Personalized Media Communications, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., Envision Peripherals, Inc., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Wistron Corp. and Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom, Edward A Infante and Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
Case Number: 2:2015cv01366
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 583 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19/21 (Trial Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 582 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/18/21 (Trial Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 581 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 580 FILED IN ERROR PER CLERKS OFFICE. PLEASE IGNORE NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/18/21 (Trial Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, ) Modified on 3/20/2021 (klc, ).
March 19, 2021 Filing 579 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 578 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/17/21 (Trial Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 577 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
March 19, 2021 Filing 576 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/16/21 (Trial Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 575 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/21 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 574 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/21 (Trial Transcript - Jury Selection) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 4/9/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2021. (sholmes, )

March 19, 2021 Filing 573 SEALED Jury Notes. (aeb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 572 JURY VERDICT. (aeb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 571 Sealed Jury Verdict. (aeb)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #398 Sealed Patent Motion in light of #446 Report and Recommendation adopted by #545 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/19/2021. (rsp1)
March 18, 2021 Filing 570 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 4 held on 3/18/2021. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
March 18, 2021 Filing 569 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #566 Sealed Patent Document,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 (Part 1 of 5), #2 Exhibit 17 (Part 2 of 5), #3 Exhibit 17 (Part 3 of 5), #4 Exhibit 17 (Part 4 of 5), #5 Exhibit 17 (Part 5 of 5))(Smith, Melissa)
March 18, 2021 Filing 568 STIPULATION OF JUDGMENT OF NO INVALIDITY UNDER 101 OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER denying #560 Sealed Patent Motion; denying #561 Sealed Patent Motion; denying #562 Sealed Patent Motion; denying #563 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on March 18, 2021. (jrg3, )
March 18, 2021 Filing 566 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING NON-INFRINGEMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 18, 2021 Filing 565 RESPONSE to #526 Response to Non-Motion filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 564 SEALED DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PERSONALIZED MEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, LLCS OFFER OF PROOF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kline, Douglas)
March 18, 2021 Filing 563 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 72(B) TO DKT. 553 REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 18, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Informal Charge Conference held on 3/18/2021. No reporter. (aeb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 562 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 72(B) TO CERTAIN PORTIONS OF PRETRIAL ORDERS REGARDING EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 17, 2021 Filing 561 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Reconsideration and Objections Pursuant to Rule 72(B) to Certain Portions of Orders Regarding Pretrial Motions on Damages Experts by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 17, 2021 Filing 560 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 72(B) TO CERTAIN PORTIONS OF ORDERS REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 17, 2021 Filing 559 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 3 held on 3/17/2021. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 558 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial Day 2 held on 3/16/2021. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb) (Main Document 558 replaced on 3/17/2021) (aeb, ).
March 15, 2021 Filing 557 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection held on 3/15/2021, Jury Trial Day 1 held on 3/15/2021. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (aeb)
March 15, 2021 Filing 555 REDACTION to #530 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF PMCS DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 14, 2021 Filing 554 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #551 SEALED MOTION to Strike Vincent A. Thomas's Third Supplemental Expert Report to the Extent it Exceeds the Scope of this Court's Prior Orders and Motion for Expedited Briefing filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #537 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2021. (klc, )
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2021. (klc, )
March 14, 2021 Filing 551 SEALED MOTION to Strike Vincent A. Thomas's Third Supplemental Expert Report to the Extent it Exceeds the Scope of this Court's Prior Orders and Motion for Expedited Briefing by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 14, 2021 Filing 550 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #530 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF PMCS DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(Smith, Melissa)
March 14, 2021 Filing 549 MOTION for Reconsideration of, and Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Orders on the Admissibility of Exhibits by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 14, 2021 Filing 548 MOTION for Reconsideration re #510 Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 14, 2021 Filing 547 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #530 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF PMCS DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #469 Motion for Reconsideration in light of #544 Order adopting #459 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2021. (rsp1)
March 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #485 Motion for Reconsideration in light of #542 Order adopting #466 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2021. (rsp1)
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES PMCs Objections (Dkt. Nos. 255, 256, 259 and 389), OVERRULES Apples Objections (Dkt. Nos. 257 and 397), and ADOPTS the Claim Construction Order (Dkt. No. 246). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES Apples Objections and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation and orders that the Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,191,091 (Dkt. No. 398) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER- the Court OVERRULES PMCs Objections (Dkt. No. 468) and ADOPTS the Memorandum Order (Dkt. No. 459).. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES Apples Objections and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation and orders that the Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 8,191,091 Under 101 (Dkt. No. 264) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES PMCs Objections (Dkt. No. 484) and ADOPTS the Memorandum Order (Dkt. No. 466).. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES Apples Objections and ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation and ORDERS that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-suit Damages for the 091 and 635 Patents (Dkt. No. 268) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES PMCs Objections (Dkt. No. 516) and ADOPTS the Memorandum Order (Dkt. No. 494).. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER- The Court OVERRULES PMCs Objections (Dkt. No. 526) and ADOPTS the Memorandum Order (Dkt. No. 495).. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2021. (klc, )
March 13, 2021 Filing 537 SEALED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTION TO THE ORDER REGARDING THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART PROVIDED TO THE JURY by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 12, 2021 Filing 536 REDACTION to #532 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER re Jury Notebooks Claim Construction Chart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/12/2021. (ch, )
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #533 Motion for Substitute of Lead Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/12/2021. (ch, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 533 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Lead Attorney) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 532 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC to #514 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 531 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/11/2021. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 11, 2021 Filing 530 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF PMCS DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 11, 2021 Filing 529 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Expedited Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Pellegrino by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Zinanni, Meredith) Modified on 3/11/2021 (ch, ).
March 11, 2021 Filing 528 Exhibit List (Amended) by Apple, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Zinanni, Meredith)
March 11, 2021 Filing 527 Exhibit List (Amended) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Kline, Douglas)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #391 Sealed Patent Motion in light of #495 Order granting-in-part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/11/2021. (rsp1)
March 11, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 529, SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Expedited Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Pellegrino PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 526 RESPONSE to #495 Order (Objections) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
March 9, 2021 Filing 525 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple, Inc. for proceedings held on Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/9/2021 before Judge Judge Roy S. Payne. (Smith, Melissa) (Forwarded to Susan Ziele on 3/10/2021) (ljw, ).
March 9, 2021 Filing 524 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #523 Pretrial Conference - Final - Exhibit A. (bga, )
March 9, 2021 Filing 523 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/9/2021. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 9, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 522 Exhibit List (Amended) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Kline, Douglas)
March 8, 2021 Filing 521 Exhibit List (AMENDED) by Apple, Inc... (Attachments: #1 AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST)(Smith, Melissa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 520 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re #517 Sealed Transcript NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION (Smith, Melissa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 519 REDACTION to #511 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 518 REDACTION to #507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 8, 2021 Filing 517 Sealed Transcript. (saz, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #430 Sealed Patent Motion in light of #510 Order on Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/8/2021. (rsp1)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #429 Sealed Patent Motion in light of #510 Order on Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/8/2021. (rsp1)
March 5, 2021 Filing 516 RESPONSE to #494 Order, #487 Memorandum & Opinion, Order OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
March 5, 2021 Filing 515 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Daloia Valenti on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Valenti, Alexandra)
March 5, 2021 Filing 514 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 72(B) TO THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING APPLES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO LIMIT PRE-SUIT DAMAGES (DKT. NO. 483) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2021 Filing 513 REDACTION to #509 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MEMORANDUM ORDER - denying #507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/4/2021. (ch, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 511 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/2/2021. (nkl, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 509 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER re #507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/2/2021. (nkl, )
March 2, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/9/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 1, 2021 Filing 507 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE NEW EXPERT REPORT OF PMCS SUBSTITUTE DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL PELLEGRINO by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER re #491 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE A SUBSTITUTE EXPERT AND LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2021. (ch, )
February 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting #491 Motion as filed with written order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2021. (no document attached). (Payne, Roy)
February 26, 2021 Filing 504 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Luke L Dauchot on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8267523. (Dauchot, Luke)
February 26, 2021 Filing 503 REDACTION to #493 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 26, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/8/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 502 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC for proceedings held on February 24, 2021 Pretrial Hearing before Judge Payne. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Forwarded to Susan Ziele on 2/25/2021) (ljw, ).
February 25, 2021 Filing 501 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Frederickson, III on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Frederickson, Robert)
February 24, 2021 Filing 500 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple, Inc. for proceedings held on Interim Pretrial Conference 2/24/2021 before Judge Payne. (Smith, Melissa) (Main Document 500 replaced with flattened version on 2/25/2021) (Forwarded to Susan Ziele on 2/25/2021) (ljw, ).
February 24, 2021 Filing 499 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/24/2021. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 498 Exhibit List Amended by Apple, Inc... (Attachments: #1 AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST)(Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2021 Filing 497 Exhibit List Amended by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 496 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Gorham, Andrew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/23/2021. (klc, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 494 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/23/2021. (klc, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 493 SEALED JOINT NOTICE REGARDING WITNESS LIST, MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PMC Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Apple Exhibit List)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 23, 2021 Filing 492 RESPONSE to #470 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 23, 2021 Filing 491 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DESIGNATE A SUBSTITUTE EXPERT AND LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/23/2021. (nkl, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 489 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan D Brit on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8257199. (Brit, Jonathan)
February 20, 2021 Filing 488 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert A Appleby on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8254748. (Appleby, Robert)
February 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #275 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Vincent A. Thomas filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2021. (nkl, )
February 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #273 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Dansky filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2021. (nkl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 485 MOTION for Reconsideration re #466 Memorandum & Opinion by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 19, 2021 Filing 484 RESPONSE to #466 Memorandum & Opinion (Objections) filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 19, 2021 Filing 483 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #268 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-Suit Damages for the '091 and '635 Patents filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/19/2021. (nkl, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 482 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: THIRD SESSION (suspended)(Folsom, David)
February 17, 2021 Filing 481 REDACTION to #474 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND PROTECTIVE ORDER TO ENABLE IT TO EXPEDITIOUSLY REPLACE ITS UNAVAILABLE DAMAGES EXPERT by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Remains Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 17, 2021 Filing 480 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Autumn Elizabeth Soucy on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Soucy, Autumn)
February 17, 2021 Filing 479 REDACTION to #472 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PMCS MOTION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 17, 2021 Filing 478 REDACTION to #471 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 17, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 476 and 477, REDACTIONS. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 17, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/24/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 16, 2021 Filing 477 ***FILED IN ERROR***REDACTION to #472 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PMCS MOTION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dansky, #2 Appendix Kline, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 2/17/2021 (ch, ).
February 16, 2021 Filing 476 ***FILED IN ERROR***REDACTION to #471 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dansky, #2 Affidavit Kline)(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 2/17/2021 (ch, ).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #474 Sealed Patent Motion to Amend the Protective Order to Enable PMC to Expeditiously Replace its Unavailable Damages Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/16/2021. (nkl, )
February 15, 2021 Filing 474 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND PROTECTIVE ORDER TO ENABLE IT TO EXPEDITIOUSLY REPLACE ITS UNAVAILABLE DAMAGES EXPERT by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying #472 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/13/2021. (jrg1)
February 12, 2021 Filing 472 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING PMCS MOTION TO MOVE TRIAL DATE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dansky, #2 Affidavit Kline, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 12, 2021 Filing 471 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dansky, #2 Affidavit Kline)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 12, 2021 Filing 470 OBJECTION to #458 Report and Recommendations by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 12, 2021 Filing 469 MOTION for Reconsideration re #459 Memorandum & Opinion by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 12, 2021 Filing 468 RESPONSE to #459 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER re Mediation. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/11/2021. (nkl, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 466 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2021. (nkl, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 465 RESPONSE to #462 Notice (Other), filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 5, 2021 Filing 464 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin P Martin on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Martin, Kevin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 463 RESPONSE to #450 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
February 2, 2021 Filing 462 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY SUPPORTING APPLES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO LIMIT PRE-SUIT DAMAGES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/2/2021. (nkl, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 460 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob Rambeau on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8227780. (Rambeau, Jacob)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MEMORANDUM ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/2021. (ch, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 458 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/2021. (ch, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER denying #455 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Move the Trial Date; denying #447 Unopposed MOTION TO PERMIT VIDEO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/2021. (ch, )
January 28, 2021 Filing 456 REDACTION to #455 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Move the Trial Date by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 27, 2021 Filing 455 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Move the Trial Date by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 27, 2021 Filing 454 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Anthony Downs on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Downs, James)
January 27, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/19/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER TO PURCHASE JURY MEALS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/26/2021. (ch, )
January 25, 2021 Filing 452 REDACTION to #451 Sealed Document, Updated Joint Final Pretrial Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 22, 2021 Filing 451 Sealed Document UPDATED JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Smith, Melissa)
January 22, 2021 Filing 450 OBJECTION to #446 Report and Recommendations by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
January 22, 2021 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Jury Selection set for 3/1/2021 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 449 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Zinanni on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8208923. (Zinanni, Meredith)
January 14, 2021 Filing 448 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Naomi L. Birbach on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8198038. (Birbach, Naomi)
January 11, 2021 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION TO PERMIT VIDEO PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 8, 2021 Filing 446 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 filed by Apple, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/8/2021. (nkl, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/4/2021. (nkl, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 444 REDACTION to #433 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
December 29, 2020 Filing 443 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
December 28, 2020 Filing 442 REDACTION to #441 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, 4, 5 and 7 Remain Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 28, 2020 Filing 441 CORRECTED SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #430 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 28, 2020 Filing 440 REDACTION to #438 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 28, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 437, SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 439 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 22, 2020 Filing 438 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #429 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2020 Filing 437 FILED IN ERORR PER ATTORNEY SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #430 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 12/28/2020 (nkl, ).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER re #246 Memorandum & Opinion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/18/2020. (nkl, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 435 REPLY to Response to Motion re #391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 15, 2020 Filing 434 REDACTION to #433 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2020 Filing 433 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
December 10, 2020 Filing 432 REDACTION to #429 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B-F Remain Under Seal)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 10, 2020 Filing 431 REDACTION to #430 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 430 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 429 SEALED PATENT MOTION In Limine by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 8, 2020 Filing 428 REDACTION to #425 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Weaver, #2 Exhibit A-C Remain Under Seal, #3 Exhibit D)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 7, 2020 Filing 427 REDACTION to #422 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 7, 2020 Filing 426 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #425 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 7, 2020 Filing 425 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Weaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #423 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 Responses due by 12/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/7/2020. (nkl, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 423 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 3, 2020 Filing 422 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 25, 2020 Filing 421 REDACTION to #413 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 59)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 25, 2020 Filing 420 REDACTION to #412 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit O)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 25, 2020 Filing 419 REDACTION to #418 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 418 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to #388 Sealed Patent Document filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 417 RESPONSE to #390 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 416 RESPONSE to #387 Sealed Patent Document filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 415 RESPONSE to #392 Brief, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 414 RESPONSE to #386 Sealed Patent Document filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17)(Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2020 Filing 413 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC to #395 Sealed Patent Document filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 59)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 24, 2020 Filing 412 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC to #393 Sealed Patent Document filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit O)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 24, 2020 Filing 411 RESPONSE to #396 Brief filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 24, 2020 Filing 410 RESPONSE to #397 Objection to Claim Construction filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #408 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Briefing PMCs Motion to Exclude the Supplemental Non-Infringement Opinions of Dr. Stephen Wicker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/23/2020. (nkl, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 408 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Briefing re #391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER by Apple, Inc., Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 407 REDACTION to #398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 406 REDACTION to #395 Sealed Patent Document by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13)(Smith, Melissa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 405 REDACTION to #393 Sealed Patent Document by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15)(Smith, Melissa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 404 REDACTION to #386 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman - Remains Under Seal, #2 Exhibit CC - Remains Under Seal)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2020 Filing 403 REDACTION to #387 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman - Remains Under Seal, #2 Exhibit E - Remains Under Seal)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2020 Filing 402 REDACTION to #388 Sealed Patent Document by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman - Remains Under Seal, #2 Exhibit J - Remains Under Seal)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2020 Filing 401 REDACTION to #390 Sealed Patent Document, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman - Remains Under Seal, #2 Exhibit D - Remains Under Seal)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2020 Filing 400 REDACTION to #391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman - Remains Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A - Remains Under Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting #384 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Serve Reply Supplemental Infringement Report of Dr. Alfred Weaver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/12/2020. (nkl, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 398 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 397 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND OBJECTIONS PURSUANT TO RULE 72(A) TO THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 396 BRIEF filed SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLES MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 8,191,091 UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 395 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO LIMIT PRE-SUIT DAMAGES FOR THE '091 PATENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew S Ong on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Ong, Andrew)
November 12, 2020 Filing 393 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDECERTAIN OPINIONS OF PMCS DAMAGES EXPERT MICHAEL DANSKY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 12, 2020 Filing 392 BRIEF filed SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO PRECLUDE MR. WECHSELBERGER FROM TESTIFYING AS A FACT WITNESS by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit J (Corrected))(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 391 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NON-INFRINGEMENT OPINIONS OF DR. STEPHEN WICKER by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 390 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSED EMERGENCY MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY J. WECHSELBERGER REGARDING INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,191,091 AND 8,559,635 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit D)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 389 BRIEF filed SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS RULE 72(a) OBJECTIONS TO THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit H)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 388 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE TESTIMONY OF VINCENT A. THOMAS (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit J)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 387 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE APPLE INC.'S UNDISCLOSED INVALIDITY THEORIES (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit E)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 386 SEALED SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF ANTHONY J. WECHSELBERGER BASED ON DAUBERT (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit CC)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 12, 2020 Filing 385 REDACTION to #384 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE REPLY SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT REPORT OF DR. ALFRED WEAVER by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Remains Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 10, 2020 Filing 384 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE REPLY SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT REPORT OF DR. ALFRED WEAVER by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 28, 2020 Filing 383 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ellisen S Turner on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8078818. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Turner, Ellisen)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #381 Motion to Extend the Close of Fact Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/9/2020. (nkl, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 381 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Fact) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 14, 2020 Filing 380 STIPULATION REGARDING REPRESENTATIVE SOURCE CODE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #378 Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT SOURCE CODE AND DOCUMENT STIPULATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/10/2020. (ch, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 378 Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT SOURCE CODE AND DOCUMENT STIPULATION by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 20, 2020 Filing 377 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC Joint Notice Regarding Live Motions (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #375 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC., Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/7/2020. (nkl, ) Modified on 7/7/2020 (nkl, ).
July 2, 2020 Filing 375 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER - ORDERED that Plaintiff Personalized Media Communications, LLC and Defendant Apple, Inc. shall submit a Joint Notice within 30 days regarding which of the pending motions filed before the stay have live disputes and which of these motions or sections of motions are now mooted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2020. (ch, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #365 Motion to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/18/2020. (nkl, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 372 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
June 15, 2020 Filing 371 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kline, Douglas)
June 10, 2020 Filing 370 REPLY to Response to Motion re #365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
June 2, 2020 Filing 369 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #368 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 368 RESPONSE in Opposition re #365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SERNEL, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #366 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates Responses due by 6/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2020. (nkl, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 366 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 365 MOTION to Lift Stay, Sever a Certain Patent, and Set Pretrial Conference and Trial Dates by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit King, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #363 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer A Albert terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/3/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer A. Albert by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
February 22, 2018 Filing 362 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. RELATING TO STATUS OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: #1 EX A)(Smith, Melissa)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #360 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/03/2017. (nkl, )
September 30, 2017 Filing 360 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Allen F. Gardner by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 22, 2017 Filing 359 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. RELATING TO STATUS OF INTER PARTES REVIEW PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: #1 Ex A - IPR2016-00755 (PMC '091 Patent) Final Decision, #2 Ex B - IPR2016-00754 (PMC '635 Patent) Final Decision)(Smith, Melissa)
March 9, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR- case has been reopen. Document # 358, Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 28, 2017 Filing 358 FILED IN ERROR Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) Modified on 3/9/2017 (nkl, ).
February 27, 2017 Filing 357 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 FILED IN ERROR: PER CHAMBERS. PLEASE DISREGARD ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2017. (nkl, ) Modified on 2/22/2017 (jml, ).
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER denying without prejudice #271 Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver ; denying without prejudice #273 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice 274 Sealed Motion; denying without prejudice #275 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #309 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice #310 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #322 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #323 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #344 Motion for Continuance of the Trial Date ; granting #354 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice #130 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice #185 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice #232 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #234 Sealed Motion; denying #235 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #250 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #251 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #254 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #262 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #263 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #264 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #266 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice #267 Motion ; denying without prejudice #268 Sealed Patent Motion; denying without prejudice #270 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/17/2017. (nkl, )
February 16, 2017 Filing 354 Agreed MOTION to Stay Pending IPR Proceedings by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
February 16, 2017 Filing 353 SEALED JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OBJECTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended PMC Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Apple Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit C - Amended PMC Deposition Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Apple Deposition Designations)(Kline, Douglas)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER re Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/2017. (nkl, )
February 14, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/21/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. *Note that only the TIME has changed*(bga, )
February 10, 2017 Filing 351 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Compliance (Kline, Douglas)
February 10, 2017 Filing 350 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #347 Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2017. (nkl, )
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER finding as moot #150 Motion to Reduce Number of Asserted Claims Against Defendants dismissed or terminated in Order #279 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2017. (rsp3, )
February 8, 2017 Filing 347 Joint MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Reports by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
February 1, 2017 Filing 346 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Apple, Inc. - second session)(Folsom, David)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER resetting Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 3/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/17/2017. (nkl, )
January 11, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: PMC v. Apple Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/19/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
January 10, 2017 Filing 344 Opposed MOTION for Continuance of the Trial Date by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 9, 2017 Filing 343 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #310 Emergency MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
January 9, 2017 Filing 342 SEALED JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND OBJECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PMC's Amended Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B - Apple's Amended Exhibit List)(Kline, Douglas)
January 7, 2017 Filing 341 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #340 Sealed Patent Document, Joint Final Pretrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J - Proposed Final Jury Instructions)(Kline, Douglas)
January 6, 2017 Filing 340 SEALED Joint Final Pretrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DTX-0102, #2 Exhibit B - PMC's Trial Witness List, #3 Exhibit C - Apple's Trial Witness List, #4 Exhibit D - PMC's Objections to Witness List, #5 Exhibit E - PMC Deposition Designations and Counters, #6 Exhibit F - Apple's Deposition Designations and Counters, #7 Exhibit G - PMC Exhibit List and Objections, #8 Exhibit H - Apple's Exhibit List and Objections, #9 Exhibit I - Proposed Preliminary Instructions, #10 Exhibit K - PMC's Proposed Verdict Form, #11 Exhibit L - Apple's Proposed Verdict Form)(Kline, Douglas)
January 6, 2017 Filing 339 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #322 SEALED PATENT MOTION s in Limine [DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S RESPONSES TO PMC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE] filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Sernel, Marcus)
January 6, 2017 Filing 338 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #323 SEALED PATENT MOTION s in Limine filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Cue Deposition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Apple's Supplemental and Amended Privilege Log, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Rebuttal Thomas Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from Dansky Report, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Dansky Deposition, #7 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Russ Report, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of '405 Patent, #9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of '461 Patent, #10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of Form 10-K, #11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of '938 Patent)(Kline, Douglas)
January 6, 2017 Filing 337 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Apple's Notice of Disclosure of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Sernel, Marcus)
January 6, 2017 Filing 336 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Questionnaire)(Kline, Douglas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 335 REPLY to Response to Motion re #310 Emergency MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 27, 2016 Filing 334 RESPONSE in Opposition re #310 Emergency MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2016: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
December 22, 2016 Filing 333 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #263 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger Based on Daubert filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 16)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2016 Filing 332 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Stephen Wicker Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2016 Filing 331 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2016 Filing 330 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #275 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Vincent A. Thomas filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2016 Filing 329 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #268 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-Suit Damages for the '091 and '635 Patents filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 58 - Email Correspondence)(Kline, Douglas)
December 22, 2016 Filing 328 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #273 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Dansky filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Dansky Report, #3 Exhibit M - Excerpts of Apple's Response to Notice of Deposition, #4 Exhibit N - August 3 Correspondence)(Kline, Douglas)
December 22, 2016 Filing 327 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #270 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claim 3 of U.S. Patent No. 8,559,635 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 18 - Excerpts of '956 Patent, #3 Exhibit 19 - Excerpts of Weaver Deposition)(Kline, Douglas)
December 22, 2016 Filing 326 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment that PMC is Collaterally Estopped from Asserting U.S. Patent No.8,559,635 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 22, 2016 Filing 325 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 22, 2016 Filing 324 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #271 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 19, 2016 Filing 323 SEALED PATENT MOTION s in Limine by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Smith, Melissa)
December 19, 2016 Filing 322 SEALED PATENT MOTION s in Limine by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Interview Summary, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Holtzman Deposition, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Thomas Deposition, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 19, 2016 Filing 321 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Smith, Melissa)
December 19, 2016 Filing 320 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #311 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/18/2016. (nkl, )
December 15, 2016 Filing 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re #264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11, #2 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 317 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment that PMC is Collaterally Estopped from Asserting U.S. Patent No.8,559,635 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 316 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #270 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claim 3 of U.S. Patent No. 8,559,635 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 315 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #268 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-Suit Damages for the '091 and '635 Patents filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 314 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #273 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Dansky filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 313 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #271 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2016 Filing 312 REPLY to Response to Motion re #263 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger Based on Daubert filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit AA - Supplemental Expert Report of Wechselberger, #3 Exhibit BB - Excerpts from Claim Construction Hearing)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 311 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Opposed Emergency Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 310 Emergency MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Supplemental Expert Report, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Wechselberger Report, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Claim Construction Hearing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 309 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Opposed Emergency Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 308 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #275 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Vincent A. Thomas filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Thomas Deposition)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 307 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Stephen Wicker Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit J - Excerpts of Tribble Deposition, #3 Exhibit K - January 29, 2016 Correspondence)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 306 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #305 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Wechselberger Deposition, #3 Exhibit B - September 22, 2016 Email)(Kline, Douglas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion re #267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 14, 2016 Filing 304 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #254 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Undisclosed Invalidity Theories filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 13, 2016 Filing 303 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #250 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses, #251 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Merkin, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23)(Smith, Melissa)
December 9, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean M McEldowney on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6065469. (McEldowney, Sean)
December 9, 2016 Filing 301 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #298 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35, #11 Exhibit 36, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38, #14 Exhibit 39, #15 Exhibit 40, #16 Exhibit 41, #17 Exhibit 42, #18 Exhibit 43, #19 Exhibit 44, #20 Exhibit 45, #21 Exhibit 46, #22 Exhibit 47, #23 Exhibit 48, #24 Exhibit 49, #25 Exhibit 50, #26 Exhibit 51, #27 Exhibit 52, #28 Exhibit 53, #29 Exhibit 54, #30 Exhibit 55, #31 Exhibit 56, #32 Exhibit 57)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 300 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #298 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 299 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #297 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Weaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit Shiferman, #6 Errata 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 298 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #268 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-Suit Damages for the '091 and '635 Patents filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 297 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #270 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claim 3 of U.S. Patent No. 8,559,635 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 296 RESPONSE in Opposition re #263 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger Based on Daubert filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2016 Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2016 Filing 294 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #273 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Dansky filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Cover Letter, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Dansky Report, #4 Exhibit C - Sales Agremeent, #5 Exhibit D - Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Distribution Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Thomas Report, #8 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Mewes Deposition, #9 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Dansky Deposition, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Managerial Accounting98, #11 Exhibit J - Excerpts of Cost Accounting45, #12 Exhibit K - Excerpts of Jaynes Deposition, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 293 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #262 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Stephen Wicker Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2016 Filing 292 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #275 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Vincent A. Thomas filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Melissa)
December 8, 2016 Filing 291 RESPONSE in Opposition re #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment that PMC is Collaterally Estopped from Asserting U.S. Patent No.8,559,635 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Weaver, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Weaver Report, #3 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae, #4 Affidavit Shiferman, #5 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Weaver Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Amendment, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 290 RESPONSE in Opposition re #264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101 filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Harvey Deposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 8, 2016 Filing 289 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #271 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Li, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Weaver Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Weaver Deposition, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Wicker Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Preliminary Claim Construction Sheets, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
December 7, 2016 Filing 288 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re #221 Response in Support of Motion, #264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101, #266 MOTION for Summary Judgment that PMC is Collaterally Estopped from Asserting U.S. Patent No.8,559,635 (NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)
December 6, 2016 Filing 287 REPLY to Response to Motion re #254 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Undisclosed Invalidity Theories filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
December 5, 2016 Filing 286 REPLY to Response to Motion re #251 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Responses to Second Notice of Deposition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Decision, #4 Exhibit 3 - Interview Summary)(Kline, Douglas)
December 2, 2016 Filing 285 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Pretrial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
December 1, 2016 Filing 284 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re Pretrial Disclosures (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #280 Motion to Amend the Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/28/2016. (nkl, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #254 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Undisclosed Invalidity Theories filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joel R. Merkin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19)(Smith, Melissa)
November 28, 2016 Filing 281 RESPONSE to #257 Objection to Claim Construction filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Kline, Douglas)
November 28, 2016 Filing 280 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #279 Order, Terminate Motions, Add and Terminate Parties, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Subramanian, Arun) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2016: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #276 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice. TOP VICTORY ELECTRONICS (TAIWAN) CO. LTD., TPV INTL (USA), INC., ENVISION PERIPHERALS, INC., TOP VICTORY ELECTRONICS (FUJIAN) CO. LTD., TPV ELECTRONICS (FUJIAN) CO. LTD., TPV TECHNOLOGY LTD., HON HAI PRECISION INDUSTRY (TAIWAN) CO., LTD., WISTRON CORP., WISTRON INFOCOMM TECHNOLOGY (TEXAS) CORP., WISTRON INFOCOMM TECHNOLOGY (AMERICA) CORP., and VIZIO, INC.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/28/2016. (ch, )
November 25, 2016 Filing 278 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #251 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Apple's Initial Disclosures, #2 Ex. 2 - Apple's Amended Disclosures, #3 Ex. 3 - Apple's Responses to PMC's First Set of ROGs (Nos 1-14), #4 Ex. 4 - Apple's Responses to PMC's Third Set of ROGs (Nos 16-20), #5 Ex. 5 - Apple's Responses to PMC's Fifth Set of Rogs (Nos 23-25), #6 Ex. 6. - 2016-10-04 Email from L. Shiferman, #7 Ex. 7 - Apple's First Notice of Deposition to PMC, #8 Ex. 8 - 2016-09-14 - Scott, Thomas Dep. Tr, #9 Ex. 9 - PMC's Website, #10 Ex. 10 - The Weather Channel's Answer, #11 Ex. 11 - Thomson's Answer, #12 Ex. 12 - Scientific-Atlanta's Answer, #13 Ex. 13 - Motorola's Answer, #14 Ex. 14 - Zynga's Answer, #15 Ex. 15 - PMC Memo, #16 Ex. 16 - PMC's Second Notice of Deposition to Apple, #17 Ex. 17 - 2016-04-29 - Harvey, John Dep. Tr, #18 Ex. 18 - 2016-09-08 - Caird, Robert Dep. Tr, #19 Ex. 19 - 2015-12-31 Letter from J. Merkin, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 25, 2016 Filing 277 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #250 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Apple's Initial Disclosures, #2 Ex. 2 - Apple's Amended Disclosures, #3 Ex. 3 - Apple's Responses to PMC's First Set of ROGs (Nos 1-14), #4 Ex. 4 - Apple's Responses to PMC's Third Set of ROGs (Nos 16-20), #5 Ex. 5 - Apple's Responses to PMC's Fifth Set of Rogs (Nos 23-25), #6 Ex. 6. - 2016-10-04 Email from L. Shiferman, #7 Ex. 7 - Apple's First Notice of Deposition to PMC, #8 Ex. 8 - 2016-09-14 - Scott, Thomas Dep. Tr, #9 Ex. 9 - PMC's Website, #10 Ex. 10 - The Weather Channel's Answer, #11 Ex. 11 - Thomson's Answer, #12 Ex. 12 - Scientific-Atlanta's Answer, #13 Ex. 13 - Motorola's Answer, #14 Ex. 14 - Zynga's Answer, #15 Ex. 15 - PMC Memo, #16 Ex. 16 - PMC's Second Notice of Deposition to Apple, #17 Ex. 17 - 2016-04-29 - Harvey, John Dep. Tr, #18 Ex. 18 - 2016-09-08 - Caird, Robert Dep. Tr, #19 Ex. 19 - 2015-12-31 Letter from J. Merkin, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 25, 2016 Filing 276 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Subramanian, Arun)
November 21, 2016 Filing 275 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Vincent A. Thomas by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiferman, Lana)
November 21, 2016 Filing 273 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Damages Expert Michael Dansky by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 272 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #271 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 271 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of PMC's Technical Expert Alfred Weaver by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 270 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of Claim 3 of U.S. Patent No. 8,559,635 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 269 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Apple's Initial and Additional Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Apple's First Supplemental Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Apple's Second Supplemental Disclosures, #5 Exhibit D - Apple's Third Supplemental Disclosures, #6 Exhibit E - Apple's Fourth Supplemental Disclosures, #7 Exhibit F - Apple's Fifth Supplemental Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Apple's Sixth Supplemental Disclosures, #9 Exhibit H - July 25, 2016 Correspondence, #10 Exhibit I - January 5, 2016 Correspondence, #11 Exhibit J - April 4, 2016 Correspondence, #12 Exhibit K - Aug. 1, 2016 Correspondence, #13 Exhibit L - PMC's First Set of Interrogatories, #14 Exhibit M - Apple's Responses to Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit N - Apple's Seventh Supplemental Disclosures, #16 Exhibit O - October 5, 2016 Correspondence, #17 Exhibit P - Excerpts from Wechselberger Report, #18 Exhibit Q - Excerpts from Wechselberger Deposition, #19 Exhibit R - Pennypacker Memorandum)(Kline, Douglas)
November 21, 2016 Filing 268 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to Limit Pre-Suit Damages for the '091 and '635 Patents by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION to Preclude Mr. Wechselberger From Testifying as a Fact Witness by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
November 21, 2016 Filing 266 MOTION for Summary Judgment that PMC is Collaterally Estopped from Asserting U.S. Patent No.8,559,635 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 265 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #263 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger Based on Daubert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Wechselberger Report, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Wechselberger Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Wechselberger Declaration, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpts of Wechselberger Declaration, #6 Exhibit E - Preliminary Claim Construction Order, #7 Exhibit F - Excerpts of Wechselberger Deposition, #8 Exhibit G - ORION-C, #9 Exhibit H - Griffin Memorandum, #10 Exhibit I - Revision C, #11 Exhibit J - Pennypacker Memorandum, #12 Exhibit K - Stubbs Memorandum, #13 Exhibit L - Eyer Memorandum, #14 Exhibit M - SRD-3000, #15 Exhibit N - SRD-7000)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2016 Filing 264 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,191,091, 8,559,635, and 7,752,649 Under 101 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Melissa)
November 21, 2016 Filing 263 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Anthony J. Wechselberger Based on Daubert by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2016 Filing 262 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Testimony of Dr. Stephen Wicker Regarding Non-Infringing Alternatives by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Wicker Report, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Wicker Deposition, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Tribble Deposition, #5 Exhibit D - Sales Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Agreement, #7 Exhibit F - Distribution Agreement, #8 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Pantos Deposition, #9 Exhibit H - Excerpts of ContentGuard Transcript, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Fasoli Deposition, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #260 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/17/2016. (nkl, )
November 16, 2016 Filing 260 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #206 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2016 Filing 259 AMENDED RULE 72 OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 14, 2016 Filing 258 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward C Donovan on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6027287. (Donovan, Edward)
November 11, 2016 Filing 257 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION #246 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2016 Filing 256 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 8, 2016 Filing 255 OBJECTION TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER (Dkt. 246) filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - '091 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Weaver Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Reply Brief, #5 Exhibit D - '490 Patent, #6 Exhibit E - Computer Dictionary, #7 Exhibit F - IEEE Standard Dictionary, #8 Exhibit G - Modern Dictionary of Electionics)(Kline, Douglas)
November 8, 2016 Filing 254 MOTION to Strike Apple Inc.'s Undisclosed Invalidity Theories by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Wechselberger Report, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Invalidity Contentions, #4 Exhibit C - March 31 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from September 27 Hearing Transcript, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
November 7, 2016 Filing 253 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Phong T Dinh on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6018031. (Dinh, Phong)
November 7, 2016 Filing 252 ANSWER to #236 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.(Kline, Douglas)
November 7, 2016 Filing 251 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Apple's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Apple's First Supplemental Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Apple's Second Disclosures, #5 Exhibit D - Apple's Third Disclosures, #6 Exhibit E - Apple's Fourth Disclosures, #7 Exhibit F - Apple's Fifth Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Apple's Sixth Disclosures, #9 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Apple's Responses to First Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Apple's Responses to Fifth Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit J - Apple's Seventh Disclosures, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
November 7, 2016 Filing 250 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims V and VI and Fifth Through Ninth, Eleventh, and Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Apple's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Apple's First Supplemental Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Apple's Second Disclosures, #5 Exhibit D - Apple's Third Disclosures, #6 Exhibit E - Apple's Fourth Disclosures, #7 Exhibit F - Apple's Fifth Disclosures, #8 Exhibit G - Apple's Sixth Disclosures, #9 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Apple's Responses to First Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit I - Excerpts of Apple's Responses to Fifth Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit J - Apple's Seventh Disclosures, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
November 3, 2016 Filing 249 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/27/16 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Goolsby, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 445-5355. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2017. (sholmes, )
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #245 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Wistron Corp., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.., Status Conference set for 11/28/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/25/2016. (nkl, )
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/25/2016. (nkl, )
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/25/2016. (nkl, )
October 25, 2016 Filing 245 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
October 24, 2016 Filing 244 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #232 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Financial Information and Agreements filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joel R. Merkin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2016. (nkl, )
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #239 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Wistron Corp., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2016. (nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 241 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: successful (TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Envision Peripherals, Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., and Vizio, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER re #233 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/19/2016. (nkl, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 239 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
October 18, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Loughlin Duncan, III on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Duncan, James)
October 17, 2016 Filing 237 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/23/16 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Goolsby, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 445-5355. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2017. (sholmes, )
October 13, 2016 Filing 236 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Personalized Media Communications, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application)(Smith, Melissa)
October 13, 2016 Filing 235 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Capshaw, #2 Exhibit A - Chen Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - TPV Agreement, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 13, 2016 Filing 234 SEALED MOTION to Compel The Production of Information and Documents from Vizio, Inc. by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Meng Xi In Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Subramanian, Arun)
October 12, 2016 Filing 233 SEALED RULE 72(A) OBJECTIONS by Personalized Media Communications, LLC to #225 Order on Sealed Patent Motion filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Wechselberger Report)(Kline, Douglas)
October 6, 2016 Filing 232 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Financial Information and Agreements by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A- Sept. 2 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit B - Sept. 23 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit C - Sept. 28 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - Sept. 12 Correspondence, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kline, Douglas)
October 3, 2016 Filing 231 RESPONSE to #221 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A -- TracBeam Order, #3 Exhibit B - Aylus Order, #4 Exhibit C - Adaptix Order, #5 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Markman Transcript)(Kline, Douglas)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #209 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2016. (ch, )
September 28, 2016 Filing 229 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory Matthew Polins on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5959495. (Polins, Gregory)
September 28, 2016 Filing 228 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rohit D Nath on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Nath, Rohit)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2016. (ch, )
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting in part #192 Sealed Patent Motion to Modify Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2016. (ch, )
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #207 Sealed Patent Motion for Leave to Amended Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2016. (ch, )
September 27, 2016 Filing 224 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2016 re #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, )
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2016. (ch, )
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER denying #29 Motion to Sever. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/26/2016. (ch, )
September 26, 2016 Filing 221 RESPONSE in Support re #130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings (Proposed Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Stay) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Merkin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Melissa)
September 26, 2016 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Stay by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 26, 2016 Filing 219 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts of Scott Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Exhibit to Disclosures, #5 Exhibit D - Preliminary Response to Petition, #6 Exhibit E - Responses to Interrogatories)(Kline, Douglas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 218 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #214 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 26, 2016 Filing 217 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Presentation Slides from September 23, 2016 Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Slides Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Slides Part 2 of 2)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2016 Filing 216 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Joint Report Regarding Meet and Confer in Connection With PMC's Emergency Motion to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify the Protective Order (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 23, 2016 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 9/23/2016. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #211 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #133 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 10/31/2016.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2016. (nkl, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 213 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Relating to Status of Inter Partes Review Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Melissa)
September 20, 2016 Filing 212 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. Joint Notice Regarding Claim Construction (Capshaw, Sidney)
September 20, 2016 Filing 211 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #133 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 19, 2016 Filing 210 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
September 19, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order, #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) : Motion Hearing RESET for 9/27/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
September 16, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order, #207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
September 13, 2016 Filing 209 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/13/2016. (nkl, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 208 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Sixth Supplemental and Amended Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
September 2, 2016 Filing 207 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions Pursuant to P.R. 3-6(B) by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #205 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/1/2016. (nkl, )
August 30, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 9/23/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 30, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order : Motion Hearing RESET for 9/23/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 29, 2016 Filing 205 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #55 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2016 Filing 204 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Non-Party Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 24, 2016 Filing 203 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. of Third Party Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Zenith Subpoena, #2 GI Subpoena)(McBride, Kevin)
August 18, 2016 Filing 202 Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to P.R. 4.5(d) for Phase 2 by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
August 17, 2016 Filing 201 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Non-Party Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HBO Subpoena, #2 Exhibit NFL Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Netflix Subpoena)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order : Motion Hearing RESET for 9/1/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/10/2016. (ch, )
August 9, 2016 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/8/2016. (nkl, )
August 8, 2016 Filing 197 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
August 5, 2016 Filing 196 VIZIO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin McBride, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Declaration of Dr. Cliff Reader, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z (Part 1), #29 Exhibit Z (Part 2), #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit DD)(McBride, Kevin)
August 2, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 1, 2016 Filing 195 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Archit P. Shah, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
July 29, 2016 Filing 194 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/28/16 (Claim Construction) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. (sholmes, )

July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re #192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/27/2016. (nkl, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 192 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - March 11 Letter, #3 Exhibit B - June 30 Email, #4 Exhibit C - July 11 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - July 13 Letter, #6 Exhibit E - July 22 Letter, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order on Expedited Briefing)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2016 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order submitted document #191 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
July 26, 2016 Filing 191 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Source Code Printing or in the Alternative to Modify Protective Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A - March 11 Letter, #3 Exhibit B - June 30 Email, #4 Exhibit C - July 11 Letter, #5 Exhibit D - July 13 Letter, #6 Exhibit E - July 22 Letter, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order on Expedited Briefing)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2016 (nkl, ).
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #187 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2016. (nkl, )
July 22, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 9/1/2016 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. *Note that only the TIME has changed*(bga, )
July 21, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Everingham, Charles)
July 21, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Compliance re Technical Tutorial (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 20, 2016 Filing 187 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 14, 2016 Filing 186 RESPONSE to Motion re #185 MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Supplemental Statement Regarding Claim Construction filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 11, 2016 Filing 185 MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Supplemental Statement Regarding Claim Construction by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 1, 2016 Filing 184 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Filing of Presentation Slides From the June 28, 2016 Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Slides Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Slides Part 2 of 2)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2016 Filing 183 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Presentation Slides (June 28, 2016 Claim Construction Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C)(Smith, Melissa)
June 28, 2016 Filing 182 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 6/28/2016. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1-1, #2 Ex. 1-2, #3 Ex. 2-1, #4 Ex. 2-2, #5 Ex. 3, #6 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (bga, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 181 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
June 27, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 27, 2016 Filing 179 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC Regarding Claims 1 and 2 of U.S. Patent No. 8,559,635 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2016 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
June 23, 2016 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: 2:15CV1366 - Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. 2:15CV1206 - Jury Selection set for 4/3/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re Privilege Log (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Joseph Klein terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/22/16. (mrm, )
June 22, 2016 Filing 175 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Smith, Melissa)
June 21, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re #130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings (Notice of Ripeness for Ruling and Request for Hearing) (Smith, Melissa)
June 20, 2016 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McBride, Kevin)
June 16, 2016 Filing 172 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Terms)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 16, 2016 Filing 171 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric J. Klein by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
June 14, 2016 Filing 170 P.R. 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Chart by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 14, 2016 Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Xi, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mediatek Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 2 - Sigma Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 3 - Broadcom Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 4 - MarketWired.com Print-Out, #6 Exhibit 5 - Banzhoff Email, #7 Exhibit 6 - MediaTek Objections, #8 Exhibit 7 - Sigma Objections, #9 Exhibit 8 - Sigma Email, #10 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Intent, #11 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Motion, #12 Exhibit 11 - Email Correspondence, #13 Exhibit 12 - Email Correspondence, #14 Exhibit 13 - Notice of Deposition, #15 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Deposition, #16 Exhibit 15 - Yoder Letter, #17 Exhibit 16 - Bonn Letter, #18 Exhibit 17 - Email Correspondence, #19 Exhibit 18 - Email Correspondence, #20 Exhibit 19 - Burnim Letter, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims Responses due by 6/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/14/2016. (nkl, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 167 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims (Dkt. No. 150) by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
June 10, 2016 Filing 166 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arun S Subramanian (Subramanian, Arun)
June 9, 2016 Filing 165 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. re #150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims (McBride, Kevin)
June 9, 2016 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Jane Fischer on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Fischer, Sarah)
June 7, 2016 Filing 163 REPLY to #148 Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit F (updated), #3 Exhibit G (updated), #4 Exhibit V, #5 Exhibit W, #6 Exhibit X, #7 Exhibit Y, #8 Exhibit Z, #9 Exhibit AA, #10 Exhibit BB, #11 Exhibit CC, #12 Exhibit DD, #13 Exhibit EE, #14 Exhibit FF)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2016 Filing 162 REPLY Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Xi, #2 Exhibit A - P.R. 4-2 Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - P.R. 4-3 Statement, #4 Exhibit C - Email Correspondence, #5 Exhibit D - McGraw-Hill, #6 Exhibit E - Websters, #7 Exhibit F - Illustrated Computer)(Capshaw, Sidney)
June 1, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 159, VIZIO Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 161 SEALED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Apple, Inc. to #148 Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Merkin, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29)(Smith, Melissa)
May 31, 2016 Filing 160 VIZIO Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief to #148 Claim Construction Brief filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Romeao J. Jennings in Support of VIZIO Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(McBride, Kevin)
May 31, 2016 Filing 159 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY VIZIO Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief to #148 Claim Construction Brief filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Romeao J. Jennings in Support of VIZIO Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(McBride, Kevin) Modified on 6/1/2016 (nkl, ).
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/27/2016. (ch, )
May 26, 2016 Filing 157 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE by Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. of P.R. 4.2 Disclosures (Burnim, Rachel)
May 26, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. re P.R. 4-2 (McBride, Kevin)
May 26, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 26, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan Rabinowitz on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5760806. (Rabinowitz, Alan)
May 25, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Supplemental Authority Regarding Section 101 (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Smith, Melissa)
May 24, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel E. Burnim on behalf of Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. (Burnim, Rachel)
May 24, 2016 Filing 150 MOTION to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
May 18, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2016 Filing 148 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit A Part 1, #3 Exhibit A Part 2, #4 Exhibit A Part 3, #5 Exhibit A Part 4, #6 Exhibit A Part 5, #7 Exhibit A Part 6, #8 Exhibit A Part 7, #9 Exhibit B Part 1, #10 Exhibit B Part 2, #11 Exhibit B Part 3, #12 Exhibit B Part 4, #13 Exhibit B Part 5, #14 Exhibit B Part 6, #15 Exhibit B Part 7, #16 Exhibit C Part 1, #17 Exhibit C Part 2, #18 Exhibit C Part 3, #19 Exhibit C Part 4, #20 Exhibit D Part 1, #21 Exhibit D Part 2, #22 Exhibit D Part 3, #23 Exhibit D Part 4, #24 Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit F, #26 Exhibit G, #27 Exhibit H, #28 Exhibit I, #29 Exhibit J, #30 Exhibit K, #31 Exhibit L, #32 Exhibit M, #33 Exhibit N, #34 Exhibit O, #35 Exhibit P, #36 Exhibit Q, #37 Exhibit R, #38 Exhibit S, #39 Exhibit T, #40 Exhibit U, #41 Affidavit Weaver, #42 Exhibit 1, #43 Exhibit 2)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Technology Tutorial (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 17, 2016 Filing 146 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Everingham, Charles)
May 17, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Technology Tutorial (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 17, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
May 16, 2016 Filing 143 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 12, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. re P.R. 4-1 (McBride, Kevin)
May 12, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/12/2016. (nkl, )
May 6, 2016 Filing 139 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Terms)(Capshaw, Sidney)
May 6, 2016 Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion re #130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2016 Filing 137 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #136 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 25, 2016 Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shiferman, #2 Exhibit 1 - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2 - Disposition Time, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 18, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Bonn on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Bonn, Amanda)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #129 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Wistron Corp., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.., Phase 2 - Markman Hearing set for 9/1/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Phase 2 -Markman Hearing set for 6/28/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/08/2016. (nkl, )
April 8, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. re P.R. 4-1 (McBride, Kevin)
April 8, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 7, 2016 Filing 130 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Related Appeals and IPR Proceedings by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joel R. Merkin, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Smith, Melissa)
April 6, 2016 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
April 6, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE by Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. Notice of Service of First Amended Initial Disclosures (Ayers, Jennifer)
April 6, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE by Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Ayers, Jennifer)
April 5, 2016 Filing 126 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Personalized Media Communications, LLC and Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Terms)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 5, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE by Vizio, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Everingham, Charles)
April 5, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE by TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Everingham, Charles)
April 5, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE by Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Everingham, Charles)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/22/2016. (nkl, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 121 ANSWER to #99 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2016 Filing 120 ANSWER to #95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2016 Filing 119 ANSWER to #97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 21, 2016 Filing 118 ANSWER to #96 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.(Capshaw, Sidney)
March 17, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 (Smith, Melissa)
March 16, 2016 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
March 15, 2016 Filing 115 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/14/2016. (nkl, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Counterclaims by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 29, 2016 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yimeng Dou on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Dou, Yimeng)
February 24, 2016 Filing 111 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2016 Filing 110 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2016 Filing 109 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 17, 2016 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wittenzellner on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Wittenzellner, John)
February 17, 2016 Filing 107 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TPV Technology Ltd. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TPV Int'l (USA), Inc. identifying Other Affiliate TPV Technology Limited for TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc.. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate TPV Technology Limited for TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd.. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate TPV Technology Limited for Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd.. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate TPV Technology Limited for Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd.. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Envision Peripherals, Inc. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd. (McBride, Kevin)
February 17, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
February 16, 2016 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. (Davis, Harold)
February 16, 2016 Filing 99 Wistron's ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Personalized Media Communications, LLC by Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron Corp..(Davis, Harold)
February 16, 2016 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vizio, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AmTRAN Technology Co., Ltd. for Vizio, Inc., Vizio, Inc.. (McBride, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 97 Defendant TPV's ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM In Response to Personalized Media Communications, LLC's First Amended Complaint against Personalized Media Communications, LLC by Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Envision Peripherals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McBride, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 96 Defendant Hon Hai's ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Counterclaims in Response to Personalized Media Communications, LLC's First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Personalized Media Communications, LLC by Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McBride, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 95 Defendant VIZIO, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims in Response to Personalized Media Communications, LLC's First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC by Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McBride, Kevin)
February 16, 2016 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Romeao J Jennings, III on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Jennings, Romeao)
February 16, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Klein, Eric)
February 16, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory David Yoder on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Yoder, Gregory)
February 16, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Zager on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Zager, Steven)
February 16, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (Everingham, Charles)
February 16, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin G McBride on behalf of Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc. (McBride, Kevin)
February 8, 2016 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E)(Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Capshaw, Sidney)
January 29, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Non-Party Deposition and Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Intel Corp. Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2 - Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3 - TMSC America Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 4 - Samsung Electro-Mechanics America, Inc. Subpoena)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 29, 2016 Filing 84 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #83 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- CV, #2 Exhibit 2 - Expert Witness Experience)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2016 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Delaware Ruling, #2 Exhibit B - Claim Terms, #3 Exhibit C - Report and Recommendation, #4 Affidavit Weaver, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #18 Amended Complaint,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/27/2016. (nkl, )
January 27, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Envision Peripherals, Inc. to 2/16/2016; Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd. to 2/16/2016; TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd. to 2/16/2016; TPV Int'l (USA), Inc. to 2/16/2016; TPV Technology Ltd. to 2/16/2016; Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd. to 2/16/2016; Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd. to 2/16/2016; Vizio, Inc. to 2/16/2016; Wistron Corp. to 2/16/2016; Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp. to 2/16/2016; Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. to 2/16/2016. (nkl, )
January 25, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dmitry Kheyfits on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Kheyfits, Dmitry)
January 19, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC of Third Party Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broadcom Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Entropic Subpoena, #3 Exhibit MediaTek Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Sigma Subpoena)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #75 Motion for Stay of Deadline to File Response ; finding as moot #76 Motion to Expedite Briefing for Dkt. 75 - Emergency Motion to Stay Deadline for Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/13/2016. (nkl, )
January 13, 2016 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Dkt. 75 - Emergency Motion to Stay Deadline for Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #53 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order filed by TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Envision Peripherals, Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.., Pretrial Conference set for 3/7/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2016., Jury Selection set for 4/3/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 9/26/2016., Motions in Limine due by 2/17/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/12/2016. (nkl, )
January 12, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION to Expedite Briefing for Dkt. 75 - Emergency Motion to Stay Deadline for Response to Motion to Dismiss by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2016 Filing 75 Emergency MOTION for Stay of Deadline to File Response re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 JOINT DISCOVERY ORDER re #66 Joint MOTION For Entry of Discovery Order filed by TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., Envision Peripherals, Inc., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/11/2016. (nkl, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/11/2016. (nkl, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/11/2016. (nkl, )
January 8, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by Envision Peripherals, Inc., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd. TPV's Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE by Vizio, Inc. VIZIO's Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re Initial and Additional Disclosures (Capshaw, Sidney)
January 8, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE by Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd. Hon Hai's Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 67 Joint MOTION re #65 Joint MOTION for Protective Order CORRECTED Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 66 Joint MOTION For Entry of Discovery Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(McBride, Kevin)
January 8, 2016 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/06/2016. (nkl, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re Initial and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2016 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/04/2016. (nkl, )
December 31, 2015 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Order and Protective Order and Exchange Initial Disclosures by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 29, 2015 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order and Exchange Initial Disclosures by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DISCOVERY ORDER re #52 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, )
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #51 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2017 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2016., Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 7/26/2016., Markman Hearing set for 6/28/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 12/19/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, )
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, )
December 23, 2015 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 23, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER MOTION FOR MISC RELIEF Document # 50, Submission of Proposed Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 22, 2015 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 50 ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC, TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc., Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(McBride, Kevin) Modified on 12/23/2015 (ch, ).
December 22, 2015 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Order by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 1/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/2015. (ch, )
December 17, 2015 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced lead case, only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/17/2015. (nkl, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Edward A. Infante is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/17/2015. (nkl, )
December 16, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 15, 2015 Filing 43 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Waiver of Service of Summons by Envision Peripherals, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd., TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd., TPV Int'l (USA), Inc., TPV Technology Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd., Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd., Vizio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 14, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re #34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Joint Notice in Compliance With Standing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Letter, #2 Exhibit PMC List of Claim Terms)(Kline, Douglas)
December 14, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas J Kline on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Kline, Douglas)
December 14, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Robert DeWitt on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5524758. (DeWitt, Timothy)
December 11, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Edward A. Infante, filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 11, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom (Ret.), filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 8, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 12/8/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
December 8, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Klein Ayers on behalf of Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. (Ayers, Jennifer)
December 8, 2015 Filing 36 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Klein Ayers on behalf of Wistron Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp., Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. (Ayers, Jennifer) Modified on 12/8/2015 (nkl, ).
December 8, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 36, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lana Svetlana Shiferman on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Shiferman, Lana)
December 2, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Sernel, Marcus) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2015: #6 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
November 25, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personalized Media Communications, LLC re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Capshaw, Sidney)
November 20, 2015 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Xi, Meng)
November 20, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph)
November 20, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arun S Subramanian on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Subramanian, Arun)
November 20, 2015 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Sever Actions from Pretrial Consolidation and Memorandum in Support by Personalized Media Communications, LLC, Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corporation.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corporation.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Vizio, Inc.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TPV Int'l (USA), Inc.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Envision Peripherals, Inc.( Capshaw, Sidney)
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Envision Peripherals, Inc. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Vizio, Inc. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TPV Int'l (USA), Inc. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 16, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd. to 12/16/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2015 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/01/2015. (nkl, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2015. (rsp3, )
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-1366. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2015. (nkl, )
October 21, 2015 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Notice of Mootness by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2015 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc., filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '091 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '635 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '649 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '088 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - Big Stories From Texas, #6 Exhibit F - Best Buy Screen Shot, #7 Exhibit G - List of Stores, #8 Exhibit H - '490 Patent, #9 Exhibit I - Form 10-Q)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 8, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer A Albert on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5429285. (Albert, Jennifer)
October 8, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ce Li on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5429183. (Li, Ce)
October 8, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Schreiner on behalf of Personalized Media Communications, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5429158. (Schreiner, Stephen)
October 6, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(Sernel, Marcus)
October 6, 2015 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Sernel, Marcus)
October 6, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joel R Merkin on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5423301. (Merkin, Joel)
October 6, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marcus E Sernel on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5423294. (Sernel, Marcus)
October 5, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S Arovas on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5421887. (Arovas, Gregory)
August 19, 2015 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. as to Apple, Inc. (mrm, )
August 6, 2015 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
August 6, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 10/6/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
August 5, 2015 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
August 5, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 9/21/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/30/2015. (ch, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
July 30, 2015 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 30, 2015 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 30, 2015 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
July 30, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5320266.), filed by Personalized Media Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '091 Patent, #2 Exhibit B part 1 - '635 Patent, #3 Exhibit B part 2 - '635 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - "Big Stories from Texas 2014", #5 Exhibit D - Best Buy screen shot, #6 Exhibit DD - List of Stores, #7 Exhibit E - Form 10-Q, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney)
July 30, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 30, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personalized Media Communications, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wistron InfoComm Technology (America) Corp.
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Klein Ayers
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TPV Electronics (Fujian) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wistron InfoComm Technology (Texas) Corp.
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Klein Ayers
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Envision Peripherals, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TPV Int'l (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Top Victory Electronics (Fujian) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Top Victory Electronics (Taiwan) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TPV Technology Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Wistron Corp.
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer Klein Ayers
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry (Taiwan) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Steven Mark Zager
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Romeao J Jennings, III
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Represented By: John Wittenzellner
Represented By: Gregory David Yoder
Represented By: James Loughlin Duncan, III
Represented By: Yimeng Dou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personalized Media Communications, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Andrew S Ong
Represented By: Rohit D Nath
Represented By: Alexandra Daloia Valenti
Represented By: Timothy Robert DeWitt
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Meng Xi
Represented By: Amanda K. Bonn
Represented By: Stephen Schreiner
Represented By: Naomi L. Birbach
Represented By: Arun S Subramanian
Represented By: Dmitry Kheyfits
Represented By: Sarah Jane Fischer
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Kevin P Martin
Represented By: Douglas J Kline
Represented By: James Anthony Downs
Represented By: Lana Svetlana Shiferman
Represented By: Robert Frederickson, III
Represented By: Ce Li
Represented By: Autumn Elizabeth Soucy
Represented By: Phong T Dinh
Represented By: Jennifer A Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Edward A Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Rabinowitz
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham
Represented By: Sean M McEldowney
Represented By: Robert A Appleby
Represented By: Gregory Matthew Polins
Represented By: Marcus E Sernel
Represented By: Jacob Rambeau
Represented By: Jonathan D Brit
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Joel R Merkin
Represented By: Edward C Donovan
Represented By: Ellisen S Turner
Represented By: Meredith Zinanni
Represented By: Gregory S Arovas
Represented By: Luke L Dauchot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?