Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00469
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. Microsoft Corporation served on 11/8/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corporation to 1/14/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 9, 2018 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.( Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corporation to 12/29/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 9, 2018 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.( Smith, Melissa)
November 6, 2018 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (ch, )
November 6, 2018 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Benjamin Hanson on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hanson, Eric)
November 6, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
November 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
November 6, 2018 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorian S. Berger on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Berger, Dorian)
November 6, 2018 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 6, 2018 5 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel)
November 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Microsoft Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7015359.), filed by Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hipskind, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Data Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Daniel P. Hipskind
Represented By: Dorian S. Berger
Represented By: Eric Benjamin Hanson
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?