Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. filed a complaint for a declaratory judgment that it had offered to license its 4G Wireless Network Essential Patents to Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc. on terms and conditions that are fair, reasonable, and non-discriminatory (FRAND).

Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00715
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Stipulation of Dismissal. ORDERED that the claims asserted by Huawei in the above-captioned action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/27/2017. (ch, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Report and Recommendations Regarding T-Mobile's Motion to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.., ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/12/2017. (nkl, ) Modified on 10/11/2017 (jml, ).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - 35 Report and Recommendations, denying 12 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/9/17. (ch, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Gopenko, Daniel)
March 9, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 39, Response to Report and Recommendation. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 8, 2017 Filing 40 RESPONSE to 35 Report and Recommendations and Objections re U. S. Magistrate Judge Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismniss filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Selwyn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1: Barkan Ltr)(Jones, Michael)
March 8, 2017 Filing 39 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***RESPONSE to 35 Report and Recommendations and Objections re U. S. Magistrate Judge Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismniss filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Selwyn Declaration)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2017 (ch, ).
March 8, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re 35 Report and Recommendations Regarding T-Mobile's Motion to Dismnniss by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Selwyn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1: Barkan Ltr, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 8, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan J Lamberson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Lamberson, Jonathan)
March 7, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan J Lamberson on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Lamberson, Jonathan)
February 22, 2017 Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2017. (ch, )
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Frand -Related Case Management. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2017. (ch, )
February 21, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing Proceedings held on 2/7/17, before Judge Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Goolsby, Telephone number: 903/445-5355. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017. (dlc, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2017 re 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd, 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, )
February 2, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -- Response to 30 Huawei's Notice of Supplemental Events Regarding T-Mobile's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction -- (Thames, Earl)
January 31, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Supplemental Events (Reger, Thomas)
January 18, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Thompson, Gregory)
November 21, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Mann, James)
November 14, 2016 Filing 27 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Ex. 1 - Huawei Amended FRAND Statement of the Case)(Thames, Earl)
November 3, 2016 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HUAWEIS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR A SPECIAL FRANDRELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barkan, David)
October 24, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Ex. 1 - Core Wireless Answer Dkt. No. 115, # 3 Ex. 2 - Core Wireless Motions transcript Dkt. No. 216, # 4 Ex. 3 - Core Wireless Order Dkt 207, # 5 Ex. 4 - Core Wireless Order Dkt. No. 466, # 6 Ex. 5 - Core Wireless Verdict Dkt. No. 399, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 6, 2016 Filing 24 Opposed MOTION FOR SPECIAL FRAND-RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barkan, David)
September 19, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE to 22 Notice (Other) -- Response to Huawei's Notice of Supplemental Authority for its Opposition to T-Mobile's Motion to Dismiss -- filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
September 13, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd re 21 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reger, Thomas)
September 6, 2016 Filing 21 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction HUAWEI'S SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO T-MOBILE'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Reger, Thomas)
September 2, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE to 18 Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 01 - Aynes Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 02 - Apple v Ericsson Minute Entry, # 4 Exhibit 03 - TCL v Ericsson Civil Minutes)(Jones, Michael)
August 25, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Reger, Thomas)
August 15, 2016 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd.'s Response to T-Mobile's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Reger, Thomas)
July 28, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Syrett on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5860872. (Syrett, Timothy)
July 28, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph J Mueller on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5859913. (Mueller, Joseph)
July 28, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Thames, Earl)
July 27, 2016 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent None for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
July 27, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Selwyn, # 2 Ex. 01 - ETSI IPR Policy (excerpts), # 3 Ex. 02 - Huawei Amended FRAND Statement of the Case (Unwired Jan. 2016)..., # 4 Ex. 03 - ETSI Guide on IPRs (excerpts), # 5 Ex. 04 - Core Wireless Motions transcript Dkt. No. 216 (excerpts), # 6 Ex. 05 - Core Wireless Order Dkt 207, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 27, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark D Selwyn on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5856963. (Selwyn, Mark)
July 11, 2016 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd. for Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Reger, Thomas)
July 11, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leonard Ellsworth Davis on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Davis, Leonard)
July 11, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Linda Liu Kordziel on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Kordziel, Linda)
July 11, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Du, Jane)
July 11, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Edward Bruce on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Bruce, Carl)
July 11, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Barkan on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Barkan, David)
July 11, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd (Cordell, Ruffin)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 76/2016. (ch, )
July 6, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 6, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 5, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(ch, )
July 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5820973.), filed by Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reger, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Represented By: David M Barkan
Represented By: Carl Edward Bruce
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Leonard Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Represented By: Thomas Howard Reger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Joseph J Mueller
Represented By: Mark D Selwyn
Represented By: Timothy Syrett
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Joseph J Mueller
Represented By: Mark D Selwyn
Represented By: Timothy Syrett
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?