Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. ABB, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sycamore IP Holdings LLC
Defendant: ABB, Inc, ABB, Inc., PacketLight USA, Xena Networks Inc., PacketLight Networks Ltd. and ABB, Ltd.
Consolidated Defendant: Anritsu Instruments Co., ADVA Optical Networking SE, Anritsu Co., Transmode Systems AB, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Hitachi, Ltd., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., Anritsu Corp., Menara Networks, Inc., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc., Hitachi America, Ltd., Ericsson Inc., Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc. and Transmode Systems Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and David Keyzer
Case Number: 2:2015cv00238
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: William C Bryson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2016 Filing 192 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/3/15 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2017. (sholmes, )
May 20, 2016 Filing 191 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 05/20/2016. (nkl, )
May 20, 2016 Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER re #168 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., #167 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 05/12/2016. (nkl, )
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge William C. Bryson. Jury Selection set for 7/11/2016 09:00AM before Judge William C. Bryson. Motions in Limine due by 6/24/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2016.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 05/12/2016. (nkl, )
May 10, 2016 Filing 186 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/12/2016 09:00 AM before Judge William C. Bryson. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on Thursday May 12, 2016, at 09:00 AM Central Time to determine case status and to set a schedule for proceedings. The stay between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC and ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE (Dkt. No. 185) expired on April, 7, 2016, and there have been no extensions of that stay. The call-in number and access code will be sent to each counsel of record by email. (Bryson, William)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore and ADVA. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 03/08/2016. (nkl, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 184 Joint MOTION to Stay ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 MOTION to Dismiss Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv332), Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv332), Ericsson Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv332) and Ericsson Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv332) terminated., Attorney Michael Daley Karson and Phillip Brett Philbin terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 03/04/2016. (nkl, )
March 4, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION to Dismiss Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #180 MOTION to Dismiss defendants PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA terminated., Attorney Justin Kurt Truelove terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 03/02/2016. (nkl, )
March 2, 2016 Filing 180 MOTION to Dismiss defendants PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Xtera Communications, Inc. filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Xtera Communications, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv335), Xtera Communications, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv335) and Xtera Communications, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv335) terminated., Attorney Charles Edward Phipps; Paul D Lein and Lithaw Howard Lim terminated.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/05/2016. (nkl, )
February 5, 2016 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Xtera Communications, Inc. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/03/2016. (nkl, )
February 3, 2016 Filing 176 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendants Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #174 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC ("Sycamore") and PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA (collectivelyPacketLight). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2016. (nkl, )
January 21, 2016 Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendants PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
January 21, 2016 Filing 173 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: settled (ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE)(Folsom, David)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC ("Sycamore") and ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE (collectively ADVA). Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 01/20/2016. (nkl, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendants ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
January 11, 2016 Filing 170 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Edward Phipps (Phipps, Charles)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #166 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC ("Sycamore") and Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (collectively Ericsson),. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 01/05/2016. (nkl, )
January 4, 2016 Filing 168 Letter Brief filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE requesting leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 6,952,405 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heartfield, J)
January 4, 2016 Filing 167 Letter Brief filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE requesting leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment that ADVA does not infringe U.S. Patent No. 6,952,405 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Heartfield, J)
January 4, 2016 Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendants Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC and Xtera Communications, Inc.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 01/04/2016. (nkl, )
January 4, 2016 Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Stay Xtera Communications, Inc. as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #162 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, filed by Xtera Communications, Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Selection set for 6/13/2016 09:00AM before Judge William C. Bryson., Motions in Limine due by 4/25/2016.). Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/30/2015. (nkl, )
December 28, 2015 Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, by Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lein, Paul)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Motion to Stay. Further proceedings between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC and PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA are stayed for thirty (30) days, until January 19, 2016, pending the finalization of the settlement documents between Sycamore and Packetlight. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/18/2015. (jrg2)
December 18, 2015 Filing 160 Joint MOTION to Stay PacketLight Networks Ltd. and PacketLight USA as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238 by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 GENERAL ORDER 15-23 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William C. Bryson for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/15/2015. (nkl, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/07/2015. (nkl, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/07/2015. (nkl, )
December 7, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PacketLight Networks Ltd. to 12/27/2015; PacketLight USA to 12/27/2015. (nkl, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #74 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/04/2015. (nkl, )
December 3, 2015 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 12/3/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 30, 2015 Filing 154 Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, Ericsson Inc., Sycamore IP Holdings LLC, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Philbin, Phillip)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying #148 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/23/2015. (nkl, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hong S Lin on behalf of ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. (Lin, Hong)
November 23, 2015 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #74 Amended Complaint by PacketLight Networks Ltd., PacketLight USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truelove, Justin)
November 19, 2015 Filing 150 JOINT Claim Construction Chart by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
November 19, 2015 Filing 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION to Continue December 3, 2015 Claim Construction Hearing filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
November 16, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION to Continue December 3, 2015 Claim Construction Hearing by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 12, 2015 Filing 147 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
November 12, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S DeVincenzo on behalf of Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (DeVincenzo, Michael)
November 11, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J Rousseau on behalf of Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Rousseau, Timothy)
November 10, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Updated for PacketLight Networks Ltd. to 11/27/2015; PacketLight USA to 11/27/2015. (nkl, )
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #143 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #74 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/09/2015. (nkl, )
November 6, 2015 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #74 Amended Complaint by PacketLight Networks Ltd., PacketLight USA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truelove, Justin)
November 5, 2015 Filing 142 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Prov. Patent Appl. No. 60/251,341, #2 Exhibit 2 - T1X1.5/2001-004 Submission, #3 Exhibit 3 - T1X1.5/2001-004R1 Submission, #4 Exhibit 4 - ITU-T G.7041 Standard, #5 Exhibit 5 - U.S. Patent No. 7,127,653, #6 Exhibit 6 - File History for U.S. Patent No. 6,952,405)(Philbin, Phillip)
November 4, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the only change is the time for the hearing.***(jml)
October 29, 2015 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re #133 MOTION to Dismiss XTERA COMMUNICATION, INC. BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berger, Eric)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #136 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Menara Networks Inc. filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Menara Networks, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv333), Menara Networks, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv333) and Menara Networks, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv333) terminated., Attorney Charles Edward Phipps; Paul D Lein and Lithaw Howard Lim terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (nkl, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (nkl, )
October 22, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson OF SUBMISSION OF TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Philbin, Phillip)
October 22, 2015 Filing 137 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berger, Eric)
October 20, 2015 Filing 136 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Menara Networks Inc. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
October 19, 2015 Filing 135 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION to Dismiss XTERA COMMUNICATION, INC. BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM filed by Xtera Communications, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv335). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Phipps, Charles)
October 1, 2015 Filing 134 RESPONSE to #131 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Sycamore's Answer in Part to XTERA COMMUNICATION, INC. Amended Counterclaims filed September 17, 2015 filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
October 1, 2015 Filing 133 MOTION to Dismiss XTERA COMMUNICATION, INC. BREACH OF CONTRACT COUNTERCLAIM by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
September 24, 2015 Filing 132 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiff's Proposed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B Defendants' Proposed Constructions)(Berger, Eric)
September 17, 2015 Filing 131 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff Sycamore IP Holdings LLC's Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Phipps, Charles)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC ("Sycamore") and MenaraNetworks, Inc. (Menara). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/17/2015. (nkl, )
September 16, 2015 Filing 129 Joint MOTION to Stay Defendant Menara Networks, Inc. in case C.A. No. 2:15-cv-00333, as part of lead case C.A. 2:15-cv-00238. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
September 4, 2015 Filing 128 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Notice of P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Claim Constructions (Philbin, Phillip)
September 3, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc. Notice of P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Claim Constructions (Lim, Lithaw)
September 3, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Spangler, Andrew)
September 3, 2015 Filing 125 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE (P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Claim Constructions) (Heartfield, J)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Xena Networks Inc. filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Xena Networks Inc. terminated., Attorney Brian Kelly Trachtenberg terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/02/2015. (nkl, )
August 28, 2015 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Xena Networks Inc. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
August 26, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc. Notice of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions (Phipps, Charles)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #119 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Transmode Systems Inc., Transmode Systems AB., Transmode Systems AB (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv334) and Transmode Systems Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv334) terminated., Attorney Ruffin B Cordell and Indranil Mukerji terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/18/2015. (nkl, )
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES #114 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN AGREED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/17/2015. (nkl, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion For Dismissal With Prejudice by Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukerji, Indranil)
August 17, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE (P.R. 4-1 Identification of Proposed Claim Terms, Phrases and Clauses for Construction) (Heartfield, J)
August 14, 2015 Filing 117 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc. (Lein, Paul)
August 14, 2015 Filing 116 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC Notice of P.R. 4-1 Identification of Proposed Claim Terms, Phrases, and Clauses for Construction (Berger, Eric)
August 14, 2015 Filing 115 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Notice of P.R. 4-1 Identification of Proposed Claim Terms, Phrases, and Clauses for Construction (Philbin, Phillip)
August 14, 2015 Filing 114 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN AGREED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order AGREED ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES)(Berger, Eric)
August 14, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Xena Networks Inc. to 8/30/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 13, 2015 Filing 113 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Xena Networks Inc.(Trachtenberg, Brian)
August 5, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE to #95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Sycamore's Answer to Ericsson Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson's Counterclaims by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #51 Motion of Defendants ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc. and ADVA Optical Networking SE (collectively ADVA) to Withdraw Consent to Trial before this Courts designated Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/02/2015. (nkl, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #91 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Sycamore Response to Menara Networks, Inc.'s Counterclaim filed July 6, 2015 filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #107 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Sycamore) and Defendants Transmode Systems, Inc. and Transmode Systems AB (Transmode). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/27/2015. (nkl, )
July 24, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Notice of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions (Philbin, Phillip)
July 24, 2015 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv334), Sycamore IP Holdings LLC, Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukerji, Indranil)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #104 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Anritsu Company, Anritsu U.S. Holding Inc., Anritsu Instruments Company, and Anritsu Corporation filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Anritsu Corp. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu Corp. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu Instruments Co. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu Instruments Co. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Anritsu Co. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241) and Anritsu Co. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241) terminated., Attorney Rick L. Rambo; Thomas R Davis and Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/24/2015. (nkl, )
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #103 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement Between Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Sycamore) and Defendants Anritsu Company, Anritsu U.S. Holdings, Inc., Anritsu Instruments Company, and Anritsu Corporation (Anritsu). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/23/2015. (nkl, )
July 23, 2015 Filing 104 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Anritsu Company, Anritsu U.S. Holding Inc., Anritsu Instruments Company, and Anritsu Corporation by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
July 22, 2015 Filing 103 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Floyd, Nicholaus)
July 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Xena Networks Inc. to 8/15/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 15, 2015 Filing 102 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Xena Networks Inc..( Trachtenberg, Brian)
July 15, 2015 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II Inc. for Ericsson Inc., Ericsson Inc.. (Philbin, Phillip)
July 15, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 100 NOTICE by Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc. Notice of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Mukerji, Indranil)
July 14, 2015 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Transmode Systems Inc. (Mukerji, Indranil)
July 14, 2015 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Transmode Systems AB (Mukerji, Indranil)
July 14, 2015 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint by Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc..(Mukerji, Indranil)
July 13, 2015 Filing 96 NOTICE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC of Additional Related Case (Spangler, Andrew)
July 13, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint Filed in Case No. 2:15-cv-00332-JRG (Dkt. No. 1), COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15-cv-332) by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson.(Philbin, Phillip)
July 8, 2015 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen M Yu on behalf of ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5285825. (Yu, Stephen)
July 7, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina A Ondrick on behalf of ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. (Ondrick, Christina)
July 7, 2015 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blair M Jacobs on behalf of ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE, ADVA Optical Networking, Inc. (Jacobs, Blair)
July 6, 2015 Filing 91 ANSWER to #74 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by Menara Networks, Inc..(Phipps, Charles)
July 6, 2015 Filing 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. Xena Networks Inc. served on 6/25/2015, answer due 7/16/2015. (nkl, )
July 2, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Transmode Systems AB to 7/14/2015; Transmode Systems Inc. to 7/14/2015. (nkl, )
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/02/2015. (nkl, )
June 30, 2015 Filing 88 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC, Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukerji, Indranil)
June 25, 2015 Filing 87 NOTICE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL RELATED CASES (Spangler, Andrew)
June 25, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE by Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. - Defendants' Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Re: 2:15-cv-00244) (Davis, William)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #83 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc.; Hitachi America, Ltd.; and Hitachi, Ltd. filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., Hitachi, Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv244), Hitachi America, Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv244) and Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15-cv244) terminated., Attorney William Ellsworth Davis, III and Shawnna Marie Yashar terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/24/2015. (nkl, )
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2015. (ch, )
June 22, 2015 Filing 83 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc.; Hitachi America, Ltd.; and Hitachi, Ltd. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
June 22, 2015 Filing 82 SUMMONS Issued as to Xena Networks Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
June 22, 2015 Filing 81 SUMMONS Issued as to PacketLight Networks Ltd., PacketLight USA, Xena Networks Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for entry of a Protective Order by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berger, Eric)
June 19, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Xtera Communications, Inc. Notice of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Lein, Paul)
June 19, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Menara Networks, Inc. Notice of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Lein, Paul)
June 19, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC Notice of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Berger, Eric)
June 19, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Floyd, Nicholaus)
June 19, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Notice of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Philbin, Phillip)
June 19, 2015 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xena Networks Inc., PacketLight Networks Ltd., PacketLight USA, filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER withdrawing #57 Motion for Entry of the Parties Agreed Proposed Discovery Order ; granting #66 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER withdrawing #56 Motion for Entry of the Parties Agreed Proposed Docket Control Order ; granting #65 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #64 Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 6/22/2015., Jury Selection set for 6/6/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 1/11/2016., Markman Hearing set for 12/3/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 4/18/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/2/2016.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DISCOVERY ORDER re #63 Joint MOTION for entry of a Discovery Order filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER withdrawing #55 Motion for Entry of The Parties Agreed Proposed Docket Control Order ; granting #62 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER withdrawing #54 Motion for Entry of The Parties Agreed Proposed Discovery Order ; granting #61 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #60 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants ABB Inc. and ABB Ltd. filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC., ABB, Ltd., ABB, Inc. and ABB, Inc. terminated., Attorney Matthew T Milam; Phillip Brett Philbin; Jennifer Parker Ainsworth and Michael Daley Karson terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/17/2015. (nkl, )
June 16, 2015 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #57 Joint MOTION for entry of a Discovery Order by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lein, Paul)
June 16, 2015 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #56 Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lein, Paul)
June 16, 2015 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berger, Eric)
June 16, 2015 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for entry of a Discovery Order by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berger, Eric)
June 16, 2015 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE PARTIES' AGREED PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 16, 2015 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE PARTIES' AGREED PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 15, 2015 Filing 60 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants ABB Inc. and ABB Ltd. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
June 15, 2015 Filing 59 RESPONSE to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Sycamore response to Anritsu Company, Anritsu U.S. Holding, Inc., Anritsu Instruments Company, and Anritsu Corporation's counterclaim filed May 19, 2015 filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
June 15, 2015 Filing 58 RESPONSE to #37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Sycamore response to ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. May 22, 2015 counterclaim filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
June 15, 2015 Filing 57 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #73 Joint MOTION for entry of a Discovery Order by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lein, Paul) Modified on 6/19/2015 (nkl, ).
June 15, 2015 Filing 56 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #72 Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order by Menara Networks, Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lein, Paul) Modified on 6/19/2015 (nkl, ).
June 12, 2015 Filing 55 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #69 Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berger, Eric) Modified on 6/19/2015 (nkl, ).
June 12, 2015 Filing 54 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #68 Joint MOTION for entry of a Discovery Order by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Berger, Eric) Modified on 6/19/2015 (nkl, ).
June 8, 2015 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #27 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Sycamore response to Xtera Communications, Inc. May 15, 2015 counterclaim filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
June 8, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Sycamore response to Menara Networks, Inc. May 15, 2015 counterclaim filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
June 5, 2015 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/02/2015. (nkl, )
June 2, 2015 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ABB, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABB Ltd., Corporate Parent ABB Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ABB Asea Brown Boveri Ltd. for ABB, Inc., ABB, Inc.. (Philbin, Phillip)
June 2, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE (Montgomery, M.)
June 1, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, DAVID FOLSOM, filed by ABB, Inc., Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc., Ericsson Inc., Menara Networks, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc., Xtera Communications, Inc.. and Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Floyd, Nicholaus)
June 1, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, DAVID FOLSOM, filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
June 1, 2015 Filing 45 RESPONSE to ABB Inc.'s May 7, 2015 Counterclaim by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Berger, Eric)
May 29, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
May 29, 2015 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ADVA AG Optical Networking SE for ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
May 29, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PATENT RULES 3-1 & 3-2 (Spangler, Andrew)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/28/2015. (nkl, )
May 28, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark S Raskin on behalf of Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Raskin, Mark)
May 28, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ellsworth Davis, III on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. (Davis, William)
May 27, 2015 Filing 39 Joint MOTION to Stay All deadlines regarding Defendants Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc.; Hitachi America, Ltd.; and Hitachi, Ltd. by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berger, Eric)
May 26, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew T Milam on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Milam, Matthew)
May 24, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 22, 2015 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint filed in Civil Action No. 2:15-cv-240 [Dkt. No. 1], COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc., ADVA Optical Networking SE.(Heartfield, J)
May 20, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 19, 2015 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Rambo, Rick)
May 19, 2015 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM Defendants Anritsu Company, Anritsu U.S. Holding, Inc., Anritsu Instruments Company, and Anritsu Corporation's Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff's Original Complaint against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv241), Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Co..(Rambo, Rick)
May 19, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indranil Mukerji on behalf of Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc. (Mukerji, Indranil)
May 19, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Transmode Systems AB, Transmode Systems Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
May 15, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Menara Networks, Inc.. (Phipps, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Menara Networks, Inc. (Phipps, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by Menara Networks, Inc..(Phipps, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 29 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Xtera Communications, Inc.. (Phipps, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Xtera Communications, Inc. (Phipps, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by Xtera Communications, Inc..(Phipps, Charles)
May 7, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 7, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Daley Karson on behalf of Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Karson, Michael)
May 7, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Daley Karson on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Karson, Michael)
May 7, 2015 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Sycamore IP Holdings LLC by ABB, Inc..(Philbin, Phillip)
May 7, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lithaw Howard Lim on behalf of Xtera Communications, Inc. (Lim, Lithaw)
May 7, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul D Lein on behalf of Xtera Communications, Inc. (Lein, Paul)
May 7, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lithaw Howard Lim on behalf of Menara Networks, Inc. (Lim, Lithaw)
May 7, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul D Lein on behalf of Menara Networks, Inc. (Lein, Paul)
May 7, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Ericsson Inc. to 7/10/2015; Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson to 7/10/2015. (nkl, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/07/2015. (nkl, )
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2015 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/04/2015. (nkl, )
May 4, 2015 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ericsson Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philbin, Phillip)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-238. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/28/2015. (nkl, )
April 27, 2015 Filing 15 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #14 Notice (Other).. (Spangler, Andrew)
April 27, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC re #11 Order, ADDITONAL RELATED CASES (Spangler, Andrew)
April 24, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Davis on behalf of Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
April 24, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L. Rambo on behalf of Anritsu Co., Anritsu Corp., Anritsu Instruments Co., Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc. (Rambo, Rick)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-238. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/23/2015. (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABB, Inc. to 5/7/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABB, Inc..( Philbin, Phillip)
April 21, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip Brett Philbin on behalf of ABB, Inc. (Philbin, Phillip)
March 18, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABB, Inc. to 4/22/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABB, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 12, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. ABB, Inc. served on 3/2/2015, answer due 3/23/2015. (nkl, )
February 26, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Paul Berger on behalf of Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Berger, Eric)
February 24, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to ABB, Inc., ABB, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(nkl, )
February 20, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 20, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC (Spangler, Andrew)
February 20, 2015 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
February 20, 2015 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Spangler, Andrew)
February 20, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5068063.), filed by Sycamore IP Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. ABB, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sycamore IP Holdings LLC
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Mark Stewart Raskin
Represented By: Timothy J Rousseau
Represented By: Eric Paul Berger
Represented By: Michael S DeVincenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Daley Karson
Represented By: Matthew T Milam
Represented By: Phillip Brett Philbin
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacketLight USA
Represented By: Justin Kurt Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xena Networks Inc.
Represented By: Brian Kelly Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PacketLight Networks Ltd.
Represented By: Justin Kurt Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Anritsu Instruments Co.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ADVA Optical Networking SE
Represented By: Hong S Lin
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Stephen M Yu
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Anritsu Co.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Transmode Systems AB
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Represented By: Michael Daley Karson
Represented By: Phillip Brett Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Represented By: Shawnna Marie Yashar
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ADVA Optical Networking, Inc.
Represented By: Hong S Lin
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Stephen M Yu
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ADVA Optical Networking North America, Inc.
Represented By: Hong S Lin
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Blair M Jacobs
Represented By: Stephen M Yu
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Christina Ann Ondrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Anritsu Corp.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Menara Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Phipps
Represented By: Paul D Lein
Represented By: Lithaw Howard Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Anritsu U.S. Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Nicholaus Engelhard Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Xtera Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Phipps
Represented By: Paul D Lein
Represented By: Lithaw Howard Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Represented By: Shawnna Marie Yashar
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Michael Daley Karson
Represented By: Phillip Brett Philbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hitachi Communications Technologies America, Inc.
Represented By: Shawnna Marie Yashar
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Transmode Systems Inc.
Represented By: Indranil Mukerji
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?