Brite Smart Corp. v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Brite Smart Corp.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Don Tiller and David Folsom
Case Number: 2:2014cv00760
Filed: July 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2015 CASE: 2:14-cv-00760 DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 5:15-cv-03962, filed 09/02/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William O Cooper terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/09/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #157 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/09/2015. (nkl, )
August 31, 2015 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on Behalf of William O. Cooper for Defendant And Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 11, 2015 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff And Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #155 Motion to Stay pending Transfer to the Northern District of California. This stay does not apply to the Court's order to Pay Technical advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/10/2015. (ch, )
August 6, 2015 Filing 155 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to the Northern District of California by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/03/2015. (nkl, )
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/21/2015. (nkl, )
July 16, 2015 Filing 152 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus to the extent that the lower court must issue a decision on Google's transfer motion within 30 days of the date of this order and stay all other proceedings pending final resolution of the transfer motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum filed by Google Inc. Circuit Judges: Newman, Linn, and O'Malley. (dlc, )
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER - All deadlines in this case are hereby stayed pending the resolution of Googles Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/16/2015. (nkl, )
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion to Amend Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 0716/2015. (nkl, )
July 15, 2015 Filing 149 AMENDED ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint #123 Amended Complaint, by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
July 14, 2015 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #96 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,, Docket Control Order by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
July 14, 2015 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #97 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
July 13, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Michelle Ann Clark re #143 Transcript,,,. (Clark, Michelle)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion Regarding Brite Smarts Request for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/12/2015. (nkl, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 144 Joint MOTION for Discovery Regarding Brite Smart's Request for Production No. 166 by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 143 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 6-30-2015 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2015. (tj, )
July 2, 2015 Filing 142 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 6-30-2015 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2015. (tj, )
July 2, 2015 Filing 141 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #57 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #80 Sealed Motion; granting #81 Sealed Motion; granting #82 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #116 Sealed Motion; granting #121 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/01/2015. (nkl, )
June 30, 2015 Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2015 re #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Brite Smart Corp., #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc., #116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Google Inc., #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Google Inc., #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Brite Smart Corp., #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Court Reporter Tonya Jackson.) (bga, )
June 30, 2015 Filing 138 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 6/30/2015. (Court Reporter Tonya Jackson.) (bga, )
June 29, 2015 Filing 137 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Decl. of Michelle Clark, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Clark, Michelle)
June 29, 2015 Filing 136 RESPONSE to Motion re #121 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Non-Opposition filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Freeman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
June 26, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lin Yang on behalf of Google Inc. (Yang, Lance)
June 26, 2015 Filing 134 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
June 25, 2015 Filing 133 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
June 24, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery, #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials, #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, #116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions, #121 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing RESET for 6/30/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
June 22, 2015 Filing 132 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Michelle Clark, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Clark, Michelle)
June 22, 2015 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Further Evidence In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District of California filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Davis Declaration, #2 Exhibit A (Driving Directions and Travel Time from Boca Raton to San Francisco, #3 Exhibit B (Driving Directions and Travel Time from Boca Raton to El Paso, #4 Exhibit C (Driving Directions and Travel Time from Boca Raton to Tyler), #5 Exhibit D (Southwest Map), #6 Exhibit E (Zuili Deposition Excerpt))(Davis, Stafford)
June 22, 2015 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories, #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery, #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials, #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions, #116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents, #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions, #121 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2015 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/21/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER the Court hereby appoints Don Tiller as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2015. (ch, )
June 18, 2015 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
June 16, 2015 Filing 126 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Robert)
June 15, 2015 Filing 125 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 123 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Google Inc., filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,249,104, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,953,667, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,326,763, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,671,057)(Katz, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 122 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #121 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Harrity 730-737, #2 Exhibit 6 - Harrity 739-750, #3 Exhibit 7 - Google's production letter, #4 Exhibit 8 - Google's Suppl Rog Resp)(Katz, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 121 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katz Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Harrity Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 2 - Harrity LLP Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 3 - Resp & Obj to Harrity Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 4 - Resp & Obj to Harrity LLP Subpoena, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
June 11, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE by Brite Smart Corp. of Opposition to Google's Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Stafford)
June 9, 2015 Filing 119 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/05/2015. (nkl, )
June 4, 2015 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Yang Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(Perlson, David)
June 3, 2015 Filing 116 SEALED MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Production of Documents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
June 2, 2015 Filing 115 SEALED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Google Inc. to #87 Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Declaration of Antonio Sistos)(Sistos, Antonio)
June 2, 2015 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Filing 112 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER directing Brite Smart Corp to respond to the petition for writ of mandamus no later than seven days after the issuance of this order. Any reply by Google is due not later than three days from the date of service of that response.(dlc, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 111 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING: A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 15-138. (dlc, )
May 28, 2015 Filing 110 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Perlson Declaration, #2 Duffy Declaration, #3 Friesen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 28, 2015 Filing 109 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Matthews Declaration, #2 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 28, 2015 Filing 108 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #79 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
May 28, 2015 Filing 107 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER withdrawing #84 Motion to Expedite; granting #104 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/28/2015. (nkl, )
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions. Responses due by 5/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/28/2015. (nkl, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #84 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Google's Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record With Further Evidence In Support of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District Of California by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #91 Motion to Unseal Document #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/27/2015. (nkl, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 102 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #83 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Further Evidence In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District of California Notice of Waiver of Reply (Perlson, David)
May 26, 2015 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 26, 2015 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Google's Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record With Further Evidence In Support of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District Of California filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
May 26, 2015 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Further Evidence In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District of California filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (emails to David Perlson), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
May 22, 2015 Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #76 Motion For Entry of Model Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/22/2015. (ch, )
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2015., Jury Selection set for 1/11/2016 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 7/28/2015., Markman Hearing set for 6/30/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 11/9/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/22/2015. (ch, )
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials Responses due by 5/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/22/2015. (ch, )
May 21, 2015 Filing 94 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Clark, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Clark, Michelle)
May 21, 2015 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
May 21, 2015 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Perlson, David)
May 20, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION to Unseal Document #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Google Inc. by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Michelle)
May 20, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Jones, Michael)
May 19, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE by Brite Smart Corp. Notice of Technology Tutorial (Katz, Robert)
May 19, 2015 Filing 88 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #87 Sealed Document,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27 - Google Design Documents re Concatenate and Cookie, #2 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts from Agrawal Transcript, #3 Exhibit 29 - Google Exemplary Cookie Definition, #4 Exhibit 30 - ZeroAccess Click-Fraud Article, #5 Exhibit 31 - Pretermined Definition from Encarta Dictionary, #6 Exhibit 32 - Website and Webpages Definition from Random House Dictionary, #7 Exhibit 33 - Website and Webpates Definition from Microsoft Dictionary, #8 Exhibit 34 - Excerpts from Turner Transcript)(Katz, Robert)
May 19, 2015 Filing 87 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - United States Patent No. 7,249,104, #2 Exhibit 2 - United States Patent No. 7,953,667, #3 Exhibit 3 - United States Patent No. 8,326,763, #4 Exhibit 4 - United States Patent No. 8,671,057, #5 Exhibit 5 - Google Design Document re Fighting Spam, #6 Exhibit 6 - Google Annual Report Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Client Definition from A Dictionary of Computing, #8 Exhibit 8 - Client Definition from Dictionary of Computer Science, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cookie Definition from Google's Key Terms, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from Surdulescu Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11 - Google Design Document re Cookie, #12 Exhibit 12 - Julia Layton - Click Fraud Article, #13 Exhibit 13 - Wendy Davis - Click Fraud Article, #14 Exhibit 14 - Jessie Stricchhiola - Click Fraud Article, #15 Exhibit 15 - Tuzhilin Report, #16 Exhibit 16 - United States Patent No. 7,523,016 to Google, #17 Exhibit 17 - File History Excerpt - Patent No. 8,671,057, #18 Exhibit 18 - Cost-Per-Click Definition from Google's AdWords Help, #19 Exhibit 19 - Link Definition from Federal Standard, #20 Exhibit 20 - Search Engine Definition from Glossary of Netspeak, #21 Exhibit 21 - Excerpts from Matthews Transcript, #22 Exhibit 22 - Client-side Definition from Wikipedia, #23 Exhibit 23 - Server-side Definition from Wikipedia, #24 Exhibit 24 - Identify Definition from Encarta Dictionary, #25 Exhibit 25 - Concatenate Definition from Encarta Dictionary, #26 Exhibit 26 - Concatenate Definition from Computer Science Dictionary)(Katz, Robert)
May 11, 2015 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
May 11, 2015 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert D. Katz, #2 Exhibit A - Discovery Communications, #3 Exhibit B - Google's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Brite Smart, #4 Exhibit C - Collins v Nissan - Opinion, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
May 7, 2015 Filing 84 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #106 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Google's Motion For Leave To Supplement The Record With Further Evidence In Support of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District Of California by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 5/28/2015 (nkl, ).
May 7, 2015 Filing 83 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Further Evidence In Support Of Google Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue To Northern District of California by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Perlson, David)
May 5, 2015 Filing 82 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of L. Yang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Appendix 1, #13 Appendix 2, #14 Appendix 3, #15 Appendix 4, #16 Appendix 5, #17 Appendix 6, #18 Appendix 7, #19 Appendix 8, #20 Appendix 9, #21 Appendix 10, #22 Appendix 11, #23 Appendix 12, #24 Appendix 13, #25 Appendix 14, #26 Appendix 15, #27 Appendix 16, #28 Appendix 17, #29 Appendix 18, #30 Appendix 19, #31 Appendix 20, #32 Appendix 21, #33 Appendix 22, #34 Appendix 23, #35 Appendix 24, #36 Appendix 25, #37 Appendix 26, #38 Appendix 27, #39 Appendix 28, #40 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Perlson, David)
May 5, 2015 Filing 81 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend/Supplement Infringement Contentions by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Katz Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Infringement Contention Chart - Version 2, #3 Exhibit B - Ltr from Google - March 9, 2015, #4 Exhibit C - Exemplary Google Production, #5 Exhibit D - Production Ltr Dated Feb 16, 2015, #6 Exhibit E - Ltr from Google - April 28, 2015, #7 Exhibit F - Infringement Contention Chart - Version 3, #8 Exhibit G - Production Ltr Dated March 24, 2015, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
May 4, 2015 Filing 80 SEALED MOTION to Compel the Production of Source Code, Documents, Interrogatory Responses and De-Designation of Protected Materials by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katz Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Brite Smart's PR3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Discovery Dispute Letters, #4 Exhibit C - Exemplary Infringement Contention Chart, #5 Exhibit D - Brite Smart's 1st 30(b)(6) Notice, #6 Exhibit E - Turner Transcript, #7 Exhibit F - Matthews Transcript, #8 Exhibit G - Brite Smart's 3rd Roggs to Google, #9 Exhibit H - Google's Obj and Resps to Brite Smart's 3rd Rogs, #10 Exhibit I - Brite Smart's 1st RFP to GoogleI - Personal Audio v Apple, #11 Exhibit J - Brite Smart's 3rd RFP to Google, #12 Exhibit K - Google's Resp to Brite Smart's 3rd RFPs, #13 Exhibit L - Brite Smart's 4th RFP to Google, #14 Exhibit M - Google's Resp to Brite Smart's 4th RFPs, #15 Exhibit N - Mtn containing Rick Woods' requests to Google, #16 Exhibit O - Surdulescu Transcript, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
April 27, 2015 Filing 79 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Perlson Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Perlson, David)
April 22, 2015 Filing 78 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Clark, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Clark, Michelle)
April 14, 2015 Filing 77 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David)
April 13, 2015 Filing 76 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART TO REDUCE COSTS by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Michelle)
April 10, 2015 Filing 75 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brite Smart's Constructions and Evidence, #2 Exhibit B - Google's Constructions and Evidence)(Katz, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT -- First Amended Complaint against Google Inc., filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '104 patent, #2 Exhibit B - '667 patent, #3 Exhibit C - '763 patent, #4 Exhibit D - '057 patent)(Katz, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE by Brite Smart Corp. re #19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint -- Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Katz, Robert)
April 6, 2015 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Katz, Robert)
April 2, 2015 Filing 71 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Clark, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Clark, Michelle)
March 23, 2015 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katz Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
March 18, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brite Smart Corp. P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Katz, Robert)
March 12, 2015 Filing 68 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Clark Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35)(Clark, Michelle)
March 11, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michelle Ann Clark on behalf of Google Inc. (Clark, Michelle)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. Responses due by 3/12/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/02/2015. (nkl, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories by Google Inc.. (Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2015: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
February 24, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc. Compliance with Patent Local Rule 4-1 (Sistos, Antonio)
February 24, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brite Smart Corp. regarding Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Katz, Robert)
February 12, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Miles D Freeman on behalf of Google Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5057363. (Freeman, Miles)
February 12, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Antonio Sistos on behalf of Google Inc. (Sistos, Antonio)
February 12, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William O Cooper on behalf of Google Inc. (Cooper, William)
February 12, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
February 12, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Ann Clark on behalf of Google Inc. (Clark, Michelle)
February 9, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Katz Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - 1st Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit B - 2nd Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit C - Response to 1st Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit D - Response to 2nd Set of Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit E - Discovery Dispute Communications, #7 Exhibit F - Performance Pricing v Google, #8 Exhibit G - Beneficial Innovations v AOL, #9 Exhibit H - Round Rock v Dell, #10 Exhibit I - Personal Audio v Apple, #11 Exhibit J - LaserDynamics v Asus, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
January 28, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Gifford, Krass Doc Subpoena Signed, #2 Possa Depo Subpoena Signed, #3 Possa Doc Subpoena Signed)(Jones, Michael)
January 14, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #45 Notice (Other),,, Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ask.com, #2 Exhibit B - LookSmart, #3 Exhibit C - Yahoo, #4 Exhibit D - TravelClick, #5 Exhibit E - Zinman, #6 Exhibit F - Strober, #7 Exhibit G - Seilgma, #8 Exhibit H - Business.com Media, #9 Exhibit I - Amazon.com, #10 Exhibit J - CJ Affiliate by Conversant, #11 Exhibit K - Schulz)(Jones, Michael)
January 7, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum Request for Oral Hearing (Jones, Michael)
January 5, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc. regarding Compliance with PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
December 31, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #45 Notice (Other),,, Proof of Service - Microsoft Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Subpoena Return, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Subpoena Return)(Jones, Michael)
December 31, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #45 Notice (Other),,, Proof of Service - Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Subpoena Return, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Subpoena Return)(Jones, Michael)
December 31, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #45 Notice (Other),,, Proof of Service - eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Subpoena Return, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Subpoena Return)(Jones, Michael)
December 31, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE by Google Inc. re #45 Notice (Other),,, Proof of Service - Adknowledge, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Production Subpoena Return, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition Subpoena Return)(Jones, Michael)
December 16, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saqib Javaid Siddiqui on behalf of Google Inc. (Siddiqui, Saqib)
December 15, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ann Marie Duffy on behalf of Google Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4968146. (Duffy, Ann)
December 15, 2014 Filing 46 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #45 Notice (Other),,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-1, Seligman Document Subpoena, #2 Exhibit J-2, Seligman Deposition Subpoena, #3 Exhibit K-1, AdForce Document Subpoena, #4 Exhibit K-2, AdForce Deposition Subpoena, #5 Exhibit L-1, Mathers Document Subpoena, #6 Exhibit L-2, Mathers Deposition Subpoena, #7 Exhibit M-1, eBayu Document Subpoena, #8 Exhibit M-2 eBay Deposition Subpoena, #9 Exhibit N-1, Business.com Media Document Subpoena, #10 Exhibit N-2, Business.com Deposition Subpoena, #11 Exhibit O-1, Amazon Document Subpoena, #12 Exhibit O-2 Amazon Deposition Subpoena, #13 Exhibit P-1, Expedia Document Subpoena, #14 Exhibit P-2, Expedia Deposition Subpoena, #15 Exhibit CJ Affiliate Document Subpoena, #16 Exhibit Q-2, CJ Affiliate Deposition Subpoena, #17 Exhibit R-1, Adknowledge Document Subpoena, #18 Exhibit R-2, Adknowledge Deposition Subpoena, #19 Exhibit S-1, Schultz Document Subpoena, #20 Exhibit S-2, Schultz Deposition Subpoena)(Jones, Michael)
December 15, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE by Google Inc. Notice of Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, Ask.com Document Subpoena, #2 Exhibit A-2, Ask.com Deposition Subpoena, #3 Exhibit B-1, LookSmart Document Subpoena, #4 Exhibit B-2, LookSmart Deposition Subpoena, #5 Exhibit C-1, Yahoo Document Subpoena, #6 Errata C-2, Yahoo Deposition Subpona, #7 Exhibit D-1, Microsoft Document Subpoena, #8 Exhibit D-2, Microsoft Deposition Subpoena, #9 Exhibit E-1, TravelClick Document Subpoena, #10 Exhibit E-2, TravelClick Deposition Subpoena, #11 Exhibit F-1, Zinman Document Subpoena, #12 Exhibit D-2, Zinman Deposition Subpoena, #13 Exhibit G-1, Strober Document Subpoena, #14 Exhibit G-2, Strober Deposition Subpoena, #15 Exhibit H-1, Conru Document Subpoena, #16 Exhibit H-2, Conru Deposition Subpoena, #17 Exhibit I-1, NetGravity Document Subpoena, #18 Exhibit I-2, NetGravity Deposition Subpoena)(Jones, Michael)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/02/2014. (nkl, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 43 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
December 1, 2014 Filing 42 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 26, 2014 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by Brite Smart Corp., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 24, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brite Smart Corp. regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Katz, Robert)
November 24, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc. regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/24/2014. (nkl, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 E-DISCOVERY ORDER re #31 Joint MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order filed by Brite Smart Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/24/2014. (nkl, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DISCOVERY ORDER re #30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order filed by Brite Smart Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/24/2014. (nkl, )
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #28 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order filed by Brite Smart Corp.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2015 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 11/10/2014., Jury Selection set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 7/28/2015., Markman Hearing set for 6/30/2015 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 11/9/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2015.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/24/2014. (nkl, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Brite Smart Corp., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 20, 2014 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Lee Supplemental Declaration, #2 Ex A - LinkedIn Profiles)(Jones, Michael)
November 19, 2014 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert D. Katz, #2 Exhibit B - Email thread regarding amendment of complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Brite Smart's P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Email transmittal of P.R. 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures, Infringement Contentions, and Appendices)(Katz, Robert)
November 17, 2014 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed E-Discovery Order, #2 Appendix Appendix 1 to Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Katz, Robert)
November 17, 2014 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Katz, Robert)
November 17, 2014 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 12, 2014 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Katz, Robert)
November 10, 2014 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Patrick Zuili, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael J. Collins, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of John R. Kasha, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Dr. Gregory J. Gonsalves, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Robert D. Katz, #6 Exhibit F - Documents relating to other relevant click fraud litigation, #7 Exhibit G - Documents containing website pages and witness location information from Tracers Information Specialists, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Robert)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/06/2014. (nkl, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom, filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert)
November 3, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
November 3, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE by Brite Smart Corp. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Katz, Robert)
October 31, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
October 28, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Additional Attachment to Main Document submitted document #22 a proposed order that should not be filed on the docket as a separate entry. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
October 28, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Amended Complaint submitted document #20 does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 22 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Additional Attachments to Main Document: #19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint.. (Katz, Robert) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nkl, ).
October 28, 2014 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Katz, Robert)
October 28, 2014 Filing 20 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Katz, Robert) Modified on 10/28/2014 (nkl, ).
October 28, 2014 Filing 19 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Brite Smart Corp.. (Katz, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
October 24, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A) and Supporting Memorandum by Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Decl of Abeer Dubey ISO mot to transfer [SIGNED] (711696266_1), #2 Ex B - Decl of David Turner ISO mot to transfer [SIGNED] (711638962_1), #3 Ex C - Tekell Declaration, #4 Ex D - Decl of Joy Lee ISO mot to transfer [SIGNED] (711669323_1), #5 Ex E - Tex. Sec. of St. Rpts, #6 Ex F - Dkt. Rpts of S Davis, #7 Ex G - Accurint Rpts. and LinkedIn Profilespdf, #8 Ex H - S&P Capital IP Co Profiles, #9 Ex I - IAB Press Release, #10 Ex J - PW Patent Litigation Study, #11 Ex K - Time to Disposition, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2014 10:00 AM before Judge the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (nkl, )
September 19, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by A John P Mancini on behalf of Google Inc. (Mancini, A)
September 19, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Google Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
September 16, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amr O Aly on behalf of Google Inc. (Aly, Amr)
September 9, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Brite Smart Corp. (Davis, Stafford)
September 8, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
September 8, 2014 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 8, 2014 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 8, 2014 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses by Google Inc..(Jones, Michael)
September 2, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 9/8/2014. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Jones, Michael)
July 22, 2014 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brite Smart Corp.. Google Inc. served on 7/14/2014. (ch, )
July 16, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 9/3/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 16, 2014 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael)
July 10, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/10/2014. (ch, )
July 10, 2014 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brite Smart Corp. (Katz, Robert)
July 10, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Katz on behalf of Brite Smart Corp. (Katz, Robert)
July 10, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc. (nkl, )
July 10, 2014 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, Stafford)
July 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4739057.), filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford)
July 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4739057.), filed by Brite Smart Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brite Smart Corp. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Don Tiller
Represented By: Donald Edward Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Amr O Aly
Represented By: William O Cooper
Represented By: Lance Lin Yang
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: A John P Mancini
Represented By: Saqib Javaid Siddiqui
Represented By: Ann Marie Duffy
Represented By: Antonio Sistos
Represented By: Miles Davenport Freeman
Represented By: Michelle Ann Clark
Represented By: David A Perlson
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brite Smart Corp.
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Robert David Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?