Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc and Uniloc USA, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Consolidated Defendant: Avaya Inc., ZTE (TX), Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Kyocera Communications, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Kyocera America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Snap Inc., HTC America, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Tencent Holdings Limited, Kyocera International, Inc. and Snapchat, Inc.
Counter Claimant: LG Electronics Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc., Shoretel, Inc. and Tencent America, LLC
Consolidated Counter Defendant: Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. and Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.
Not Classified By Court: Edward A Infante and Robert W Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2016cv00992
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re ZTE (USA), Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv993), ZTE (USA), Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv993), ZTE (TX), Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv993) and ZTE (TX), Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv993) terminated., Attorney Harold Davis Davis, Jr; Theodore J Angelis and Rachel E. Burnim terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2022. (nkl, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 202 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to ZTE (USA) Inc. and ZTE (TX) Inc. by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Jacobs, Aaron)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to HTC America, Inc (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv989). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/28/2021. (ch, )
September 24, 2021 Filing 200 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE RE HTC AMERICA, INC. by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Gannon, Kevin)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/1/2021. (nkl, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Latchford, Shawn)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Joseph Klein terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/5/2021. (nkl, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Isaac Margulies and Jeffrey Andrew Miller terminated; granting #193 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paul Isaac Margulies and Jeffrey Andrew Miller terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/5/2021. (nkl, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 195 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Eric)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #191 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey Huang terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/3/2021. (nkl, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 193 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paul Margulies by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 3, 2021 Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey Miller by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huang, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett Aaron Mangrum; Travis Lee Richins; James L Etheridge and Ryan Scott Loveless terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/2/2021. (nkl, )
February 1, 2021 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Seth Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
January 28, 2021 Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal of Consolicated Civil Action 2:16-cv991.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/6/2020. (ch, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Soumitra Deka terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2019. (nkl, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore J Angelis on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. (Angelis, Theodore)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #181 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv994), Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv994), Huawei Device Co., Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv994) and Huawei Device Co., Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv994) terminated., Attorney Gregory Scott Nieberg; Stanley Young; Jennifer Parker Ainsworth and Devon L Mobley-Ritter terminated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/3/2019. (nkl, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #179 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/1/2019. (nkl, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by Avaya Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ravinder Singh Deol terminated Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/08/2019. (klc, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 177 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deol, Ravinder)
October 4, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stanley Young (Young, Stanley)
September 28, 2018 Filing 175 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Latchford, Shawn)
September 13, 2018 Filing 174 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Unopposed MOTION TO JOIN NEW PATENT OWNER by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James J. Foster, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) Modified on 9/13/2018 (ch, ).
September 13, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 174, Unopposed Motion to Join. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER - granting #169 Motion to Stay and dismissing all following motinns without prejudice #133 Motion to Strike ; dismissing #150 Motion to Stay; dismissing #157 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing #158 Motion to Stay; dismissing #161 Motion for Leave to File; dismissing #170 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; dismissing #171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; dismissing #172 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that each of the consolidated cases isstayed pending resolution. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/30/2017. (ch, )
June 28, 2017 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition To Defendant Motorola Mobility LLCs Motion To Stay Pending Resolution Of Its Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Transfer For Improper Venue by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 28, 2017 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Dismiss or, In The Alternative, Transfer for Improper Venue by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 27, 2017 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #146 Response to Motion, #133 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions and/or Motion to Compel Rule-Compliant Infringement Contentions by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 26, 2017 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Snap Inc., ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/22/2017. (nkl, )
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER finding as moot #149 Motion to Expedite; granting #159 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #150 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer ( Responses due by 6/28/2017). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/21/2017. (nkl, )
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER re #165 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., denied as moot #160 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Kyocera Int'l, Inc. filed by Kyocera International, Inc.., Kyocera International, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv990) terminated., Attorney Thomas William Ritchie; David L. Witcoff; Marc S Blackman and Nickou Oskoui terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/21/2017. (nkl, )
June 20, 2017 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal AGAINST KYOCERA INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 20, 2017 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #146 Response to Motion, #133 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions and/or Motion to Compel Rule-Compliant Infringement Contentions by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re #155 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc., Motions terminated:, Tencent Holdings Limited (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv694), Tencent Holdings Limited (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv694), Tencent America, LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv694) and Tencent America, LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv694) terminated., Attorney Gerald F Ivey; John M Williamson; Qingyu Yin; Guang-Yu Zhu; Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/19/2017. (nkl, )
June 16, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION to Dismiss [CORRECTED] or, In the Alternative, Transfer for Improper Venue by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State of Delaware Registered Agent, #2 2017-06-13 Merritt Declaration ISO Motorola's MTD, #3 2017-06-16 Tsuyemura Declaration ISO Motorola's MTD, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 16, 2017 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Motion to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, Transfer for Improper Venue, and a Corrected Tsuyemura Declaration in Support Thereof by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 15, 2017 Filing 160 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Kyocera Int'l, Inc. by Kyocera International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ritchie, Thomas)
June 15, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #150 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richins, Travis)
June 14, 2017 Filing 158 MOTION to Stay re #157 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 13, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Merritt Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3, Tsuyemura Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 13, 2017 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Support re #133 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions and/or Motion to Compel Rule-Compliant Infringement Contentions filed by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Williams, Fred)
June 13, 2017 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of Tencent Holdings America, LLC and Tencent Holdings Limited by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing Regarding HTC's Motion to Strike Uniloc's Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2017. (nkl, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #141 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #95 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order Docket Control Order filed by Snap Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 12/8/2017., Markman Hearing set for 11/17/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2017. (nkl, )
June 7, 2017 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #95 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Docket Control Order filed by HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Snap Inc., ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Unikel, Robert)
June 2, 2017 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Regarding HTC's Motion to Strike Uniloc's Infringement Contentions by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
June 1, 2017 Filing 150 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
June 1, 2017 Filing 149 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by Snap Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Reuben)
June 1, 2017 Filing 148 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #95 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Docket Control Order filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Jacobs, Aaron)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #145 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/31/2017. (nkl, )
June 1, 2017 Answer Due Deadline Updated for HTC America, Inc. to 6/13/2017; Motorola Mobility LLC to 6/13/2017. (nkl, )
May 30, 2017 Filing 146 RESPONSE to Motion re #133 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions and/or Motion to Compel Rule-Compliant Infringement Contentions filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 3A, #6 Exhibit 3B, #7 Exhibit 3C, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
May 26, 2017 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 26, 2017 Filing 144 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HTC America, Inc.. (Williams, Fred) Modified on 5/26/2017 (nkl, ).
May 26, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 144, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/19/2017. (nkl, )
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Amend/Correct the Court's Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/19/2017. (nkl, )
May 18, 2017 Filing 141 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #95 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Docket Control Order by HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Snap Inc., ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
May 18, 2017 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Court's Protective Order by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Sharma, Parmanand) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2017: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
May 18, 2017 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Court's Discovery Order by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Sharma, Parmanand) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2017: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
May 18, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Sharma, Parmanand)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #135 Motion to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Kyocera Int'l, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/17/2017. (nkl, )
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/17/2017. (nkl, )
May 16, 2017 Filing 135 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines as to Defendant Kyocera Int'l, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron)
May 16, 2017 Filing 134 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James)
May 16, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Infringement Contentions and/or Motion to Compel Rule-Compliant Infringement Contentions by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Apreotesi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2017. (nkl, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/12/2017. (nkl, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The above-captioned case (Case No. 2:16-cv-991) is CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE (Case No. 2:16-cv-00992). All future pleadings-except relating to venue-are to be filed in the Lead Case (Case No. 2:16-cv-00992). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/4/2017. (slo, )
May 2, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 5/21/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
April 28, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Huang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Huang, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice All Claims Against ShoreTel, Inc. filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.., Shoretel, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv779) and Shoretel, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv779) terminated., Attorney Michael E Jones; Amr O Aly and Gregory J Apgar terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/18/2017. (nkl, )
April 13, 2017 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice All Claims Against ShoreTel, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DISCOVERY ORDER re #97 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Disputed Discovery Order filed by Uniloc USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/06/2017. (nkl, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying #63 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/05/2017. (nkl, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE CASE CAPTION filed in member case 2:16cv696. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/04/2017. (nkl, )
April 4, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Michael Vecchione on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vecchione, Anthony)
April 4, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nelson, Edward)
March 29, 2017 Filing 121 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. (Davis, Harold)
March 29, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Mobley-Ritter, Devon)
March 29, 2017 Filing 119 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited Regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Craft, Roger)
March 29, 2017 Filing 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HTC America, Inc. of Compliance regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Williams, Fred)
March 29, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Snapchat, Inc. of Compliance regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Chen, Reuben)
March 28, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Motorola Mobility LLC of Compliance regarding PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Jones, Michael)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/24/2017. (nkl, )
March 22, 2017 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Craig Tadlock by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
February 28, 2017 Filing 113 MOTION for Protective Order (Disputed) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #99 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (ShoreTel, Inc.) filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., denying as moot #96 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendant ShoreTel Pending Finalization of Settlement filed by Uniloc USA, Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/23/2017. (nkl, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/23/2017. (nkl, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/23/2017. (nkl, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE by ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Davis, Harold)
February 22, 2017 Filing 108 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Initial and Additional Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 22, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. (Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance re Initial Disclosures) (Gannon, Kevin)
February 22, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc. (Plaintiffs' Notice of 3-1 & 3-2 Disclosures) (Gannon, Kevin)
February 22, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Kyocera International, Inc. regarding compliance with Initial and Additional Disclosures (Ritchie, Thomas)
February 22, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HTC America, Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Williams, Fred)
February 21, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Snapchat, Inc. regarding Compliance with Initial and Additional Disclosures (Chen, Reuben)
February 21, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Craft, Roger)
February 21, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Motorola Mobility LLC regarding Compliance with Initial and Additional Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
February 21, 2017 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement (ShoreTel, Inc.) by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron)
February 21, 2017 Filing 98 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 97 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Disputed Discovery Order by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed DISPUTED Discovery Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
February 17, 2017 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendant ShoreTel Pending Finalization of Settlement by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Aaron)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #93 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.., Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2017., Jury Selection set for 6/4/2018 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 11/17/2017., Markman Hearing set for 10/20/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 4/16/2018., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/30/2018. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/16/2017. (nkl, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 94 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loveless, Ryan)
February 14, 2017 Filing 93 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order))(Gannon, Kevin)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Edward A. Infante is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced member case, only. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2017. (nkl, )
February 7, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 90, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Honorable Robert Faulkner (Ret.) of JAMS is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced lead case and listed member cases.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2017. (nkl, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FILED IN ERROR ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Edward A. Infante is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced member case, only.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2017. (nkl, ) Modified on 2/7/2017 (nkl, ).
February 3, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, No Agreement, filed by HTC America, Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
February 3, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Huawei Device Co., Ltd.. (Notice of Agreed Selection of Mediator for Plaintiffs and Defendants Huawei Device Co., Ltd. and Huawei Device USA Inc.) (Nieberg, Gregory)
February 3, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Snapchat, Inc.. (Chen, Reuben)
February 3, 2017 Filing 86 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Notice of Agreed Selection of Mediator for Plaintiffs and ZTE Defendants) (Gannon, Kevin)
February 3, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Notice of Agreed Selection of Mediator for Plaintiffs and ShoreTel, Inc.) (Gannon, Kevin)
February 3, 2017 Filing 84 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable Robert Faulkner, filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Notice of Agreed Selection of Mediator for Plaintiffs and Kyocera International, Inc.) (Gannon, Kevin)
February 3, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Edward A. Infante (Ret.),, filed by Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited. (Craft, Roger)
February 3, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Agreed Selection of Mediator (Jones, Michael)
January 31, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2017. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
January 30, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Snapchat, Inc. (Kerr, Peter)
January 30, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravinder Singh Deol on behalf of ZTE (TX), Inc., ZTE (USA), Inc. (Deol, Ravinder)
January 27, 2017 Filing 79 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #63 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by HTC America, Inc. filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Gannon, Kevin)
January 24, 2017 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #63 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by HTC America, Inc.. (Williams, Fred)
January 24, 2017 Filing 77 Plaintiffs' Answer ANSWER to #57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Device Co., Ltd. by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A..(Gannon, Kevin)
January 23, 2017 Filing 76 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Stanley Young on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Young, Stanley)
January 20, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Devon L Mobley-Ritter on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Mobley-Ritter, Devon)
January 20, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Nieberg on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Nieberg, Gregory)
January 20, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley Young on behalf of Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. (Young, Stanley)
January 20, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE by Avaya Inc. Notice of Suggestion on Pendency of Bankruptcy for Avaya Inc and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Bankruptcy Petition)(Jones, Michael)
January 20, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Service of P.R. 3-1, 3-2 Disclosures (Loveless, Ryan)
January 19, 2017 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Terrell on behalf of Snapchat, Inc. (Terrell, Emily)
January 18, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reuben Chen on behalf of Snapchat, Inc. (Chen, Reuben)
January 18, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Soumitra Deka on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6115510. (Deka, Soumitra)
January 17, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nickou Oskoui on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Oskoui, Nickou)
January 17, 2017 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by HTC America, Inc. filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 13, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey A Miller on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6110954. (Miller, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew E Buccellato on behalf of Snapchat, Inc. (Buccellato, Matthew)
January 11, 2017 Filing 63 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Apreotesi Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Williams, Fred)
January 11, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Qingyu Yin on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited (Yin, Qingyu)
January 10, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Williamson on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited (Williamson, John)
January 10, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guang-Yu Zhu on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited (Zhu, Guang-Yu)
January 9, 2017 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Device Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Huawei Tech. Investment Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd for Huawei Device Co., Ltd.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 9, 2017 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Limited for Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 9, 2017 Filing 57 ANSWER to Complaint in Member Case No. 2:16-cv-994, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Device Co., Ltd..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 9, 2017 Filing 56 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Motorola Mobility LLC filed by Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Gannon, Kevin)
January 6, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Tencent America, LLC, Tencent Holdings Limited (Craft, Roger)
January 6, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James John Foster on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Foster, James)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Motorolas Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/5/2017. (nkl, )
January 4, 2017 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Plaintiffs' Extension to file Sur-Reply to Motorola's Motion to Dismiss) by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
January 4, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc S Blackman on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Blackman, Marc)
January 4, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas William Ritchie on behalf of Kyocera International, Inc. (Ritchie, Thomas)
December 30, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Lee Richins on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv779), Uniloc USA, Inc. (Richins, Travis)
December 30, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Scott Loveless on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Loveless, Ryan)
December 30, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James)
December 30, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Aaron Mangrum on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Mangrum, Brett)
December 30, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory J Apgar on behalf of Avaya Inc., Shoretel, Inc. (Apgar, Gregory)
December 30, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv991; Terminated per Order #42), Uniloc USA, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv694) (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation & Contact Information for all Plaintiffs' Counsel) (Hayes, Paul)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/30/2016. (ch, )
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - The Clerk is hereby ORDERED to DECONSOLIDATE Civil Action No. 2:16-cv-991 from Civil Action No. 2:16-cv-992.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/29/2016. (nkl, )
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER withdrawing #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #38 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/29/2016. (nkl, )
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #32 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/28/2016. (nkl, )
December 28, 2016 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Unikel, Robert)
December 28, 2016 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 28, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. to 3/8/2017; LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. to 3/8/2017; LG Electronics, Inc. to 3/8/2017. (nkl, )
December 27, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles H Suh on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Suh, Charles)
December 27, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Preston Long on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Long, Joseph)
December 27, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Minjae Kang on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Kang, Minjae)
December 27, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Parmanand K Sharma on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Sharma, Parmanand)
December 26, 2016 Filing 33 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Margulies, Paul) Modified on 12/29/2016 (nkl, ).
December 22, 2016 Filing 32 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed in Member Case No. 2:16-cv-991 by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 21, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mario A Apreotesi on behalf of HTC America, Inc. (Apreotesi, Mario)
December 21, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Lloyd Hardt on behalf of HTC America, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan)
December 21, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of HTC America, Inc. (Klein, Eric)
December 21, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of HTC America, Inc. (Landis, Todd)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) Responses due by 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/21/2016. (nkl, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-00992. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/2016. (nkl, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel McGonagle, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(McGonagle, Daniel)
December 19, 2016 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin)
December 5, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul Isaac Margulies on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6056340. (Margulies, Paul)
December 5, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert W Unikel on behalf of Motorola Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6056310. (Unikel, Robert)
December 5, 2016 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Mobility LLC (Jones, Michael)
December 5, 2016 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 5, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/1/16. (mrm, )
November 1, 2016 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Motorola Mobility LLC to 12/5/2016. (mrm, )
October 18, 2016 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 6, 2016 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A. for Motorola Mobility LLC. (nkl, )
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Clarence Williams terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/03/2016. (nkl, )
September 30, 2016 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason C. Williams by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
September 30, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Seth Jacobs on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Jacobs, Aaron)
September 13, 2016 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola Mobility LLC.( Jones, Michael)
September 13, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola Mobility LLC to 11/3/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases) (Williams, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Motorola Mobility LLC c/o CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
September 7, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel James McGonagle on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (McGonagle, Daniel)
September 7, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean G Bostock on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bostock, Dean)
September 7, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Clarence Williams on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Williams, Jason)
September 7, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Gannon on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Gannon, Kevin)
September 7, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Ercolini on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Ercolini, Michael)
September 7, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Paul J Hayes on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
September 6, 2016 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
September 6, 2016 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motorola Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5922661.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
September 6, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
September 6, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Miller
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Soumitra Deka
Represented By: Robert W Unikel
Represented By: Paul Isaac Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dean G Bostock
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Daniel James McGonagle
Represented By: Michael James Ercolini
Represented By: James John Foster
Represented By: Jason Clarence Williams
Represented By: Kevin Gannon
Represented By: Ryan Scott Loveless
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Represented By: Jeffrey Huang
Represented By: Aaron Seth Jacobs
Represented By: James L Etheridge
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Represented By: Anthony Michael Vecchione
Represented By: Shawn A. Latchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Avaya Inc.
Represented By: Amr O Aly
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Gregory J Apgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ZTE (TX), Inc.
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Represented By: Rachel E. Burnim
Represented By: Theodore J Angelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Huawei Device Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Stanley Young
Represented By: Gregory Scott Nieberg
Represented By: Devon L Mobley-Ritter
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kyocera Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.
Represented By: Parmanand K Sharma
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Charles H Suh
Represented By: Minjae Kang
Represented By: Joseph Preston Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Parmanand K Sharma
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Charles H Suh
Represented By: Minjae Kang
Represented By: Joseph Preston Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kyocera America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Huawei Device USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley Young
Represented By: KD Shull
Represented By: Gregory Scott Nieberg
Represented By: Devon L Mobley-Ritter
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Snap Inc.
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Terrell
Represented By: Peter Aaron Kerr
Represented By: Reuben Chen
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Matthew E Buccellato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Mario A Apreotesi
Represented By: Todd Eric Landis
Represented By: Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Parmanand K Sharma
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Charles H Suh
Represented By: Minjae Kang
Represented By: Joseph Preston Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Tencent Holdings Limited
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Qingyu Yin
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Guang-Yu Zhu
Represented By: John M Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Kyocera International, Inc.
Represented By: Nickou Oskoui
Represented By: Marc S Blackman
Represented By: Thomas William Ritchie
Represented By: David L. Witcoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Snapchat, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew E Buccellato
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Terrell
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Peter Aaron Kerr
Represented By: Reuben Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: LG Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Parmanand K Sharma
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ZTE (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Harold Davis Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shoretel, Inc.
Represented By: Amr O Aly
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Tencent America, LLC
Represented By: Qingyu Yin
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Guang-Yu Zhu
Represented By: John M Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated counter defendant: Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: Brett Aaron Mangrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated counter defendant: Uniloc Luxembourg, S.A.
Represented By: Travis Lee Richins
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Edward A Infante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?