Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00057
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 305 Report and Recommendations. Objections OVERRULED Denying 312 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/282017. (ch, )
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 305 Report and Recommendations, Denying 242 Motion for Summary Judgment and OVERRULING 311 Objections. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2017. (ch, )
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2017. (ch, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 137 Report and Recommendations, Denying 25 Motion to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/24/2017. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Represented By: David M Barkan
Represented By: Carl Edward Bruce
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Represented By: Thomas Howard Reger, II
Represented By: Richard Alex Sterba
Represented By: Brian Gregory Strand
Represented By: Kevin K. Su
Represented By: Neil Alexander Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?