Russell v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Gary Russell
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00438
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company to 1/17/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.( Mathisen, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Mathisen, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric P Mathisen on behalf of The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Mathisen, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gary Russell. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Mann, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company CT Corporation Service. (nkl, )
October 23, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
October 23, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6993691.), filed by Gary Russell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Russell
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric P Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?