My Health, Inc. v. ALR Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: My Health, Inc.
Defendant: ALR Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00535
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDERED that Defendants objections (Docket No. 238) are OVERRULED and the Court AFFIRMS the Magistrate Judges Memorandum Opinion and Order in its entirety. Defendants joinder motion (Docket No. 182) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/10/2020. (ch, )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/5/2019. (ch, )
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 81 SEALED MOTION TO DECLARE CASES EXCEPTIONAL AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by ALR Technologies, Inc., McKesson Technologies Inc., MyNetDiary, Inc., InTouch Technologies, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/19/2017. (nkl, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING 66 and 69 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Granting 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue and Failure to State a Claim filed by ALR Technologies, Inc., and 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by McKesson Technologies Inc. and ORDERED that My Health complaint against Defendants are Dismissed With Prejudice.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/27/2017. (sm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Health, Inc. v. ALR Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Health, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Joseph G Pia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALR Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?