Chabrowski et al v. Litwin et al
Plaintiff: Chabrowski, Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki and Zbigniew Witko in the Right of and for the Benefit of Texas Enterprises LLC d/b/a Bluebonnet Elite Assisted Living
Defendant: Litwin, W. Jan Litwin, Ryszard Piskorczyk, Izabela Nordahl, Katarzyna Hyclak, Roman Mozdyniewicz and Texas Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00391
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for #20 Report and Recommendations. (Case DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/24/2017. (slo, )
May 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Zbigniew Witko, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/20/2017. (slo, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Zbigneiw Witko as to #20 Report and Recommendations. (slo, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Unable to Forward). Mail sent to Zbigniew Makowiecki. (slo, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 24 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Janusz Kecki as to #20 Report and Recommendations. (slo, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Derek Jahn Chabrowski as to #20 Report and Recommendations. (slo, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
May 15, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #20 Report and Recommendations filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
May 5, 2017 Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (Court RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/5/2017. (slo, )
April 18, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(slo, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Katarzyna Hyclak, W. Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl, Ryszard Piskorczyk, Texas Enterprises, LLC, filed by Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(slo, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(slo, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Katarzyna Hyclak, W. Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl, Ryszard Piskorczyk, Texas Enterprises, LLC, filed by Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski.(ch, )
February 6, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. (ch, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. W. Jan Litwin served on 1/4/2017, answer due 1/25/2017. (ch, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Roman Mozdyniewicz served on 12/24/2016, answer due 1/16/2017. (ch, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Katarzyna Hyclak served on 1/14/2017, answer due 2/6/2017. (ch, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski. Izabela Nordahl served on 12/12/2016, answer due 1/2/2017. (ch, )
January 27, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Allow More Time to Comply with Court Order Dated 12/27/2016 by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
January 10, 2017 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable 1/10/2017. Return to Sender Unable to Forward Mail sent to Zbigniew Makowiecki Docket # 8 Order (ch, )
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Serve Defendants by Alternative Means with leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/23/2016. (nkl, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Serve Defendants by Alternative Means with leave of court by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (ch, )
December 19, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Zbigniew Makowiecki, Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Zbigniew Witko as to W. Jan Litwin.Would not accept Service without a court order (ch, ) Modified on 12/21/2016 (ch, ).
September 23, 2016 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (ch, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Injunction and Restraining Order by Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Janusz Kecki, Zbigniew Makowiecki, Zbigniew Witko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ch, )
April 20, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zbigniew Makowiecki, Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Zbigniew Witko. W. Jan Litwin served on 4/15/2016, answer due 5/6/2016. (ch, )
April 14, 2016 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-29690. (mjc, )
April 12, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Katarzyna Hyclak, W. Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl, Ryszard Piskorczyk. (ch, )
April 12, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katarzyna Hyclak, W. Jan Litwin, Roman Mozdyniewicz, Izabela Nordahl, Ryszard Piskorczyk, filed by Zbigniew Makowiecki, Janusz Kecki, Derek Jahn Chabrowski, Zbigniew Witko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )
April 12, 2016 (SENT REGULAR MAIL TO PLAINTIFF'S)In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chabrowski et al v. Litwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Jan Litwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryszard Piskorczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Izabela Nordahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katarzyna Hyclak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Mozdyniewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Jahn Chabrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janusz Kecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbigniew Makowiecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zbigniew Witko in the Right of and for the Benefit of Texas Enterprises LLC d/b/a Bluebonnet Elite Assisted Living
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?