Weidner v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nancy Weidner
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00361
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Nancy Weidner. (Goodman, Robert)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Nancy Weidner. (Goodman, Robert)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 11/6/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 02:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 11, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Unpublished Opinions, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/28/2018. (ch, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (ch, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6900700.), filed by NANCY WEIDNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 15, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weidner v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Weidner
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?