WESNER v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: JONATHAN WESNER
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00411
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/2018. (ch, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay all deadlines for 90 days so that Defendant may complete its review of Plaintiffs appeal. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/5/2018. (ch, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Butler, Samuel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (ch, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6958560.), filed by JONATHAN WESNER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert)
September 26, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
September 26, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESNER v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Samuel W Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN WESNER
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?