Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics Mobile Research U.S.A. LLC and LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01425
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims in this matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/2018. (ch, )
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/2/2018. (ch, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - LG defendants objections, Dkt. No. 113, are OVERRULED. The motion to transfer, Dkt. No. 48, stands DENIED. LG defendants motion to stay the case pending consideration of their objections, Dkt. No. 114, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/13/2018. (ch, )
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 48 MOTION to Change Venue /Transfer filed by LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics Mobile Research U.S.A. LLC, LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A. Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Alabama, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2017. (nkl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobile Research U.S.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?