LLC, AT&T, Inc., Fidelity Investments, Inc., American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company, FMR LLC, Wells Fargo & Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, Physicians Life Insurance Company, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Sprint Spectrum L P, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, DIRECTV, LLC, Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Sallie Mae, Inc, Ford Motor Company, American Express Company, Sprint Corporation, Dell Inc., DirecTV Inc, American Express Incentive Services, LLC, FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC and Upromise Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Scott Woloson, Antonio Piazza and David Folsom
Case Number: 2:2013cv01081
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2015 Filing 522 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on June 4, 2015 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: chris.bickham@yahoo.com, 409-654-2891.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2015. (Chris Bickham, )

August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/21/2015. (nkl, )
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to American Express Incentive Services, LLC (Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636) with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/14/2015. (ch, )
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #518 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC (Consolidated from case 2:13-cv-1085). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/14/2015. (ch, )
August 13, 2015 Filing 518 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Wang, Benjamin)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER granting #516 MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion for Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice as to AAA Life Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/5/2015. (ch, )
August 3, 2015 Filing 516 MOTION to Dismiss (Joint Motion for Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice as to AAA Life Insurance Company) by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2015 NOTICE the Status Conference set for 8/4/15 is CANCELLED. (bga, )
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sprint Spectrum with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/31/2015. (ch, )
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER granting #513 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO GENERAL MOTORS LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/31/2015. (ch, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 513 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO GENERAL MOTORS LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO GENERAL MOTORS LLC)(Wang, Benjamin)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting #511 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs 8/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/29/2015. (ch, )
July 24, 2015 Filing 511 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend EXCHANGE OF PRIVILEGE LOGS by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tutt, Shani)
July 24, 2015 Filing 510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sprint Spectrum L.P. by Sprint Spectrum L P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yang, Irene)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER the Court has received Mr. Wolosons invoice for services through June 14, 2015, and orders to be promptly made as follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/14/2015. (ch, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER finding as moot #381 Motion for Claim Construction Briefing Structure in view of #403 Order Regarding Claim Construction Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/09/2015. (No document attached.) (rsp1, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting in part #502 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines. Status Conference set for 8/4/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/6/2015. (ch, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #501 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gerber Life Insurance Company with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/6/2015. (ch, )
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting in part #502 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines filed by AAA Life Insurance Company., ( Status Conference set for 8/4/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/06/2015. (nkl, )
July 3, 2015 Filing 504 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (General Motors LLC)(Folsom, David)
July 2, 2015 Filing 503 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (AAA Life Insurance Company)(Folsom, David)
July 2, 2015 Filing 502 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by AAA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jakubowski, Matthew)
July 1, 2015 Filing 501 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gerber Life Insurance Company by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting #495 Joint MOTION to Dismiss American Airlines, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/29/2015. (ch, )
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 499 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2015. (ch, )
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ***FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN WRONG CASE.***ORDER granting #495 Joint MOTION to Dismiss American Airlines, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2015. (ch, ) Modified on 6/22/2015 (ch, ).
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting #494 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Delta Air Lines, Inc. terminated with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2015. (ch, )
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting #493 Joint MOTION to Dismiss United Airlines, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2015. (ch, )
June 22, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 498, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 17, 2015 Filing 495 Joint MOTION to Dismiss American Airlines, Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 17, 2015 Filing 494 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Delta Air Lines, Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 17, 2015 Filing 493 Joint MOTION to Dismiss United Airlines, Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting #489 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/14/2015. (ch, )
June 17, 2015 NOTICE the Status Conference set for 6/18/15 at 3:45 pm is CANCELLED. (bga, )
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #490 Motion to Withdraw #455 Motion to Quash, #456 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/16/15. (ch, )
June 12, 2015 Filing 490 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #456 MOTION for Protective Order , #455 MOTION to Quash by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Yesmail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
June 10, 2015 Filing 489 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JOINT MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting #473 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/5/2015. (ch, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER granting in part #478 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Delta Air Lines, Inc. Status Conference set for 6/18/2015 03:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2015. (ch, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting in part #477 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines. Status Conference set for 6/18/2015 03:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2015. (ch, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting in part #476 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines. Status Conference set for 6/18/2015 03:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2015. (ch, )
June 4, 2015 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 6/4/2015. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #472 Joint MOTION to Dismiss American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Marketing & Development Corp. American Express Travel Related Services, Inc. American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company, Amex Assurance Company, American Express Bank, FSB and American Express Bank, FSB (Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636) with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2015. (ch, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #475 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE CURRENT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 7/10/2015.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2015. (ch, )
June 3, 2015 Filing 481 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing held on 4/10/2015 before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden,Telephone number: 903-530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2015. (tlh, )
June 3, 2015 Filing 480 NOTICE by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. NOTICE BY DEFENDANT PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD. OF WITHDRAWAL OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER (DKT. 445) (Clark, Stuart)
June 2, 2015 Filing 479 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Sprint Spectrum L P Defendants Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Term "pertinent" from Defendants Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (Bettinger, Michael)
June 1, 2015 Filing 478 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Barton, Ross)
June 1, 2015 Filing 477 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Barton, Ross)
June 1, 2015 Filing 476 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stay)(Barton, Ross)
May 29, 2015 Filing 475 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE CURRENT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by AAA Life Insurance Company, American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barton, Ross)
May 28, 2015 Filing 474 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC)(Folsom, David)
May 28, 2015 Filing 473 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 28, 2015 Filing 472 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants AmEx by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 27, 2015 Filing 471 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by LPL Licensing, L.L.C. for proceedings held on April 10, 2015 Markman Hearing before Judge Roy Payne. (Tutt, Shani)
May 26, 2015 Filing 470 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #455 MOTION to Quash /PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S RESPONSE TO NON-PARTY YESMAIL, INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Shani M. Tutt, #3 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 26, 2015 Filing 469 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc. of Compliance of Payment to Technical Advisor (Weber, Robert)
May 22, 2015 Filing 468 RESPONSE to #452 Notice (Other) /PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAYNES CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
May 19, 2015 Filing 467 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc. re #458 Claim Construction Brief,, OF WITHDRAWAL OF DECLARATION OF JACK D. GRIMES, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bettinger, Michael)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER granting #464 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/18/2015. (ch, )
May 19, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #455 MOTION to Quash , #456 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 465 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 14, 2015 Filing 464 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting in part #460 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES WITH defendant Princess Cruise Lines. Status Conference set for 6/11/2015 01:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/14/2015. (ch, )
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting in part #459 Joint MOTION to Stay defendant Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. Status Conference set for 6/11/2015 01:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/13/2015. (ch, )
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting in part #457 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES with American Express Centurion Bank, AMEX Assurance Company, American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., American Express Company, and American Express Marketing & Devel filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C. Status Conference set for 6/11/2015 01:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/13/2015. (ch, )
May 13, 2015 Filing 460 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES WITH defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 12, 2015 Filing 459 Joint MOTION to Stay defendant Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 8, 2015 Filing 458 Supplemental CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Grimes, #2 Declaration of Yang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H)(Yang, Irene)
May 8, 2015 Filing 457 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES with American Express Centurion Bank, AMEX Assurance Company, American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., American Express Company, and American Express Marketing & Development Corp. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 7, 2015 Filing 456 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #491*** MOTION for Protective Order by Yesmail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeSantos, Laura) Modified on 6/16/2015 (ch, ).
May 7, 2015 Filing 455 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #491*** MOTION to Quash by Yesmail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeSantos, Laura) Modified on 6/16/2015 (ch, ).
May 7, 2015 Filing 454 ***FILED IN ERROR.*** MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order by Yesmail, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeSantos, Laura) Modified on 5/7/2015 (ch, ).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #451 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ravinder Singh Deol terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/7/2015. (ch, )
May 7, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 454, Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY HAS REFILED)(ch, )
May 4, 2015 Filing 452 NOTICE by General Motors LLC re #444 Memorandum & Opinion , Consolidated Defendants' Objections to Certain Limited Aspects of Claim Construction Order (Supko, Mark)
May 4, 2015 Filing 451 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sprint Spectrum L P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deol, Ravinder)
May 1, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C. re #403 Order PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C., AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S RESPONSE TO ORDER (DKT. NO. 403) REGARDING NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL TERMS TO BE CONSTRUED (Wang, Benjamin)
May 1, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc. Consolidated Defendants Additional Terms To Be Construed (Nelson, Mark)
April 27, 2015 Filing 448 NOTICE by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. Notice of Substantial Compliance by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. with Obligation to Produce or Permit Inspecition of Documents (Clark, Stuart)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER The Court has received Mr. Wolosons invoice for services through April 15, 2015, ORDERS payment to be promptly made as follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/27/2015. (ch, )
April 20, 2015 Filing 445 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for proceedings held on 4-10-2015 before Judge Roy Pane. (Clark, Stuart)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/18/2015. (ch, )
April 16, 2015 Filing 443 NOTICE by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. re #420 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, #402 Order Notice of Compliance Re Preliminary Election of Prior Art of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Clark, Stuart)
April 10, 2015 Filing 446 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 4/10/2015. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 442 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. re #420 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, #402 Order of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Govett, Brett)
April 8, 2015 Filing 441 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art [Dkt #402 and #420] (Barton, Ross)
April 8, 2015 Filing 440 NOTICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art [Dkt #402 and #420] (Barton, Ross)
April 8, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE by United Airlines, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art [dkt # 402 and # 420] (Barton, Ross)
April 8, 2015 Filing 438 NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Compliance re Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Supko, Mark)
April 8, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE by Gerber Life Insurance Company re #420 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, #402 Order of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Burr, Kendall)
April 8, 2015 Filing 436 NOTICE by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Nelson, Mark)
April 8, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. Compliance with Service of Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Kunze, Jason)
April 8, 2015 Filing 434 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company of Complaince with Service of Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Smith, Christopher)
April 8, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE by Sprint Spectrum L P of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Weber, Robert)
April 8, 2015 Filing 432 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marwan Elrakabawy on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. (Elrakabawy, Marwan)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #418 Motion to Strike #418 MOTION to Strike /PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY EXPERT DECLARATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/6/2015. (ch, )
April 3, 2015 Filing 429 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Sprint Spectrum LP)(Folsom, David)
April 2, 2015 Filing 428 RESPONSE in Opposition re #418 MOTION to Strike /PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY EXPERT DECLARATION filed by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Nelson, Mark)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING RE: #418 Motion to Strike Untimely Expert Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/30/2015. (ch, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting #417 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV, LLC with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/29/2015. (ch, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting #415 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant Carnival Corporation & plc with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/29/2015. (ch, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 424 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on March 11, 2015 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. Email: chris.bickham@yahoo.com

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2015. (Chris Bickham, )

March 27, 2015 Filing 423 Joint Claim Construction Chart by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 27, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 421, Joint Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 422 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Falkler on behalf of FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC (Falkler, Jonathan)
March 25, 2015 Filing 421 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 3/27/2015 (ch, ).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting #416 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE CURRENT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 2/8/2016 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 5/29/2015., Markman Hearing set for 4/10/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 11/25/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/25/2015. (ch, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 419 REPLY to #411 Claim Construction Brief, PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S REPLY MARKMAN BRIEF filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29, #2 Exhibit 30, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Appendix)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 23, 2015 Filing 418 MOTION to Strike /PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY EXPERT DECLARATION by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 23, 2015 Filing 417 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV, LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 20, 2015 Filing 416 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct THE CURRENT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 20, 2015 Filing 415 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Carnival Corporation & plc by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 19, 2015 Filing 414 NOTICE by Sprint Corporation, Sprint Spectrum L P re #410 Order Appointing Technical Advisor (Bettinger, Michael)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #412 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Deadline 3/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/18/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Filing 412 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend /JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE MARCH 16, 2015 JOINT MOTION DEADLINE [DKT 403] by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 16, 2015 Filing 411 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Govett, Brett)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER The Court hereby appoints Scott E. Woloson as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting in part #400 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines With Respect to Defendants DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV, LLC( Status Conference set for 3/31/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #388 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dell Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER granting #390 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting #386 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting #392 Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice As To Defendants Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2015. (ch, )
March 13, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 4/10/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 12, 2015 Filing 404 RESPONSE to #377 Notice (Other), PLAINTIFFS PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C. AND LPL LICENSING, L.L.C.S RESPONSE TO AMERCAN EXPRESSS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAYNES ORDER filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 11, 2015 Filing 431 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2015 re #286 Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs filed by Comcast Corporation, FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Verizon Communications, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Delta Air Lines, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., General Motors LLC, AAA Life Insurance Company, Wells Fargo & Company, DirecTV Inc, Sprint Spectrum L P, Dell Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #389 Order on Claim Construction disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/11/2015. (ch, )
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART TO REDUCT COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/11/2015. (ch, )
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting #391 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines With Respect to Defendant Carnival Corporation & plc. Status Conference set for 3/24/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/10/2015. (ch, )
March 10, 2015 Filing 400 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines With Respect to Defendants DIRECTV, Inc. and DIRECTV, LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 9, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc. re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 OF SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cimino, Frank)
March 6, 2015 Filing 398 REPLY to Response to Motion re #381 Opposed MOTION Claim Construction Briefing Structure filed by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc.. (Govett, Brett)
March 6, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Megan Khassian on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Incentive Services, LLC, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company (Khassian, Heather)
March 6, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Doll on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Incentive Services, LLC, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company (Doll, Patrick)
March 6, 2015 Filing 395 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garreth Alexander Sarosi on behalf of American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Incentive Services, LLC, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company (Sarosi, Garreth)
March 6, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T Milam on behalf of Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Milam, Matthew)
March 6, 2015 Filing 393 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T Milam on behalf of AAA Life Insurance Company (Milam, Matthew)
March 5, 2015 Filing 392 Joint MOTION to Dismiss All Claims With Prejudice As To Defendants Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 5, 2015 Filing 391 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines With Respect to Defendant Carnival Corporation & plc by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 4, 2015 Filing 390 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER SETTING HEARING AND CONTINUING DFT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINE - Hearing set for 3/11/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/4/2014. (ch, )
March 2, 2015 Filing 388 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dell Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 2, 2015 Filing 387 RESPONSE in Opposition re #381 Opposed MOTION Claim Construction Briefing Structure /PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING STRUCTURE filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
February 27, 2015 Filing 386 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
February 26, 2015 Filing 385 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Supplement 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Wang, Benjamin)
February 26, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE by Sprint Spectrum L P of Compliance regarding Defendants' Technology Tutorial (Weber, Robert)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting-in-part #378 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement With Defendants Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.., Status Conference set for 3/24/2015 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/26/2015. (nkl, )
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting-in-part #380 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement With Defendant Dell Inc. filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.., Status Conference set for 3/24/2015 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/26/2015. (nkl, )
February 25, 2015 Filing 381 Opposed MOTION Claim Construction Briefing Structure by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company, Carnival Corporation & PLC, Delta Air Lines, Inc., FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
February 24, 2015 Filing 380 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement With Defendant Dell Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #375 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2015. (ch, )
February 23, 2015 Filing 378 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement With Defendants Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications, LLC by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
February 23, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases American Express Objections to Magistrate Judge Paynes Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Mark)
February 23, 2015 Filing 376 ***FILED IN ERROR***MOTION for Reconsideration re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Mark) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ch, ).
February 23, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT - NOT A MOTION Document # 376, Motion for Reconsideration. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 375 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery JOINT STIPULATED Motion for Extension of Time by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulated Motion to Extend Time)(Barton, Ross)
February 17, 2015 Filing 374 Sealed Document. AT&T SERVICES, INC. AND AT&T MOBILITY LLC's NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL CLAIM TERMS REQUIRING CONSTRUCTION (Govett, Brett)
February 17, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 369 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
February 16, 2015 Filing 373 NOTICE by Gerber Life Insurance Company re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Notice of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Burr, Kendall)
February 16, 2015 Filing 372 NOTICE by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. re #361 Notice (Other),, #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Kunze, Jason)
February 16, 2015 Filing 371 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Barton, Ross)
February 16, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Connor, Michael)
February 16, 2015 Filing 369 NOTICE by United Airlines, Inc. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Broyles, Keith)
February 16, 2015 Filing 368 NOTICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Broyles, Keith)
February 16, 2015 Filing 367 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Broyles, Keith)
February 16, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE by Sprint Spectrum L P re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Deol, Ravinder)
February 16, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #347 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases /PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ELECTION OF CLAIM TERMS (Wang, Benjamin)
February 16, 2015 Filing 364 NOTICE by DIRECTV, LLC, DirecTV Inc OF ADDITIONAL CLAIM TERMS REQUIRING CONSTRUCTION (Johnson, Kellie)
February 16, 2015 Filing 363 NOTICE by Carnival Corporation & PLC of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Byer, Benjamin)
February 16, 2015 Filing 362 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Sooter, Mary)
February 16, 2015 Filing 361 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation , Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., AAA Life Insurance Company, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Sprint Spectrum L.P., Carnival Corporation, DIRECTV, Inc. DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., General Motors LLC, Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Verizon Communications Inc. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., FCA US LLC, American Express Centurion Bank, AMEX Assurance Company, and American Express Bank, FSB of Consolidated Defendants' Election of Claim Terms to Be Construed (Sooter, Mary)
February 16, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Supko, Mark)
February 16, 2015 Filing 359 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***AT&T Services, Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC's Notice of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction. Sealed Document. (Govett, Brett) Modified on 2/17/2015 (ch, ).
February 16, 2015 Filing 358 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company OF ADDITIONAL CLAIM TERMS REQUIRING CONSTRUCTION (Jakubowski, Matthew)
February 16, 2015 Filing 357 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Meek, Kevin)
February 16, 2015 Filing 356 NOTICE by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company of Additional Claim Terms Requiring Construction (Nelson, Mark)
February 16, 2015 Filing 355 RESPONSE to Motion re #352 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Reduce the Number of Claims Asserted Against American Express or in the Alternative, Permit American Express Additional Disputed Terms and Modify Dates filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
February 12, 2015 Filing 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (Kroeger, Paul)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER REGARDING MEET AND CONFER OBILIGATION - RE: #352 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Reduce the Number of Claims Asserted Against American Express or in the Alternative, Permit American Express Additional Disputed Terms and Modify Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2015. (ch, ) (ch, ).
February 11, 2015 Filing 352 Emergency MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Reduce the Number of Claims Asserted Against American Express or in the Alternative, Permit American Express Additional Disputed Terms and Modify Dates by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Nelson, Mark)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #342 Motion to Change Name. Dft Chrysler Group LLC will now be known as Dft FCA US LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/10/2015. (ch, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2015. (ch, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 349 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2015. (ch, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER VACATING #307 Consolidation Order, granting in part #325 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Cause No. 2:13-cv-01091-RWS-RSP is ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-00965. All affected parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2015. (ch, )
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #325 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #339 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2015. (ch, )
February 5, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 344, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 4, 2015 Filing 346 RESPONSE to Motion re #339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants AAA Life Insurance Company, American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Comcast Corporation, Comcast Cable Communications LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DIRECTV, Inc., DIRECTV, LLC, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint, Spectrum L.P., United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sooter, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2015: #2 CORRECTED ORDER) (ch, ).
February 4, 2015 Filing 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re #339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company. (Nelson, Mark)
February 4, 2015 Filing 344 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY.***RESPONSE in Opposition re #339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Travel Related Services, Inc., Amex Assurance Company. (Nelson, Mark) Modified on 2/5/2015 (ch, ).
February 4, 2015 Filing 343 RESPONSE to Motion re #339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Govett, Brett)
February 3, 2015 Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION for Name Change by Chrysler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 30, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #325 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Wang, Benjamin)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES re #339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/15. (ch, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 339 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting #337 Motion to Withdraw, attorney Dipu A Doshi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/28/2015. (ch, )
January 27, 2015 Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Dipu A. Doshi as Counsel of Record by Chrysler Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 27, 2015 Filing 336 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrysler Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.C. for Chrysler Group LLC. (Heartfield, J)
January 27, 2015 Filing 335 NOTICE by Chrysler Group LLC of Name Change (Heartfield, J)
January 27, 2015 Filing 334 NOTICE by Chrysler Group LLC of Firm and Address Change of its Counsel, Frank C. Cimino, Jr. (Heartfield, J)
January 27, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan S Woodworth on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC (Woodworth, Megan)
January 26, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Richard Lareau on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Lareau, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 331 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Richard Lareau on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Lareau, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Richard Lareau on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Lareau, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 329 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Richard Lareau on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Lareau, Stephen)
January 26, 2015 Filing 328 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Richard Lareau on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Lareau, Stephen)
January 21, 2015 Filing 327 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #325 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Wang, Benjamin)
January 9, 2015 Filing 326 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 filed by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fenster, Marc)
January 8, 2015 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, DISCOVERY ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Benjamin)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #323 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/08/2015. (nkl, )
January 6, 2015 Filing 323 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction Statement (Corrected) by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, LPL Licensing, L.L.C., LPL Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636), LPL Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:13-cv-1091), Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636), Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from Case 2:13-cv-1091), Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
January 6, 2015 Filing 322 NOTICE by American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, Amex Assurance Company of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Nelson, Mark)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting #316 Motion for Extension of Time to appoint mediator 1/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #315 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 Replies due by 1/9/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #314 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwayne Cuthbert Norton terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER denying #313 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, )
December 30, 2014 Filing 317 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Claim Chart)(Sooter, Mary)
December 30, 2014 Filing 316 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for the parties to comply with the consolidation order of December 17, 2014 (Dkt. No. 307) by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 30, 2014 Filing 315 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #312 Reply to Response to Motion,,, /AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SUR-REPLY by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., LPL Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636), LPL Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:13-cv-1091), Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.(Consolidated from case 2:14-cv-636). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 30, 2014 Filing 314 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dwayne C. Norton by American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Dwayne)
December 23, 2014 Filing 313 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File for the parties to comply with P.R. 4-3 by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 22, 2014 Filing 312 REPLY to Response to Motion re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 filed by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., American Express Bank, FSB, American Express Centurion Bank, American Express Company, American Express Incentive Services, LLC, American Express Marketing & Development Corp., Amex Assurance Company, Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yang, Irene)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting #310 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/22/2014. (ch, )
December 18, 2014 Filing 310 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 18, 2014 Filing 309 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Kevin James Meek on behalf of Dell Inc. (Meek, Kevin)
December 17, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Smith, Melissa)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ***VACATED PER ORDER #348***CONSOLIDATED ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-cv-1081. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 2/9/2015 (ch, ).
December 12, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 4/7/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #305 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/9/2014. (ch, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 305 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss /UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, INC. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 5, 2014 Filing 304 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Wang, Benjamin)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #301 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 Responses due by 12/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/2/2014. (ch, )
December 2, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Compliance (Sooter, Mary)
December 1, 2014 Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 20, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. /PLAINTIFFS LPL LICENSING, L.L.C. AND PHOENIX LICENSING, L.L.C.S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING SERVICE OF 4-2 PRELIMINARY CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS and PRELIMINARY IDENTIFICATION of EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE (Wang, Benjamin)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #297 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss. FMR LLC and Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/14/2014. (ch, )
November 14, 2014 Filing 298 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings that the Asserted Claims are Invalid Under 35 U.S.C. sec. 101 by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Irene Yang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 13, 2014 Filing 297 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss /AGREED MOTION FOR STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #294 Stipulation of Dismissal. Navient Solutions, Inc Upromise Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/10/2014. (ch, )
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #186 Motion to Withdraw. Stuart Dunwoody, Benjamin Byer and Davis Tremaine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/10/2014. (ch, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 294 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER denying #286 Entry of Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art To Reduce Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/6/2014. (ch, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #291 Motion for Extension of Time to File P.R. 4-1, 4-2 and 4-3 Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/4/2014. (ch, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 291 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /SERVE P.R. 4-1, 4-2, and 4-3 DEADLINES by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 3, 2014 Filing 290 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /SERVE P.R. 4-1, 4-2, and 4-3 DEADLINES by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ch, ).
November 3, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 290, Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 31, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sallie Mae, Inc, Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Upromise Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. Consolidated Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding Service of P.R. 4-1 Proposed Terms, Phrases and Claim Elements for Contruction (Dacus, Deron)
October 30, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. SERVICE OF PR 4-1 Proposed Terms of Claim Elements for Claim Construction (Wang, Benjamin)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER granting #285 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., Toyota Financial Savings Bank and Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/29/2014. (ch, )
October 24, 2014 Filing 286 Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sprint Spectrum L P, United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
October 23, 2014 Filing 285 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
October 23, 2014 Filing 284 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shani M Tutt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tutt, Shani)
October 20, 2014 Filing 283 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Consolidated Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Sooter, Mary)
October 17, 2014 Filing 282 ANSWER to #265 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 281 ANSWER to #262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 280 ANSWER to #266 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 279 ANSWER to #263 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Filing 278 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott L Bittman on behalf of General Motors LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4887704. (Bittman, Scott)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting in part #272 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Financial Savings Bank, and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. Stayed until 11/26/2014. Status Conference set for 12/2/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (ch, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 276 RESPONSE to #251 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC.S AND CELLCO PARTNERSHIP D/B/A VERIZON WIRELESSS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE to #250 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO DEFENDANT GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS COUNTERCLAIMS by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 274 RESPONSE to #256 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO DEFENDANT DELL INC.S FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 273 RESPONSE to #257 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim ANSWER TO AT&T MOBILITY LLCS AND AT&T SERVICES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIMS by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
October 10, 2014 Filing 272 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #270 Stipulation of Dismissal. Physicians Mutual Insurance Company, Physicians Life Insurance Company dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/9/2014. (ch, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 270 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granitng in part #267 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Deadlines between Moving Parties are stayed until 11/14/2014 pending settlement. Status Conference set for 11/18/2014 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/2/2014. (ch, )
September 29, 2014 Filing 268 ANSWER to #232 Amended Complaint, by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation.(Dacus, Deron)
September 29, 2014 Filing 267 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 29, 2014 Filing 266 ANSWER to #234 Amended Complaint, DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by General Motors LLC.(Supko, Mark)
September 29, 2014 Filing 265 ANSWER to #236 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd..(Kunze, Jason)
September 29, 2014 Filing 264 ANSWER to #247 Amended Complaint, by Sprint Spectrum L P.(Bettinger, Michael)
September 29, 2014 Filing 263 Carnival Corporation & PLC's ANSWER to #230 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Carnival Corporation & PLC.(Dunwoody, Stuart)
September 29, 2014 Filing 262 Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd's ANSWER to #230 Amended Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd..(Clark, Stuart)
September 29, 2014 Filing 261 ANSWER to #242 Amended Complaint by AAA Life Insurance Company.(Jakubowski, Matthew)
September 27, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. to 10/29/2014; Toyota Motor North America, Inc. to 10/29/2014; Toyota Financial Savings Bank to 10/29/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 27, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 26, 2014 Filing 260 ANSWER to #231 Amended Complaint, by Chrysler Group LLC.(Heartfield, J)
September 26, 2014 Filing 259 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 237) re Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc..( Heartfield, J)
September 25, 2014 Filing 258 ANSWER to #241 Amended Complaint, by DIRECTV, LLC, DirecTV Inc.(McBride, Kevin)
September 25, 2014 Filing 257 ANSWER to #243 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Govett, Brett)
September 25, 2014 Filing 256 Defendant Dell Inc's First Amended ANSWER to #239 Amended Complaint, and, First COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Dell Inc..(Meek, Kevin)
September 25, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 255 First Amended Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #238 Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc..(Barton, Ross)
September 24, 2014 Filing 254 Defenses and ANSWER to #240 Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
September 24, 2014 Filing 253 Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #245 Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement by United Airlines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
September 24, 2014 Filing 252 American Airlines Answer and Defenses ANSWER to #229 Amended Complaint, for Patent Infringement by American Airlines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
September 24, 2014 Filing 251 AMENDED ANSWER to #246 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Jones, Michael)
September 24, 2014 Filing 250 ANSWER to #233 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Gerber Life Insurance Company.(Burr, Kendall)
September 24, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 12, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Production of Documents (Sooter, Mary)
September 11, 2014 Filing 248 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: successful (Physicians Mutual Insurance Company, Physicians Life Insurance Company)(Folsom, David)
September 10, 2014 Filing 247 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sprint Spectrum L P, (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1097) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 246 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc., (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1100) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 245 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United Airlines, Inc., filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wang, Benjamin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 244 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc., (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1090) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 243 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., ( consolidated case 2:13-cv-1083)filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 242 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AAA Life Insurance Company, filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Benjamin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 241 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DIRECTV, LLC, DirecTV Inc, (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1089)filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 240 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Delta Air Lines, Inc., (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1088) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 239 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dell Inc.,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1087) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 238 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wang, Benjamin)
September 10, 2014 Filing 237 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1098) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 236 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1095) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 235 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1094) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 234 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1093) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 233 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gerber Life Insurance Company,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1092) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 232 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1086) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 231 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chrysler Group LLC, (consolidated case 2:13-cv-1085) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 230 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1084) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 10, 2014 Filing 229 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Airlines, Inc.,(consolidated case 2:13-cv-1082) filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 9/11/2014 (ch, ).
September 9, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 12/14/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #227 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order Pretrial Conference set for 10/27/2015 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 12/7/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 5/6/2015., Motions due by 9/25/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/5/2014. (ch, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 227 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
August 18, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Request for Ruling on the Motion (Robinson, William)
August 12, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 (Robinson, William)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Woodard Cook terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/1/2014. (ch, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason W. Cook by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
July 23, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Compliance (Wright, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 7/29/2015 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
July 21, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Holland Councill on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Councill, Pamela)
July 21, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Holland Councill on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Councill, Pamela)
July 21, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 9/14/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/15/2014. (ch, )
July 11, 2014 Filing 218 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order's Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Courtney Suzanne Werner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/11/2014. (ch, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Courtney)
July 9, 2014 Filing 215 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by American Airlines, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.. (Werner, Courtney) Modified on 7/9/2014 (ch, ).
July 9, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 215 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE OR PROPOSED ORDER. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 214 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting #202 UNOPPOSED MOTION BY NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, INC. AND UPROMISE, INC. TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDERS DEADLINE TO EXCHANGE INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/01/2014. (nkl, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Holland Councill on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Councill, Pamela)
June 30, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Holland Councill on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (Councill, Pamela)
June 30, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela Holland Councill on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Councill, Pamela)
June 30, 2014 Filing 209 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc. of Compliance PR 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
June 30, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE by Verizon Communications, Inc. of Compliance re: PR 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
June 30, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. of Compliance re: PR 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
June 30, 2014 Filing 206 NOTICE by United Airlines, Inc. of Compliance re PR 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
June 30, 2014 Filing 205 NOTICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. of Compliance re: PR 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
June 27, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Compliance (Meek, Kevin)
June 27, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE by Gerber Life Insurance Company of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 3-3 and 3-4 (Burr, Kendall)
June 26, 2014 Filing 202 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order's Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2014: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
June 26, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Supko, Mark)
June 26, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. in Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Kunze, Jason)
June 25, 2014 Filing 199 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #196 Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gillam, Harry)
June 25, 2014 Filing 198 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. in Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Heartfield, J)
June 25, 2014 Filing 197 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #196 Reply to Response to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 6/25/2014 (ch, ).
June 25, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE COVER PAGE Document # 197, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #144 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2014. (ch, )
June 20, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 (Jakubowski, Matthew)
June 18, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING PR 3-3 & 3-4 (Gillam, Harry)
June 18, 2014 Filing 192 NOTICE by Sprint Spectrum L P of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 (Weber, Robert)
June 18, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE by DIRECTV, LLC OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4(b) (McBride, Kevin)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #180 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-4(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/17/2014. (ch, )
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #178 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Invalidity Contentions and Product Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/17/2014. (ch, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eagle Howard Robinson on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC (Robinson, Eagle)
June 17, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation PR 3-4(a) and 3-4(b) Disclosures (Sooter, Mary)
June 17, 2014 Filing 186 MOTION to Withdraw Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw from Representation of Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. by Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunwoody, Stuart)
June 17, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Chrysler Group LLC PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Cimino, Frank)
June 16, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE by Carnival Corporation & PLC Defendant Carnival Corporation's Notice of Compliance (Dunwoody, Stuart)
June 16, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company, AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Carnival Corporation & PLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Chrysler Group LLC, Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation, DIRECTV, LLC, Dell Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., DirecTV Inc, FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc., General Motors LLC, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd., Sallie Mae, Inc, Sprint Corporation, Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc., United Airlines, Inc., Upromise Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. of Compliance (Barton, Ross)
June 16, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #179 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Correction (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Exhibit I to Declaration of Benjamin T. Wang)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 16, 2014 Filing 181 Letter Brief filed by Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Clark, Stuart)
June 16, 2014 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with PR 3-4(a) by DIRECTV, LLC, DirecTV Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
June 13, 2014 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #144 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin T. Wang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 11, 2014 Filing 178 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Exchange Invalidity Contentions and Produce Documents Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William)
June 10, 2014 Filing 177 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Arguments in Support of Its Proposals of Paragraphs 9-11 of the Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants Arguments in Support of Their Proposed Provisions in the Protective Order)(Sooter, Mary)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Dismiss. Wells Fargo & Company is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/10/2014. (ch, )
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #173 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #144 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/9/2014. (ch, )
June 9, 2014 Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wells Fargo & Company Without Prejudice by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 6, 2014 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #144 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER finding as moot #142 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/06/2014. (rsp3)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER striking #137 Notice (Other), filed by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/2014. (ch, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/2014. (ch, )
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/4/2014. (ch, )
June 4, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stuart Craig Clark on behalf of Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4689970. (Clark, Stuart)
June 4, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Heartfield, J)
June 4, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by AAA Life Insurance Company OF COMPLIANCE (Jakubowski, Matthew)
June 4, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE by United Airlines, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Broyles, Keith)
June 4, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE by Delta Air Lines, Inc. of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Broyles, Keith)
June 4, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc. of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Broyles, Keith)
June 4, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Barton, Ross)
June 4, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Barton, Ross)
June 3, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Wang, Benjamin)
June 3, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sprint Corporation (Bettinger, Michael)
June 3, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Govett, Brett)
June 3, 2014 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Consoldiated Defendants. Filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sooter, Mary)
June 3, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE by DirecTV Inc re #139 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,, Notice of Compliance (McBride, Kevin)
June 3, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Sooter, Mary)
June 3, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. re #139 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,, of Compliance by Navient Solutions, Inc. (f/k/a Sallie Mae, Inc.) and Upromise Inc. (Robinson, William)
June 3, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE by Dell Inc. of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Meek, Kevin)
June 3, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC of Compliance (Gillam, Harry)
June 3, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Gerber Life Insurance Company re #139 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,, Notice of Compliance (Burr, Kendall)
June 3, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE by Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Paxson, Sarah)
June 3, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE by Chrysler Group LLC re #134 Agreed MOTION re #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #127 Order for Entry of Proposed, Partially Disputed Discovery Order, #139 Order, Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,, (Cimino, Frank)
June 3, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. Notice of Compliance (Kunze, Jason)
June 3, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Dunwoody, Stuart)
June 3, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE by General Motors LLC of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Supko, Mark)
May 29, 2014 Filing 145 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION to Strike #137 Notice (Other), of Defendants Navient Solutions, Inc. (formerly Salle Mae, Inc.) and Upromise, Inc. Regarding Discovery Order and Docket Control Order and Request for Deconsolidation filed by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Robinson, William)
May 19, 2014 Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. David Folsom, Jackson Walker, L.L.P., 6004 Summerfield Drive, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number 903-255-3251, fax number 903-255-3266, and email dfolsom@jw.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2014. (ch, )
May 12, 2014 Filing 142 MOTION to Strike #137 Notice (Other), of Defendants Navient Solutions, Inc. (formerly Salle Mae, Inc.) and Upromise, Inc. Regarding Discovery Order and Docket Control Order and Request for Deconsolidation by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. Responses due by 5/29/2014 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin T. Wang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 12, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravinder Singh Deol on behalf of Sprint Corporation (Deol, Ravinder)
May 8, 2014 Filing 140 RESPONSE to DEFENDANT GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS COUNTERCLAIMS by LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Tutt, Shani)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 11/6/2014., Jury Selection set for 9/8/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/19/2015., Markman Hearing set for 1/22/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 7/7/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/6/2014. (ch, )
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline is extended to 5/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/6/2014. (ch, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 137 ***STRIKEN PER ORDER # 171***NOTICE by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. re #133 Agreed MOTION re #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #127 Order for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order, #134 Agreed MOTION re #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #127 Order for Entry of Proposed, Partially Disputed Discovery Order Statement of Navient Solutions, Inc. and Upromise, Inc. Regarding Proposed Amendments (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robinson, William) Modified on 6/5/2014 (ch, ).
May 5, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE by Sallie Mae, Inc of Change of Corporate Name to Navient Solutions, Inc. (Robinson, William)
May 5, 2014 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. (Robinson, William)
May 5, 2014 Filing 134 Agreed MOTION re #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #127 Order for Entry of Proposed, Partially Disputed Discovery Order by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 5, 2014 Filing 133 Agreed MOTION re #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #127 Order for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
May 5, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 131, Submission of Agreed Orders. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 5, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 132, Submission of Discovery Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 2, 2014 Filing 132 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 5/5/2014 (ch, ).
May 2, 2014 Filing 131 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 5/5/2014 (ch, ).
May 2, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom and Tony Pizza, filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. re #127 Order (Wang, Benjamin)
May 2, 2014 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #114 Amended Complaint, by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 25, 2014 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AAA Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent ACLI Acquisition Company for AAA Life Insurance Company. (Jakubowski, Matthew)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #120 Joint Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/23/2014. (ch, )
April 22, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #84 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Wang, Benjamin)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/21/2014. (ch, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 124 ANSWER to Complaint /PHYSICIANS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS AND PHYSICIANS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS COUNTERCLAIMS by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
April 21, 2014 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint /GENERAL MOTORS LLCS COUNTERCLAIMS by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
April 21, 2014 Filing 122 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
April 21, 2014 Filing 121 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECT DOCUMENT # 120 ***STIPULATION /JOINT STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 4/21/2014 (ch, ).
April 21, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE CORRECT DOCUMENT # 120 Document # 121, Stipulation. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 21, 2014 ***PLEASE DISREGARD THIS FILED IN ERROR.***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 120, Joint Stipulated Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 4/21/2014 (ch, ).
April 18, 2014 Filing 120 Joint Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Docket Control Order, Proposed Discovery Order, and Notice of Mediator, by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 4/21/2014 (ch, ). Modified on 4/21/2014 (ch, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.'s Counterclaims in Response to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/16/14. (mrm, )
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #89 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 4/15/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/16/14. (mrm, )
April 17, 2014 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint /COUNTERCLAIMS by AT&T MOBILITY LLCS AND AT&T SERVICES, INC. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
April 15, 2014 Filing 116 RESPONSE to Motion re #89 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
April 15, 2014 Filing 115 Phoenix LIcensing, L.L.C. and LPL Licensing, L.L.C's ANSWER to Complaint /ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. Counterclaims by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin) Modified on 4/16/2014 (nkl, ).
April 15, 2014 Filing 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc., filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wang, Benjamin)
April 15, 2014 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
April 15, 2014 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO FIDELITY INVESTMENTS, INC., FIDELITY BROKERAGE SERVICES, LLC, AND FMR LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
April 14, 2014 Filing 111 ANSWER to #99 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Gerber Life Insurance Company.(Burr, Kendall)
April 10, 2014 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William J. Robinson)(Robinson, William)
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml)
April 7, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. re #84 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct of Compliance (Wang, Benjamin)
April 7, 2014 Filing 108 Phoenix LIcensing, L.L.C. and LPL Licensing, L.L.C's ANSWER to #48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Verizon Communications Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
April 5, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC (Everingham, Charles)
April 2, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Perez-Albuerne on behalf of FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc. (Perez-Albuerne, Carlos)
April 1, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret E Ives on behalf of FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc. (Ives, Margaret)
March 31, 2014 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 31, 2014 Filing 103 ANSWER to #62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Dell Inc. by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/31/14. (mrm, )
March 28, 2014 Filing 101 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 27, 2014 Filing 100 RESPONSE to Defendant Gerber Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss (filed as Doc 16 in Member Case 13-1092) filed by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 27, 2014 Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gerber Life Insurance Company, filed by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
March 27, 2014 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FMR LLC for Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
March 27, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dipu Doshi on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4584236. (Doshi, Dipu)
March 26, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesse J Jenner on behalf of Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Jenner, Jesse)
March 26, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diana Gladys Santos on behalf of Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Santos, Diana)
March 26, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Simpson on behalf of Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Simpson, Todd)
March 26, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Biddinger on behalf of Toyota Financial Savings Bank, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc. (Biddinger, Brian)
March 26, 2014 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors LLC (Supko, Mark)
March 26, 2014 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint , DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by General Motors LLC.(Supko, Mark)
March 26, 2014 Filing 90 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
March 26, 2014 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss by FMR LLC, Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC, Fidelity Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 26, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene I Yang on behalf of Sprint Corporation (Yang, Irene)
March 26, 2014 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company (Paxson, Sarah)
March 26, 2014 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company.(Paxson, Sarah)
March 26, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC (Cimino, Frank)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 JOINT Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/25/2014. (sm, )
March 25, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin J Byer on behalf of Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4581071. (Byer, Benjamin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 82 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #74 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wang, Benjamin)
March 24, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Taylor Smith on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Smith, Darren)
March 24, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Leventhal on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Leventhal, Daniel)
March 24, 2014 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T, Inc. (Govett, Brett)
March 24, 2014 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Govett, Brett)
March 24, 2014 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc..(Govett, Brett)
March 21, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY REFILED AT #51 Document # 29, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 21, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 53, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 20, 2014 Filing 76 STIPULATION to Substitute Parties by AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc., LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.. (Wang, Benjamin)
March 20, 2014 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (2:13-cv-1095) Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd..(Kunze, Jason)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2014 02:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/19/2014. (nkl, )
March 19, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart R Dunwoody on behalf of Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Dunwoody, Stuart)
March 17, 2014 Filing 72 Phoenix LIcensing, L.L.C. and LPL Licensing, L.L.C's ANSWER to Complaint /Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.'s Amended Counterclaims by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
March 17, 2014 Filing 71 Phoenix LIcensing, L.L.C. and LPL Licensing, L.L.C's ANSWER to Complaint /Carnival Corporation & PLC's Counterclaims by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
March 17, 2014 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. (Kunze, Jason)
March 16, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-cv-1081. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/12/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William)
March 14, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
March 14, 2014 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrysler Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat North America LLC for Chrysler Group LLC. (Heartfield, J)
March 14, 2014 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (filed in Civil Action No. 2:13-cv-1085) by Chrysler Group LLC.(Heartfield, J)
March 14, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jean-Paul Ciardullo on behalf of Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
March 14, 2014 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Denali Intermediate Inc. for Dell Inc.. (Meek, Kevin)
March 14, 2014 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint #19 First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM in 2:13-cv-01087-JRG-RSP against LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. by Dell Inc..(Meek, Kevin)
March 14, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anne Jin Lee on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation (Lee, Anne)
March 14, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Cowan Wright on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation (Wright, Elizabeth)
March 14, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary V Sooter on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Comcast Corporation (Sooter, Mary)
March 14, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Marie Paxson on behalf of Physicians Life Insurance Company, Physicians Mutual Insurance Company (Paxson, Sarah)
March 14, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paula Diane Heyman on behalf of Dell Inc. (Heyman, Paula)
March 14, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin James Meek on behalf of Dell Inc. (Meek, Kevin)
March 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN WRONG CASE Document # 55, Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 55 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Sallie Mae, Inc, Upromise Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, William) Modified on 3/14/2014 (ch, ).
March 13, 2014 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gerber Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nestle S.A. for Gerber Life Insurance Company. (Burr, Kendall)
March 13, 2014 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of General Motors LLC (Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/21/2014 (ch, ).
March 13, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 12, 2014 Filing 51 Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Patent Infringment by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc..(Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications, Inc. for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless; Corporate Parent None for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 49 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint ( #1 in 2:13cv1100), Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Jones, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kellie M Johnson on behalf of DIRECTV, LLC, DirecTV Inc (Johnson, Kellie)
March 12, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Edward Broyles on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Connor on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Connor, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Connor on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Connor, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Connor on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Connor, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Connor on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Connor, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S Connor on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Connor, Michael)
March 12, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Barton, Ross)
March 12, 2014 Filing 29 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY REFILED AT 51*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc..(Barton, Ross) Modified on 3/21/2014 (ch, ).
March 12, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Cuthbert Norton on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc. (Norton, Dwayne)
March 12, 2014 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent American Airlines Group Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Airlines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Continental Holdings, Inc. for United Airlines, Inc.. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United Airlines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Delta Air Lines, Inc..(Broyles, Keith)
March 12, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Cuthbert Norton on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Norton, Dwayne)
March 12, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Cuthbert Norton on behalf of United Airlines, Inc. (Norton, Dwayne)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER; The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:13-cv-1081. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/11/14. (mrm, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher C Smith on behalf of AAA Life Insurance Company (Smith, Christopher)
March 7, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Cantor on behalf of AAA Life Insurance Company (Cantor, Mark)
March 7, 2014 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AAA Life Insurance Company (Jakubowski, Matthew)
March 7, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by AAA Life Insurance Company.(Jakubowski, Matthew)
March 7, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline due 3/7/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 6, 2014 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AAA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 8, 2014 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C..(Wang, Benjamin)
January 8, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AAA Life Insurance Company to 2/6/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 30, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed for AAA Life Insurance Company served on 12/17/2013, answer due 1/7/2014. (bas, )
December 13, 2013 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to AAA Life Insurance Company. (ch, )
December 12, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (Rambin, Daymon)
December 12, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 12, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
December 12, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 11, 2013 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Wang, Benjamin)
December 11, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (Fenster, Marc)
December 11, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. of Related Cases (Wang, Benjamin)
December 11, 2013 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LPL Licensing, L.L.C., Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. (Wang, Benjamin)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AAA Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4439830.), filed by Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C., LPL Licensing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Wang, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C. et al v. AAA Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Licensing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shani M Tutt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LPL Licensing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shani M Tutt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Benjamin T Wang
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.
Represented By: Jason T Kunze
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Marketing & Development Corp.
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Stephen Richard Lareau
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Carnival Corporation & PLC
Represented By: Stuart R Dunwoody
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Benjamin J Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Stephen Richard Lareau
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Natalie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary (Mindy) V Sooter
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Represented By: Anne Jin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fidelity Brokerage Services, LLC
Represented By: Margaret E Ives
Represented By: Carlos Perez-Albuerne
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Stephen Richard Lareau
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Stuart Craig Clark
Represented By: Stuart R Dunwoody
Represented By: Matthew T Milam
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Benjamin J Byer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Scott L Bittman
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Mark M Supko
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S Leventhal
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Darren Taylor Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fidelity Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret E Ives
Represented By: Carlos Perez-Albuerne
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Travel Related Services, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amex Assurance Company
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: FMR LLC
Represented By: Margaret E Ives
Represented By: Carlos Perez-Albuerne
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S Leventhal
Represented By: Marwan Elrakabawy
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Darren Taylor Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Physicians Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Sarah Marie Paxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kendall Johan Burr
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Stephen Richard Lareau
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Toyota Financial Savings Bank
Represented By: Brian P Biddinger
Represented By: Todd M Simpson
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Diana Gladys Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Spectrum L P
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Irene I Yang
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Physicians Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark W Bayer
Represented By: Sarah Marie Paxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P Biddinger
Represented By: Todd M Simpson
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Diana Gladys Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Werner
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Stephen Richard Lareau
Represented By: Pamela Holland Councill
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Keith Edward Broyles
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: Michael S Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Kellie M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P Biddinger
Represented By: Todd M Simpson
Represented By: Jesse J Jenner
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Diana Gladys Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Natalie Hanlon-Leh
Represented By: Mary (Mindy) V Sooter
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Represented By: Anne Jin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sallie Mae, Inc
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: William J Robinson
Represented By: Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Ajay A Sharma
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Irene I Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Kevin James Meek
Represented By: Paula Diane Heyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: DirecTV Inc
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Kellie M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Express Incentive Services, LLC
Represented By: Heather Megan Khassian
Represented By: Garreth Alexander Sarosi
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: FCA US LLC f/k/a Chrysler Group, LLC
Represented By: Frank C Cimino, Jr
Represented By: Megan S Woodworth
Represented By: Jonathan Lee Falkler
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Dipu Doshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Upromise Inc.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: William J Robinson
Represented By: Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark A Cantor
Represented By: Matthew T Milam
Represented By: Christopher C Smith
Represented By: Matthew M Jakubowski
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Marwan Elrakabawy
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Scott Woloson
Represented By: Scott Edward Woloson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Antonio Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yesmail, Inc.
Represented By: Laura E DeSantos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?