SSL Services, LLC vs. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: SSL Services, LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00433
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM ORDER - Ciscos Motion to Stay Pending IPR (Dkt. No. 89) is GRANTED and this case is STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/27/2016. (ch, )
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/17/2016. (ch, )
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 02/24/2016. (nkl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SSL Services, LLC vs. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SSL Services, LLC
Represented By: Alan Michael Fisch
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Sheng-Wen Desmond Jui
Represented By: Jennifer K Robinson
Represented By: David Michael Saunders
Represented By: Roy William Sigler
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?